Duro Textiles, LLC v. Sunbelt Corporation

Defendant: Sunbelt Corporation
Plaintiff: Duro Textiles, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv10927
Filed: April 15, 2013
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Bristol
Presiding Judge: Mark L. Wolf
 
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER In view of the foregoing, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. Sunbelt's Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 5) is DENIED. 2. Sunbelt shall answer the complaint by April 25, 2014. 3. A scheduling conference will be held on May 19, 2014, at 4:00 p.m. The parties shall comply with the attached Notice concerning the scheduling conference. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Scheduling Conference)(Hohler, Daniel)
May 15, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered granting 28 Motion LEAVE TO APPEAR AT THE MAY 19, 2014, SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE. (MacDonald, Gail)
June 23, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Mark L. Wolf: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 36 Motion for Protective Order "Allowed, with a revision." (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order) (Hohler, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Duro Textiles, LLC v. Sunbelt Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbelt Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duro Textiles, LLC
Represented By: Mark D. Meredith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]