Ruiz v. The Principal Financial Group et al

Plaintiff: Norma Ruiz
Defendant: The Principal Financial Group, Richard Van Liew, Michael Benbenek, Dick Mullen and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 4:2012cv40069
Filed: May 30, 2012
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Worcester Office
County: Worcester
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered denying requests for reimbursement of reasonable expenses incurred in bringing 18 MOTION to Compel Further Discovery From Plaintiff filed by The Principal Financial Group and 39 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37 filed by Dick Mullen, Michael Benbenek, The Principal Financial Group, Richard Van Liew. (Belpedio, Lisa)
January 27, 2014 124 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered finding as moot 61 Motion to Set Aside; denying 61 Motion to Strike; denying 61 Motion for Extension of Time; and, denying 61 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (DHH, law2)
January 27, 2014 125 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered denying 79 Motion for Reconsideration. (DHH, law2)
January 27, 2014 127 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered denying 92 Motion for Reconsideration (DHH, law2)
January 27, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered denying 94 Motion to Strike (DHH, law2)
January 27, 2014 131 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered denying 98 Plaintiff's Motion to Recall the Order of January 7, 2014. (DHH, law2)
September 17, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Compel Further Discovery From Plaintiff; granting in part and denying in part 23 MOTION for Protective Order to Prohibit the Deposition of Plaintiff in Boston (this portion shall be heard in camera), Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order to Prevent Defendant's Counsel from Engaging in Harassing Vexatious and Oppressive Conduct. (Belpedio, Lisa)
November 13, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Substitute in Pro Se filed by Norma Ruiz; denying 41 MOTION to Strike 39 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37; finding as moot 41 Renewed MOTION to appoint plaintiff as her own counsel ; granting 49 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue hearing; denying 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to 60 days to hire competent counsel. (Belpedio, Lisa)
December 10, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered denying 33 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/20/13 to Complete Discovery; granting in part and denying in part 39 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 37; Denying 45 Plaintiffs Judicial Notice and Notice to the Court in re: Deposition. (Belpedio, Lisa)
January 7, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered denying 84 Motion for Protective Order; denying 84 Motion to Stay (DHH, law2).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. The Principal Financial Group et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Ruiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Principal Financial Group
Represented By: Tracy M. Waugh
Represented By: Andrea L. Kraemer
Represented By: William T. Bogaert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Van Liew
Represented By: William T. Bogaert
Represented By: Andrea L. Kraemer
Represented By: Tracy M. Waugh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Benbenek
Represented By: William T. Bogaert
Represented By: Andrea L. Kraemer
Represented By: Tracy M. Waugh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Mullen
Represented By: William T. Bogaert
Represented By: Andrea L. Kraemer
Represented By: Tracy M. Waugh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]