Hicks v. Ryan et al

Defendant: First name unknown Powers, Matthew Tolman, Umass Correctional Health, Kelly A. Ryan, Karen Dinardo, Matthew Arpano, Luis Spencer, Timothy Bariamis, Aimee Grenier and CNA Lucia
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Hicks
Case Number: 1:2013cv10709
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Stearns
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting 2 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and assessing an initial, partial filing fee. The clerk shall issue a summons for service of the complaint on defendan t Ryan as to plaintiffs First Amendment Free Exercise claim and Defendant Ryan is required to respond to the complaint. Within forty-two (42) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, Plaintiff shall show cause why his employment claim under th e Americans With Disabilities Act and the remaining Section 1983 claims should not be dismissed, or in the alternative, he shall file an amended complaint. Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel (Docket No. 5) is denied without prejudice. Pla intiffs motion for temporary restraining order (Docket No. 6) is denied. Plaintiffs motion to dispense with requirement for security (Docket No. 11) is denied as moot. Plaintiffs motion for service by U.S. Marshal (Docket No. 12) is granted, in par t, by permitting plaintiff to elect to have service of the complaint made by the United States Marshal Service on defendant Ryan. Plaintiffs motion to proceed on handwritten motions (Docket No. 13) is allowed. Plaintiffs motion to expedite depositi ons (Docket No. 15) is denied. Plaintiffs motion for speeding trial/hearing due to precarious health (Docket No. 16) is denied. The Clerk shall send the summons, complaint, and this Order to the plaintiff, who must thereafter serve defendant Ryan in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). (PSSA, 4)
September 16, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting UMass Correctional Healths Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Docket No. 24); granting Amy Grenier and CNA Lucias Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Docket No. 26). In acco rdance with this Court's order dated May 9, 2013, and the plaintiff not having shown good cause why the claims, except for the Free Exercise claim against Warden Ryan, should not be dismissed be dismissed, it is ORDERED that the remaining claims against defendants Karen Dinardo, Luis Spencer, UMass Correctional Health; Matthew Arpano, Ms. Powers, Matthew Tolman, Timothy Bariamis, Aimee Grenier, Lucia and the Department of Correction are dismissed pursuant to pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Defendant Ryan is reminded that her answer to the Amended Complaint is due by September 20, 2013. Copy of Memorandum and Order sent by regular mail to plaintiff Hicks. (PSSA, 4)
January 21, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Richard G. Stearns: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered that the motion 32 of defendant Ryan to dismiss or for summary judgment, treated as a motion for summary judgment, is GRANTED; and plaintiffs motion 39 for stay of execution is DENIED. (PSSA, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hicks v. Ryan et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First name unknown Powers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Tolman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umass Correctional Health
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly A. Ryan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Dinardo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Arpano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Spencer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Bariamis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aimee Grenier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Lucia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin D. Hicks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]