Excelsior Printing Company v. Inman et al Featured Case

Defendant: Papyrus-Recycled Greetings, Inc. and Matthew Inman
Plaintiff: Excelsior Printing Company
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv30200
Filed: November 20, 2012
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Springfield Office
County: Berkshire
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Ponsor
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2013 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Excelsior Printing Company. (Hennessey, Christopher)
July 11, 2013 32 Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER entered. ORDER granting defendants request to file answer by 8/16/13. See attached order for details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
July 11, 2013 31 Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Matthew Inman answer due 8/16/2013; Papyrus-Recycled Greetings, Inc. answer due 8/16/2013. ALLOWED, with reluctance. See order. It is time either to wrap up settlement discussion or proceed with the litigation. (Lindsay, Maurice)
July 2, 2013 30 Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time to August 16, 2013 to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Matthew Inman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Balasubramani, Venkat)
May 13, 2013 29 Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ALLOWED. Extension to 7-3-13, Matthew Inman answer due 7/3/2013. (Lindsay, Maurice)
May 8, 2013 28 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/03/2013 to File Answer by Matthew Inman.(Balasubramani, Venkat)
May 7, 2013 27 Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to Ptf's 1 Complaint. ALLOWED. Extension to July 3, 2013. Papyrus-Recycled Greetings, Inc. answer due 7/3/2013. (Lindsay, Maurice)
May 6, 2013 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Nuala E. Droney on behalf of Papyrus-Recycled Greetings, Inc. (Droney, Nuala)
May 3, 2013 25 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/3/13 to File Answer by Papyrus-Recycled Greetings, Inc..(Curtin, Jason)
May 3, 2013 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason B. Curtin on behalf of Papyrus-Recycled Greetings, Inc. (Curtin, Jason)
April 16, 2013 23 Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to May 6, 2013 to Answer re 1 Complaint. (Lindsay, Maurice)
April 8, 2013 22 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 21 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. (Balasubramani, Venkat)
April 8, 2013 21 STIPULATION Extending time to file response to complaint by Matthew Inman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Balasubramani, Venkat) Modified on 4/16/2013 (Lindsay, Maurice).
March 6, 2013 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Excelsior Printing Company. Papyrus-Recycled Greetings, Inc. waiver sent on 3/5/2013, answer due 5/6/2013. (Hennessey, Christopher)
February 26, 2013 19 Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re 17 Stipulation to Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Matthew Inman, Matthew Inman answer due 4/12/2013.(Pelegano, Theresa)
February 13, 2013 18 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Balasubramani, Venkat)
February 13, 2013 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Matthew Inman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Balasubramani, Venkat)
February 4, 2013 16 Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER entered. granting 14 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond. Defendant Matthew Inman answer due 2/27/13. See the attached order for details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
January 25, 2013 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 14 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. (Balasubramani, Venkat)
January 25, 2013 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Matthew Inman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Balasubramani, Venkat)
December 5, 2012 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Excelsior Printing Company. Matthew Inman waiver sent on 11/29/2012, answer due 1/28/2013. (Hennessey, Christopher)
December 5, 2012 12 Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ALLOWED. Added Venkat Balasubramani. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lindsay, Maurice)
December 4, 2012 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Y. Silverstein on behalf of Matthew Inman (Silverstein, Aaron)
November 30, 2012 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Venkat Balasubramani Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4223840 by Matthew Inman. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Pro Hac motion)(Saunders, Arpiar)
November 30, 2012 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Arpiar M. Saunders on behalf of Matthew Inman (Saunders, Arpiar)
November 21, 2012 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
November 20, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-4210590 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Excelsior Printing Company. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form)(Hennessey, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/21/2012) (Lindsay, Maurice). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/21/2012) (Lindsay, Maurice).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Excelsior Printing Company v. Inman et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papyrus-Recycled Greetings, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Inman
Represented By: Venkat Balasubramani
Represented By: Arpiar M. Saunders
Represented By: Aaron Y. Silverstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Excelsior Printing Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Hennessey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]