Surprenant, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated v. Massachusetts Turnpike Authority et al

Plaintiff: Carol Surprenant
Defendant: Massachusetts Turnpike Authority and Massachusetts Port Authority
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv10428
Filed: March 20, 2009
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Constitutional - State Statute Office
County: Barnstable
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Stearns
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2011 106 Featured Case Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 99 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 99 Motion to Amend (Zierk, Marsha)
March 4, 2010 43 Featured Case Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss (Zierk, Marsha)
August 23, 2010 71 Featured Case Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 55 Motion for Protective Order (Zierk, Marsha)
February 4, 2011 94 Featured Case Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 79 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Zierk, Marsha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Surprenant, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated v. Massachusetts Turnpike Authority et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Surprenant
Represented By: David Pastor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Turnpike Authority
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Port Authority
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]