Trombley v. Bank of America Corporation

Plaintiff: Bruce J. Trombley and Ryan Sukaskas
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Case Number: 1:2008cv00456
Filed: November 24, 2008
Court: Rhode Island District Court
Office: Truth in Lending Office
County: Providence
Referring Judge: Lincoln D. Almond
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1601 Truth in Lending

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 98 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct and Incorporate Additional Proposed Rulings Into Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement. So Ordered by Judge Joseph DiClerico (New Hampshire) on 8/23/2011. (Duhamel, John)
May 4, 2012 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 105 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying without prejudice 117 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying without prejudice 108 Motion for Settlement; denying without prejudice 116 Motion for Settlement: The instant motions are denied without prejudice to filing motions to approve a revised settlement agreement and a revised request for an award of fees and costs that comply with the requirements for approval. So Ordered by Judge Joseph DiClerico (New Hampshire) on 5/3/2012. (Duhamel, John)
September 12, 2013 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting (as provided in this attached order) 133 Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement, and granting (as provided in this attached order) 132 Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. (New Hampshire, sitting by designation) on 9/12/2013. (Duhamel, John)
June 3, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and lifting stay imposed on 2/16/10- So Ordered by Judge Joseph DiClerico on 6/2/10. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 1, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 72 Motion to Appoint Counsel - So Ordered by Judge Joseph DiClerico on 12/1/10. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 29, 2011 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 90 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action SettlementAgreement. The hearing for final approval of the Settlement Agreement is scheduled for Thursday, December 8, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. in USDC-RI, Courtroom 4. So Ordered by Judge Joseph DiClerico (New Hampshire) on 7/28/2011. (Duhamel, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trombley v. Bank of America Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce J. Trombley
Represented By: Peter N. Wasylyk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Sukaskas
Represented By: Peter N. Wasylyk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]