Securities and Exchange Commission v. Online-Registries, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Online-Registries, Inc., David G. Stern and Michele Ritter
Case Number: 1:2010cv00433
Filed: October 19, 2010
Court: Rhode Island District Court
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: David L. Martin
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order; adopting 9 Report and Recommendations with clarifications; finding as moot 10 Motion (Request) for Clarification. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 12/8/10. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 28, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, ORDER FREEZING ASSETS, AND ORDER FOR OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF; Order granting 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; adopting 21 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 2/24/11. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 3, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CIVIL CONTEMPT granting 36 Motion to Adjudge in Contempt; rejecting Report and Recommendations re 80 Report and Recommendations.- So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 4/3/12. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 8, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Recommending that the TRO be modified. Objections to R&R due by 11/26/2010. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 11/8/10. (Saucier, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Online-Registries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Kathleen Burdette Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Online-Registries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.