KG Urban Enterprises, LLC v. Patrick et al

Plaintiff: KG Urban Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Deval L. Patrick and Chairman and Commissioner of MA Gaming Commission
Case Number: 1:2011cv12070
Filed: November 22, 2011
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M. Gorton
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: "In accordance with the foregoing, 1) the motion to intervene as of right by the Aquinnah (Docket No. 39 ) is DENIED; 2) the conditional motions to intervene by the AGHCA (Docket No. 52 ) and the Town (Docket No. 75 ) are DENIED as moot; and 3) the motion to intervene and dismiss by special limited appearance of the Mashpee (Docket No. 62 ) is DENIED without prejudice. So ordered." (Moore, Kellyann)
August 16, 2013 131 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: "In accordance with the foregoing, defendants' motion todismiss the Amended Complaint for mootness (Docket No. 114 ) is DENIED. So ordered." (Moore, Kellyann)
January 9, 2014 160 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: "In accordance with the foregoing, defendants' motion for summary judgment (Docket No. 138 ) is ALLOWED and plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Docket No. 141 ) is DENIED. So ordered."(Moore, Kellyann)
February 16, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: "In accordance with the foregoing, plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (Docket No. 2 ) is DENIED. Moreover, because plaintiff brings only a facial equal protection challenge to the Gaming Act and no further briefing or proceedings would affect this Court's constitutional analysis, plaintiff's complaint (Docket No. 1 ) is hereby DISMISSED. So ordered." (Moore, Kellyann) (Main Document 26 replaced on 2/17/2012) (Moore, Kellyann).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KG Urban Enterprises, LLC v. Patrick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KG Urban Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Furey
Represented By: Kevin M. Considine
Represented By: Paul D Clement
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deval L. Patrick
Represented By: Kenneth W. Salinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chairman and Commissioner of MA Gaming Commission
Represented By: Kenneth W. Salinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.