Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company v. Residential Funding Company, et al

Plaintiff: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Residential Accredit Loans, Inc., Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Residential Asset Securities Corporation, UBS Securities LLC, Bruce J. Paradis, Davee L. Olson, David C. Walker, Kenneth M Duncan, Ralph T Flees, James G Jones, David M Bricker, Residential Funding Company, LLC and Residential Funding Securities, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv30035
Filed: February 9, 2011
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Springfield Office
County: Hampden
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Ponsor
 
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 131 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting (119) Motion for Approval of Stipulation and Order Amending the expert Discovery Schedule in case 3:11-cv-30035-MAP; granting (134) Motion Approval in case 3:11-cv-30039-MAP; granting (113) Motion for Protective Order; granting (122) Motion for Approval in case 3:11-cv-30044-MAP; granting (131) Motion for Approval in case 3:11-cv-30047-MAP; granting (153) Motion for Approval in case 3:11-cv-30048-MAP; granting (192) Motion to Amend in case 3:11-cv-30094-MAP; granting (180) Motion for Approval in case 3:11-cv-30126-MAP; granting (110) Motion to Amend in case 3:11-cv-30141-MAP; granting (156) Motion for Approval in case 3:11-cv-30285-MAP. See the attached approved order for details. Associated Cases: 3:11-cv-30039-MAP et al.(Lindsay, Maurice)
December 9, 2013 182 Opinion or Order of the Court Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. "...ORDER: The Motion to Exclude the Opinions Expressed in the April 12, 2013 Report of Plaintiff's Expert, Charles D. Cowan, Ph.D., (11-cv-30039, Dkt No. 143 ) is DENIED without prejudice." Associated Cases: 3:11-cv-30035-PBS et al.(LaFlamme, Jennifer)
February 14, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. As follows: Defendants motions to dismiss (11-30035-MAP (Dkt. Nos. 22 and 28 ); 11-30039-MAP(Dkt. No. 17 ); 11-30044-MAP (Dkt. No. 17 ); 11-30047-MAP (Dkt. No. 16 ); 11-30048-MAP (Dkt. Nos. 23 and 27 ); 11-30094-MAP (Dkt. No. 24 ); 11-30126-MAP (Dkt. No. 26 ); 11-30127-MAP (Dkt. No. 10 ); 11-30141-MAP (Dkt. No. 11 )) are hereby ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs claims regarding misrepresentations concerning owner-oc cupancy rates are dismissed in all of the complaints, except in the complaint against HSBC Bank USA, National Association et al. (11-30141-MAP). Plaintiffs section 410(a) claims against the non-underwriter Defendants are dismissed in all of the compl aints. These Defendants are identified in Part III, Section B of this memorandum and order. Plaintiffs section 410(b) claims against Defendants whose control personliability stems from primary violations by non-underwriter Defendants are also dismiss ed. Some of these Defendants are identified in Part III, Section B of this memorandum. The court is unable to identify these Defendants in the actions numbered 11-30035-MAP, 11-30094-MAP, 11-30126-MAP, 11-30127-MAP, and 11-30141-MAP. Defendants in th ese actions have until two weeks from the date of this memorandum to file a status report naming the relevant Defendants. Defendants should now file Answers within twenty days. The cases will then be referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman for a pretrial scheduling conference. It is So Ordered. See the attached memorandum and order for complete details. Associated Cases: 3:11-cv-30035-MAP et al. (Lindsay, Maurice)
October 17, 2012 98 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered with regard to Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company's 84 Motion to Strike Certain Defenses, cc:cl. See Memorandum and Order for details. (Healy, Bethaney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company v. Residential Funding Company, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen E. Spelman
Represented By: Edward J. McDonough, Jr.
Represented By: Bernadette Harrigan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Accredit Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon F. White
Represented By: Richard G. Baldwin
Represented By: Kristopher N. Austin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon F. White
Represented By: Richard G. Baldwin
Represented By: Kristopher N. Austin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Asset Securities Corporation
Represented By: Brandon F. White
Represented By: Richard G. Baldwin
Represented By: Kristopher N. Austin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Jason R. Meltzer
Represented By: Azure M. Abuirmeileh
Represented By: Thomas C. Rice
Represented By: Alan Turner
Represented By: Kathy B. Weinman
Represented By: David J. Woll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce J. Paradis
Represented By: Richard G. Baldwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davee L. Olson
Represented By: Richard G. Baldwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Walker
Represented By: Richard G. Baldwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth M Duncan
Represented By: Richard G. Baldwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph T Flees
Represented By: Richard G. Baldwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G Jones
Represented By: Richard G. Baldwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M Bricker
Represented By: Richard G. Baldwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Funding Company, LLC
Represented By: Kristopher N. Austin
Represented By: Richard G. Baldwin
Represented By: Brandon F. White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Funding Securities, LLC
Represented By: Kristopher N. Austin
Represented By: Richard G. Baldwin
Represented By: Brandon F. White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]