Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company v. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc. et al

Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC and RBS Securities Inc.
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv30285
Filed: December 29, 2011
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Springfield Office
County: Hampden
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Ponsor
 
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 26, 2012 109 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered. approving 107 Stipulation Concerning The Applicability To This Action Of Magistrate Judge Neiman's October 17, 2012 Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion To Strike Certain Defenses. See the attached endorsed order for details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
January 3, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. As follows: With regard to the amended answer of Defendant RBS Securities, Inc. (Dkt. No. 41), the motion is ALLOWED as to the eleventh defense, the twelfth defense (to the extentthat it asserts that MassMutual should have known of the misrepresentation), the nineteenth defense (to the extent that it asserts that MassMutual had constructive knowledge, or assumed the risk), and the twentieth defense (to the extent that it seeks to raise lack of justifiable reliance as a defense).In all other respects, the Motion to Strike (Dkt. No. 47 ) is hereby DENIED.It is So Ordered. See the attached memo and order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
January 3, 2013 111 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REFERRAL. See the attached order for details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
January 3, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered denying 104 Motion for Clarification Regarding A Term Of The Order For The Production And Exchange Of Confidential Information. DENIED, as unnecessary. The point at issue has been clarified by Magistrate Judge Neiman's ruling on the same issue in the related cases. See, e.g., Docket No. 113 in 11-cv-30035. This court hereby adopts his resolution in this case. So ordered. (Lindsay, Maurice)
February 25, 2013 135 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 129 Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulation and proposed order Regarding the Successor-in-Interest to Banc of America Securities LLC. ALLOWED and So ordered. (Lindsay, Maurice)
May 6, 2013 149 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER entered. Stipulation and order Modifying the 6/27/12 Scheduling Order. See the attached order for details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
July 2, 2013 176 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 128 Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulation and Order Modifying the June 27, 2012 Scheduling Order. See attached approved scheduling order. (Lindsay, Maurice)
October 31, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered. approving 63 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for the Production and Exchange of Confidential Information. APPROVED. The stipulated and proposed order, attached as Dkt 63-1, has been approved and may be docketed separately along with exhibits A & B. So Ordered. (Lindsay, Maurice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company v. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Mark A Berthiaume
Represented By: Zachary C. Kleinsasser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey L. McCormick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Securities Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Harry A. Olivar, Jr.
Represented By: Jennifer J. Barrett
Represented By: Edward J. McDonough, Jr.
Represented By: Philippe Z. Selendy
Represented By: Stephen E. Spelman
Represented By: Molly Stephens
Represented By: A. William Urquhart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]