Astrolabe, Inc. v. Olson et al Featured Case

Defendant: Arthur David Olson and Paul Eggert
Plaintiff: Astrolabe, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv11725
Filed: September 30, 2011
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Barnstable
Presiding Judge: George A. OToole
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2012 Civil Case Terminated. (Lyness, Paul)
February 22, 2012 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Astrolabe, Inc. (Molloy, Julie)
February 17, 2012 4 Notice of potential dismissal of action pursuant to FCRP 4(m) and Local Rule 4.1(b): This action will be dismissed in twenty-one days unless proof of service is filed. (Lyness, Paul)
September 30, 2011 3 Summons Issued as to Paul Eggert, Arthur David Olson. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (York, Steve)
September 30, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Folan, Karen)
September 30, 2011 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (York, Steve)
September 30, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-3604021 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Astrolabe, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Action Sheet, # 2 Category Form )(Molloy, Julie) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/30/2011) (York, Steve). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/30/2011) (York, Steve). Modified on 9/30/2011 (York, Steve).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Astrolabe, Inc. v. Olson et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur David Olson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Eggert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astrolabe, Inc.
Represented By: Julie C. Molloy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]