Castillo v. Holder et al

Defendant: Eric Holder, Janet Napolitano, John T. Morton and Greg Jensen
Plaintiff: Aida Castillo
 
Case Number: 8:2009cv00324
Filed: September 15, 2009
 
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Richard G. Kopf (REFERRAL JUDGE)
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 8:1105(a) Aliens: Habeas Corpus to Release INS Det
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2009 15 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Filing 10 , the government's motion to restrict access to its index of evidence (filing 11 ) to court users and case participants, is granted. The petitioner's request for a temporary restraining order is denied. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
September 23, 2009 20 Featured Case ORDER - The petitioner's motion for reconsideration (filing 18 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
February 9, 2010 29 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendant's motion to dismiss (filing 25 ) is granted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1). Final judgment shall be entered by separate document dismissing the plaintiff's action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
September 15, 2009 9 Featured Case ORDER - After consultation with counsel, IT IS ORDERED that the parties will each submit a brief regarding the petitioner's request for a temporary restraining order by the close of business on Friday, September 18, 2009. The clerk of the court is directed to forward a copy of this order to Assistant United States Attorney Laurie M. Barrett.Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed)(GJG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Castillo v. Holder et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Morton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Jensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aida Castillo
Represented By: Bassel F. El-Kasaby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]