Long v. Neven et al

Defendant: Dwight Neven, J. Nash, Fine, Henry, Cook, Frank Dressen, Peterson, David Stevens and Harold Wickham
Plaintiff: Felix Long
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00699
Filed: April 24, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 8 Plaintiff's Motion for District Judge to Reconsider 4 Screening Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no further motions shall be filed by the parties during the 90-day mediation stay, pursuant to the Courts order of May 13, 2013. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 06/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
August 14, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the Office of the Attorney General file the report form attached to the 4 Screening Order regarding the results of the 90-day stay no later than 8/26/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 29, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Attorney Generals Office shall file a notice of defendants for whom it accepts service and which defendants it does not accept service within 21 days. If the Atto rney General accepts service of process for any named defendant(s), an answer or other response to the complaint is due within 60 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 20, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' 32 MOTION for Enlargement of Time for the Dispositive Motions Deadline. The 6/18/2014 dispositive motions deadline is Vacated. Dispositive motions if necessary shall be due 60 days after the filing of the Court's Order on Defendants' 23 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Long v. Neven et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Neven
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Kelly M. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Nash
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Kelly M. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fine
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Kelly M. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Kelly M. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Kelly M. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Dressen
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Kelly M. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterson
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Kelly M. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stevens
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Kelly M. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Wickham
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Kelly M. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Long
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]