Seguin v. Suttell et al

Defendant: Steven G. O'Donnell, Michael Forte, Peter F. Kilmartin, Sharon A. Santilli, Priscilla Glucksman, Haiganush Bedrosian, Paul Suttell, Lincoln D. Chafee, Steven M. Constantino, John E McCann, III, Stephen Capineri, Lori Giarrusso and Hugh T. Clements, Jr.
Plaintiff: Mary Seguin
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00095
Filed: February 6, 2013
 
Court: Rhode Island District Court
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Referring Judge: Landya B McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2013 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 MOTION to Convene a Grand Jury to Investigate and Prosecute Corruption and Fraud Abusing the Courts; denying 78 MOTION for Recusal of the New Hampshire Federal Bench Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 455(a)); denying 88 MOTION for Recu sal of New Hampshire Federal Bench Under 28 USC sec. 455(a); denying 89 MOTION to Strike LR 302(d) as Impermissable Obstruction of Raising Court Con Claims; denying 90 MOTION to Change Venue; denying 95 MOTION to Vacate "All McCafferty 's Orders"; denying 96 MOTION to Convene a Special Grand Jury to Investigate and Prosecute Corruption and Fraud Abusing the Court; granting in part and denying in part 97 MOTION to Take Judicial Notice of Patrice Livingston's Declarations in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Convene a Special Grand Jury. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B McCafferty (New Hampshire) on 12/10/2013. (Duhamel, John)
December 18, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court SUMMARY ORDER adopting 70 Report and Recommendations, and granting Defendant's 34 Motion for a Temporary Stay; denying Plaintiff's 74 Motion to Vacate Order of Referral to USMJ MCCafferty; denying Plaintiff's 92 Motion to Va cate Order of Referral to USMJ MCCafferty. -- The Court imposes a narrowly-tailored filing restriction upon the Plaintiff: Plaintiff is ordered to cease filing any motions, pleadings, notices, or other documents after the date of the attached Order, until the district court rules on the Defendants' 46 Motion to Dismiss. Exceptions are defined in the attached Order at Paragraphs 1.a. through 1.f. -- So Ordered by Judge Joseph N Laplante (New Hampshire) on 12/18/2013. (Duhamel, John)
July 9, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion To Disclose Recusal Reasons on the Record and to Assign to the District of Massachusetts or Puerto Rico Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 291(b), 292(b), 294(c) or 295; granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. -- Reset Answer Deadlines: Defendants' answers/responses to Complaint due by JULY 24, 2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B McCafferty (New Hampshire) on 7/8/2013. (Duhamel, John)
October 3, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part re 39 Motion, 40 Motion, 41 Motion, 42 Motion, 44 Motion, 50 Motion, 54 Motion, 55 Motion, 56 Motion: The court GRANTS in part the requests for judicial notice set forth in Document Nos. 39-42, 44, 50, and 54, to the extent that the court takes judicial notice of the existence of the articles, websites, blogs, court documents, and demographic statistics cited by plaintiff and attached as exhibits to those motions. The court DENIES the remaining relief sought in Document Nos. 39-42, 44, 50, and 54-56. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B McCafferty (New Hampshire) on 10/2/2013. (Duhamel, John)
October 18, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 63 Report and Recommendations and denying as moot Defendants' 17 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Strike Plaintiff's 1 Complaint. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N Laplante (New Hampshire) on 10/18/2013. (Duhamel, John)
October 28, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF RULING: DENYING 69 Emergency Expedited Motion to Convene a Grand Jury; DENYING 79 Emergency Expedited Motion to Convene/Impanel a Special Grand Jury to Investigate RICO and Retaliation and Give Grand Jury Presentment; DENYING 80 FRE 210 Motion to Take Judicial Notice of a Pattern of RICO and Extortion Under Color of Law by Identified Syndicate Judges and Their Patronage Appointees Similar to Cok Trilogy; DENYING 83 Emergency Expedited Motion to Impanel a Special Grand Jur y to Investigate Court Con, Perjury and Treason and Give Presentment; GRANTING to the extent that it takes judicial notice of the existance of the public records attached to the motion, and DENYING in all other respects 84 Emergency Expedited Motio n to Take Judicial Notice of Billing Records to R.I. Judiciary/Suttell by Marc DeSisto Showing Similar Patterns of Court Con and Personal Retaliation by Suttell and R.I. Judiciary. ---- The Court directs the Clerk to forward to Plaintiff a copy of Do cument #34 (Motion to Stay). Plaintiff may file a motion to reconsider the Report and Recommendation (Document #70) WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER for the purpose of asserting her objections to the motion to stay. -- Plaintiff may move for an exemption from PACER fees if she shows that an exemption is necessary (as outlined in the attached Order). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B McCafferty (New Hampshire) on 10/25/2013. (Duhamel, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Seguin v. Suttell et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven G. O'Donnell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Forte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter F. Kilmartin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon A. Santilli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priscilla Glucksman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haiganush Bedrosian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Suttell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln D. Chafee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M. Constantino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E McCann, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Capineri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Giarrusso
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh T. Clements, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Seguin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]