Sustainable Sourcing, LLC v. Brandstorm, Inc. et al

Defendant: Brandstorm, Inc., Brandstorm HBC, Inc. and Thierry Ollivier
Plaintiff: Sustainable Sourcing, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv30093
Filed: May 17, 2012
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Springfield Office
County: Berkshire
Presiding Judge: Kenneth P. Neiman
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. As follows; The Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 10 ) is hereby ALLOWED, in part, as to Counts II and III. The facts as set forth in the complaint do not support any claim against Defendants apart fr om the claim contained in Count I, which asserts copyright violation. The Motion to Dismiss is hereby DENIED, without prejudice, as to Count I. This ruling will permit counsel to pursue possible settlement of this case, and if necessary, jurisdiction al discovery. A schedule for this is set forth in the attached memo and order. The Motion to Strike (Dkt. No. 34 ) is hereby DENIED. Counsel will submit a joint report to the court no later than December 28, 2012 regarding efforts at resolution of this case. See the attached memo and order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
November 20, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER RE: PROPOSED SCHEDULE entered. As follows: This court hereby orders counsel to submit a proposed schedule for completion ofpretrial proceedings no later than December 2, 2013. Failure to submit a schedule may result in default or dismissal. It is So Ordered. See the attached order for the complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
December 2, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered. approving 70 Recommendations for Scheduling Order. APPROVED and so ordered. A date and time for hearing on Defendants' motion to dismiss will be set as soon as Plaintiff's opposition is filed, so ordered. (Lindsay, Maurice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sustainable Sourcing, LLC v. Brandstorm, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandstorm, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandstorm HBC, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thierry Ollivier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sustainable Sourcing, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Hennessey
Represented By: David E. Valicenti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]