Kelora Systems, LLC v. Target Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Kelora Systems, LLC
Defendant: Target Corporation, OfficeMax Inc., Shopko Stores Operating Co., LLC, Briggs & Stratton Corporation, National Business Furniture, LLC, Rockler Companies, Inc., 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc., PC Connection, Inc., Mason Companies, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Dell, Inc., Office Depot, Inc., Newegg Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. and Circuitcity.Com Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv01548
Filed: April 1, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2011 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO RESPOND TO INTENT TO RELATE CASE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/4/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 5, 2011 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO RESPOND TO INTENT TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/5/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011) *** DISREGARD, THIS IS A DUPLICATE FILING. SEE ORIGINAL ORDER, DOCKET NO. 161 ***
May 31, 2011 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 213 Dell, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
June 7, 2011 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 268 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice Between Plaintiff Kelora Systems, LLC, and Defendant Briggs & Stratton Corporation.Briggs & Stratton Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 300 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice Between Plaintiff Kelora Systems, LLC, and Defendant Shopko Stores Operating Co., LLC. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 303 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 301 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Between Plaintiff Kelora Systems, LLC, and Defendant PC Connection, Inc. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 8, 2011 304 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 298 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Between Plaintiff Kelora Systems, LLC, and Defendant National Business Furniture, LLC. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/8/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 29, 2011 323 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 320 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Between Plaintiff Kelora Systems, LLC, and Defendant Mason Companies, Inc., D/B/A Maryland Square.Mason Companies, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/29/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
August 2, 2011 325 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes re 321 MOTION to Compel Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Defendant Rockler Companies, Inc. in the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 12, 2011 331 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 329 Stipulation ENLARGING THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT 1-800-FLOWERS.COM, INC. TO ADD ADDITIONAL PARTIES OR CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/12/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 12, 2011 332 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 328 Stipulation Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and 15(a)(2) to Add Defendants Hewlett-Packard Company, Zappos.Com, Inc., and Audible, Inc., and to Drop Defendant Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/12/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 29, 2011 349 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY LETTER RE LOCATION OF DELL DEPOSITIONS 337 . Signed by Judge Beeler on 8/29/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
November 3, 2011 407 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 406 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice Between Plaintiff Kelora Systems, LLC, and Defendant 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/3/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 9, 2011 415 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 11/2/2011 DISCOVERY LETTER 405 . Signed by Judge Beeler on 11/9/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 9, 2011 416 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 11/4/2011 DISCOVERY LETTER 411 . Signed by Judge Beeler on 11/9/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
December 12, 2011 434 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 433 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice between Plaintiff Kelora Systems, LLC, and Defendant CircuitCity.com, Inc. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/12/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
January 11, 2012 441 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 440 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice Between Plaintiff Kelora Systems, LLC And Defendant Officemax Incorporated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/11/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 24, 2012 449 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 12/27/2011 DISCOVERY LETTER 437 . Signed by Judge Beeler on 1/24/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
February 21, 2012 464 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 461 STIPULATION Of Dismissal With Prejudice Between Kelora Systems, LLC, And Rockler Companies. Rockler Companies, Inc. and Rockler Companies, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/21/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelora Systems, LLC v. Target Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelora Systems, LLC
Represented By: Ronald Stanley Katz
Represented By: Ronald S. Katz
Represented By: Shawn G. Hansen
Represented By: Robert David Becker
Represented By: Robert D. Becker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Richard Stephen Zembek
Represented By: John Anthony O'Malley
Represented By: Daniel Leventhal
Represented By: Gilbert Greene
Represented By: Aaron Damion Gopen
Represented By: Dan D Davison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OfficeMax Inc.
Represented By: Edward Timothy Walker
Represented By: Douglas S. Rupert
Represented By: Clinton Judd McCord
Represented By: John S. Letchinger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shopko Stores Operating Co., LLC
Represented By: Martha Jahn Snyder
Represented By: Kristin Graham Noel
Represented By: Anthony A. Tomaselli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briggs & Stratton Corporation
Represented By: Allen Arntsen
Represented By: Gina Ann Bibby
Represented By: Matthew Burt Lowrie
Represented By: Aaron William Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Business Furniture, LLC
Represented By: Martha Jahn Snyder
Represented By: Kristin Graham Noel
Represented By: Anthony A. Tomaselli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockler Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Niall A. MacLeod
Represented By: Robert A Mich, Jr.
Represented By: Aaron A. Myers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine E Hart
Represented By: Vaibhav P. Kadaba
Represented By: Joseph P. Wright
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PC Connection, Inc.
Represented By: Allen Arntsen
Represented By: Gina Ann Bibby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Shane Brunner
Represented By: Joel Frederick Graham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Dan D Davison
Represented By: Aaron Damion Gopen
Represented By: Gilbert Greene
Represented By: Daniel Leventhal
Represented By: John Anthony O'Malley
Represented By: Richard Stephen Zembek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell, Inc.
Represented By: Kimball Anderson
Represented By: David S. Bloch
Represented By: Marlon Lutfiyya
Represented By: Howard Shin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Dan D Davison
Represented By: Aaron Damion Gopen
Represented By: Gilbert Greene
Represented By: Daniel Leventhal
Represented By: John Anthony O'Malley
Represented By: Joseph P. Wright
Represented By: Richard Stephen Zembek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newegg Inc.
Represented By: Kent E Baldauf, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Harris Brean
Represented By: Phillip Francis Shinn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Dan D Davison
Represented By: Aaron Damion Gopen
Represented By: Gilbert Greene
Represented By: Daniel Leventhal
Represented By: John Anthony O'Malley
Represented By: Richard Stephen Zembek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
Represented By: Dan D Davison
Represented By: Aaron Damion Gopen
Represented By: Gilbert Greene
Represented By: Daniel Leventhal
Represented By: John Anthony O'Malley
Represented By: Richard Stephen Zembek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circuitcity.Com Inc.
Represented By: David Joyal
Represented By: Michael Nicodema
Represented By: Barry Schindler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]