Joyce v. Town of Dennis et al

Plaintiff: Elaine Joyce
Defendant: Town of Dennis, Dennis Pines Golf Course, Dennis Highlands, Robert Canevazzi, Michael Cummings, Dennis Penner and Russell Champoux
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv10277
Filed: February 15, 2008
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Barnstable
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M. Gorton
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2011 110 Featured Case Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER "In accordance with the foregoing, 1) plaintiff's petition for reasonable attorney's fees and costs (Docket No. 90 ) is ALLOWED, in part, and DENIED, in part. The Court aw ards attorney's fees in the amount of $30,000 and costs of $4,600; 2) plaintiff's petition for injunctive relief (Docket No. 91 ) is DENIED without prejudice; and 3) plaintiff's motion to alter the judgment to add prejudgment interest (Docket No. 95 ) is ALLOWED, the amount to be calculated by the Clerk." (Duong, Diep)
February 12, 2014 139 Featured Case Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: "In accordance with the foregoing, 1) Plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees (Docket No. 90 ) is ALLOWED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Plaintiff is awarded $87,28 7 in fees and $4,764 in costs. 2) Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief (Docket No. 91 ) is ALLOWED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Defendants are ordered to issue a directive, to be provided to all members and posted at Town-owned golf courses and on the courses' website, that there shall be no distinction, restriction or discrimination on the basis of gender at either of the golf courses. So ordered."(Moore, Kellyann)
March 30, 2010 49 Featured Case Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER "In accordance with the foregoing, 1) plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Docket No. 32 ) is, with respect to Counts I and VI-X, ALLOWED, and, with respect to Counts II-V and XI, DENIED; and 2) defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment (Docket No. 38 ) is, with respect to Counts II-V and XI, ALLOWED, and, with respect to Counts I and VI-X DENIED." (Duong, Diep)
August 18, 2010 52 Featured Case Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. In accordance with the foregoing, 50 Plaintiff's emergency motion for sanctions is DENIED. So Ordered.(Abaid, Kimberly)
January 4, 2011 58 Featured Case Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER "In accordance with the foregoing, the defendants' requests which are treated as in limine motions (Docket No. 54 ) are 1) with respect to attorneys fees, DENIED; and 2) with respect to the prohibition of a jury instruction on punitive damages, ALLOWED." (Duong, Diep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Joyce v. Town of Dennis et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Joyce
Represented By: Nancy A. Newark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Dennis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Pines Golf Course
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Highlands
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Canevazzi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cummings
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Penner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Champoux
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]