Baptista v. Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Nancy A Baptista
Defendant: Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company and United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00467
Filed: November 17, 2010
 
Court: Rhode Island District Court
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Referring Judge: Lincoln D. Almond
Presiding Judge: Mary M Lisi
 
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2012 39 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: GRANTING 32 Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement Agreement; and, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 31 Motion For Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Costs: the motion for approval of attorney's fees and costs is GRANTED as specified in the instant order, and DENIED otherwise; the motion for reimbursement of expenses is GRANTED; and the motion for an incentive award for Baptista is GRANTED as specified in the instant order, and DENIED otherwise. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/14/2012. (Duhamel, John)
April 3, 2012 43 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons stated within the instant order, the request for attorney's fees and costs for the period between January 1, 2012 to conclusion of this case is GRANTED as specified, and DENIED otherwise; and the motion for reimbursement of expenses for the same time period is GRANTED. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 4/3/2012. (Duhamel, John)
April 5, 2012 44 Featured Case FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSING THIS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 4/5/2012. (Duhamel, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Baptista v. Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy A Baptista
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Padwa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]