Accusoft Corporation v. Quest Diagnostics et al

Counter_claimant: Quest Diagnostics Incorporated and MedPlus Inc
Counter_defendant: Accusoft Corporation
Plaintiff: Accusoft Corporation
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Incorporated and MedPlus Inc
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv40007
Filed: January 26, 2012
 
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Worcester Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: F. Dennis Saylor
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2013 308 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered re: 307 Motion Hearing held on December 16, 2013, Status Conference regarding pending discovery issues set for 1/10/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy.(Belpedio, Lisa)
January 13, 2014 316 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 266 Motion to Compel Responses to Plaintiffs First and Second Sets of Interrogatories and First and Second Requests for Production by Accusoft Corporation. (Belpedio, Lisa)
February 14, 2014 343 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered denying 325 Motion to Compel. (DHH, law2)
April 7, 2014 367 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered that Plaintiff Accusoft Corp. shall reimburse Defendants MedPlus, Inc. and Quest Diagnostics, Inc., for their attorney's fees in the amount of $12,297, pursuant to Order 362 and Declaration 363 . (DHH, law2)
April 18, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting 28 Motion for Injunctive Relief; granting 28 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and granting 39 Motion for Protective Order. (Castles, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Accusoft Corporation v. Quest Diagnostics et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Quest Diagnostics Incorporated
Represented By: Whitney J. Baran
Represented By: John J. Cotter
Represented By: Emily H. Cunningham
Represented By: J. Michael Keyes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: MedPlus Inc
Represented By: Whitney J. Baran
Represented By: John J. Cotter
Represented By: Emily H. Cunningham
Represented By: J. Michael Keyes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Accusoft Corporation
Represented By: Louis M. Ciavarra
Represented By: Kevin L. Dees
Represented By: David D. Ferrentino
Represented By: Lynette Paczkowski
Represented By: Patrick A. Traber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accusoft Corporation
Represented By: Patrick A. Traber
Represented By: Lynette Paczkowski
Represented By: David D. Ferrentino
Represented By: Kevin L. Dees
Represented By: Louis M. Ciavarra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Incorporated
Represented By: Whitney J. Baran
Represented By: John J. Cotter
Represented By: Emily H. Cunningham
Represented By: J. Michael Keyes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MedPlus Inc
Represented By: Whitney J. Baran
Represented By: John J. Cotter
Represented By: Emily H. Cunningham
Represented By: J. Michael Keyes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]