Cunningham v. Warden Lebanon Correctional Institution

Respondent: Warden Lebanon Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Charles Cunningham
Case Number: 3:2013cv00129
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: CLARK
Referring Judge: Michael R Merz
Presiding Judge: Walter H Rice
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT with Attached Notice of Disposal. Signed on 10/21/13. (pb1)
November 19, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is respectfully recommended that Petitioner Charles Cunningham's Petition for Rehearing to Reconsider the Court's decisions of October 21 and 25, 2013 (Doc. No. 13) be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 12/6/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 11/19/2013. (kpf1)
December 16, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - re 14 Report and Recommendations - Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Petitioner Charles Cunningham's Petition for Rehearing to Reconsider the Court's decisions of October 21 and 25, 2013 (Doc. No. 13 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 12/16/13. (pb1)
April 26, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR ANSWER re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Charles Cunningham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 4/26/2013. (kf)
September 18, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is respectfully recommended that the Petition herein be dismissed with prejudice. Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclusion, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealability and the Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous. Objections to R&R due by 10/7/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 9/18/2013. (kpf1)
October 21, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 8 Report and Recommendations,. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 10/21/13. (pb1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Warden Lebanon Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Lebanon Correctional Institution
Represented By: M Scott Criss
Represented By: Mary Anne Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.