Excel Dryer, Inc. v. Dyson, Inc.

Plaintiff: Excel Dryer, Inc.
Defendant: Dyson, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv30211
Filed: December 5, 2012
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Springfield Office
County: Hampden
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Ponsor
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2013 100 Featured Case Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 98 Joint Motion to move status conference to a date consistent with amended schedule approved by the Court. ALLOWED. The clerk will re-schedule the status conference for some time after May 7, 2014, So ordered. (Lindsay, Maurice)
February 4, 2014 152 Featured Case Magistrate Judge Kenneth P. Neiman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered: As follows: For the reasons stated in the attached memo and order, the court ALLOWS Dysons 124 motion with respect to the subpoena duces tecum served on NSF by Excel and the depositi on subpoena served on Davison by Excel, EXCEPT as to the permitted discovery set forth in this memo and order. For the reasons previously explained, however, Dysons motion is DENIED without prejudice to the extent it seeks to limit Excels discovery requests of other third-parties. SO ORDERED. See the attached memo and order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)
June 27, 2014 172 Featured Case Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ENDORSED ORDER entered. re: 171 Letter/request (non-motion). Construed as a motion to reopen, this is ALLOWED. (Lindsay, Maurice)
February 19, 2013 34 Featured Case Judge Michael A. Ponsor: ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION entered. As follows; for the reasons set forth by the court in detail orally following argument, the Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. No. 2 ) was DENIED fro m the bench. The court has this day issued a Pretrial Scheduling Orderto govern the preliminary phase of this case over the next eight months, leading to a status conference to take place on December 4, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. See the attached order for complete details. (Lindsay, Maurice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Excel Dryer, Inc. v. Dyson, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Excel Dryer, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. Markey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyson, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan J. O'Rourke
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Michael D. Roundy
Represented By: Lawrence Weinstein
Represented By: Andrew S. Wellin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]