Nelson v. Hart et al

Plaintiff: Bavarious Nelson
Defendant: Holden, Cox, Jarrell Hart, Anderson and Maddox
Case Number: 5:2013cv00009
Filed: January 17, 2013
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Waycross Office
County: Ware
Referring Judge: James E. Graham
Presiding Judge: Lisa G. Wood
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's 8 Report and Recommendations; Plaintiff's claims against Warden Jarrell Hart and Deputy Warden Holden are DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 3/5/2013. (csr)
June 14, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING 10 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations; and this Order shall take its stead. A copy of Plaintiff's Complaint, Document Numbered 8, and Plaintiff's Objections, and a copy of this Order shall be served upon Defendants Hart and Holden by the United States Marshals Service. The Magistrate Judge's service Order dated February 7, 2013, shall govern the parties' action and course of conduct. Signed by Chief Judge Lisa G. Wood on 6/13/2013. (csr)
February 7, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint and a copy of this Order shall be served upon Defendants Anderson, Cox, and Maddox by the United States Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 2/7/2013. (csr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Hart et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bavarious Nelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrell Hart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maddox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]