Rudolph and Me, Inc. v. Ornament Central, LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Rudolph and Me, Inc.
Defendant: Ornament Central, LLC, Smudges and Christine Casey
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv40168
Filed: September 12, 2011
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Worcester Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: F. Dennis Saylor
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2011 19 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle via electronic case transfer; Case Number 8:11-cv-00670. File, transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. HMC
September 7, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Defendants' Motion to Transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts, Central Division. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/7/2011. (CR)
August 29, 2011 17 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 16 Motion for Approval of Stipulated Extension of Time to Prepare and File Case Management Report. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/29/2011. (CR)
August 26, 2011 16 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file document CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Jenkins, Matthew)
August 26, 2011 15 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 (LS)
July 1, 2011 14 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 11 Motion to dismissMotion to change venue filed by Rudolph and Me, Inc.. (Jenkins, Matthew)
June 22, 2011 13 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively Transfer Venue. Response due by 7/5/2011. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/22/2011. (CR)
June 20, 2011 12 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply to DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR ALTERNATIVELY TRANSFER VENUE by Rudolph and Me, Inc.. (Jenkins, Matthew)
June 13, 2011 11 MOTION to dismiss Complaint Alternative, MOTION to change venue by Christine Casey, Ornament Central, LLC, Smudges. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Fee, Richard)
June 7, 2011 10 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint. Defendants' responses due 6/13/2011. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/7/2011. (CR)
June 6, 2011 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Wade on behalf of Christine Casey, Ornament Central, LLC, Smudges (Wade, Kathleen)
June 6, 2011 8 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead re 1 Complaint by Christine Casey, Ornament Central, LLC, Smudges. (Fee, Richard)
April 25, 2011 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed on 04/08/2011 by Rudolph and Me, Inc. as to Christine Casey. (Jenkins, Matthew)
April 25, 2011 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed on 04/08/2011 by Rudolph and Me, Inc. as to Smudges. (Jenkins, Matthew)
April 25, 2011 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed on 04/08/2011 by Rudolph and Me, Inc. as to Ornament Central, LLC. (Jenkins, Matthew)
April 1, 2011 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A-C) (DMS)
April 1, 2011 3 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A-C) (DMS)
April 1, 2011 2 Summons issued as to Christine Casey, Ornament Central, LLC, Smudges. (DMS)
March 30, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Christine Casey, Ornament Central, LLC, Smudges with Jury Demand (Filing fee $350 receipt number TPA4353) filed by Rudolph and Me, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (DMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rudolph and Me, Inc. v. Ornament Central, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudolph and Me, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa M. Tittemore
Represented By: Peter J. Karol
Represented By: Matthew Richard Jenkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ornament Central, LLC
Represented By: Richard E. Fee
Represented By: Kathleen M. Wade
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smudges
Represented By: Richard E. Fee
Represented By: Kathleen M. Wade
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Casey
Represented By: Richard E. Fee
Represented By: Kathleen M. Wade
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]