Trustees of Boston University v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Trustees of Boston University
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv11575
Filed: July 2, 2013
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Boston Office
County: Suffolk
Presiding Judge: Patti B. Saris
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2014 137 Public Version of Letter/request (non-motion) from Michael W. Shore originally filed as Dkt #120. (Shore, Michael)
February 11, 2014 136 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 132 Assented Motion to Strike. The Court declines to strike the docket entry but will seal the document. No later than February 18, 2014, BU shall file a public version of the letter redacting only those portions of the letter that BU maintains contain confidential information. (York, Steve)
February 10, 2014 135 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 10, 2014 134 Transcript of Markman Hearing held on January 30, 2014, before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com Redaction Request due 3/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2014. (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 4, 2014 133 REPORT ON THE TERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
February 3, 2014 132 Assented to MOTION to Strike 120 Letter/request (non-motion) by Trustees of Boston University.(Shore, Michael)
January 21, 2014 131 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
January 16, 2014 130 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 127 Motion to Dismiss. "ALLOWED." (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
January 15, 2014 129 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered DENYING (308) Motion to Vacate Current Scheduling Order and to Set Status Conference in case 1:12-cv-11935-PBS; DENYING (186) Motion to Vacate Current Scheduling Order and to Set Status Conference in case 1:13-cv-11105-PBS. "The Motion to Continue the long-scheduled Markman hearing is DENIED." Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(LaFlamme, Jennifer)
January 15, 2014 128 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered DENYING (202) Motion to Disqualify Dr. Redwing in case 1:12-cv-11935-PBS. "DENIED. Opinion to follow." Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(LaFlamme, Jennifer)
January 14, 2014 127 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Trustees of Boston University.(Shore, Michael)
January 7, 2014 126 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Based on the January 6, 2014 letter [Docket No. 120 ] from plaintiff Trustees of Boston University that alerted the Court that plaintiff had settled with many of the defendants, the Court denies without prejudice the motion to sever [Docket No. 99 ]. (York, Steve)
January 6, 2014 124 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Filing of Technology Tutorial (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Professor Fitzgerald)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
January 6, 2014 123 DECLARATION re 121 Notice (Other) of Edwin Piner In Support of Technical Tutorial by Trustees of Boston University. (Shore, Michael)
January 6, 2014 122 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Trustees of Boston University. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Shore, Michael)
January 6, 2014 121 NOTICE by Trustees of Boston University of Service of Technical Tutorial (Shore, Michael)
January 6, 2014 120 Letter/request (non-motion) from Michael W. Shore . (Shore, Michael)
January 3, 2014 119 BRIEF by Apple, Inc. Defendants' Rebuttal Brief Concerning Additional Terms. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey Lerner, # 2 Exhibit 11)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
January 3, 2014 118 BRIEF by Trustees of Boston University to 95 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs, . (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edwin Piner)(Evans, Christopher)
January 2, 2014 125 SEALED DOCUMENT: Apple Inc.'s First Supplemental Preliminary Contentions (see public version 112 ). (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
January 2, 2014 117 Document deleted on 1/7/2014 as filed in error (LaFlamme, Jennifer).
January 2, 2014 116 Objection to 115 Order on Motion for Modification,, by Trustees of Boston University . (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael W. Shore, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Shore, Michael)
December 30, 2013 115 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying without prejudice 107 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. While framed as a motion to modify the scheduling order, the motion focuses on discovery disputes in general which are not squarely before the Court and for which Plaintiff has not complied with the local rules. See LR 37.1. Rather, if Plaintiff has an issue with a particular Defendant's compliance with discovery requests, it should present that issue in a motion to compel with respect to that particular Defendant. See, e.g., Docket No. 135 in Trustees of Boston University v. Samsung Electronics Company, Limited et al., 13-cv-10659-PBS. (York, Steve)
December 30, 2013 114 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 111 Assented to Motion to Seal First Supplemental Preliminary Non-infringement. (York, Steve)
December 26, 2013 113 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
December 26, 2013 112 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Apple, Inc.. (Papastavros, Nicholas)
December 26, 2013 111 Assented to MOTION to Seal First Supplemental Preliminary Non-infringement Contentions by Apple, Inc..(Papastavros, Nicholas)
December 23, 2013 110 SEALED DOCUMENT: Defendants' Rebuttal Claim Construction Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Exhibit 24, # 2 Sealed Exhibit 25)Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
December 20, 2013 109 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. "I prefer 1-2 hours of video with supporting declarations. Windows media video is best." re (144 in 1:13-cv-10659-PBS) Letter/request (non-motion), (104 in 1:13-cv-11097-PBS) Letter/request (non-motion), (257 in 1:12-cv-11935-PBS) Letter/request (non-motion), (183 in 1:12-cv-11938-PBS) Letter/request (non-motion), (70 in 1:13-cv-11832-PBS) Letter/request (non-motion), (103 in 1:13-cv-11575-PBS) Letter/request (non-motion), (168 in 1:13-cv-11105-PBS) Letter/request (non-motion). Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(LaFlamme, Jennifer)
December 20, 2013 108 Reply to Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey Lerner, # 2 Exhibit 24 (Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit 25 (Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit 26, # 5 Exhibit 27, # 6 Exhibit 28, # 7 Exhibit 29, # 8 Affidavit of Professor Fitzgerald)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
December 20, 2013 107 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Trustees of Boston University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shore, Michael)
December 20, 2013 106 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 105 Motion to Seal Rebuttal Claim Construction Brief and Related Exhibits. (York, Steve)
December 20, 2013 105 MOTION to Seal Rebuttal Claim Construction Brief and Related Exhibits by Apple, Inc..(Papastavros, Nicholas)
December 20, 2013 104 Reply to Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by Trustees of Boston University. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher L. Evans, # 2 Exhibit 16, # 3 Exhibit 17, # 4 Exhibit 18, # 5 Exhibit 19, # 6 Declaration of Dr. Edwin Piner)(Shore, Michael)
December 18, 2013 103 Letter/request (non-motion) from Andrew M. Howard Regarding Technical Tutorial. (Howard, Andrew)
December 18, 2013 102 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re 90 Third Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. The Trustees of Boston University ("BU") have moved to modify paragraph 1.b of the Amended Scheduling Order. BU seeks to extend, inter alia, its ability to amend or supplement its preliminary infringement contentions as of right from up to 45 days before the Markman hearing to 45 days from the close of discovery, based on its argument that the Defendants have not produced requested discovery. The Defendants have offered to agree to a brief extension of the paragraph 1.b deadlines, which BU refused. The second sentence of paragraph 1.b allows BU to seek an extension of the current deadline on a case-by-case basis for good cause shown. After careful consideration of BU's arguments, the Court denies BU's request for such a lengthy extension. (York, Steve)
December 17, 2013 100 MEMORANDUM in Support re 99 Assented to MOTION to Sever filed by Trustees of Boston University. (Shore, Michael)
December 17, 2013 99 Assented to MOTION to Sever by Trustees of Boston University.(Shore, Michael)
December 16, 2013 101 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Status Conference & Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2013 re (90 in 1:13-cv-11575-PBS) Third MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Trustees of Boston University, (59 in 1:13-cv-11963-PBS) Third MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Trustees of Boston University, (57 in 1:13-cv-11832-PBS) Third MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Trustees of Boston University, (127 in 1:13-cv-10659-PBS) Third MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Trustees of Boston University, (155 in 1:13-cv-11105-PBS) Third MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Trustees of Boston University, (161 in 1:12-cv-11938-PBS) Third MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Trustees of Boston University, (91 in 1:13-cv-11097-PBS) Third MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Trustees of Boston University, (148 in 1:12-cv-11938-PBS) MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Trustees of Boston University held on 12/16/2013. The Court reviewed the status of discovery with the parties and heard oral arguments on the pending motions. The Court took the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Catherine Handel at 617-261-0555.)(Attorneys present: Shore & Belt for the plaintiff; Lopez, DeBari, Jonak, Haslam, Doherty, Courtney, Papastavros for defendants;) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(York, Steve)
December 16, 2013 98 NOTICE by Trustees of Boston University re 87 Notice (Other), 60 Notice (Other), 50 Notice (Other), 33 Notice (Other) of Fourth Supplemental Preliminary Infringement Disclosures to Apple, Inc. (Shore, Michael)
December 14, 2013 97 REPLY to Response to 90 Third MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Trustees of Boston University. (Howard, Andrew)
December 11, 2013 96 Opposition re 90 Third MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Apple, Inc.. (Papastavros, Nicholas)
December 11, 2013 95 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jeffrey Lerner, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Affidavit of Professor Fitzgerald)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
December 11, 2013 94 BRIEF by Trustees of Boston University to [Dkt. No. 128 of Case No. 13-10659] Supplemental Claim Construction. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher L. Evans, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Evans, Christopher)
December 9, 2013 93 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Trustees of Boston University. (Howard, Andrew)
December 4, 2013 92 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion. Oral arguments re 80 Motion for Disqualification, has been rescheduled for 2/13/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal.(York, Steve)
December 2, 2013 91 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion. In addition to the currently scheduled Motion Hearing, the Court will hear oral arguments on 12/16/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal re 90 Third MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order . (York, Steve).
November 27, 2013 90 Third MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Trustees of Boston University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Shore, Michael)
November 26, 2013 89 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Affidavit, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
November 26, 2013 88 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by Trustees of Boston University. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Evans, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Evans Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Evans Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Evans Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to Evans Decl., # 6 Exhibit 5 to Evans Decl., # 7 Exhibit 6 to Evans Decl., # 8 Exhibit 7 to Evans Decl., # 9 Exhibit 8 to Evans Decl., # 10 Exhibit 9 to Evans Decl., # 11 Exhibit 10 to Evans Decl., # 12 Exhibit 11 to Evans Decl., # 13 Exhibit 12 to Evans Decl., # 14 Exhibit 13 to Evans Decl., # 15 Exhibit 14 to Evans Decl., # 16 Exhibit 15 to Evans Decl., # 17 Exhibit 16 to Evans Decl., # 18 Exhibit 17 to Evans Decl., # 19 Exhibit 18 to Evans Decl., # 20 Declaration of Dr. Edwin Piner, # 21 Exhibit 1-7 to Piner Decl., # 22 Exhibit 8-12 to Piner Decl., # 23 Exhibit 13-15 to Piner Decl.)(Shore, Michael)
November 25, 2013 87 NOTICE by Trustees of Boston University re 50 Notice (Other), 33 Notice (Other), 60 Notice (Other) of Third Supplemental Preliminary Infringement Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Shore, Michael)
November 21, 2013 86 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(Scalfani, Deborah)
November 21, 2013 85 Transcript of Status Conference held on November 19, 2013, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com Redaction Request due 12/12/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/23/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(Scalfani, Deborah)
November 21, 2013 84 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion re 80 MOTION for Disqualification of Defendants' Expert Dr. Redwing : The Motion Hearing is set for 12/16/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal.(York, Steve)
November 21, 2013 83 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER ENTERED. The Court will hold further status conferences on December 16, February 13, 2014 and March 7, 2014. All conferences shall be held at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 17 in the 5th floor before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The parties shall file a brief joint status report 7 days before each conference identifying any issues to be discussed at the conference. At the November 19, 2013 status conference, Samsung stated that it was concerned that it would be unable to comply with the deadlines for claim construction proceedings in light of BU's filing of a Notice of Third Supplemental Preliminary Infringement Disclosures to the Samsung Defendants on November 13, 2013, which arguably added certain claims not previously asserted against Samsung. The deadlines for claim construction proceedings shall remain in effect for all previously asserted claims. The parties shall confer in an attempt to agree on a briefing schedule for terms related to the new claims only with the goal of including those claims in the January 30-31 Markman Hearing. They shall propose a briefing schedule for those claims by Tuesday, November 26, 2013. (York, Steve)
November 19, 2013 82 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Status Conference held on 11/19/2013. The Court reviewed the status of discovery with the parties and heard oral arguments on pending issues. The Court took the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Shore & Belt for plaintiffs; Schultz, Lopez, DeBari, Lerner, Doherty, Courtney, Papastavros, for defendants;) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(York, Steve)
November 15, 2013 81 NOTICE by Trustees of Boston University re 77 Status Report Defendants Request for Inter Partes Review was DENIED (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - IPR Denial)(Shore, Michael)
November 15, 2013 80 MOTION for Disqualification of Defendants' Expert Dr. Redwing by Trustees of Boston University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Zielinski, # 2 Declaration of Evans, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10)(Shore, Michael)
November 15, 2013 79 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered. GLOBAL PROTECTIVE ORDER Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al. (York, Steve)
November 15, 2013 78 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Protective Order. (York, Steve)
November 12, 2013 77 STATUS REPORT by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
November 12, 2013 76 STATUS REPORT by Trustees of Boston University. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher L. Evans, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Shore, Michael)
November 4, 2013 75 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by Trustees of Boston University. (Shore, Michael)
October 30, 2013 74 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(York, Steve)
October 30, 2013 73 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 52 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; granting 58 Second Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. (York, Steve)
October 30, 2013 72 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on October 22, 2013, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The Transcript may be purchased through Judy Bond Gonsalves at 508-984-7003, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name: No Reporter Used. Digital Recording transcribed by Judy Bond Gonsalves. Redaction Request due 11/20/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2014. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(Scalfani, Deborah)
October 29, 2013 71 SUR-REPLY to Motion re 35 MOTION for Protective Order Provisions Advanced by Plaintiff filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Vito J. DeBari, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
October 28, 2013 70 REPLY to Response to 35 MOTION for Protective Order Provisions Advanced by Plaintiff filed by Trustees of Boston University. (Shore, Michael)
October 28, 2013 69 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 51 MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of its Global Protective Order Positions; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (York, Steve)
October 28, 2013 68 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 46 Motion for Leave to File Document; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (York, Steve)
October 24, 2013 67 SEALED DOCUMENT: Defendant Apple Inc.'s Preliminary Contentions. (LaFlamme, Jennifer)
October 24, 2013 66 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 62 Assented to MOTION to Seal Portions of Preliminary Non-Infringement Contentions by Apple, Inc. (York, Steve)
October 23, 2013 65 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Apple, Inc.. (Papastavros, Nicholas)
October 23, 2013 64 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Motion Hearing held on 10/22/2013 re (104 in 1:13-cv-11105-PBS) MOTION for Protective Order Provisions Advanced by Plaintiff filed by Trustees of Boston University, (148 in 1:12-cv-11935-PBS) MOTION for Protective Order Provisions Advanced by Plaintiff filed by Trustees of Boston University, (21 in 1:13-cv-10659-PBS) MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Trustees of Boston University, (12 in 1:13-cv-11963-PBS) MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(b)(1)(B), Or In The Alternative To Participate As An Amicus Curiae, For The Limited Purpose Of Opposing Plaintiff's "Assented-To" Motion for Entry of Permanent Injunc filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., (10 in 1:13-cv-11963-PBS) Assented to MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Final Judgment filed by Trustees of Boston University, (36 in 1:12-cv-11938-PBS) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Seoul Optodevice Co., Ltd., (95 in 1:12-cv-11938-PBS) MOTION for Protective Order Provisions Advanced by Plaintiff filed by Trustees of Boston University, (69 in 1:13-cv-10659-PBS) MOTION for Protective Order Provisions Advanced by Plaintiff filed by Trustees of Boston University, (40 in 1:13-cv-11097-PBS) MOTION for Protective Order Provisions Advanced by Plaintiff filed by Trustees of Boston University, (35 in 1:13-cv-11575-PBS) MOTION for Protective Order Provisions Advanced by Plaintiff filed by Trustees of Boston University, Status Conference held on 10/23/2013. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.) The Court heard arguments from the parties and took the matter under advisement. (Attorneys present: Shore, Evans, Howard & Belt for plaintiffs; Schultz, Lopez, DeBari, Jonak, Lerner, Tighe, Glitzenstein, Courtney, Papastavros, Choksi, Brzezynski & Barry for defendants;) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(York, Steve) . Modified on 10/30/2013 (Scalfani, Deborah).
October 23, 2013 63 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
October 23, 2013 62 Assented to MOTION to Seal Portions of Preliminary Non-Infringement Contentions by Apple, Inc..(Papastavros, Nicholas)
October 21, 2013 61 Opposition re 52 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order , 58 Second MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order and 54 Objection to Scheduling Order filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
October 16, 2013 60 NOTICE by Trustees of Boston University re 33 Notice (Other) of Second Supplemental Preliminary Infringement Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Shore, Michael)
October 15, 2013 59 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Trustees of Boston University. (Shore, Michael)
October 15, 2013 58 Second MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Trustees of Boston University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Shore, Michael)
October 15, 2013 57 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Christopher L. Evans and Russell J. DePalma. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (York, Steve)
October 14, 2013 56 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher L. Evans and Russell J. DePalma Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-4676953 by Trustees of Boston University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Belt, Erik)
October 8, 2013 55 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Trustees of Boston University to 54 Objection. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Evans, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christopher Evans, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Christopher Evans, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Christopher Evans, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Christopher Evans)(Shore, Michael)
October 8, 2013 54 Objection to 48 Scheduling Order, by Trustees of Boston University . (Shore, Michael)
October 7, 2013 53 MEMORANDUM in Support re 52 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Trustees of Boston University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Shore, Michael) (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/8/2013) (LaFlamme, Jennifer).
October 7, 2013 52 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Trustees of Boston University.(Shore, Michael)
October 4, 2013 51 MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of its Global Protective Order Positions by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Surreply Brief, # 2 Declaration of Vito J. DeBari, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
October 3, 2013 50 NOTICE by Trustees of Boston University re 33 Notice (Other) of First Supplemental Preliminary Infringement Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shore, Michael)
October 3, 2013 49 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion re: 35 MOTION for Protective Order Provisions Advanced by Plaintiff. Please note that the oral argument hearing has been rescheduled for 10/22/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (York, Steve)
October 3, 2013 48 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conferences are set for October 22, 2013 at 2:00 P.M., November 19, 2013 at 2:00 P.M., and December 16, 2013 at 2:00 P.M. All in Courtroom 17 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(York, Steve)
October 1, 2013 47 Response by Trustees of Boston University to 45 Response to Plaintiff's Claim Construction Notice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Shore, Michael)
September 27, 2013 46 MOTION for Leave to File by Trustees of Boston University. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Reply in Support of Its Motion for Entry of Its Global Protective Order Positions, # 2 Affidavit Michael W. Shore, # 3 Affidavit Alicia Cary-Howell)(Shore, Michael)
September 27, 2013 45 Response by Apple, Inc. to 39 Notice (Other) of Claim Construction. (Papastavros, Nicholas)
September 24, 2013 44 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion. The Court will hold a oral argument Hearing set for 10/22/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal re 35 MOTION for Protective Order Provisions Advanced by Plaintiff. (York, Steve)
September 20, 2013 43 Joint Opposition re 35 MOTION for Protective Order Provisions Advanced by Plaintiff filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Vito J. DeBari, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Vito J. DeBari, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Vito J. DeBari, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Vito J. DeBari, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Vito J. DeBari, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Vito J. DeBari, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Vito J. DeBari, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Vito J. DeBari, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Vito J. DeBari, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Vito J. DeBari, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Vito J. DeBari)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
September 19, 2013 42 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 41 Assented to Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eve Henson terminated. (York, Steve)
September 18, 2013 41 Assented to MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Eve L. Henson by Trustees of Boston University.(Howard, Andrew)
September 18, 2013 40 EXHIBIT re 39 Notice (Other) by Trustees of Boston University. (Shore, Michael)
September 18, 2013 39 NOTICE by Trustees of Boston University of Initial Claim Construction (Shore, Michael)
September 17, 2013 38 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ELECTRONIC ORDER ENTERED. STANDING ORDER re: Reply Memoranda. For matters before the Magistrate Judge, the Court will allow the filing of a reply without leave of court, provided that such reply memorandum does not exceed twelve pages, double-spaced, and is filed within seven days after service of the opposition memorandum. Parties may otherwise file sur-reply memoranda only with leave of court. When such leave is sought, the moving party may file a proposed sur-reply memorandum with the motion for leave. (York, Steve)
September 17, 2013 37 Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER ENTERED. STANDING ORDER Regarding Courtesy Copies. If any filing exceeds 30 pages (including attachments), the filing party shall also submit a courtesy copy to the Clerk's Office within one business day. Courtesy copies must be bound in a binder, clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(York, Steve)
September 9, 2013 36 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal Referred for: Full Pretrial, Dispositive Motions (ptd). Motions referred: 35 MOTION for Protective Order Provisions Advanced by Plaintiff. Further information: Also referring all pending motions. (LaFlamme, Jennifer) Motions referred to Jennifer C. Boal.
September 6, 2013 35 MOTION for Protective Order Provisions Advanced by Plaintiff by Trustees of Boston University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shore, Michael)
September 6, 2013 34 STIPULATION of Global Protective Order by Trustees of Boston University. (Howard, Andrew)
August 23, 2013 33 NOTICE by Trustees of Boston University Preliminary Infringement Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Howard, Andrew)
August 23, 2013 32 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Trustees of Boston University's ANSWER to Counterclaim and Answer of Defendant Apple, Inc. by Trustees of Boston University.(Howard, Andrew)
August 23, 2013 31 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Plaintiff Trustees of Boston University. (Howard, Andrew)
August 16, 2013 30 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Trustees of Boston University.(Howard, Andrew)
August 16, 2013 29 Response by Trustees of Boston University to 20 Status Report and Proposal for Coordinating Cases. (Howard, Andrew)
August 16, 2013 28 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Apple Inc.. (Papastavros, Nicholas)
August 12, 2013 27 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(Scalfani, Deborah)
August 12, 2013 26 Transcript of Status Conference held on August 7, 2013, before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com Redaction Request due 9/2/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/11/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(Scalfani, Deborah)
August 8, 2013 25 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing...... Markman Hearing set for 1/30/2014 at 09:00am and on 1/31/2014 at 09:00am in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(Molloy, Maryellen)
August 8, 2013 24 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: Status Conference/16.b Scheduling Conference held on 8/8/2013 in all cases....Joint Statement shall be filed on or before 8/16/13; for any dates that parties are unable to agree upon, counsel shall submit a Contested Proposal for the court's consideration. Parties considering private mediation; Videos shall be filed with court on or before 1/6/14; Markman Hearing scheduled for 1/30/14 and 1/31/14 from 9:00 to 4:00. Court will refer matter to Magistrate for case mgmt, court adjourned.(Court Reporter: Lee Marzilli at leemarz@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: see transcript) Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(Molloy, Maryellen)
August 8, 2013 23 Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mark D. Fowler, Gerald Sekimura, Summer Krause, and Stephanie Wang. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Anderson, Jennifer)
August 5, 2013 22 STATUS REPORT by Trustees of Boston University. (Henson, Eve)
August 2, 2013 21 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Trustees of Boston University. Document received: Proposal for Consolidation and Coordination. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Andrew M. Howard, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Howard, Andrew)
August 2, 2013 20 STATUS REPORT and Proposal for Coordinating Cases by Apple, Inc.. (Choksi, Maya)
August 2, 2013 19 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark D. Fowler, Gerald Sekimura, Summer Krause, Stephanie Wang Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-4573698 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Maya P. Choksi, # 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Mark D. Fowler, # 3 Affidavit Affidavit of Gerald Sekimura, # 4 Affidavit Affidavit of Summer Krause, # 5 Affidavit Affidavit of Stephanie Wang)(Choksi, Maya)
August 2, 2013 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apple, Inc.. (Papastavros, Nicholas)
August 2, 2013 17 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Trustees of Boston University by Apple, Inc..(Papastavros, Nicholas)
August 2, 2013 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas G. Papastavros on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Papastavros, Nicholas)
August 2, 2013 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Maya Prakash Choksi on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Choksi, Maya)
August 1, 2013 14 Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/5/2013. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(Anderson, Jennifer)
July 31, 2013 13 NOTICE....Parties are hereby ordered to submit a Status Report on or before Monday 8/5/13. Chief Judge Saris will address each individual case at the status conference set for 8/7/13 at 9:30am, ctrm #19 7th Floor. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al.(Molloy, Maryellen)
July 29, 2013 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Apple, Inc. served on 7/12/2013, answer due 8/2/2013. (Howard, Andrew)
July 26, 2013 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING TIME ONLY: Status Conference RESET TO 8/7/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-11935-PBS et al. (Anderson, Jennifer)
July 24, 2013 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(I), this case is hereby reassigned to Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly)
July 23, 2013 9 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(FDS, law3)
July 18, 2013 8 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Michael W. Shore, Alfonso G. Chan, Eve L. Henson, and Andrew M. Howard added. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Cicolini, Pietro)
July 3, 2013 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael W. Shore, Alfonso Garcia Chan, Eve Henson, Andrew M. Howard Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-4529900 by Trustees of Boston University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Erik Paul Belt, # 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Michael W. Shore, # 3 Exhibit C- Affidavit of Alfonso Garcia Chan, # 4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Eve Henson, # 5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Andrew M. Howard)(Belt, Erik)
July 2, 2013 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Gabos on behalf of Trustees of Boston University (Gabos, Kelly)
July 2, 2013 5 REPORT ON THE FILING/TERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Belt, Erik) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/11/2013) (Maynard, Timothy).
July 2, 2013 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trustees of Boston University. (Belt, Erik)
July 2, 2013 3 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Flaherty, Elaine)
July 2, 2013 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Abaid, Kimberly)
July 2, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-4527400 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Trustees of Boston University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Civil Category Form)(Belt, Erik) (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/11/2013) (Maynard, Timothy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Trustees of Boston University v. Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of Boston University
Represented By: Alfonso Garcia Chan(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Erik Paul Belt
Represented By: Kelly A. Gabos
Represented By: Eve Henson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Andrew M. Howard(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael W. Shore(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]