Fargas v. United States of America et al

Defendant: Richard Sletten, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Anderson, Miller, Vavra, Smith and United States of America
Plaintiff: Luis Fargas
 
Case Number: 0:2012cv02165
Filed: August 29, 2012
 
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: Olmsted
Referring Judge: Janie S. Mayeron
Presiding Judge: John R. Tunheim
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting plaintiff's 42 Motion for Waiver of Noncompliance; granting plaintiff's 46 Motion to Submit Exhibits on the Record; adopt Magistrate Judge's 48 Report and Recommendation; granting defendants' 23 Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on September 23, 2013. (DML) cc: Luis Fargas. Modified on 9/23/2013 (lmb).
January 2, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 55 Motion to Reconsider ; granting 57 Application for Permission to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on January 2, 2014. (DML) cc: Luis Fargas. Modified on 1/2/2014 (lmb).
October 12, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 5 Report and Recommendation, that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Richard Sletten are summarily DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii).(Written Opinion) Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on October 11, 2012. (jam) cc: Luis Fargas. Modified on 10/12/2012 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fargas v. United States of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sletten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vavra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Fargas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]