I/P Engine, Inc. v. AOL, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc. alleged that Defendants AOL, Inc., Google, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc. and Target Corporation infringed on U.S. Patent No. 6,314,420 entitled "Collaborative /adaptive search engine" and 6,775,664 entitled "Information filter system and method for integrated content-based and collaborative/adaptive feedback queries."

Defendant: Google, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Target Corporation and AOL, Inc.
Plaintiff: I/P Engine, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00512
Filed: September 15, 2011
 
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Office: Norfolk Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Raymond A. Jackson
Referring Judge: F. Bradford Stillman
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2014 1098 REPLY to Response to Motion re 1092 MOTION to Stay of Requirement that Defendants Provide Revenue Information and Calculations of Ongoing Royalty Payments filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
April 14, 2014 1097 STIPULATION re 1096 Proposed Stipulation by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., I/P Engine, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 4/11/14 and filed on 4/14/14. (tbro)
April 11, 2014 1096 STIPULATION by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., I/P Engine, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
April 10, 2014 1095 Opposition to 1092 MOTION to Stay of Requirement that Defendants Provide Revenue Information and Calculations of Ongoing Royalty Payments filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 2, 2014 1094 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 975 Declaration, of Filing of Corrected Exhibit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Noona, Stephen)
March 27, 2014 1093 Memorandum in Support re 1092 MOTION to Stay of Requirement that Defendants Provide Revenue Information and Calculations of Ongoing Royalty Payments filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
March 27, 2014 1092 MOTION to Stay of Requirement that Defendants Provide Revenue Information and Calculations of Ongoing Royalty Payments by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
February 11, 2014 1091 Federal Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 14-1289 for 1089 Notice of Appeal, filed by Google Inc., AOL Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation, Gannett Company, Inc. (14-1289) (tbro)
February 7, 2014 1090 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Federal Circuit re 1089 Notice of Appeal. Appeal Package emailed to the Federal Circuit. (tbro)
February 5, 2014 1089 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 1086 Memorandum Opinion, 963 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, 1088 Memorandum Opinion by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0422-3840302. (Noona, Stephen)
January 28, 2014 1088 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 1/28/14. (tbro)
January 24, 2014 1087 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation before Judge Jackson, (Noona, Stephen)
January 22, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard:Settlement Conference held on 1/22/2014. (cdod, )
January 21, 2014 1086 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 1/21/14. (tbro)
January 21, 2014 Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 1/22/2014 at 01:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (cdod, )
January 21, 2014 Set Hearings Telephone Conference set for 1/21/2014 at 02:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (cdod, )
January 14, 2014 1085 STIPULATION by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., I/P Engine, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
January 14, 2014 1084 Federal Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 14-1233 for 1082 Notice of Appeal filed by Google Inc., AOL Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation, Gannett Company, Inc. (14-1233) (tbro)
January 13, 2014 1083 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Federal Circuit re 1082 Notice of Appeal. Appeal Package emailed to the Federal Circuit 1/13/14. (tbro)
January 10, 2014 1082 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 960 Memorandum Opinion,, 1081 Memorandum Opinion by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0422-3809476. (Noona, Stephen)
January 3, 2014 1081 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 1/3/14. (tbro)
December 23, 2013 1080 Featured Case ORDER granting 1049 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 12/23/13, Nunc Pro Tunc December 23, 2013. (tbro)
December 23, 2013 1079 Featured Case ORDER granting 1045 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 12/23/13, Nunc Pro Tunc November 11, 2013. (tbro)
December 23, 2013 1078 Featured Case ORDER granting 1029 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 12/23/13, Nunc Pro Tunc October 31, 2013. (tbro)
December 23, 2013 1077 Featured Case ORDER granting 1025 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 12/23/13, Nunc Pro Tunc October 30, 2013. (tbro)
December 23, 2013 1076 Featured Case ORDER granting 1017 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 12/23/13, Nunc Pro Tunc October 30, 2013. (tbro)
December 23, 2013 1075 Featured Case ORDER granting 1011 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 12/23/13, Nunc Pro Tunc October 28, 2013. (tbro)
December 23, 2013 1074 Featured Case ORDER granting 1000 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 12/23/13, Nunc Pro Tunc October 21, 2013. (tbro)
December 23, 2013 1073 Featured Case ORDER granting 995 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 12/23/13, Nunc Pro Tunc October 4, 2013. (tbro)
December 23, 2013 1072 Featured Case ORDER granting 970 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 12/23/13, Nunc Pro Tunc August 26, 2013. (tbro)
December 23, 2013 1071 Featured Case ORDER granting 965 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 12/23/13, Nunc Pro Tunc August 21, 2013. (tbro)
December 23, 2013 1070 Featured Case ORDER granting 936 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on December 23, 2013, Nunc Pro Tunc May 13, 2013. (
December 23, 2013 1069 Featured Case ORDER granting 954 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on December 23, 2013, Nunc Pro TuncJune 21, 2013.
December 23, 2013 1068 Featured Case ORDER granting 958 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on December 23, 2013, Nunc Pro Tunc July 31, 2013.
December 23, 2013 1067 Featured Case ORDER granting 987 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on December 23, 2013.
December 23, 2013 1066 Featured Case ORDER denying 1006 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on December 23, 2013.
December 23, 2013 1065 Featured Case ORDER denying 1021 Motion. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on December 21, 2013.
December 23, 2013 1064 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot 1041 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on December 23, 2013.
December 18, 2013 1063 Featured Case ORDER granting 1062 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Emily Christina O'Brien terminated. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 12/18/13. (tbro)
December 13, 2013 1062 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Consent Motion and Memorandum In Support Of Consent Motion To Withdraw Appearance of Attorney Emily OBrien) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
December 11, 2013 1061 Settlement Conference Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 12/11/13. (tbro)
December 4, 2013 Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 1/22/2014 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (cdod, )
November 18, 2013 1060 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. re 963 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Joint Submission Regarding Court Ordered Meet and Confer Regarding Post-Judgment Royalties (Schultz, Donald)
November 18, 2013 1059 CERTIFICATE of Service re 1052 Opposition, by Jeffrey Kirk Sherwood on behalf of I/P Engine, Inc. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2013 1058 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11-07-2013, before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden,OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 12/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2014.(borden, sharon)
November 18, 2013 Notice of Correction re 1052 Opposition, Please file the Certificate of Service as a separate document. Use the Certificate of Service event (under notices) and link the Certificate of Service to the document it was omitted from. (tbro)
November 15, 2013 1057 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. re 1044 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, in Response to the Court's November 7, 2013 Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2013 1056 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 1044 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, in Response to the Court's November 7, 2013 Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Noona, Stephen)
November 13, 2013 1055 Reply to Motion re 1021 MOTION Motion For Leave To Submit Evidence and Offer Of Proof In Support Of Defendants Opening Brief On Issues Raised In The Court's August 14 Order re 1020 Memorandum, and Proposed Order filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Schultz, Donald)
November 12, 2013 1054 Sealed Document re 1052 Opposition. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(tbro)
November 12, 2013 1053 Sealed Document re 1048 Reply. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(tbro)
November 11, 2013 1052 Opposition to 1033 Sealed Document Defendants Opening Brief on Issues in the Courts August 14 Order filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Rebuttal Declaration of Dr. Ophir Frieder, Ph.D. in Support of Opposition)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
November 11, 2013 1051 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. re 1049 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Defendants Opening Brief on Issues in the Courts August 14 Order and the Rebuttal Declaration of Dr. Ophir Frieder, Ph.D. in support of its Opposition (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
November 11, 2013 1050 Memorandum in Support re 1049 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Defendants Opening Brief on Issues in the Courts August 14 Order and the Rebuttal Declaration of Dr. Ophir Frieder, Ph.D. in support of its Opposition filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
November 11, 2013 1049 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Defendants Opening Brief on Issues in the Courts August 14 Order and the Rebuttal Declaration of Dr. Ophir Frieder, Ph.D. in support of its Opposition by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
November 11, 2013 1048 Reply to 963 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Defendants Responsive Brief On Issues Raised In The Courts August 14 Order (Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
November 11, 2013 1047 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 1045 MOTION to Seal Portions Of Defendants Responsive Brief On Issues Raised In The Courts August 14 Order (Noona, Stephen)
November 11, 2013 1046 Memorandum in Support re 1045 MOTION to Seal Portions Of Defendants Responsive Brief On Issues Raised In The Courts August 14 Order filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
November 11, 2013 1045 MOTION to Seal Portions Of Defendants Responsive Brief On Issues Raised In The Courts August 14 Order by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
November 7, 2013 1044 Featured Case ORDER denying 978 Motion for Order to Show Cause. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff and Defendant each provide the Court with names of two (2) experts unaffiliated with any of the parties who are capable of determining whether Google's re-design of its infringing system is no more than a colorable variation ofthe adjudged infringing system by November 15, 2013. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/7/13. (afar)
November 7, 2013 1043 Motion Hearing held before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/7/2013 re 978 MOTION for Order to Show Cause UNDER RULE 37 FOR NONCOMPLIANCE WITH AUGUST 13, 2013 ORDER filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. Attorneys Donald Schultz, Frank Cimino, Jr., Charles J. Monterio, Jr. and Jonathan Falkler appeared on behalf of the plaintiff. Attorneys David Perlson, David Nelson, Jennifer Polse, and Stephen Noona appeared on behalf of the defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc. and Target Corporation. Comments of the Court. Argument of counsel heard. Court DENIES plaintiffs #978 Motion. Court DIRECTS the parties to forward names of two individual experts who are capable and competent to evaluate the design around of the patent by Nov. 15, 2014. Court to issue an order. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR.)(ptom, )
November 5, 2013 1042 Memorandum in Support re 1041 MOTION for Leave to File to File Response to Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional New Facts Justifying its Request for Default Judgment in I/P Engine's Motion for Defendants to Show Cause Under Ru filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Noona, Stephen)
November 5, 2013 1041 MOTION for Leave to File to File Response to Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional New Facts Justifying its Request for Default Judgment in I/P Engine's Motion for Defendants to Show Cause Under Rule 37 for Noncompliance with the August 13, 2013 Order by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
November 1, 2013 1040 Sealed Document re 1029 MOTION to Seal I/P Engine's Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional Facts Justifying Its Request for Default Judgment in I/P Engine's Motion for Defendants to Show Cause Under Rule 37 for Non-Compliance with the August 13, 2013 Order, 1030 Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(tbro)
November 1, 2013 1039 Sealed Document re 1029 MOTION to Seal I/P Engine's Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional Facts Justifying Its Request for Default Judgment in I/P Engine's Motion for Defendants to Show Cause Under Rule 37 for Non-Compliance with the August 13, 2013 Order, 1030 Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(tbro)
October 31, 2013 1038 Sealed Document re 1028 Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(tbro)
October 31, 2013 1037 Sealed Document re 1024 Declaration. (tbro)
October 31, 2013 1036 Sealed Document re 1024 Declaration. (tbro)
October 31, 2013 1035 Sealed Document re 1024 Declaration. (tbro)
October 31, 2013 1034 Sealed Document re 1022 Memorandum in Support. (tbro)
October 31, 2013 1033 Sealed Document re 1020 Memorandum. (tbro) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2013: # 1 Letter) (tbro, ).
October 31, 2013 1032 Memorandum in Support re 978 MOTION for Order to Show Cause UNDER RULE 37 FOR NONCOMPLIANCE WITH AUGUST 13, 2013 ORDER (Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional Facts) filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Charles J. Monterio, Jr. in Support of I/P Engine's Supplemental Memorandum of Additional Facts)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2013 1031 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. re 1029 MOTION to Seal I/P Engine's Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional Facts Justifying Its Request for Default Judgment in I/P Engine's Motion for Defendants to Show Cause Under Rule 37 for Non-Compliance with the August 13, 2013 O rder and the Declaration of Charles J. Monterio, Jr. in Support of I/P Engine's Supplemental Memorandum of Additional Facts (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2013 1030 Memorandum in Support re 1029 MOTION to Seal I/P Engine's Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional Facts Justifying Its Request for Default Judgment in I/P Engine's Motion for Defendants to Show Cause Under Rule 37 for Non-Compliance with the August 13, 2013 O rder and the Declaration of Charles J. Monterio, Jr. in Support of I/P Engine's Supplemental Memorandum of Additional Facts filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2013 1029 MOTION to Seal I/P Engine's Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional Facts Justifying Its Request for Default Judgment in I/P Engine's Motion for Defendants to Show Cause Under Rule 37 for Non-Compliance with the August 13, 2013 Order and the Declaration of Charles J. Monterio, Jr. in Support of I/P Engine's Supplemental Memorandum of Additional Facts by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2013 1028 Memorandum Opening Brief on Post-Judgment Royalties filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. Ophir Frieder, # 2 Declaration of Dr. Stephen Becker)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2013 1027 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. re 1025 MOTION to Seal I/P Engines Opening Brief on Post-Judgment Royalties and accompanying Declarations of Drs. Stephen Becker and Ophir Frieder (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2013 1026 Memorandum in Support re 1025 MOTION to Seal I/P Engines Opening Brief on Post-Judgment Royalties and accompanying Declarations of Drs. Stephen Becker and Ophir Frieder filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2013 1025 MOTION to Seal I/P Engines Opening Brief on Post-Judgment Royalties and accompanying Declarations of Drs. Stephen Becker and Ophir Frieder by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2013 1024 Declaration re 1022 Memorandum in Support, (Declaration Of Howard Chen In Support Of Defendants Motion For Leave To Submit Evidence And Offer Of Proof In Support Of Defendants Opening Brief On Issues Raised In The Court's August 14 Order) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Public Version), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Public Version), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Public Version))(Noona, Stephen)
October 30, 2013 1023 Declaration re 1022 Memorandum in Support, (Declaration of Kristan Burch in Support of Defendants Motion For Leave To Submit Evidence and Offer Of Proof In Support Of Defendants Opening Brief On Issues Raised In The Court's August 14 Order) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 30, 2013 1022 Memorandum in Support re 1021 MOTION Motion For Leave To Submit Evidence and Offer Of Proof In Support Of Defendants Opening Brief On Issues Raised In The Court's August 14 Order re 1020 Memorandum, and Proposed Order (Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 30, 2013 1021 MOTION Motion For Leave To Submit Evidence and Offer Of Proof In Support Of Defendants Opening Brief On Issues Raised In The Court's August 14 Order re 1020 Memorandum, and Proposed Order by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 30, 2013 1020 Memorandum (Defendants' Opening Brief On Issues Raised In The Court's August 14 Order)(Public Version) to 963 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 30, 2013 1019 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 1017 MOTION to Seal (Motion To Seal (1) Portions Of Defendants Opening Brief On Issues Raised In The Courts August 14 Order; (2) Portions Of The Brief In Support Of Defendants Motion For Leave To Submit Evidence and Offer Proof In Support Of Defendants Opening Brief On Issues Raised In The Courts August 14 Order; and (3) Exhibits 1-3 Of The Declaration Of Howard Chen In Support Of Defendants Motion For Leave To Submit Evidence and Offer Proof In Support Of Defendants Opening Brief On Issues Raised In The Courts August 14 Order (Noona, Stephen)
October 30, 2013 1018 Memorandum in Support re 1017 MOTION to Seal (Motion To Seal (1) Portions Of Defendants Opening Brief On Issues Raised In The Courts August 14 Order; (2) Portions Of The Brief In Support Of Defendants Motion For Leave To Submit Evidence and Offer Proof In Support Of Defendants Opening Brief On Issues Raised In The Courts August 14 Order; and (3) Exhibits 1-3 Of The Declaration Of Howard Chen In Support Of Defendants Motion For Leave To Submit Evidence and Offer Proof In Support Of Defendants Opening Brief On Issues Raised In The Courts August 14 Order filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 30, 2013 1017 MOTION to Seal (Motion To Seal (1) Portions Of Defendants Opening Brief On Issues Raised In The Courts August 14 Order; (2) Portions Of The Brief In Support Of Defendants Motion For Leave To Submit Evidence and Offer Proof In Support Of Defendants Opening Brief On Issues Raised In The Courts August 14 Order; and (3) Exhibits 1-3 Of The Declaration of Howard Chen In Support Of Defendants Motion For Leave To Submit Evidence and Offer Proof In Support Of Defendants Opening Brief On Issues Raised In The Courts August 14 Order) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 30, 2013 1016 Featured Case ORDER granting 993 Motion for Leave to File Additional Facts Justifying Its Motion for Defendants to Show Cause under Rule 37 for Noncompliance with August 13, 2013 Order. The supplement shall not exceed ten (10) pages including any attachments. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on October 30, 2013.
October 29, 2013 1015 Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Letter)(tbro)
October 28, 2013 1014 REPLY to Response to Motion re 993 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional New Facts Justifying Its Request for Default Judgment in I/P Engine's Motion for Defendants to Show Cause Under Rule 37 for Noncompliance with the August 13, 2013 Order filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2013 1013 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. re 1011 MOTION to Seal I/P Engine, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Leave (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2013 1012 Memorandum in Support re 1011 MOTION to Seal I/P Engine, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Leave filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 28, 2013 1011 MOTION to Seal I/P Engine, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Leave by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2013 1010 ***SEALED*** re 1005 Exhibits 6-10 to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Motion to Show Cause and Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Supplemental Memorandum (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6, # 2 Exhibit 7, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10).(bgra)
October 22, 2013 1009 **SEALED*** re 1004 DECLARATION OF KRISTIN ZMRHAL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS'OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTALMEMORANDUM REGARDING MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE. (bgra)
October 21, 2013 1006 MOTION to Strike 998 Memorandum in Support,,, of Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 21, 2013 1005 Declaration re 1003 Opposition, (of Joshua L. Sohn) in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Motion to Show Cause and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Noona, Stephen)
October 21, 2013 1004 Declaration re 1003 Opposition, (of Kristin Zmrhal) in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Motion to Show Cause (Public Version) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 21, 2013 1003 Opposition to 993 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional New Facts Justifying Its Request for Default Judgment in I/P Engine's Motion for Defendants to Show Cause Under Rule 37 for Noncompliance with the August 13, 2013 Order filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 21, 2013 1002 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 1000 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of the Declaration of Kristin Zmrhal in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintifif's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Motion to Show Cause; (2) Portions of Exhibits 6-8 to the Dec (Noona, Stephen)
October 21, 2013 1001 Memorandum in Support re 1000 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of the Declaration of Kristin Zmrhal in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintifif's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Motion to Show Cause; (2) Portions of Exhibits 6-8 to the Dec filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 21, 2013 1000 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of the Declaration of Kristin Zmrhal in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintifif's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Motion to Show Cause; (2) Portions of Exhibits 6-8 to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support Thereof; and (3) Exhibits 9-10 to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support Thereof by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 18, 2013 Set Hearing as to 978 MOTION for Order to Show Cause UNDER RULE 37 FOR NONCOMPLIANCE WITH AUGUST 13, 2013 ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2013 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. (ptom)
October 8, 2013 1008 ***SEALED*** re 995 MOTION to Seal Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional New Facts Justifying Its Request for Default Judgment in I/P Engine's Motion for Defendants to Show Cause Under Rule 37 for Noncompliance with the August 13, 2013 Order Along with attachments filed 10/8/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(bgra)
October 8, 2013 1007 ***SEALED*** re 999 DECLARATION OF CHARLES J. MONTERIO, JR. IN SUPPORT OF I/P ENGINE'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUMOF ADDITIONAL FACTS filed 10/8/2013.(bgra)
October 7, 2013 999 Declaration re 998 Memorandum in Support,,, of Charles J. Monterio, Jr., in Support of I/P Engine's Supplemental Memorandum of Additional Facts by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2013 998 Memorandum in Support re 978 MOTION for Order to Show Cause UNDER RULE 37 FOR NONCOMPLIANCE WITH AUGUST 13, 2013 ORDER, 993 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional New Facts Justifying Its Request for Default Judgment in I/P Engine's Motion for Defendants to Show Cause Under Rule 37 for Noncompliance with the August 13, 2013 Order, 995 MOTION to Seal Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional New Facts Justifying Its Request for Default Judgment in I/P Engine's Motion for Defendants to Show Cause Under Rule 37 for Noncompliance with the August 13, 2013 Order Along with Exhibits A and C and the Declaration of Charles J. Monterio, Jr. in Support of I/P Engine's Supplemental Memorandum of Additional Facts filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2013 997 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. re 995 MOTION to Seal Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional New Facts Justifying Its Request for Default Judgment in I/P Engine's Motion for Defendants to Show Cause Under Rule 37 for Noncompliance with the August 13, 2013 Order Along with Exhibits A and C and the Declaration of Charles J. Monterio, Jr. in Support of I/P Engine's Supplemental Memorandum of Additional Facts (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2013 996 Memorandum in Support re 995 MOTION to Seal Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional New Facts Justifying Its Request for Default Judgment in I/P Engine's Motion for Defendants to Show Cause Under Rule 37 for Noncompliance with the August 13, 2013 Order Along with Exhibits A and C and the Declaration of Charles J. Monterio, Jr. In Support of I/P Engine's Supplemental Memorandum of Additional Facts filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2013 995 MOTION to Seal Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional New Facts Justifying Its Request for Default Judgment in I/P Engine's Motion for Defendants to Show Cause Under Rule 37 for Noncompliance with the August 13, 2013 Order Along with Exhibits A and C and the Declaration of Charles J. Monterio, Jr. In Support of I/P Engine's Supplemental Memorandum of Additional Facts by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2013 994 Memorandum in Support re 993 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional New Facts Justifying Its Request for Default Judgment in I/P Engine's Motion for Defendants to Show Cause Under Rule 37 for Noncompliance with the August 13, 2013 Order filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2013 993 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Setting Forth Additional New Facts Justifying Its Request for Default Judgment in I/P Engine's Motion for Defendants to Show Cause Under Rule 37 for Noncompliance with the August 13, 2013 Order by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2013 992 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot 981 Motion to Shorten Response Time. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on October 2, 2013.
October 1, 2013 991 REPLY to Response to Motion re 987 MOTION to Strike 986 Response in Support of Motion (Defendants Motion To Strike Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Motion To Show Cause) (Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Motion to Show Cause Reply) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 27, 2013 990 RESPONSE in Opposition re 987 MOTION to Strike 986 Response in Support of Motion (Defendants Motion To Strike Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Motion To Show Cause) filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Schultz, Donald)
September 13, 2013 989 Declaration re 988 Memorandum in Support, (Declaration of Stephen E. Noona in Support of Defendants Motion To Strike Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Motion To Show Cause) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 13, 2013 988 Memorandum in Support re 987 MOTION to Strike 986 Response in Support of Motion (Defendants Motion To Strike Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Motion To Show Cause) (Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Motion To Strike Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Motion To Show Cause) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 13, 2013 987 MOTION to Strike 986 Response in Support of Motion (Defendants Motion To Strike Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Motion To Show Cause) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 12, 2013 986 RESPONSE in Support re 978 MOTION for Order to Show Cause UNDER RULE 37 FOR NONCOMPLIANCE WITH AUGUST 13, 2013 ORDER and Request for Hearing filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 4, 2013 985 Declaration re 982 Opposition,, (Declaration of Roseanne Eff in Support of Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Defendants To Show Cause ) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 4, 2013 984 Declaration re 982 Opposition,, (Declaration of Kristin Zmrhal in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plainitiff's Motion For Defendants to Show Cause) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 4, 2013 983 Declaration re 982 Opposition,, (Declaration of Antonio Sistos) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Noona, Stephen)
September 4, 2013 982 Opposition to 981 MOTION SHORTEN DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO I/P ENGINES MOTION re 978 MOTION for Order to Show Cause UNDER RULE 37 FOR NONCOMPLIANCE WITH AUGUST 13, 2013 ORDER , 978 MOTION for Order to Show Cause UNDER RULE 37 FOR NONCOMPLIANCE WITH AUGUST 13, 2013 ORDER (Opposition To Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.s Motion For Defendants To Show Cause Under Rule 37 For Noncompliance With August 13, 2013 Order) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
August 29, 2013 981 MOTION SHORTEN DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO I/P ENGINES MOTION re 978 MOTION for Order to Show Cause UNDER RULE 37 FOR NONCOMPLIANCE WITH AUGUST 13, 2013 ORDER by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2013 980 Declaration re 978 MOTION for Order to Show Cause UNDER RULE 37 FOR NONCOMPLIANCE WITH AUGUST 13, 2013 ORDER OF CHARLES J. MONTERIO, JR. by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2013 979 Memorandum in Support re 978 MOTION for Order to Show Cause UNDER RULE 37 FOR NONCOMPLIANCE WITH AUGUST 13, 2013 ORDER filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2013 978 MOTION for Order to Show Cause UNDER RULE 37 FOR NONCOMPLIANCE WITH AUGUST 13, 2013 ORDER by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2013 977 SEALED EXHIBIT B re 975 Declaration Declaration Of Margaret P. Kammerud by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation filed under seal. (rsim, )
August 27, 2013 976 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 re 974 Declaration of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation filed under seal. (rsim, )
August 26, 2013 975 Declaration re 973 Opposition, Declaration Of Margaret P. Kammerud In Support Of Defendants Opposition To Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.s Notice Of Calculation Of Supplemental Damages, Prejudgment Interest and Post-Judgment Interest by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (Public Version))(Noona, Stephen)
August 26, 2013 974 Declaration re 973 Opposition, Declaration Of Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D. In Support Of Defendants' Response To Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Notice Of Calculation Of Supplemental Damages, Prejudgment Interest, and Post-Judgment Interest by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Public Version), # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Noona, Stephen)
August 26, 2013 973 Opposition to 968 NOTICE, Opposition To Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Notice Of Calculation Of Supplemental Damages, Prejudgment Interest and Post-Judgment filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
August 26, 2013 972 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 970 MOTION to Seal (1) Exhibit 1 To The Declaration Of Keith Ugone, Ph.D., In Support Of Defendants Opposition To Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.s Notice Of Calculation Of Supplemental Damages, Prejudgment Interest and Post-Judgment Interest; and (2) Exhibi (Noona, Stephen)
August 26, 2013 971 Memorandum in Support re 970 MOTION to Seal (1) Exhibit 1 To The Declaration Of Keith Ugone, Ph.D., In Support Of Defendants Opposition To Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.s Notice Of Calculation Of Supplemental Damages, Prejudgment Interest and Post-Judgment Interest; and (2) Exhibi filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
August 26, 2013 970 MOTION to Seal (1) Exhibit 1 To The Declaration Of Keith Ugone, Ph.D., In Support Of Defendants Opposition To Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.s Notice Of Calculation Of Supplemental Damages, Prejudgment Interest and Post-Judgment Interest; and (2) Exhibit B To The Declaration Of Margaret P. Kammerud In Support Thereof by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
August 21, 2013 969 Sealed Documents re 968 NOTICE,. (Attachments: # 1 Letter, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(ldab, )
August 21, 2013 968 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. re 960 Memorandum Opinion,, of Plaintiff's Calculation of Supplemental Damages, Prejudgment Interest and Post-Judgment Interest (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
August 21, 2013 967 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. re 965 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Notice Of Calculation Of Supplemental Damages, Prejudgment Interest And Post-Judgment Interest (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
August 21, 2013 966 Memorandum in Support re 965 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Notice Of Calculation Of Supplemental Damages, Prejudgment Interest And Post-Judgment Interest filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
August 21, 2013 965 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Notice Of Calculation Of Supplemental Damages, Prejudgment Interest And Post-Judgment Interest by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2013 964 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation Notice of Compliance (Noona, Stephen)
August 14, 2013 963 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and deferring in part 822 Motion for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties. Within 5 days of completing the aforementioned discovery and briefing schedule, the Court ORDERS the parties to meet and to negotiate an appropriate ongoingroyalty rate, using 20.9% of U.S. AdWords revenues as the appropriate royalty base; if the parties are unable to come to an agreement, the Court Orders the parties to schedule a settlement conference with the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this case no later than December 1, 2013. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 8/13/2013 and filed on 8/14/2013. (rsim, )
August 8, 2013 962 RESPONSE in Support re 958 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2013 961 Opposition to 958 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
August 1, 2013 960 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER that I/P Engine is entitled to supplemental damages for October 1, 2012 to November 20, 2012, in an amount to be determined, prejudgment interest in an amount to be determined from September 15, 2011 to November 20, 2012, and post-judgment interest for Defendants' infringement in an amount to be determined. Accordingly, I/P Engine's 792 motion is GRANTED; that the defendants are to provide an accounting of revenue for the accused products through the date of judgment, November 20, 2012, WITHIN 15 DAYS OF THE ENTRY OF THIS ORDER. (See Order for further specifics). Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 8/1/2013. (rsim, )
July 31, 2013 959 Memorandum in Support re 958 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2013 958 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2013 957 REPLY to Response to Motion re 954 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Evidence filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
June 17, 2013 956 Opposition to 954 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Evidence filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
June 4, 2013 955 Memorandum in Support re 954 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Evidence filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
June 4, 2013 954 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Evidence by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Noona, Stephen)
May 24, 2013 953 RESPONSE in Support re 822 MOTION for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties Corrected Reply filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
May 24, 2013 952 Featured Case ORDER granting 951 Motion for Leave to File; granting plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc. leave of Court to file its corrected Reply in Support of its Motion for an Award for Post-Judgment Royalties. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 5/24/13. (mwin, )
May 23, 2013 951 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Reply in Support of its Motion for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply in Support of its Motion for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schultz, Donald)
May 21, 2013 Notice of Correction re 950 Declaration: (1) Counsel's signature does not include the required nine-element signature block. (2) The heading of the document indicates the wrong division. Counsel is advised that in all future filings, the full nine-element signature block is required, and the correct division should be indicated on the document. (mwin, )
May 20, 2013 950 Declaration re 949 Response in Support of Motion of Dr. Stephen L. Becker, Ph.D. Regarding Ongoing Royalties by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
May 20, 2013 949 RESPONSE in Support re 822 MOTION for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
May 14, 2013 948 SEALED Documents: Sealed version of Exhibits 10-21 to 942 Declaration of Margaret Kammerud in Support of Opposition to Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties; filed under seal per #936 motion to seal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10, # 2 Exhibit 11, # 3 Exhibit 12, # 4 Exhibit 13, # 5 Exhibit 14, # 6 Exhibit 15, # 7 Exhibit 16, # 8 Exhibit 17, # 9 Exhibit 18, # 10 Exhibit 19, # 11 Exhibit 20, # 12 Exhibit 21)(mwin, )
May 14, 2013 947 SEALED Documents: Sealed version of Exhibits 2-9 to the 942 Declaration of Margaret Kammerud in Support of Opposition to Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties; filed under seal per #936 motion to seal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 9)(mwin, )
May 14, 2013 946 SEALED Document: Sealed version of Declaration of Keith Ugone, Ph.D, in support of 938 Memorandum in Opposition by defendants; filed under seal per #936 motion to seal. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(mwin, )
May 14, 2013 945 SEALED Document: Sealed version of Declaration of Bartholomew Furrow in support of 938 Memorandum in Opposition by defendants; filed under seal per #936 motion to seal. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(mwin, )
May 14, 2013 944 SEALED Document: Sealed version of Defendants' Opposition to 822 MOTION for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties, filed under seal per #936 motion to seal. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(mwin, )
May 14, 2013 943 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 936 MOTION to Seal (Noona, Stephen)
May 14, 2013 Notice of Correction re 936 MOTION to Seal: The title of the document was shown twice ("MOTION to Seal motion to seal"). The clerk edited the entry to remove the duplicate language.(mwin, )
May 13, 2013 942 Declaration re 938 Memorandum in Opposition, by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 (Public Version), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Public Version), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Public Version), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Public Version), # 6 Exhibit 6 (Public Version), # 7 Exhibit 7 (Public Version), # 8 Exhibit 8 (Public Version), # 9 Exhibit 9 (Public Version), # 10 Exhibit 10 (Public Version), # 11 Exhibit 11 (Public Version), # 12 Exhibit 12 (Public Version), # 13 Exhibit 13 (Public Version), # 14 Exhibit 14 (Public Version), # 15 Exhibit 15 (Public Version), # 16 Exhibit 16 (Public Version), # 17 Exhibit 17 (Public Version), # 18 Exhibit 18 (Public Version), # 19 Exhibit 19 (Public Version), # 20 Exhibit 20 (Public Version), # 21 Exhibit 21 (Public Version), # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30)(Noona, Stephen)
May 13, 2013 941 Declaration re 938 Memorandum in Opposition, (of Keith Ugone, Ph.D., In Support Of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties)(Public Version) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
May 13, 2013 940 Declaration re 938 Memorandum in Opposition, (of Bartholomew Furrow In Support Of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties)(Public Version) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
May 13, 2013 939 Declaration re 938 Memorandum in Opposition, (Declaration of Brian Keuthe in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plainitff's Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
May 13, 2013 938 Memorandum in Opposition re 822 MOTION for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties (Defendants Memorandum In Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Post-Judgment Royalties)(Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
May 13, 2013 937 Memorandum in Support re 936 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions Of Defendants Memorandum In Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Post-Judgment Royalties, (2) Portions Of The Declaration Of Keith Ugone, Ph.D., In Support Of Defendants Opposition, (3) Certain Exhibits To filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen) Modified on 5/14/2013 to remove duplicate language by changing "MOTION to Seal motion to seal" to "MOTION to Seal." (mwin, )
May 13, 2013 936 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions Of Defendants Memorandum In Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Post-Judgment Royalties, (2) Portions Of The Declaration Of Keith Ugone, Ph.D., In Support Of Defendants Opposition, (3) Certain Exhibits To The Declaration Of Margaret Kammerud In Support Of Defendants Opposition, and (4) Portions Of The Declaration Of Bartholomew Furrow In Support Of Defendants Opposition by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen) Modified on 5/14/2013 to remove duplicate language by changing "MOTION to Seal motion to seal" to "MOTION to Seal."(mwin, )
May 1, 2013 935 Featured Case ORDER denying 923 Renewed Motion to Compel Deposition of Dr. Beckerand for Enlargement of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Post-judgment Royalties; directing defendants to respond to plaintiff's Motion for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties within ten days of entry of this order; permitting plaintiff to file a reply within five days of defendants' response. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 5/1/13. (mwin, )
April 22, 2013 934 Opposition to 923 MOTION to Compel Renewed Motion to Compel Deposition of Dr. Becker and for Enlargement of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 17, 2013 933 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, (Noona, Stephen)
April 17, 2013 932 STIPULATION - See Attached Document for Specifics. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 4/17/2013. (bnew)
April 17, 2013 931 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by I/P Engine, Inc. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 17, 2013 930 Featured Case ORDER re 923 MOTION to Compel Renewed Motion to Compel Deposition of Dr. Becker and for Enlargement of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties filed by Google Inc., AOL Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation, Gannett Company, Inc. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Deposition of Dr. Becker and for Enlargement of Time to Oppose Plaintiffs Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties (ECF No. 923) WITHIN FIVE (5) DAYS of the entry of this Order. Defendants shall forego filing a Reply brief in support of their motion. Briefing on Plaintiffs Motion for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties (ECF No. 822) is hereby SUSPENDED until the Court rules on Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Deposition of Dr. Becker and for Enlargement of Time to Oppose Plaintiffs Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties. The Court will provide additional instructions regarding briefing schedule of Plaintiffs Motion for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties upon resolution of Defendants renewed motion. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 4/17/2013. (bnew)
April 17, 2013 929 Declaration re 928 Reply to Response to Motion, (Declaration of Margaret P. Kammerud in Support of Expediting the Briefing on Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Deposition of Dr. Becker and for Enlargement of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
April 17, 2013 928 REPLY to Response to Motion re 926 MOTION to Expedite and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Expedite the Briefing on Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Deposition of Dr. Becker and for Enlargement of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
April 16, 2013 927 Opposition to 926 MOTION to Expedite and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Expedite the Briefing on Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Deposition of Dr. Becker and for Enlargement of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 16, 2013 926 MOTION to Expedite and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Expedite the Briefing on Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Deposition of Dr. Becker and for Enlargement of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Noona, Stephen)
April 16, 2013 925 Declaration re 924 Memorandum in Support, (Declaration of David Perlson in Support of Defendants' Renewed Motion to Compel Deposition of Dr. Becker and for Enlargement of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Noona, Stephen)
April 16, 2013 924 Memorandum in Support re 923 MOTION to Compel Renewed Motion to Compel Deposition of Dr. Becker and for Enlargement of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
April 16, 2013 923 MOTION to Compel Renewed Motion to Compel Deposition of Dr. Becker and for Enlargement of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Noona, Stephen)
April 9, 2013 922 Federal Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 13-1313 for cross-appeal, 914 Notice of Appeal filed by Google Inc., AOL Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation, Gannett Company, Inc. (mwin, )
April 5, 2013 921 Featured Case ORDER granting 913 Motion for Joseph R. Re to appear Pro hac vice for I/P Engine, Inc. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 4/5/13. (mwin, )
April 5, 2013 920 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER Regarding Parties' Joint Response to the Court's Order Regarding Outstanding Motions to Seal Case Documents, amending 911 Order as outlined. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 4/4/13; filed 4/5/13. (mwin, )
April 5, 2013 919 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11-06-2012, before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 5/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2013.(borden, sharon)
April 5, 2013 918 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11-05-2012, before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 5/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2013.(borden, sharon)
April 5, 2013 917 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11-02-2012, before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 5/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2013.(borden, sharon)
April 5, 2013 916 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Federal Circuit re 914 Notice of Appeal. (mwin, )
April 4, 2013 915 Federal Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 13-1307 for 910 Notice of Appeal filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 caption notice)(mwin, )
April 4, 2013 914 NOTICE OF APPEAL by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0422-3464587. (Noona, Stephen)
April 4, 2013 913 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph R. Re and Certification of Local Counsel W. Ryan Snow Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3463977. by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Snow, W. Ryan)
April 4, 2013 912 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Federal Circuit re 910 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 party and attorney list)(mwin, )
April 3, 2013 911 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PARTIES' JOINT RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S ORDER REGARDING OUTSTANDING MOTIONS TO SEAL CASE DOCUMENTS deeming certain motions moot; granting certain motions; denying certain motions; granting certain motions as to the lesser redacted materials. (See order for specifics.) Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 4/3/13. (mwin, )
April 3, 2013 910 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 800 Memorandum Opinion, 884 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 908 Order on Motion for New Trial by I/P Engine, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0422-3463041. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 3, 2013 909 Featured Case ORDER directing Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties within 15 days of the entry of this Order; permitting Plaintiff to file a reply to Defendants' response within 7 days. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 4/3/13. (mwin, )
April 2, 2013 908 Featured Case ORDER denying Plaintiff's 825 Motion for New Trial on the Dollar Amount of Past Damages. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 4/2/13. (mwin, )
April 2, 2013 907 Featured Case ORDER denying Defendants' 833 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages or New Trial. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 4/2/13. (mwin, )
April 2, 2013 906 Featured Case ORDER denying Defendants' 831 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 4/2/13. (mwin, )
April 2, 2013 905 Featured Case ORDER denying Defendants' 820 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 4/2/13. (mwin, )
April 2, 2013 904 Featured Case ORDER granting 900 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on April 1, 2013.
March 18, 2013 903 RESPONSE in Support re 900 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
March 11, 2013 902 Opposition to 900 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
March 1, 2013 901 Memorandum in Support re 900 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Snow, W. Ryan)
March 1, 2013 900 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Snow, W. Ryan)
February 28, 2013 Notice of Correction re 899 NOTICE (of Supplemental Authority): Leave of court is required for filing of supplemental authority, pursuant to Local Rule 7(F)(1). (mwin, )
February 28, 2013 899 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. re 871 Opposition, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit VirnetX Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2013 898 Response to 886 Order,,, (Parties' Joint Response to the Court's Order Regarding Outstanding Motions to Seal Case Documents) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., I/P Engine, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
February 15, 2013 897 Declaration re 896 Response in Support of Motion for a New Trial on the Dollar Amount of Past Damages by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2013 896 RESPONSE in Support re 825 MOTION for New Trial on the Dollar Amount of Past Damages filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2013 895 Declaration re 894 Reply to Response to Motion, 893 Reply to Motion, 892 Reply to Motion, (Declaration Of Howard Chen In Support Of Defendants Reply Briefs In Support Of Defendants Renewed Motions For Judgment As A Matter Of Law) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Noona, Stephen)
February 15, 2013 894 REPLY to Response to Motion re 833 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Damages Or A New Trial filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
February 15, 2013 893 Reply to Motion re 831 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Non-Infringement Or New Trial filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
February 15, 2013 892 Reply to Motion re 820 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Defendants Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Invalidity Or New Trial filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
February 12, 2013 891 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denied in part 888 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Counsel shall file a response no later than February 19, 2013. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on February 12, 2013.
February 12, 2013 890 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 889 NOTICE of Corrected Continued Opposition to Plaintiff's Amended Bill of Costs (Noona, Stephen)
February 12, 2013 889 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Suffolk Technologies, LLC, Target Corporation re 887 Bill of Costs of Continued Opposition to Plaintifif's Amended Bill of Costs (Noona, Stephen)
February 12, 2013 888 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 886 Order,,, (Joint Motion and Memorandum In Support Of Joint Motion For an Extension Of Time To Respond To The Courts Order on Outstanding Motions To Seal) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., I/P Engine, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
February 7, 2013 886 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING OUTSTANDING MOTIONS TO SEAL CASE DOCUMENTS - WITHIN SEVEN (7) DAYS of the entry of this order, the Court ORDERS the parties to undertake an assessment of outstanding motions to seal case records and provide the namesand document numbers of motions to seal that are now moot, withdrawn, or that should otherwise be dismissed. The Court ORDERS the parties to submit a proposed order disposing of any outstanding motions to seal that are moot, withdrawn, or otherwise should be dismissed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties affirmatively identify, by name and document number, which outstanding motions to seal should still be resolved by the Court. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 2/6/13 and filed on 2/7/13. (jcow, )
February 5, 2013 885 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot 859 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller on 2/5/2013. (Miller, Tommy)
February 4, 2013 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller: 859 MOTION to Expedite and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Dr. Becker. (mwin, )
February 4, 2013 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller: 828 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions Of Defendants Memorandum In Support Of Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Non-Infringement Or New Trial; (2) Portions Of Defendants' Memorandum In Support Of Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law. (mwin, )
January 31, 2013 884 Featured Case ORDER denying 835 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment under Rule 52(b) and a New Trial under Rule 59 on Laches. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 1/31/13. (mwin, )
January 30, 2013 883 Featured Case AGREED ORDER granting 879 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; ORDERED that Docket Items 871, 872 and 876 may exceed the page limit specified inLocal Rule 7(F)(3) as filed in their current form on January 25, 2013. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 1/29/13 and filed on 1/30/13. (jcow, )
January 29, 2013 882 Withdrawal of Motion by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 856 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Dr. Becker (Without Prejudice) (Noona, Stephen)
January 29, 2013 881 Sealed Document - Opposition Memorandum, re 831 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Non-Infringement Or New Trial. (jcow, )
January 28, 2013 880 Memorandum in Support re 879 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Docket Items 871, 872 and 876 filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Snow, W. Ryan)
January 28, 2013 879 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages as to Docket Items 871, 872 and 876 by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Snow, W. Ryan)
January 28, 2013 878 SEALED Document: Sealed Exhibit 2 to 870 Declaration; filed under seal pursuant to 866 motion to seal. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(mwin, )
January 28, 2013 877 SEALED Document: Defendants' Sealed version of Memorandum in Opposition to plaintiff's 825 MOTION for New Trial on the Dollar Amount of Past Damages; filed under seal pursuant to 866 motion to seal. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(mwin, )
January 28, 2013 Notice of Correction re 876 Opposition, this document contains excess pages. The filing user has been notified to file a motion for leave of court to properly file this document. (jcow, )
January 28, 2013 Notice of Correction re 872 Opposition, this document contains excess pages. The filing user has been notified that leave of court is required to properly file this document. (jcow, )
January 28, 2013 Notice of Correction re 871 Opposition, this document contains excess pages. The filing user has been notified that a motion for leave of court is required to properly file this document. (jcow, )
January 25, 2013 876 Opposition to 831 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Non-Infringement Or New Trial filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2013 875 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. re 873 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement or New Trial (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2013 874 Memorandum in Support re 873 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement or New Trial filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2013 873 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.s Opposition to Defendants Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement or New Trial by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2013 872 Opposition to 820 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Defendants Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Invalidity Or New Trial filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2013 871 Opposition to 833 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Damages Or A New Trial filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2013 870 Declaration re 869 Memorandum in Opposition (of Margaret P. Kammerud) in Opposition to Plaintiff's Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial on the Dollar Amount of Damages by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Noona, Stephen)
January 25, 2013 869 Memorandum in Opposition re 825 MOTION for New Trial on the Dollar Amount of Past Damages (Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
January 25, 2013 868 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 866 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial on the Dollar Amount of Damages and Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Margaret P. Kammerud Filed in Support Thereof (Noona, Stephen)
January 25, 2013 867 Memorandum in Support re 866 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial on the Dollar Amount of Damages and Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Margaret P. Kammerud Filed in Support Thereof filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
January 25, 2013 866 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial on the Dollar Amount of Damages and Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Margaret P. Kammerud Filed in Support Thereof by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
January 25, 2013 Notice of Correction re 863 Opposition: The clerk edited the entry to add all filers stated in the document. (mwin, )
January 25, 2013 865 Declaration re 863 Opposition (of Dave Nelson) in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment Under Rule 52(B) and a New Trial Under Rule 59 on Laches by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Noona, Stephen)
January 25, 2013 864 Declaration re 863 Opposition (of Jennifer Polse) in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment Under Rule 52(B) and a New Trial Under Rule 59 on Laches by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
January 25, 2013 863 Opposition to 835 MOTION for Judgment under Rule 52(B) and a New Trial under Rule 59 filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation, AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc. . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen) Modified on 1/25/2013 to add filers as stated in the document.(mwin, )
January 25, 2013 862 Declaration re 861 Reply Declaration of Charles J. Monterio, Jr. In Support of I/P Engine Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Bill of Costs by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
January 25, 2013 861 Reply to 809 Bill of Costs I/P Engine, Inc.'s Reply In Support of Its Bill of Costs filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
January 23, 2013 860 Featured Case ORDER granting 847 Motion to postpone briefing and ruling; The parties' briefing on Plaintiffs Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties (ECF No. 822) and the Court's consideration of said motion shall be postponed until after the Court rules on the parties' post-trial motions currently pending before the Court under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 50, 52, and 59. The Court will provide further guidance on the revised briefing schedule for Plaintiffs Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties as necessary after the Court completes its consideration of the other relevant post-trial motions. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 1/23/13. (jcow, )
January 16, 2013 859 MOTION to Expedite and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Dr. Becker by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
January 16, 2013 858 Declaration re 857 Memorandum in Support (of Stephen E. Noona) in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Deposition of Dr. Becker by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Noona, Stephen)
January 16, 2013 857 Memorandum in Support re 856 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Dr. Becker filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
January 16, 2013 856 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Dr. Becker by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
January 11, 2013 855 Declaration re 854 Opposition (of Sarah Agudo) in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Bill of Costs by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Noona, Stephen)
January 11, 2013 854 Opposition to 809 Bill of Costs filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
January 3, 2013 853 REPLY to Response to Motion re 847 MOTION re 822 MOTION for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties Motion To Postpone Briefing And Ruling On Plaintiffs Motion For Post-Judgment Royalties MOTION re 822 MOTION for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties Motion To Postpone Briefing And Ruling On Plaintiffs Motion For Post-Judgment Royalties filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
December 31, 2012 852 Opposition to 847 MOTION re 822 MOTION for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties Motion To Postpone Briefing And Ruling On Plaintiffs Motion For Post-Judgment Royalties MOTION re 822 MOTION for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties Motion To Postpone Briefing And Ruling On Plaintiffs Motion For Post-Judgment Royalties filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 24, 2012 851 Featured Case ORDER granting 849 Joint Motion to Expedite Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Postpone Briefing and Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on December 24, 2012.
December 24, 2012 850 Featured Case ORDER granting 846 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on December 24, 2012.
December 21, 2012 849 Joint MOTION to Expedite and Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion to Expedite Briefing On Defendants Motion To Postpone Briefing And Ruling On Plaintiffs Motion For Post-Judgment by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
December 21, 2012 848 Memorandum in Support re 847 MOTION re 822 MOTION for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties Motion To Postpone Briefing And Ruling On Plaintiffs Motion For Post-Judgment Royalties MOTION re 822 MOTION for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties Motion To Postpone Briefing And Ruling On Plaintiffs Motion For Post-Judgment Royalties filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Noona, Stephen)
December 21, 2012 847 MOTION re 822 MOTION for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties Motion To Postpone Briefing And Ruling On Plaintiffs Motion For Post-Judgment Royalties by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
December 21, 2012 846 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 825 MOTION for New Trial on the Dollar Amount of Past Damages, 833 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Damages Or A New Trial, 822 MOTION for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties, 835 MOTION for Judgment under Rule 52(B) and a New Trial under Rule 59, 820 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Defendants Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Invalidity Or New Trial, 831 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Non-Infringement Or New Trial by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., I/P Engine, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
December 19, 2012 845 Sealed Document - Exhibit 1 to thet declaration in Joshua L. Sohn in support of defendants' renewed motions for judgment as a matter of law on damages, invalidity, and non-infringement or new trial (836). (jcow, )
December 19, 2012 844 Sealed Document - Memorandum in support of defendants' renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law on damages or new trial (834). (jcow, )
December 19, 2012 843 Sealed Document - Memorandum in support of defendants' renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law on non-infringement or new trial (832). (jcow, )
December 18, 2012 842 Declaration re 837 Memorandum in Support, of W. Ryan Snow by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2012 841 Declaration re 837 Memorandum in Support, of Kenneth Brothers by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2012 840 Declaration re 837 Memorandum in Support, of Jeffrey K. Sherwood by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2012 839 Declaration re 837 Memorandum in Support, of Dawn Rudenko by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2012 838 Request for Hearing by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 833 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Damages Or A New Trial, 820 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Defendants Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Invalidity Or New Trial, 831 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Non-Infringement Or New Trial (Noona, Stephen)
December 18, 2012 837 Memorandum in Support re 835 MOTION for Judgment under Rule 52(B) and a New Trial under Rule 59 filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2012 836 Declaration re 821 Memorandum in Support, 832 Memorandum in Support, 834 Memorandum in Support, Declaration Of Joshua L. Sohn In Support Of Defendants Renewed Motions For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Damages, Invalidity, And Non-Infringement Or New Trial by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Noona, Stephen)
December 18, 2012 835 MOTION for Judgment under Rule 52(B) and a New Trial under Rule 59 by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2012 834 Memorandum in Support re 833 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Damages Or A New Trial (Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
December 18, 2012 833 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Damages Or A New Trial by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
December 18, 2012 832 Memorandum in Support re 831 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Non-Infringement Or New Trial (Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
December 18, 2012 831 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Non-Infringement Or New Trial by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
December 18, 2012 830 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 828 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions Of Defendants Memorandum In Support Of Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Non-Infringement Or New Trial; (2) Portions Of DefendantsMemorandum In Support Of Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On MOTION to Seal (1) Portions Of Defendants Memorandum In Support Of Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Non-Infringement Or New Trial; (2) Portions Of DefendantsMemorandum In Support Of Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On MOTION to Seal (1) Portions Of Defendants Memorandum In Support Of Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Non-Infringement Or New Trial; (2) Portions Of DefendantsMemorandum In Support Of Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On (Noona, Stephen)
December 18, 2012 829 Memorandum in Support re 828 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions Of Defendants Memorandum In Support Of Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Non-Infringement Or New Trial; (2) Portions Of DefendantsMemorandum In Support Of Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On MOTION to Seal (1) Portions Of Defendants Memorandum In Support Of Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Non-Infringement Or New Trial; (2) Portions Of DefendantsMemorandum In Support Of Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On MOTION to Seal (1) Portions Of Defendants Memorandum In Support Of Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Non-Infringement Or New Trial; (2) Portions Of DefendantsMemorandum In Support Of Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
December 18, 2012 828 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions Of Defendants Memorandum In Support Of Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Non-Infringement Or New Trial; (2) Portions Of DefendantsMemorandum In Support Of Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Damages Or New Trial; And (3) Certain Exhibit To The Declaration Of Joshua L. Sohn In Support Of Defendants Renewed Motions For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Damages, Invalidity And Non-Infringement Or New Trial by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
December 18, 2012 827 Declaration re 826 Memorandum in Support of Jeffrey K. Sherwood by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PDX442 and PDX443)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2012 826 Memorandum in Support re 825 MOTION for New Trial on the Dollar Amount of Past Damages filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2012 825 MOTION for New Trial on the Dollar Amount of Past Damages by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2012 824 Declaration re 823 Memorandum in Support of Stephen L. Becker by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2012 823 Memorandum in Support re 822 MOTION for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2012 822 MOTION for an Award of Post-Judgment Royalties by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2012 821 Memorandum in Support re 820 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Defendants Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Invalidity Or New Trial filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
December 18, 2012 820 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Defendants Renewed Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law On Invalidity Or New Trial by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
December 18, 2012 819 Featured Case AGREED ORDER granting 817 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; the Defendants shall have through and including January 11, 2013 in which to file their Response to Plaintiffs Bill of Costs. In addition, Plaintiff willhave through and including January 25, 2013, to file its reply in support of its Bill of Costs. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 12/17/12 and filed on 12/18/12. (jcow, )
December 17, 2012 817 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 809 Bill of Costs (Unopposed) and Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Bill of Costs by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
December 13, 2012 816 Request for Hearing by Google Inc. re 802 MOTION to Seal and Redact Portions of Trial Record (Noona, Stephen)
December 13, 2012 815 REPLY to Response to Motion re 802 MOTION to Seal and Redact Portions of Trial Record filed by Google Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
December 7, 2012 814 Declaration re 813 Reply to Response to Motion of Stephen L. Becker, Ph.D. In Further Support Of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.S Motion For An Award Of Prejudgment Interest, Post-Judgment Interest And Damages For Defendants Continuing Infringement by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2012 813 REPLY to Response to Motion re 792 MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST, AND SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES FOR DEFENDANTS POST-DISCOVERY/PRE-VERDICT INFRINGEMENT filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 5, 2012 812 Opposition to 802 MOTION to Seal and Redact Portions of Trial Record filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 5, 2012 811 Featured Case AGREED ORDER granting 808 Motion to Stay execution of judgmetn pending disposition of a motion - ORDERED that the Defendants' Motion To Stay Execution of Judgment Pending Disposition of a Motion is granted, and any proceedings to execute on or enforce the Final Judgment against Defendants shall be stayed pending resolution of any post-judgment motions timely filed in this case, and for 14 days thereafter. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 12/5/12. (jcow, )
December 3, 2012 810 Declaration re 809 Bill of Costs of Charles J. Monterio, Jr. by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 3, 2012 809 BILL OF COSTS by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 3, 2012 808 MOTION to Stay (Unopposed) and Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending Disposition of a Motion by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
November 29, 2012 807 Declaration re 805 Opposition,, Declaration of Sarah Agudo in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for an Award of Prejudgment Interest, Post-Judgment Interest, and Supplemental Damages by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Noona, Stephen)
November 29, 2012 806 Declaration re 805 Opposition,, Declaration of Keith R. Ugone, PhD. in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for an Award pf Prejudgment Interest, Post-Judgment Interest and Supplemental Damages by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Noona, Stephen)
November 29, 2012 805 Opposition to 792 MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST, AND SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES FOR DEFENDANTS POST-DISCOVERY/PRE-VERDICT INFRINGEMENT, 791 NOTICE Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For An Award Of Prejudgment Interest, Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For An Award Of Prejudgment Interest, Post-Judgment Interest and Supplemental Damages filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
November 21, 2012 804 NOTICE by Google Inc. re 802 MOTION to Seal and Redact Portions of Trial Record and of Intent to Request Redaction (Noona, Stephen)
November 21, 2012 803 Memorandum in Support re 802 MOTION to Seal and Redact Portions of Trial Record filed by Google Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
November 21, 2012 802 MOTION to Seal and Redact Portions of Trial Record by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
November 20, 2012 801 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that plaintiff, I/P Engine, Inc., recover of defendant, Google, Inc., the sum of Fifteen Million Eight Hundred Thousand Dollars and 00/100 ($15,800,000.00). The Running Royalty Rate is 3.5%.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc., recover of defendant AOL, Inc., the sum of Seven Million Nine Hundred Forty-Three ThousandDollars and 00/100 ($7,943,000.00).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc., recover of defendant IAC Search &Media, Inc., the sum of Six Million Six Hundred Fifty Thousand Dollars and 00/100 $6,650,000.00).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc. recover of defendant Gannett Co., Inc., the sum of Four Thousand Three Hundred Twenty-TwoDollars and 00/100 ($4,322.00).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc., recover of defendant Target Corp., the sum of Ninety-Eight Thousand Eight Hundred Thirty-Three Dollars and 00/100 ($98,833.00) Form of judgment approved in accordance with Rule 58, FRCivP, July 20,2012. Entered and filed 11/20/12. (Signed by Patrice L. Thompson, Deputy Clerk, on 11/20/12). (ecav)
November 20, 2012 800 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: As outlined in this Memorandum Opinion and Order, a presumption of laches arises in this case, which I/P Engine was unable to rebut. Therefore, I/P Engine is barred from recovering damages from any of the defendants for any infringement occurring before September 15,2011. (See Order for Specifics) Entered and filed 11/20/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/20/12). (ecav, )
November 20, 2012 799 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER: Having considered the Jury's determinations, the Court finds that the Defendants have failed to prove, by clear and convincing evidence, that the '420 Patent or the '664 Patent are obvious. (See Order for Specifics) Entered and filed 11/20/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/20/12). (ecav, )
November 20, 2012 798 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 797 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 792 MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST, AND SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES FOR DEFENDANTS POST-DISCOVERY/PRE-VERDICT INFRINGEMENT, 791 NOTICE OF CALCULATION Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 792 MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST, AND SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES FOR DEFENDANTS POST-DISCOVERY/PRE-VERDICT INFRINGEMENT, 791 NOTICE OF CALCULATION. Defendants shall have through and including 11/29/2012 for Responses and Plaintiff shall have through and including 12/7/2012. (See Order for Specifics) Entered and filed 11/20/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/20/12). (ecav, )
November 19, 2012 797 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 792 MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST, AND SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES FOR DEFENDANTS POST-DISCOVERY/PRE-VERDICT INFRINGEMENT, 791 NOTICE OF CALCULATION OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
November 13, 2012 796 Featured Case JURY MEAL ORDER. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/6/12 & filed on 11/7/12. (ptom)
November 9, 2012 795 Declaration re 792 MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST, AND SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES FOR DEFENDANTS POST-DISCOVERY/PRE-VERDICT INFRINGEMENT of Dawn Rudenko, Esq. by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2012 794 Declaration re 792 MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST, AND SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES FOR DEFENDANTS POST-DISCOVERY/PRE-VERDICT INFRINGEMENT of Stephen L. Becker, PHD. by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2012 793 Memorandum in Support re 792 MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST, AND SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES FOR DEFENDANTS POST-DISCOVERY/PRE-VERDICT INFRINGEMENT filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2012 792 MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST, AND SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES FOR DEFENDANTS POST-DISCOVERY/PRE-VERDICT INFRINGEMENT by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
November 7, 2012 791 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Calculation of Prejudgment Interest (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2012 790 Sealed Document (E-gov Jury Verdict). (ptom) Modified on 11/8/2012 (ptom).
November 6, 2012 789 JURY VERDICT (Redacted). (ptom)
November 6, 2012 788 JURY TRIAL (DAY #15) completed on 11/6/2012 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorneys Kenneth Brothers, Frank Ciminio, Jr., W. Ryan Snow, Donald Schultz, and Charles Monterio appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Andrew Perlman, Corporate Representative present. Attorneys David Nelson, David Perlson, and Stephen Noona, appeared on behalf of defendants AOL, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation. Petit jurors (9) appeared pursuant to adjournment last evening 11/5/12. Court excused jurors to continue their deliberations at 10:04am. Out of the presence of the jury, court and counsel answered questions of the jury. Court ordered jury sequestered for lunch. Jury later returned with a verdict which was read into the record. Jurors excused. Court directed counsel to file any motions in accordance with the Rules of Civil Procedure. Judgment will issue once the Court makes a ruling on obviousness. Court adjourned. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Witness List) (Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR.)(ptom) (Main Document 788 replaced on 11/7/2012) (ptom, ). Modified on 11/7/2012 to add language re: judgment(ptom, ).
November 5, 2012 787 JURY TRIAL (DAY #14) held on 11/5/2012 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorneys Kenneth Brothers, Frank Cimino, Jr. Charles Monterio, and W. Ryan Snow, appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Andrew Perlman, Corporate Representative present. Attorneys David Nelson, David Perlson, and Stephen Noona, appeared on behalf of defendants AOL, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation. Petit jurors (9) appeared pursuant to adjournment last Friday 11/2/12. Court excused jurors to continue their deliberations at 9:58am. Outside of the presence of the jury, Court and counsel discussed and answered questions of the jury. Jurors excused and Court adjourned until Tuesday, 11/6/12 at 10:00 a.m. Jury Trial continued to 11/6/2012 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. (Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR.)(ptom)
November 5, 2012 786 Featured Case JURY MEAL ORDER. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/5/12. (ptom)
November 2, 2012 785 Featured Case JURY MEAL ORDER. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson & filed on 11/2/12. (ptom)
November 2, 2012 784 JURY TRIAL (DAY #13) held on 11/2/2012 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorneys Kenneth Brothers, Jeffrey Sherwood, Frank Cimino, Jr., Dawn Rudenko, Charles Monterio, and Donald Schultz, appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Andrew Perlman, Corporate Representative present. Attorneys David Nelson, David Perlson, David Bilsker, Robert Wilson, Joshua Sohn, Emily OBrien and Stephen Noona, appeared on behalf of defendants AOL, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation. Petit jurors (9) appeared pursuant to adjournment last evening 11/1/12. Court excused jurors to continue their deliberations at 9:43am. Outside of the presence of the jury, Court and counsel discussed and answered questions of the jury. Court ORDERED Jurors sequestered for lunch. Jurors excused and Court adjourned to Monday November 5, 2012 at 10:00am. Jury Trial continued to 11/5/2012 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. (Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR.)(ptom)
November 2, 2012 783 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation of Lodging of Demonstratives (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Noona, Stephen)
November 2, 2012 781 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of 11-01-2012, before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 12/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2013.(borden, sharon) (Main Document 781 replaced on 11/2/2012) (arou, ).
November 1, 2012 782 Featured Case JURY MEAL ORDER.. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/1/12. (ptom)
November 1, 2012 780 JURY TRIAL (DAY #12) held on 11/1/2012 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorneys Kenneth Brothers, Jeffrey Sherwood, Frank Cimino, Jr., Dawn Rudenko, Charles Monterio, and Donald Schultz, appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Andrew Perlman, Corporate Representative present. Attorneys David Nelson, David Perlson, David Bilsker, Robert Wilson, Joshua Sohn, Emily OBrien and Stephen Noona, appeared on behalf of defendants AOL, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation. Out of the presence of the jury, Court conducted a charge conference off the record. Objections heard on the record. Petit jurors (9) appeared pursuant to adjournment last evening 10/31/12. Out of the presence of the jury, Court finds the co-defendants will benefit from Courts previous ruling on Laches. Closing Arguments heard. Court ORDERED Jurors sequestered for lunch. Jury received Courts charge and instructions. Court excused jurors to begin their deliberations at 4:10pm. Jurors excused and Court adjourned until Friday, 11/2/12 at 9:30 a.m. Jury Trial continued to 11/2/2012 at 09:30 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. (Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR.)(ptom)
November 1, 2012 776 Memorandum in Support re 775 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
November 1, 2012 775 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Invalidity by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
November 1, 2012 774 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of 10-31-2012, before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 12/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2013.(borden, sharon) (Main Document 774 replaced on 11/2/2012) (arou, ).
November 1, 2012 773 Memorandum in Support re 772 Second MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Damages filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
November 1, 2012 772 Second MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Damages by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
November 1, 2012 771 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. Proffer of Evidence Related to Laches (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 PX 176, # 10 PX 408, # 11 PX 409, # 12 PX 410, # 13 PX 411, # 14 PX 412, # 15 PX 413, # 16 PX 414, # 17 PX 415, # 18 PX 416, # 19 PX 417 I, # 20 PX 417 II, # 21 PX 418, # 22 PX 419 I, # 23 PX 419 II, # 24 PX 421, # 25 DX 21, # 26 DX28, # 27 DX 255)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2012 770 JURY TRIAL (DAY #11) held on 10/31/2012 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorneys Kenneth Brothers, Jeffrey Sherwood, Frank Cimino, Jr., and Donald Schultz, appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Andrew Perlman, Corporate Representative present. Attorneys David Nelson, David Perlson, David Bilsker, Robert Wilson, Joshua Sohn, and Stephen Noona, appeared on behalf of defendants AOL, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation. Out of the presence of the jury, Court GRANTS IN PARTS AND DENIES IN PART Plaintiffs JMOL as to Validity. Court GRANTS Defendants Renewed JMOL of Laches stating findings and rulings on the record. Petit jurors (9) appeared pursuant to adjournment last evening 10/30/12. Plaintiff presented rebuttal evidence - witness sworn and testified. Plaintiffs exhibits introduced and admitted into evidence. Objections heard and rulings made on the record. Jurors excused until Thursday, 11/1/12 at 10:30 a.m. Out of the presence of the jury, Defendants Motions for a Judgment as a Matter of Law as to Invalidity, as to Non-Infringement, and as to Damages - Argued - Court DENIES JMOLs as to Invalidity and Non-Infringement. Court adjourned until Thursday, 11/1/12 at 9:00 a.m. Jury Trial continued to 11/1/2012 at 10:30 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. (Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR.)(ptom, ) Modified on 11/1/2012 to correct last appearance or jurors(ptom). (Main Document 770 replaced on 11/1/2012) (ptom, ).
October 31, 2012 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller. 706 MOTION to Seal Portions Of Exhibit 1 To The OBrien Declaration In Support Of Defendants Motion For Sanctions And To Strike Portions Of Dr. Frieders Second Updated Expert Report. (ecav, )
October 31, 2012 769 Opposition to Plaintiff's (Oral) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Anticipation and Obviousness filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 31, 2012 768 Memorandum in Support re 767 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Defendants Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law Of Laches filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 31, 2012 767 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Defendants Motion For Judgment As A Matter Of Law Of Laches by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 30, 2012 766 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation of Filing of Defendants Proffer Of Evidence Related To Laches (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Noona, Stephen)
October 30, 2012 765 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of 10-30-2012 (Morning Session), before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2013.(borden, sharon)
October 30, 2012 764 TRANSCRIPT of Trial proceedings, Day 10, Afternoon session, for dates of 10/30/2012, before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Jody Stewart, Telephone number 757-222-7071. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2013.(stewart, jody)
October 30, 2012 763 JURY TRIAL (DAY #10) held on 10/30/2012 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorneys Kenneth Brothers, Jeffrey Sherwood, Dawn Rudenko, and W. Ryan Snow, appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Andrew Perlman, Corporate Representative present. Attorneys David Nelson, David Perlson, David Bilsker, Emily OBrien, Robert Wilson, Joshua Sohn, and Stephen Noona, appeared on behalf of defendants AOL, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation. Petit jurors (9) appeared pursuant to adjournment last Friday 10/26/12. Defendants continued presentation of evidence - witness testified. Objections heard and rulings made on the record. Out of the presence of the jury, Court GRANTED Defendants #748 MOTION to Exclude And Preclude Plaintiff From Recalling Mr. Kosak As A Rebuttal Witness, stating ruling on the record. Defendants rest. Jurors excused until Wednesday, 10/31/12 at 10:00 a.m. Out of the presence of the jury, Plaintiffs Motions for a Judgment as a Matter of Law as to Validity, as to Damages, and as to Latches - Argued - Court takes matter under advisement. Out of the presence of the jury, Defendants Renewed their Motion for a Judgment as a Matter of Law.Court adjourned until Wednesday, 10/31/12 at 10:00 a.m. Jury Trial continued to 10/31/2012 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. [Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR (a.m.) and Jody Stewart, OCR (p.m.)](ptom)
October 30, 2012 762 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of 10-26-2012 (Morning Session Public Portion), before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2013.(borden, sharon)
October 30, 2012 761 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of 10-25-2012 (Morning Session Public Portion), before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2013.(borden, sharon)
October 30, 2012 760 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of 10-24-2012 (Morning Session), before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2013.(borden, sharon)
October 30, 2012 759 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of 10-23-2012 (Morning Session), before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2013.(borden, sharon)
October 30, 2012 758 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of 10-22-2012 (Morning Session), before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2013.(borden, sharon)
October 30, 2012 757 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of 10-19-2012 (Morning Session), before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2013.(borden, sharon)
October 30, 2012 756 TRANSCRIPT of Trial proceedings, Day 9, afternoon session, for dates of 10/26/2012, before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Jody Stewart, Telephone number 757-222-7071. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2013.(stewart, jody)
October 30, 2012 755 Declaration re 754 Memorandum in Support of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 30, 2012 754 Memorandum in Support re 753 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 30, 2012 753 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-Infringement by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 30, 2012 752 Memorandum in Support re 751 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Damages filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 30, 2012 751 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Damages by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 30, 2012 750 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Plaintiff's Proffer Regarding Proposed Rebuttal Testimony of Donald Kosak (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2012 749 Brief in Support to 748 MOTION to Exclude And Preclude Plaintiff From Recalling Mr. Kosak As A Rebuttal Witness filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 30, 2012 748 MOTION to Exclude And Preclude Plaintiff From Recalling Mr. Kosak As A Rebuttal Witness by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 26, 2012 747 JURY TRIAL (DAY #9)held on 10/26/2012 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorneys Kenneth Brothers, Jeffrey Sherwood, Dawn Rudenko, W. Ryan Snow, Donald Schultz, and Frank Cimino, Jr. appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Andrew Perlman, Corporate Representative present. Attorneys David Nelson, David Perlson, David Bilsker, Emily OBrien, Robert Wilson, and Stephen Noona, appeared on behalf of defendants AOL, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation. Petit jurors (9) appeared pursuant to adjournment last evening 10/25/12. Court ORDERED courtroom sealed for proprietary testimony. Defendants continued presentation of evidence-witness sworn and testified. Defendants and Plaintiff exhibits introduced and admitted into evidence. Objections heard and rulings made on the record. Out of the presence of the jury, objections heard and rulings made on the record about certain exhibits and testimony. Jurors excused and Court adjourned until Monday, 10/29/12 at 10:00 a.m. Jury Trial continued to 10/29/2012 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. [Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR (a.m.) and Jody Stewart, OCR (p.m.)](ptom)
October 26, 2012 746 TRANSCRIPT of Trial proceedings, Day 8, Afternoon session, for dates of 10/25/2012, before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Jody Stewart, Telephone number 757-222-7071. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/26/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2013.(stewart, jody)
October 25, 2012 745 JURY TRIAL (DAY #8) held on 10/25/2012 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Out of the presence of the jury, objections heard and rulings made on the record about certain exhibits and testimony. Petit jurors (9) appeared pursuant to adjournment last evening 10/24/12. Court ORDERED courtroom sealed for proprietary testimony. Defendants continued presentation of evidence. Defendants exhibits introduced and admitted into evidence. Objections heard and rulings made on the record. Jurors excused and Court adjourned until Friday, 10/26/12 at 10:00 a.m. Jury Trial continued to 10/26/2012 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. [Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR (a.m.) and Jody Stewart, OCR (p.m.)](ptom) (Main Document 745 replaced on 10/26/2012) (ptom, ).
October 25, 2012 744 TRANSCRIPT of Trial proceedings, Day 7, Afternoon session, for dates of 10/24/2012, before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Jody Stewart, Telephone number 757-222-7071. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/26/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2013.(stewart, jody) (Main Document 744 replaced on 11/2/2012) (arou, ).
October 24, 2012 743 JURY TRIAL (DAY #7) held on 10/24/2012 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorneys Kenneth Brothers, Jeffrey Sherwood, Dawn Rudenko, Donald Schultz, and Frank Cimino, Jr. appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Andrew Perlman, Corporate Representative present. Attorneys David Nelson, David Perlson, Emily OBrien, Stephen Noona, David Bilsker, and Robert Wilson appeared on behalf of defendants AOL, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation. Out of the presence of the jury, Defendants Motion to Strike Testimony of Dr. Becker - Argued - Court DENIES the Motion. Out of the presence of the jury, Defendant Motion to Strike Certain Testimony of Dr. Becker - Argued - Court to issue a curative jury instruction. Out of the presence of the jury, the Court heard objections to certain exhibits. Petit jurors (9) appeared pursuant to adjournment last evening 10/23/12. Plaintiff read interrogatory into the record. Plaintiff rested. Out of the presence of the jury, Defendants Motion for a Judgment as a Matter of Law - Argued - Court DENIED the motion. Defendants presented evidence - witnesses sworn and testified. Plaintiffs Exhibit introduced and admitted into evidence. Objections heard and rulings made on the record. Jurors excused and Court adjourned until Thursday, 10/25/12 at 10:00 a.m. Jury Trial continued to 10/25/2012 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. [Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR (a.m.) and Jody Stewart, OCR (p.m.)](ptom) (Main Document 743 replaced on 10/25/2012) (ptom, ).
October 24, 2012 742 TRANSCRIPT of Trial proceedings, Day 6, Afternoon session, for dates of 10/23/2012, before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Jody Stewart, Telephone number 757-222-7071. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/23/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2013.(stewart, jody)
October 24, 2012 741 TRANSCRIPT of Trial proceedings, Afternoon session, for dates of 10/22/2012, before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Jody Stewart, Telephone number 757-222-7071. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/23/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2013.(stewart, jody)
October 24, 2012 740 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Plaintiff's Proposed Curative Instructions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 23, 2012 739 Featured Case ORDER denying 709 Motion to Strike per ruling of October 17, 2012. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on October 23, 2012.
October 23, 2012 738 Featured Case ORDER denying 700 Motion for Reconsideration per ruling on October 16, 2012. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on October 23, 2012.
October 23, 2012 737 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot 701 Motion to Expedite per ruling on October 16,2012. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on October 23, 2012.
October 23, 2012 736 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot 712 Motion to Expedite. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on october 23, 2012.
October 23, 2012 735 JURY TRIAL (DAY #6) held on 10/23/2012 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Jury Trial set for 10/24/2012 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorneys Kenneth Brothers, Jeffrey Sherwood, Dawn Rudenko, and W. Ryan Snow appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Andrew Perlman, Corporate Representative present. Attorneys David Nelson, Robert Wilson, Emily OBrien, David Bilsker, and Stephen Noona, appeared on behalf of defendants AOL, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation. Matter came on for trial by jury (Day #6). Out of the presence of the jury, Pretrial conference held in chambers. Petit jurors (9) appeared pursuant to adjournment last evening 10/22/12. Plaintiff continued presentation of evidence witnesses sworn and testified.Plaintiffs Exhibits introduced and admitted into evidence. Objections heard and rulings made on the record. Court STRIKES testimony of Dr. Becker, on cross-examination, about purchase/sell agreement of the Disney/Google Patent, based on improper cross-examination on issue. Court to close Courtroom tomorrow, 10/24/12, from 2:30pm - 3:15pm for proprietary testimony. Juror excused and Court adjourned until Wednesday, 10/24/12 at 10:00 a.m. Jury trial continued to 10/24/12 at 10:00am in Courtroom #4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson.[Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR (a.m.) and Jody Stewart, OCR (p.m.)](ptom) (Main Document 735 replaced on 10/24/2012) (ptom). Modified on 10/24/2012 to add language (ptom).
October 23, 2012 734 Featured Case ORDER granting 724 Motion for David Andrew Perlson to appear Pro hac vice on behalf of AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. Entered and filed 10/23/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/23/12). (ecav, )
October 23, 2012 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller. 687 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Order on the Final Pretrial Conference, 684 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 and 4 to its Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against AOL, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., and Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 22, 2012 733 JURY TRIAL (DAY #5) held on 10/22/2012 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorneys Kenneth Brothers, Jeffrey Sherwood, W. Ryan Snow, and Frank Cimino, Jr. appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Andrew Perlman, Corporate Representative present. Attorneys David Nelson, David Perlson, Emily OBrien, Stephen Noona, and Robert Wilson appeared on behalf of defendants AOL, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation. Out of the presence of the jury, Pretrial conference held in chambers. Petit jurors (9) appeared pursuant to adjournment last Friday, 10/19/12. Plaintiff continued presentation of evidence witnesses sworn and testified. Plaintiffs Exhibits introduced and admitted into evidence. Objections heard and rulings made on the record. Jurors excused and Court adjourned until Tuesday, 10/23/12 at 9:30 a.m. Jury Trial continued to 10/23/2012 at 09:30 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. [Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR (a.m.) and Jody Stewart, OCR (p.m.)](ptom) (Main Document 733 replaced on 10/23/2012) (ptom, ).
October 22, 2012 732 TRANSCRIPT of Trial proceedings, Day 3, Afternoon session, for dates of 10/18/2012, before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Jody Stewart, Telephone number 757-222-7071. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2013.(stewart, jody)
October 22, 2012 731 TRANSCRIPT of Trial proceedings, Day 2, Afternoon session, for dates of 10/17/2012, before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Jody Stewart, Telephone number 757-222-7074. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2013.(stewart, jody)
October 22, 2012 730 TRANSCRIPT of Trial proceedings, Day 1, Afternoon session, for dates of 10/16/2012, before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Jody Stewart, Telephone number 757-222-7071. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/21/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2013.(stewart, jody)
October 19, 2012 729 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of 10-18-2012 (Morning Session), before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2013.(borden, sharon)
October 19, 2012 728 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of 10-17-2012 (Morning Session), before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2013.(borden, sharon)
October 19, 2012 727 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of 10-16-2012 (Morning Session), before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2013.(borden, sharon)
October 19, 2012 726 JURY TRIAL (DAY #4) held on 10/19/2012 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorneys Kenneth Brothers, Jeffrey Sherwood, W. Ryan Snow, and Frank Cimino, Jr. appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Andrew Perlman, Corporate Representative present. Attorneys David Nelson, David Perlson, Stephen Noona, and Robert Wilson appeared on behalf of defendants AOL, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation. Petit jurors (9) appeared pursuant to adjournment last evening 10/18/12. Court ORDERED courtroom sealed for proprietary testimony. Plaintiff continued presentation of evidence witness testified. Plaintiffs Sealed Exhibits introduced and admitted into evidence. Objections heard and rulings made on the record. Out of the presence of the jury, Court DENIES Defendants Motion to Strike. Jurors excused and Court adjourned until Monday, 10/22/12 at 10:00 a.m. Jury Trial continued to 10/22/2012 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. (Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR.)(ptom) (Main Document 726 replaced on 10/23/2012) (ptom, ).
October 18, 2012 725 JURY TRIAL (DAY #3) held on 10/18/2012 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorneys Kenneth Brothers, Jeffrey Sherwood, Frank Cimino, Jr., Charles Monterio, and W. Ryan Snow appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Andrew Perlman, Corporate Representative present. Attorneys David Nelson, David Perlson, Emily OBrien and Stephen Noona, appeared on behalf of defendants AOL, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation. Petit jurors (9) appeared pursuant to adjournment last evening 10/17/12. Out of the presence of the jury, pretrial conference held in chambers. Comments of Court and counsel re: sealing of courtroom for testimony on proprietary information. Public notice to be posted. Plaintiff continued presentation of evidence witnesses sworn and testified. Video deposition of Jon Diorio, Gary Holt and Bartholomew Furrow shown to the jury. Plaintiffs Exhibits introduced and admitted into evidence. Objections heard and rulings made on the record. Court adjourned until Friday, 10/19/12 at 10:00 a.m. Jury Trial continued to 10/19/2012 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. (Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR (a.m.) and Jody Stewart, OCR (p.m.).)(ptom) Modified on 10/19/2012 to add pretrial conference (ptom). (Main Document 725 replaced on 10/19/2012) (ptom, ). (Main Document 725 replaced on 10/23/2012) (ptom, )
October 18, 2012 724 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David Andrew Perlson and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen E. Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3252387. by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 18, 2012 723 Featured Case ORDER granting 721 Motion for Pro hac vice, Appointed Jennifer Lynn Polse for AOL Inc., for Gannett Company, Inc., for Google Inc., for IAC Search & Media, Inc., for Target Corporation. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 10/18/12. (jcow, )
October 18, 2012 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller. 561 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes MOTION to Seal 1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes, 567 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Reply in Further Support of its Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone along with Exhibits 1-3 (ecav, )
October 17, 2012 722 JURY TRIAL (DAY #2) held on 10/17/2012 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorneys Kenneth Brothers, Jeffrey Sherwood, W. Ryan Snow, Dawn Rudenko, Donald Schultz, and Frank Cimino, Jr. appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Andrew Perlman, Corporate Representative present. Attorneys David Nelson, David Perlson, Emily OBrien, Stephen Noona, David Bilsker, and Robert Wilson appeared on behalf of defendants AOL, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation. Petit jurors (9) appeared pursuant to adjournment last evening 10/16/12. Plaintiff presented evidence witnesses sworn and testified. Plaintiffs and Defendants Exhibits introduced and admitted into evidence. Objections heard and rulings made on the record. Video Deposition of Jonathan Alferness shown to the jury. Out of the presence of the jury, Court DENIED Plaintiffs #700 Motion for Reconsideration of 697 Order denying Motion for Sanctions; and DENIED Defendants #709 Motion to Strike and for Sanctions and to Strike Plaintiffs Supplemental Expert report in Violation of the Courts Oct. 9th Order, stating rulings on the record. Jurors excused and Court adjourned until Thursday, 10/18/12 at 10:00 a.m. Jury Trial continued to 10/18/2012 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. (Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR (a.m.) and Jody Stewart, OCR (p.m.).)(ptom) Modified on 10/18/2012 to add language(ptom). (Main Document 722 replaced on 10/18/2012) (ptom, ). (Main Document 722 replaced on 10/23/2012) (ptom, ).
October 17, 2012 721 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Lynn Polse and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen E. Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3250881. by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 17, 2012 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller. 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions;, 524 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibits 34 and 36 to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judg, 514 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to its Response to Defendants Motion to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Materials at Trial, 508 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12 t MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12 to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12. (ecav, )
October 16, 2012 720 (DAY #1) Jury Trial Begun and Voir Dire held on 10/16/12 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorneys Kenneth Brothers, Jeffrey Sherwood, W. Ryan Snow, Dawn Rudenko, Donald Schultz, and Frank Cimino, Jr. appeared on behalf of the Plaintiff. Andrew Perlman, Corporate Representative present. Attorneys David Nelson, David Perlson, Emily OBrien, Stephen Noona, David Bilsker, and Robert Wilson appeared on behalf of defendants AOL, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation. Pretrial conference held in chambers. Petit jurors were sworn, examined on voir dire and from said panel came a jury of nine (9) who were duly sworn. Jurors not selected excused subject to call. Jurors instructed by Court and shown a video as to patent cases. Out of the presence of the jury, counsel argued objections to demonstrative exhibits - Court stated rulings on the record. Witnesses sequestered. Opening statements of counsel heard. Court adjourned until Wednesday, 10/17/12 at 10:00 a.m. Jury Trial continued to 10/17/2012 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. [Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR (a.m.) and Jody Stewart, OCR (p.m.)](ptom) (Main Document 720 replaced on 10/23/2012) (ptom, ).
October 16, 2012 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller. 453 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #5 along with Exhibits 1 and 2, 436 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #1 along with Exhibits 5-6 and 11-12, 465 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone, 449 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #4 along with Exhibits 1 and 2, 457 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker along with Exhibits 1-5, 7-8, and 10-11, 429 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to, 462 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants Motion to Preclude Dr. Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions along with Exhibits 1-3 and 5, 441 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #2 along with Exhibits 1 and 2, 445 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #3 along with Exhibits 3-11. (ecav, )
October 15, 2012 719 Featured Case ORDER ON FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/15/12. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(arou)
October 15, 2012 718 Sealed Document: Exhibit to 711 Declaration, filed by by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation UNDER SEAL, pursuant to 706 Motion to Seal. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(mwin, )
October 15, 2012 717 RESPONSE in Opposition re 709 Emergency MOTION to Strike and For Sanctions and To Strike Plaintiffs Supplemental Expert Report In Violation Of the Courts October 9 Order filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2012 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller. 429 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to (rsim, )
October 15, 2012 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller. 453 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #5 along with Exhibits 1 and 2, 436 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #1 along with Exhibits 5-6 and 11-12, 465 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone, 449 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #4 along with Exhibits 1 and 2, 457 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker along with Exhibits 1-5, 7-8, and 10-11, 462 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants Motion to Preclude Dr. Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions along with Exhibits 1-3 and 5, 441 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #2 along with Exhibits 1 and 2, 445 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #3 along with Exhibits 3-11 (rsim, )
October 15, 2012 716 Opposition to 700 MOTION for Reconsideration re 697 Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,,,,,,,,,,, denial of I/P Engines Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Review of Judge Leonard's Ruling on Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 15, 2012 715 CERTIFICATE of Service (Amended) re 713 Reply to Motion, by Stephen Edward Noona on behalf of AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation (Noona, Stephen)
October 15, 2012 714 CERTIFICATE of Service (Amended) re 710 Memorandum in Support, by Stephen Edward Noona on behalf of AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation (Noona, Stephen)
October 15, 2012 Notice of Correction re 713 Reply to Motion - The filing user has been notified to file a separate Certificate of Service. The certificate of service filed is not signed. (rsim, )
October 15, 2012 Notice of Correction re 710 Memorandum in Support - The filing user has been notified to file a separate Certificate of Service. The certificate of service filed is not signed. (rsim, )
October 14, 2012 713 Reply to Motion re 701 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiffs Motion for Review of Judge Leonards Ruling on I/P Engines Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 14, 2012 712 Consent MOTION to Expedite and Memorandum in Support of Consent Motion to Expedite Briefing on Defendants Emergency Motion For Sanctions And To Strike Plaintiffs Supplemental Expert Report In Violation Of The Courts October 9 Order by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 14, 2012 711 Declaration re 710 Memorandum in Support, of Emily O'Brien in Support of Defendants Emergency Motion For Sanctions and To Strike Plaintiffs Supplemental Expert Report In Violation Of the Courts October 9 Order by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 14, 2012 710 Memorandum in Support re 709 Emergency MOTION to Strike and For Sanctions and To Strike Plaintiffs Supplemental Expert Report In Violation Of the Courts October 9 Order filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 14, 2012 709 Emergency MOTION to Strike and For Sanctions and To Strike Plaintiffs Supplemental Expert Report In Violation Of the Courts October 9 Order by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 14, 2012 708 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 706 MOTION to Seal Portions Of Exhibit 1 To The OBrien Declaration In Support Of Defendants Motion For Sanctions And To Strike Portions Of Dr. Frieders Second Updated Expert Report (Noona, Stephen)
October 14, 2012 707 Memorandum in Support re 706 MOTION to Seal Portions Of Exhibit 1 To The OBrien Declaration In Support Of Defendants Motion For Sanctions And To Strike Portions Of Dr. Frieders Second Updated Expert Report filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 14, 2012 706 MOTION to Seal Portions Of Exhibit 1 To The OBrien Declaration In Support Of Defendants Motion For Sanctions And To Strike Portions Of Dr. Frieders Second Updated Expert Report by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 705 Featured Case ORDER NUMBER 2 - PRE-TRIAL MOTIONS: Before the Court are remaining motions to exclude evidence and witnesses from trial in the above-styled matter filed by both Plaintiff and Defendants. These matters have been fully briefed by the Parties. The Court finds that oral arguments of these motions will not aid itsdecisional process. Having reviewed the motions and related materials, the Court finds these matters ripe for judicial determination. For the reasons stated herein, and pursuant to the inherent authority to make evidentiary rulings prior to trial, see Luce v. United States, 469 U.S. 38,41 n.4(1984), the Court resolves the Parties' motions as outlined: Plaintiffs First Motion in Limine as to Items 2 and 6 is DEFERRED. The Court's reasoning with respect to the Lycos agreements is equally applicable to the seven agreements Defendants wish to offer, which by their own admission are non-comparable, and are again solely offered for the purpose of showing a preference by Google for lump sum royalty payments. Non-comparable licenses cannot be used to determine either the form or amount of a reasonable royalty. Accordingly, for the reasons outlined above and under the Court's discretion under Fed. R. Evid. 403, Plaintiffs Second Motion in Limine to Preclude Non-Comparable License Agreements between Google and other third parties, as outlined in Plaintiffs memorandum in support of this motion, is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Second Motion in Limine to exclude the Google-Meyer Agreement is DENIED. Additionally, the Court's reasoning with respect to the Google-Meyer Agreement is equally applicable to the Google-Disney Agreement. As there is a dispute to whether the technology underlying the Google-Disney Agreements is comparable, the jury must resolve the dispute in the context of determining a reasonable royalty for damages. Consequently, Plaintiffs Second Motion in Limine to exclude the Google-Disney Agreement is DENIED. Court GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone as to any testimony using a "yardstick" or "proxy" methodology or the use of the real estate valuations analogies in this context. Dr. Ugone is free to present expert opinion using established methods of calculating damages, including the hypothetical negotiation approach guided by the Georgia-Pacific Factors, which he purports to use. Having reviewed the motions and related pleadings, the Court finds that Dr. Ungars new theory of invalidity is not violative of Rule 26 procedures. Furthermore, the Court finds that Plaintiff has neither been surprised nor prejudiced by this new theory under Fourth Circuit precedent on this issue. See Southern States Rack & Fixture, Inc. v. Sherwm-Williams Co., 318 F.3d 592, 597 (4th Cir. 2003). Accordingly, Plaintiffs motion as to Dr. Ungars' new theory of invalidity is DENIED. At Final-Pre Trial Conference, Defendants essentially asked for reconsideration of the Court's previous denial of their Motion in Limine No. 2. Having again reviewed the relevant case law, the Court declines to reconsider its decision. I/P Engine, through its damages expert, is prepared to offer evidence at trial that "patented technology forms a substantial basis of the consumer demand of the accused products" through discovered documents showing increased revenue specifically attributed to patented technologies, presumably reflecting increased consumer demand. The sufficiency of this evidence in determining a reasonable royalty is a question for the jury. If questions arise as to whether Dr. Becker's trial testimony adequately supports application of the Entire Market Value Rule, they can be addressed through cross examination or through relevant trial motions. Accordingly, motion for reconsideration of the Court's previous denial of their Motion in Limine No. 2 is DENIED. Having reviewed the motion and related pleadings, the Court finds that objections to Dr. Becker's testimony are best resolved at trial during the course of examination as they generally go to the weight of the evidence and should be resolved by the jury. In summary: Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Stephen L. Becker (ECF No. 319) is DENIED. DENYING 293 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING 299 Motion in Limine; DENYING 319 Motion to Exclude; DENYING 327 Motion to Exclude; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 333 Motion in Limine; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 340 Motion to Exclude; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 357 Motion in Limine, as outlined in this Order. (See Order for entire Specifics) Entered and filed 10/12/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/12/12). (ecav, )
October 12, 2012 704 Defendants' Proposed Pre-Trial Jury Instructions Proposed Jury Instructions by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Noona, Stephen)
October 12, 2012 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller. 296 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Matters Related to Historical Click-Through Rate, and Exhibits F, H, I and J to the Declaration of Joshua, 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof, 331 MOTION to Seal the Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion in Limine to Preclude Non-Comparable License Agreements along with Exhibits 1 and 2, 312 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 3 to the Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence, 338 MOTION to Seal the Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone along with Exhibits 1 and 2 (ecav, )
October 12, 2012 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller. 425 MOTION to Seal its Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment along with Exhibits 8, 11-19, 22-24, 27-32, 34-39, 45, 53-54, 56. (ecav, )
October 11, 2012 703 REPLY to Response to Motion re 293 MOTION to Dismiss all Claims Against AOL Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Target Corporation filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 11, 2012 702 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of 10-09-2012, before Judge Lawrence R. Leonard, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/13/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/11/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2013.(borden, sharon)
October 11, 2012 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller as directed. Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller no longer assigned to the case. (ecav, )
October 10, 2012 701 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiffs Motion for Review of Judge Leonards Ruling on I/P Engines Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 10, 2012 700 MOTION for Reconsideration re 697 Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,,,,,,,,,,, denial of I/P Engines Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 10, 2012 699 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Filing of Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schultz, Donald)
October 9, 2012 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller no longer assigned to the case. (ecav, )
October 9, 2012 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller. Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard no longer assigned to the case. (ecav, )
October 9, 2012 698 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to assign any matters which arise in this case to an alternate United States Magistrate Judge due to the undersigned U.S. Magistrate Judge having conducted a settlement conference and discussions in this matter. Because of the nature of the settlement discussions the undersigned cannot preside over any contested issues in this case. Entered and filed 10/9/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 10/9/12). (ecav, )
October 9, 2012 697 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's 277 Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses; AND DENYING its 282 Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses. Specifically, as to the Plaintiffs Second Motion, the Court ORDERS the Defendants to produce to the Plaintiff within two days of entry of this Order data that has not been produced as to Google, Inc.'s, revenues for its properties based in the United States and AUTHORIZES the Plaintiff to supplement the report of its damages expert, Dr. Stephen L. Becker, within two days thereafter. Furthermore, the Defendants may not cross-examine Dr. Becker on the omission in his initial report of Google, Inc.'s, revenues for its properties based in the United States. Although the Court DENIES the Plaintiff's Second Motion as to certain e-mails and information provided therein produced by the Defendants as Bates Nos. G-IPE-0888897,G-IPE-0888898-99, G-IPE-0888900, and G-IPE-888901-02, the Plaintiff is AUTHORIZED to supplement Dr. Becker's report to include these documents by Friday, October 12,2012. Finally, the Court DENIES the Plaintiffs Second Motion as to the Defendants' non-infringing alternatives contentions but AUTHORIZES the Plaintiff to supplement the report of its infringement expert, Dr. Ophir Frieder, to include these contentions by Friday, October 12, 2012. (See Order for All Specifics) Entered and filed 10/9/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 10/9/12). (ecav, )
October 9, 2012 696 Proposed Voir Dire by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Snow, W. Ryan)
October 9, 2012 695 Proposed Jury Instructions by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Snow, W. Ryan)
October 9, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson:Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/9/2012. Attorney's Kenneth Brothers, Jeffrey Sherwood, W. Ryan Snow, Dawn Rudenko and Frank Cimino, Jr. appeared on behalf of the plaintiff. Attorney's David Nelson, David Pearlson, Emily O'Brien, Stephen Noona, David Bilsker, and Robert Wilson appeared on behalf of the defendant's. (ptom)
October 9, 2012 694 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation of Filing Defendants' Proposed Verdict Form (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 9, 2012 693 Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 9, 2012 692 Proposed Voir Dire by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 9, 2012 691 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard:Motion Hearing held on 10/9/2012 re 282 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses filed by I/P Engine, Inc., 277 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. Present were Jeffrey Sherwood, W. Ryan Snow, Frank Cimino, Jr. and Kenneth Brothers on behalf of the plaintiff and David Bilsker, David Perlson, Steve Noona and David Nelson on behalf of the defendants. Mr. Sherwood argues motion #277 and Mr. Bilsker responds. The Court makes rulings on the record. Mr. Cimino argues motion #282 and Mr. Perlson responds. The Court makes rulings on the record. The Court will enter an order in this matter. Parties adjourn to participate in a settlement conference with Judge Leonard in this case and a final pretrial conference later in the afternoon with Judge Jackson. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR.)(cdod, )
October 9, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard:Settlement Conference held on 10/9/2012. (cdod, )
October 9, 2012 690 Featured Case ORDER, AGREED, re. 202 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice of I/P Engine's Claims Relating to AOL's Advertising.com Sponsored Listings by AOL, I/P Engine, Inc. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that I/P Engine's claims for relief against AOL relating to AOL's Advertising.com Sponsored Listings are dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses relating to the dismissed claims shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Entered and filed 10/9/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/9/12). (ecav, )
October 8, 2012 689 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 687 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Order on the Final Pretrial Conference (Noona, Stephen)
October 8, 2012 688 Memorandum in Support re 687 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Order on the Final Pretrial Conference filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 8, 2012 687 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Order on the Final Pretrial Conference by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 686 Opposition to 293 MOTION to Dismiss all Claims Against AOL Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Target Corporation filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2012 685 Memorandum in Support re 684 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 and 4 to its Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against AOL, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., and Target Corporation filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2012 684 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 and 4 to its Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against AOL, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., and Target Corporation by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2012 683 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Motion to Seal Exhibits 1 and 4 to its Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against AOL, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., and Target Corporation (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2012 682 Featured Case ORDER on three (3) Motions in Limine filed by I/P Engine, Inc. ("Plaintiff") toexclude evidence from trial in the above-styled matter. Also before the Court are five (5) Motions in Limine to exclude evidence filed by Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., Target Corporation, IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Gannett Co., Inc. ("Defendants"). These matters have been fully briefed by the Parties. The Court finds that oral arguments of these motions will not aid its decisional process. Having reviewed the motions and related materials, the Courtfinds these matters ripe for judicial determination. For the reasons stated herein, and pursuant to the inherent authority to make evidentiary rulings prior to trial, see Luce v. United States, 469 U.S. 38,41 n.4 (1984), the Court resolves the Parties' Motions in Limine as outlined: DEFERRING ruling on 299 Motion in Limine; DENYING 301 Motion in Limine; DEFERRING ruling on 303 Motion in Limine; DEFERRING ruling on 305 Motion in Limine; DENYING 307 Motion in Limine; GRANTING AND DEFERRING (See Order for specifics as to each item) 314 Motion in Limine; DEFERRING ruling on 333 Motion in Limine; DENYING 335 Motion in Limine, as outlined in this Order. (See Order for all Specifics as to each Motion in Limine) Entered and filed 10/5/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/5/12). (ecav, )
October 5, 2012 681 Featured Case ORDER granting 654 Motion for Pro hac vice appearance. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on October 5, 2012.
October 5, 2012 680 Featured Case ORDER granting 672 Motion for Pro hac vice appearance. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on October 5, 2012.
October 5, 2012 679 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 582 Motion for David Leon Bilsker to appear asPro hac vice for AOL Inc. Entered and filed 10/5/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/5/12). (ecav, )
October 5, 2012 678 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 643 Motion for Margaret Pirnie Kammerud to appear as Pro hac vice for AOL Inc. Entered and filed 10/5/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/5/12). (ecav, )
October 5, 2012 677 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 642 Motion for Jennifer Jasmine Ghaussy to appear as Pro hac vice for AOL Inc. Entered and filed 10/5/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/5/12). (ecav, )
October 5, 2012 676 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 641 Motion for Howard Yeh-hao Chen to appear as Pro hac vice for AOL Inc. Entered and filed 10/5/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/5/12). (ecav, )
October 5, 2012 675 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 640 Motion for Antonio Ricardo Sistos to appear as Pro hac vice for AOL Inc. Entered and filed 10/5/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/5/12). (ecav, )
October 5, 2012 674 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 639 Motion for Joshua Lee Sohn to appear as Pro hac vice for AOL Inc. Entered and filed 10/5/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/5/12). (ecav, )
October 5, 2012 673 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 638 Motion for Sarah Agudo to appear as Pro hac vice for AOL Inc. Entered and filed 10/5/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/5/12). (ecav, )
October 5, 2012 672 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David Aaron Nelson and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen E. Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3235417. by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 671 Sealed Exhibit 2 re 651 Reply to Motion re 282 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation of Sealed Exhibit 2, # 2 Continuation of Sealed Exhibit 2)(ecav, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2012: # 3 Letter) (ecav, ).
October 5, 2012 670 Sealed Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Reply re 651 Reply to Motion re 282 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
October 5, 2012 669 Sealed Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Reply re 651 Reply to Motion re 282 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
October 5, 2012 668 MOTION to Expedite and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Expedite Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Deposition Designations by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 667 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 664 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Deposition Designations , Notice of Filing of Additional Exhibit to the Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 666 Declaration re 665 Memorandum in Support of Emily O'Brien in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Deposition Designations by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Noona, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 665 Memorandum in Support re 664 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Deposition Designations filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 664 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Deposition Designations by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 5, 2012 Notice of Correction re 660 Stipulation. Counsel filed a pleading titled, "Stipulation and Proposed Order Withdrawing Certain Motions in Limine Pending before the Court". Proposed Orders have to be sent to the Clerk's Office in paper and not filed electronically as a pleading. If counsel's intent is to withdraw the motions that are stated in Doc. 660, a Motion to Withdraw is all that is needed, linking same back to the pertinent motions and the Stipulation is not necessary. (ecav, )
October 4, 2012 660 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Withdrawing Certain Motions in Limine Pending Before the Court by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., I/P Engine, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2012 659 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Crandall Reilly on behalf of Suffolk Technologies, LLC (Reilly, Craig)
October 4, 2012 658 Brief in Support to 657 Opposition filed by Suffolk Technologies, LLC. (Reilly, Craig)
October 4, 2012 657 Opposition to 346 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial filed by Suffolk Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig)
October 4, 2012 656 Request for Hearing by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 346 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial (Noona, Stephen)
October 4, 2012 655 REPLY to Response to Motion re 346 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 4, 2012 654 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily Christina O'Brien and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen E. Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3233922. by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 4, 2012 651 Reply to Motion re 282 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2012 649 Memorandum in Support re 647 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Reply in Further Support of its Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions along with Exhibits 1 and 2 filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2012 647 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Reply in Further Support of its Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions along with Exhibits 1 and 2 by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2012 646 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Motion to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Reply in Further Support of its Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions along with Exhibits 1 and 2 (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2012 644 Reply to Motion re 277 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2012 643 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Margaret Pirnie Kammerud and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen E. Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3233082. by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 4, 2012 642 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Jasmine Ghaussy and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen E. Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3233079. by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 4, 2012 641 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Howard Yeh-hao Chen and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen E. Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3233062. by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 4, 2012 640 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Antonio Ricardo Sistos and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen E. Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3233056. by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 4, 2012 639 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joshua Lee Sohn and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen E. Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3233047. by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 4, 2012 638 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Agudo and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen E. Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3233036. by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 3, 2012 663 Sealed Defendants' Reply Brief in Support re 561 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(ecav, )
October 3, 2012 662 Sealed Exhibit 1 re 561 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes. (ecav, )
October 3, 2012 661 Sealed Defendants' Reply Brief in Support to Exclude Testimony re 561 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes MOTION to Seal 1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes. (ecav, )
October 3, 2012 653 Cover Letter re 652 Sealed Document, 645 Sealed Document, 648 Sealed Document, 650 Sealed Document. (ecav, )
October 3, 2012 652 Sealed Exhibit 3 re 569 Reply to Motion re 340 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
October 3, 2012 650 Sealed Exhibit 2 re 569 Reply to Motion re 340 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
October 3, 2012 648 Sealed Exhibit 1 re 569 Reply to Motion re 340 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (ecav, )
October 3, 2012 645 Sealed Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone re 569 Reply to Motion re 340 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
October 3, 2012 609 Reply to Motion re 357 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff I/P Engines Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungars New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2012 608 Response to 115 MOTION to Seal I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Exhibits 15, 16, 17, 18, and 21 of IP Engine's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc.'s Custodial Document Production, 125 MOTION to Seal Motion to Seal I/P Engine's Opposition to Google and IAC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions Along with Exhibits 11, 12, 14, 15, 18, 21, and 22 in Support filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 15 (Lesser Redacted), # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 16 (Lesser Redacted), # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 17 (Lesser Redacted), # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 18 (Unredacted, Public Form), # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 21 (Lesser Redacted), # 6 Exhibit ECF 125 (Lesser Redacted), # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 11 (Lesser Redacted), # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 12 (Lesser Redacted), # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 15 (Lesser Redacted), # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 22 (Lesser Redacted))(Schultz, Donald)
October 3, 2012 607 Response to 241 NOTICE,, 234 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Exhibits 4-9, 21-22, and 25-31 to the Declaration of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and the Declaration o Notice of Filing Response to Agreed Order to Maintain Portions of Documents Under Seal filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4 (Lesser Redacted), # 2 Exhibit 5 (Lesser Redacted), # 3 Exhibit 6 (Lesser Redacted), # 4 Exhibit 7 (Lesser Redacted), # 5 Exhibit 8 (Lesser Redacted), # 6 Exhibit 9 (to Remain Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit 21 (Lesser Redacted), # 8 Exhibit 22 (Lesser Redacted), # 9 Exhibit 26 (Lesser Redacted), # 10 Exhibit 27 (Lesser Redacted), # 11 Exhibit 28 (Lesser Redacted), # 12 Exhibit 29 (Lesser Redacted), # 13 Exhibit 30 (Lesser Redacted), # 14 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Lesser Redacted, # 15 Exhibit Declaration of Bartholomew Furrow (Less Redacted))(Noona, Stephen)
October 3, 2012 606 Response to 206 MOTION to Seal Portions Of Google Inc.s Brief In Support Of Motion To Compel And Various Exhibits To The Declaration Of Jen Ghaussy in Support Thereof Notice of Filing Response to Agreed Order to Maintain Portions of Documents Under Seal filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H (Undreacted, Public Form), # 2 Exhibit I (Unredacted, Public Form), # 3 Exhibit L (Unredacted, Public Form), # 4 Exhibit M (Unredacted, Public Form), # 5 Exhibit N (Unredacted, Public Form), # 6 Exhibit P (Unredacted, Public Form), # 7 Exhibit Q (Unredacted, Public Form), # 8 Exhibit R (Unredacted, Public Form), # 9 Exhibit S (Undredacted, Public Form), # 10 Exhibit T (Unredacted, Public Form), # 11 Exhibit U (Unredacted, Public Form))(Noona, Stephen)
October 3, 2012 604 Response to 234 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Exhibits 4-9, 21-22, and 25-31 to the Declaration of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and the Declaration o Notice of Filing Response to Agreed Order to Maintain Portions of Documents Under Seal filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31 to the Declaration of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Unredacted, Public Form))(Noona, Stephen)
October 3, 2012 602 Response to 226 MOTION to Seal Portions of Google Inc.'s Reply Brief in Support of Google's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Documents Notice of Filing Response to Agreed Order to Maintain Portions of Documents Under Seal filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply Brief in Support of the Motion to Compel (Unredacted, Public Form))(Noona, Stephen)
October 3, 2012 600 Response to 214 MOTION to Seal Motion To Seal Portions Of Defendants Brief In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Discovery Sanctions And Various Exhibits To The Declaration Of Emily OBrien In Support Thereof Notice of Filing Response to Agreed Order to Maintain Portions of Documents Under Seal filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M to the Declaration of Emily O'Brien (Lesser Redacted), # 2 Exhibit N to the Declaration of Emily O'Brien (Lesser, # 3 Exhibit Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions (Lesser Redacted))(Noona, Stephen)
October 3, 2012 594 Response to 206 MOTION to Seal Portions Of Google Inc.s Brief In Support Of Motion To Compel And Various Exhibits To The Declaration Of Jen Ghaussy in Support Thereof Notice of Filing Response to Agreed Order to Maintain Portions of Documents Under Seal filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Lesser Redacted), # 2 Exhibit B (Lesser Redacted), # 3 Exhibit C (Lesser Redacted), # 4 Exhibit J (Lesser Redacted), # 5 Exhibit K (Lesser Redacted), # 6 Exhibit Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel (Lesser Redacted))(Noona, Stephen)
October 3, 2012 591 Response to 181 MOTION to Seal Exhibit P to the Declaration of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(1) Depositions MOTION to Seal Exhibit P to the Declaration of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(1) Depositions Notice of Filing Response to Agreed Order to Maintain Portsions of Documents Under Seal filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P to the Declaration of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(1) Depositions (Lesser Redacted))(Noona, Stephen)
October 3, 2012 590 Response to 136 MOTION to Seal Portions of Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel and Exhibits AA and BB to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of the Reply Notice of Filing Response to Agreed Order to Maintain Portions of Documents Under Seal filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA (Lesser Redacted), # 2 Exhibit BB (Lesser Redacted), # 3 Exhibit Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel (Lesser Redacted))(Noona, Stephen)
October 3, 2012 Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 10/9/2012 at 02:30 PM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. (ptom)
October 3, 2012 585 Response to 244 Order,,,,, 245 Order,,,,,,,,,, Joint Response to the Orders to Show Cause filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., I/P Engine, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 3, 2012 582 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David Leon Bilsker and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen E. Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3231446. by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 3, 2012 573 Featured Case Settlement Conference Order: This case has been referred to the undersigned for a settlement conference. In order to facilitate the just and expeditious resolution of this case, it is ORDERED as follows: All parties and their lead counsel are required to appear at a settlement conference scheduled in the United States District Court, 600 Granby Street, Norfolk, Virginia 23510, at10:30 a.m. on Tuesday, October 9, 2012, for the purpose of conducting discussions, in good faith, towards a compromised resolution of this case. Counsel must notify parties attending the settlement conference that electronic equipment (cell phones, pagers, laptops, etc.) is not permitted in the courthouse without the express permission of the Court. (See Order for further specifics) Additionally, The parties must: Submit a brief memorandum of five pages or less directly to the chambers of the undersigned (do not file in the clerk's office) by noon on Friday, October 5, 2012. Do not serve a copy of the letter on the opposing party unless you wish to disclose your settlement position. The memorandum can be faxed to (757) 222-7257. Identify the lawyers and party representatives who will attend the conference. (See Order for further specifics) Entered and filed 10/3/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 10/3/12). (ecav, )
October 3, 2012 Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 10/9/2012 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (cdod, )
October 3, 2012 572 Featured Case ORDER DENYING Defendants' 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Google Inc., AOL Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation, Gannett Company, Inc. It is further ORDERED that parties engage in settlement discussions before United States Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard @ 10:30 a.m. on Tuesday, 10/9/12. Entered and filed 10/3/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/3/12). (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 637 Cover Letter re. Docs. 613 - 636. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 636 Sealed Exhibit 36 to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn re 524 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibits 34 and 36 to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 635 Sealed Exhibit 34 to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn re 524 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibits 34 and 36 to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 634 Sealed Defendants' Reply in Support re 524 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibits 34 and 36 to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement. (ecav)
October 2, 2012 633 Sealed Exhibit Q re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 632 Sealed Exhibit P to the Declaration of Margaret P. Kammerud re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 631 Sealed Exhibit O to the Declaration of Margaret P. Kammerud re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 630 Sealed Exhibit N to the Declaration of Margaret P. Kammerud re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 629 Sealed Exhibit M to the Declaration of Margaret P. Kammerud re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 628 Sealed Exhibit L to the Declaration of Margaret P. Kammerud re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav)
October 2, 2012 627 Sealed Declaration of Margaret P. Kammerud re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 626 Sealed Exhibit K re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 625 Sealed Exhibit J re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 624 Sealed Exhibit I re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 623 Sealed Exhibit G re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 622 Sealed Exhibit E re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 621 Sealed Exhibit D re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 620 Sealed Exhibit C re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 619 Sealed Exhibit B re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 618 Sealed Exhibit A re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 617 Sealed Defendants' Opposition re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 616 Sealed Defendants' Opposition re 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 615 Sealed Exhibit 12 re 508 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12 t MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12 to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12 to. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 614 Sealed Exhibit 10 re 508 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12 t MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12 t MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12 to. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 613 Sealed Defendants' Opposition re Plaintiff's 508 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12 to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12 to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 612 Cover Letter re 610 Sealed Document, 611 Sealed Document,. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 611 Sealed Exhibit 2 re 516 Response to Motion re 346 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation of Sealed Exhibit 2, # 2 Continuation of Sealed Exhibit 2)(ecav, )
October 2, 2012 610 Sealed Exhibit 1 re 516 Response to Motion re 346 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 571 Declaration re 570 Reply to Response to Motion,, of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I)(Noona, Stephen)
October 2, 2012 570 REPLY to Response to Motion re 327 MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect (Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 2, 2012 569 Reply to Motion re 340 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2012 568 Memorandum in Support re 567 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Reply in Further Support of its Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone along with Exhibits 1-3 filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2012 567 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Reply in Further Support of its Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone along with Exhibits 1-3 by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2012 566 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Motion to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Reply in Further Support of its Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone along with Exhibits 1-3 (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2012 565 Declaration re 564 Reply to Response to Motion of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18)(Noona, Stephen)
October 2, 2012 564 REPLY to Response to Motion re 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker (Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 2, 2012 563 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 561 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes (Noona, Stephen)
October 2, 2012 562 Memorandum in Support re 561 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 2, 2012 561 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect; (2) Portions of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of their Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker; and (3) Portions of Exhibit I to the Declaration of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of their Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 2, 2012 560 Request for Hearing by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 303 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Materials Related to Historical Click-Through Rate, 327 MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect, 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker, 307 MOTION in Limine #5 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Damages Against AOL Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Target Corporation, 299 MOTION in Limine #1 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Willful Infringement, Pre-Suit Knowledge, or Copying (Noona, Stephen)
October 2, 2012 554 Request for Hearing by I/P Engine, Inc. re 335 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion in Limine to Exclude Improper Prior Art Evidence, 357 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff I/P Engines Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungars New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction, 340 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone (Schultz, Donald)
October 2, 2012 547 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. re 282 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses, 277 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses Notice of Hearing (Schultz, Donald)
October 2, 2012 541 Featured Case ORDER, AGREED, GRANTING 470 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct 90 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Entered and filed 10/2/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 10/2/12). (Attachments: # 1 Letter) (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Judge Leonard. 470 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 90 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. (ecav, )
October 2, 2012 Set Deadlines as to 277 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses, 282 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2012 at 09:30 AM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (cdod, )
October 2, 2012 529 Request for Hearing by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation on Motion for Summary Judgment (Noona, Stephen)
October 2, 2012 528 Declaration re 527 Reply to Response to Motion, of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of the Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 34, # 2 Exhibit 35, # 3 Exhibit 36, # 4 Exhibit 37, # 5 Exhibit 38)(Noona, Stephen)
October 2, 2012 527 REPLY to Response to Motion re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment (Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 2, 2012 526 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 524 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibits 34 and 36 to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judg (Noona, Stephen)
October 2, 2012 525 Memorandum in Support re 524 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibits 34 and 36 to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judg filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 2, 2012 524 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibits 34 and 36 to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 1, 2012 523 Declaration re 521 Opposition, of Margaret P. Kammerud in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions (Public Version) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit O, # 5 Exhibit P, # 6 Exhibit Q, # 7 Exhibit R)(Noona, Stephen)
October 1, 2012 522 Declaration re 520 Opposition, of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Noona, Stephen)
October 1, 2012 521 Opposition to 282 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses (Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 1, 2012 520 Opposition to 277 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses (Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 1, 2012 519 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (Noona, Stephen)
October 1, 2012 518 Memorandum in Support re 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 1, 2012 517 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (2) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (3) Portions of the Declaration of Margaret Kammerud in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions; (4) Portions of Exhibits A-E, G, I-K to the Declaration of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions; and (5) Exhibits L-Q to the Declaration of Margaret Kammerud in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
October 1, 2012 516 RESPONSE to Motion re 346 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2012 515 Memorandum in Support re 514 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to its Response to Defendants Motion to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Materials at Trial filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2012 514 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to its Response to Defendants Motion to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Materials at Trial by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2012 513 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Motion to Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to its Response to Defendants Motion to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Materials at Trial (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2012 512 Declaration re 511 Opposition, of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Noona, Stephen)
October 1, 2012 511 Opposition to 357 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff I/P Engines Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungars New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction (Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 1, 2012 510 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 508 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12 t MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12 t MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12 t (Noona, Stephen)
October 1, 2012 509 Memorandum in Support re 508 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12 t MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12 t MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12 t filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
October 1, 2012 508 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction and (2) Exhibits 10 and 12 to the Declaration of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungar's New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 28, 2012 605 Sealed Exhibit 6 re 447 Opposition to 303 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Materials Related to Historical Click-Through Rate filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation of Sealed Exhibit 6, # 2 Continuation of Sealed Exhibit 6)(ecav, )
September 28, 2012 603 Sealed Exhibit 7 re 447 Opposition to 303 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Materials Related to Historical Click-Through Rate filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 601 Sealed Exhibit 8 re 447 Opposition to 303 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Materials Related to Historical Click-Through Rate filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 599 Sealed Exhibit 9 re 447 Opposition to 303 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Materials Related to Historical Click-Through Rate filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 598 Sealed Exhibit 10 re 447 Opposition to 303 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Materials Related to Historical Click-Through Rate filed by I/P Engine, Inc.(ecav, )
September 28, 2012 597 Sealed Exhibit 11 re 447 Opposition to 303 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Materials Related to Historical Click-Through Rate filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 596 Sealed Opposition to Defendants' re 455 Opposition to 307 MOTION in Limine #5 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Damages Against AOL Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Target Corporation filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 595 Sealed Exhibit 1 re 455 Opposition to 307 MOTION in Limine #5 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Damages Against AOL Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Target Corporation filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 593 Sealed Exhibit 2 re 455 Opposition to 307 MOTION in Limine #5 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Damages Against AOL Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Target Corporation filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 592 Sealed Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Brief in Opposition re 460 Opposition to 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 589 Sealed Exhibit 1 re 460 Opposition to 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 588 Sealed Exhibit 2 re 460 Opposition to 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation of Sealed Exhibit 2)(ecav, )
September 28, 2012 587 Sealed Exhibit 2 re 460 Opposition to 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 586 Sealed Exhibit 3 re 460 Opposition to 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 584 Sealed Exhibit 4 re 460 Opposition to 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 583 Sealed Exhibit 5 re 460 Opposition to 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 581 Sealed Exhibit 7 re 460 Opposition to 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 580 Sealed Exhibit 8 re 460 Opposition to 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 579 Sealed Exhibit 10 re 460 Opposition to 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 578 Sealed Exhibit 11 re 460 Opposition to 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 577 Sealed Document re 464 Opposition to 327 MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 576 Sealed Exhibit 1 re 464 Opposition to 327 MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 575 Sealed Exhibit 3 re 464 Opposition to 327 MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 574 Sealed Exhibit 5 re 464 Opposition to 327 MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 559 Sealed Cover Letter received on 9/28/12.
September 28, 2012 558 Sealed Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s 451 Opposition to 305 MOTION in Limine #4 to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Evidence or Argument Relating to Defendants' Conduct During Discovery or to Google's Unproduced Licenses filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 557 Sealed Exhibit 1 re 451 Opposition to 305 MOTION in Limine #4 to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Evidence or Argument Relating to Defendants' Conduct During Discovery or to Google's Unproduced Licenses filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 556 Sealed Exhibit 2 re 451 Opposition to 305 MOTION in Limine #4 to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Evidence or Argument Relating to Defendants' Conduct During Discovery or to Google's Unproduced Licenses filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 555 Sealed Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s re 439 Opposition to 299 MOTION in Limine #1 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Willful Infringement, Pre-Suit Knowledge, or Copying filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 553 Sealed Exhibit 5 re 439 Opposition to 299 MOTION in Limine #1 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Willful Infringement, Pre-Suit Knowledge, or Copying filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 552 Sealed Exhibit 6 re 439 Opposition to 299 MOTION in Limine #1 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Willful Infringement, Pre-Suit Knowledge, or Copying filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 551 Sealed Exhibit 11 re 439 Opposition to 299 MOTION in Limine #1 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Willful Infringement, Pre-Suit Knowledge, or Copying filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 550 Sealed Exhibit 12 re 439 Opposition to 299 MOTION in Limine #1 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Willful Infringement, Pre-Suit Knowledge, or Copying filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 549 Sealed I/P Engine, Inc.'s 443 Opposition to 301 MOTION in Limine #2 to Exclude Evidence of Entire Market Value of Accused Products and of Defendants' Size, Wealth and Overall Revenues filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 548 Sealed Exhibit 1 re 443 Opposition to 301 MOTION in Limine #2 to Exclude Evidence of Entire Market Value of Accused Products and of Defendants' Size, Wealth and Overall Revenues filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 546 Sealed Exhibit 2 re 443 Opposition to 301 MOTION in Limine #2 to Exclude Evidence of Entire Market Value of Accused Products and of Defendants' Size, Wealth and Overall Revenues filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 545 Sealed Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s 447 Opposition to 303 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Materials Related to Historical Click-Through Rate filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 544 Sealed Exhibit 3 re 447 Opposition to 303 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Materials Related to Historical Click-Through Rate filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 543 Sealed Exhibit 4 re 447 Opposition to 303 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Materials Related to Historical Click-Through Rate filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 542 Sealed Exhibit 5 re 447 Opposition to 303 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Materials Related to Historical Click-Through Rate filed by I/P Engine, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation of Sealed Exhibit 5, # 2 Continuation of Sealed Exhibit 5)(ecav, )
September 28, 2012 540 Sealed Cover Letter re 530 Sealed Document, 537 Sealed Document,,, 538 Sealed Document,,, 536 Sealed Document,,, 535 Sealed Document, 534 Sealed Document, 539 Sealed Document,,, 533 Sealed Document, 531 Sealed Document, 532 Sealed Document. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 539 Sealed Exhibit K re Defendants' 429 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 538 Sealed Exhibit E re Defendants' 429 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 537 Sealed Defendants' Opposition re 429 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 536 Sealed Defendants' Opposition re 429 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to MOTION to Seal(1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 535 Sealed Exhibit E re Defendants' 465 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 534 Sealed Exhibit D re Defendants' 465 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation of Sealed Exhibit D)(ecav, )
September 28, 2012 533 Sealed Exhibit C re Defendants' 465 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 532 Sealed Exhibit B re Defendants' 465 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 531 Sealed Exhibit A re Defendants' 465 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 530 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Defendants' 465 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone. (ecav, )
September 28, 2012 470 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 90 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order by Defendants and by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schultz, Donald)
September 28, 2012 469 Featured Case ORDER, AGREED, To Maintain Portions of Documents Under Seal: Granting in part and Denying in part 115 Motion to Seal; Granting in part and Denying in part 125 Motion to Seal; Granting 136 Motion to Seal; Granting 181 Motion to Seal; Granting in part and Denying in part 206 Motion to Seal; Granting 214 Motion to Seal; Denying 226 Motion to Seal; Granting in part and Denying in part 234 Motion to Seal; Granting in part and Denying in part 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that the following documents be maintained under seal in full: ECF No. 125 - Exhibits 14,18 and 21 to the Plaintiffs Motion to Seal. ECF Nos. 234-41 - Exhibits 9 and 25 to the Declaration of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. It is further ORDERED that portions of the following documents be maintained under seal in connection with the motions they support: ECF No. 115 - Exhibits 15,16,17, and 21 to the Plaintiffs Motion to Seal. ECF No. 125 - Exhibits 11,12,15, and 22 to Plaintiffs Motion to Seal, and I/P Engine'sBrief in Opposition to Google, and IAC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement Its Infringement Contentions. ECF No. 136 - Exhibits AA and BB to Defendants' Motion to Seal, and the Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel.ECF No. 181 - Exhibit P to the Declaration of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support ofDefendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(l) Depositions. ECF No. 206 - Exhibits A, B, C, J, K, and the Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel. ECF No. 214 - Exhibits M and N to the Declaration of Emily O'Brien in Support of the Motion to Seal Portions of Defendants Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Discovery Sanctions, and the Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions. ECF Nos. 234-41 - Exhibits 4, 5, 6,7, 8,9,21,22,26, 27,28,29, and 30 to the Declaration of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment,the Declaration of Bartholomew Furrow in Support of Defendants" Motion for Summary Judgment, and the Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following documents be unsealed in connection with the motions they support: ECF No. 115 - Exhibit 18 to the Plaintiffs Motion to Seal. ECF No. 206 - Exhibits H, I, L, M, N, P, Q, R, S, T, and U. ECF No. 226 - The Reply Brief in Support of the Motion to Compel. ECF Nos. 234-41 - Exhibit 31 to the Declaration of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. In addition to above, THE PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO FILE THEIR JOINT RESPONSE TO THE ORDERS TO SHOW CAUSE AND NON-CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBITS, PROFFERED IN CAMERA ON 9/24/12, VIA CM/ECF WITHIN FIVE (5) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. Entered and filed 9/28/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 9/28/12). (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 507 Sealed Cover Letter re 477 Sealed Document, 496 Sealed Document, 480 Sealed Document, 487 Sealed Document, 475 Sealed Document, 503 Sealed Document, 497 Sealed Document, 502 Sealed Document, 505 Sealed Document, 473 Sealed Document, 479 Sealed Document, 492 Sealed Document, 471 Sealed Document, 490 Sealed Document, 485 Sealed Document, 504 Sealed Document, 472 Sealed Document, 491 Sealed Document, 494 Sealed Document, 500 Sealed Document, 482 Sealed Document, 476 Sealed Document, 478 Sealed Document, 499 Sealed Document, 493 Sealed Document, 483 Sealed Document, 498 Sealed Document, 495 Sealed Document, 488 Sealed Document, 501 Sealed Document, 481 Sealed Document, 489 Sealed Document, 484 Sealed Document, 474 Sealed Document, 486 Sealed Document, 506 Sealed Document. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 506 Sealed Exhibit 56 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 505 Sealed Exhibit 54 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 504 Sealed Exhibit 53 I/P Engine, Inc.'s re 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 503 Sealed Exhibit 45 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 502 Sealed Exhibit 39 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 501 Sealed Exhibit 38 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 500 Sealed Exhibit 37 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 499 Sealed Exhibit 36 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 498 Sealed Exhibit 35 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 497 Sealed Exhibit 34 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 496 Sealed Exhibit 32 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation of Sealed Exhibit 32, # 2 Continuation of Sealed Exhibit 32)(ecav, )
September 27, 2012 495 Sealed Exhibit 31 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Exhibit 31 Continuation, # 2 Sealed Exhibit 31 Continuation)(ecav, )
September 27, 2012 494 Sealed Exhibit 30 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: Continuation of Exhibit 30.(ecav, )
September 27, 2012 493 Sealed Exhibit 29 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 492 Sealed Exhibit 28 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 491 Sealed Exhibit 27 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 490 Sealed Exhibit 24 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 489 Sealed Exhibit 23 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 488 Sealed Exhibit 22 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 487 Sealed Exhibit 19 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 486 Sealed Exhibit 18 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 485 Sealed Exhibit 17 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 484 Sealed Exhibit 16 re I/P Engine Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 483 Sealed Exhibit 15 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 482 Sealed Exhibit 14 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 481 Sealed Exhibit 13 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 480 Sealed Exhibit 12 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 479 Sealed Exhibit 11 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 478 Sealed Exhibit 8 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 477 Sealed Exhibit 7 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendant's 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 476 Sealed Exhibit 6 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 475 Sealed Exhibit 5 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 474 Sealed Exhibit 4 re. I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 27, 2012 473 Sealed Exhibit 3 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav)
September 27, 2012 472 Sealed Exhibit 2 re I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav)
September 27, 2012 471 Sealed Document I/P Engine, Inc.'s 427 Opposition to Defendants' 237 Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav)
September 27, 2012 468 Declaration re 466 Memorandum in Support, of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Opposition to I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Noona, Stephen)
September 27, 2012 467 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 465 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone (Noona, Stephen)
September 27, 2012 466 Memorandum in Support re 465 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 27, 2012 465 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 27, 2012 464 Opposition to 327 MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 463 Memorandum in Support re 462 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants Motion to Preclude Dr. Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions along with Exhibits 1-3 and 5 filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 462 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants Motion to Preclude Dr. Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions along with Exhibits 1-3 and 5 by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 461 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Motion to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants Motion to Preclude Dr. Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions along with Exhibits 1-3 and 5 (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 460 Opposition to 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 459 Opposition to 340 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone (Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 27, 2012 458 Memorandum in Support re 457 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker along with Exhibits 1-5, 7-8, and 10-11 filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 457 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker along with Exhibits 1-5, 7-8, and 10-11 by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 456 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Motion to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker along with Exhibits 1-5, 7-8, and 10-11 (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 455 Opposition to 307 MOTION in Limine #5 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Damages Against AOL Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Target Corporation filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 454 Memorandum in Support re 453 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #5 along with Exhibits 1 and 2 filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 453 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #5 along with Exhibits 1 and 2 by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 452 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Motion to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #5 along with Exhibits 1 and 2 (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 451 Opposition to 305 MOTION in Limine #4 to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Evidence or Argument Relating to Defendants' Conduct During Discovery or to Google's Unproduced Licenses filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 450 Memorandum in Support re 449 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #4 along with Exhibits 1 and 2 filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 449 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #4 along with Exhibits 1 and 2 by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 448 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Motion to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #4 along with Exhibits 1 and 2 (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 447 Opposition to 303 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Materials Related to Historical Click-Through Rate filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 446 Memorandum in Support re 445 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #3 along with Exhibits 3-11 filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 445 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #3 along with Exhibits 3-11 by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 444 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Motion to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #3 along with Exhibits 3-11 (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 443 Opposition to 301 MOTION in Limine #2 to Exclude Evidence of Entire Market Value of Accused Products and of Defendants' Size, Wealth and Overall Revenues filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 442 Memorandum in Support re 441 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #2 along with Exhibits 1 and 2 filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 441 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #2 along with Exhibits 1 and 2 by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 440 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Motion to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #2 along with Exhibits 1 and 2 (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 439 Opposition to 299 MOTION in Limine #1 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Willful Infringement, Pre-Suit Knowledge, or Copying filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 438 Declaration re 433 Opposition, 432 Opposition, 434 Opposition, of Margaret P. Kammerud in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Noona, Stephen)
September 27, 2012 437 Memorandum in Support re 436 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #1 along with Exhibits 5-6 and 11-12 filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 436 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #1 along with Exhibits 5-6 and 11-12 by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 435 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Motion to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine #1 along with Exhibits 5-6 and 11-12 (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2012 434 Opposition to 335 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion in Limine to Exclude Improper Prior Art Evidence filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 27, 2012 433 Opposition to 333 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion in Limine to Preclude Non-Comparable License Agreements (Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 27, 2012 432 Opposition to 314 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence (Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 27, 2012 431 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 429 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to (Noona, Stephen)
September 27, 2012 430 Memorandum in Support re 429 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 27, 2012 429 MOTION to Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence; (2) Portions of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff I/P Engine's Second Motion in Limine to Preclude License Agreements, and (3) Exhibits E and K to the Declaration of Margaret P. Kammerud in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 27, 2012 428 Featured Case ORDER, AGREED re. 412 Motion to Amend/Correct Motion 346 to Close the Courtroom. The Scheduling Order is modified as follows: 1. Scheduling Order is hereby modified to include the following deadlines for the briefing of Defendants' Motion to Close Courtroom (Dkt. No. 346): Plaintiff shall file its response to the Defendants' Motion to Close Courtroom on or before October 1,2012; and Defendant shall file its Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to CloseCourtroom on or before October 4,2012.2. Modification of the Scheduling Order shall not adjust the other dates set forth in the Scheduling Order, including, without limitation, the trial date. Entered and filed 9/27/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 9/27/12). (ecav, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2012: # 1 Letter) (ecav, ).
September 26, 2012 427 Opposition to 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2-8 (Filed Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit 9, # 4 Exhibit 10, # 5 Exhibit 11-19 (Filed Under Seal), # 6 Exhibit 20, # 7 Exhibit 21, # 8 Exhibit 22-24 (Filed Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit 25, # 10 Exhibit 26, # 11 Exhibit 27-32 (Filed Under Seal), # 12 Exhibit 33, # 13 Exhibit 34-39 (Filed Under Seal), # 14 Exhibit 40, # 15 Exhibit 41, # 16 Exhibit 42, # 17 Exhibit 43, # 18 Exhibit 44, # 19 Exhibit 45 (Filed Under Seal), # 20 Exhibit 46, # 21 Exhibit 47, # 22 Exhibit 48, # 23 Exhibit 49, # 24 Exhibit 50, # 25 Exhibit 51, # 26 Exhibit 52, # 27 Exhibit 53-54 (Filed Under Seal), # 28 Exhibit 55, # 29 Exhibit 56 (Filed Under Seal))(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2012 426 Memorandum in Support re 425 MOTION to Seal its Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment along with Exhibits 8, 11-19, 22-24, 27-32, 34-39, 45, 53-54, 56 filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2012 425 MOTION to Seal its Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment along with Exhibits 8, 11-19, 22-24, 27-32, 34-39, 45, 53-54, 56 by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2012 424 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Motion to Seal its Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment along with Exhibits 8, 11-19, 22-24, 27-32, 34-39, 45, 53-54, 56 (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2012 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: F. Bradford Stillman. 412 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 346 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial Joint Motion and Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion To Amend/Modify Scheduling Order to Provide BriefJoint MOTION to Amend/Correct 346 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial Joint Motion and Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion To Amend/Modify Scheduling Order to Provide Brief (ecav, )
September 25, 2012 423 Sealed Exhibit 1 re 357 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff I/P Engines Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungars New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction by I/P Engine, Inc. (ecav)
September 25, 2012 422 Sealed Exhibit 2 re 340 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone. (ecav, )
September 25, 2012 421 Sealed Exhibit 1 re 340 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone. (ecav, ) (ecav, ).
September 25, 2012 420 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s 340 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone. (ecav, )
September 25, 2012 419 Sealed Exhibit 2 re 333 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion in Limine to Preclude Non-Comparable License Agreements. (ecav, )
September 25, 2012 418 Sealed Exhibit 1 re. 333 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion in Limine to Preclude Non-Comparable License Agreements. (ecav)
September 25, 2012 417 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second 333 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion in Limine to Preclude Non-Comparable License Agreements. (ecav, )
September 25, 2012 416 Sealed Exhibit 3 re. Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s First 314 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence. (ecav)
September 25, 2012 415 Sealed Opposition to Google and IAC's 125 MOTION to Seal Motion to Seal I/P Engine's Opposition to Google and IAC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions Along with Exhibits 11, 12, 14, 15, 18, 21, and 22 in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(ecav, )
September 25, 2012 414 Sealed Declaration of Michael Hochberg in Support of Plaintiff's and Defendants' 343 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Declaration of Michael Hochberg in Support of Plaintiff's and Defendants' Motions to Seal. (ecav, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2012: # 1 Letter) (ecav, ).
September 25, 2012 413 MOTION to Expedite and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Dismiss ((Dkt. No. 293)) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 25, 2012 412 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 346 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial Joint Motion and Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion To Amend/Modify Scheduling Order to Provide Briefing Schedule for Motion to Seal and Close Courtroom (Dkt. No. 346) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., I/P Engine, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 24, 2012 411 Sealed Letter re 406 Sealed Document, 408 Sealed Document, 410 Sealed Document, 409 Sealed Document, 404 Sealed Document, 407 Sealed Document, 405 Sealed Document,. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 410 Sealed Exhibit 22 re 125 MOTION to Seal Motion to Seal I/P Engine's Opposition to Google and IAC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions Along with Exhibits 11, 12, 14, 15, 18, 21, and 22 in Support. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 409 Sealed Exhibit 21 re 125 MOTION to Seal Motion to Seal I/P Engine's Opposition to Google and IAC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions Along with Exhibits 11, 12, 14, 15, 18, 21, and 22 in Support. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 408 Sealed Exhibit 18 re 125 MOTION to Seal Motion to Seal I/P Engine's Opposition to Google and IAC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions Along with Exhibits 11, 12, 14, 15, 18, 21, and 22 in Support. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 407 Sealed Exhibit 15 re. 125 MOTION to Seal Motion to Seal I/P Engine's Opposition to Google and IAC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions Along with Exhibits 11, 12, 14, 15, 18, 21, and 22 in Support. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 406 Sealed Exhibit 14 re. 125 MOTION to Seal Motion to Seal I/P Engine's Opposition to Google and IAC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions Along with Exhibits 11, 12, 14, 15, 18, 21, and 22 in Support. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 405 Sealed Exhibit 12 re 125 MOTION to Seal Motion to Seal I/P Engine's Opposition to Google and IAC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions Along with Exhibits 11, 12, 14, 15, 18, 21, and 22 in Support. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 404 Sealed Exhibit 11 re 125 MOTION to Seal Motion to Seal I/P Engine's Opposition to Google and IAC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions Along with Exhibits 11, 12, 14, 15, 18, 21, and 22 in Support. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 403 Sealed Letter re 324 MOTION to Seal >Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect, 296 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Matters Related to Historical Click-Through Rate, and Exhibits F, H, I and J to the Declaration of Joshua, 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 402 Sealed Declaration of Nicholas Fox in Support of Defendants' 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav)
September 24, 2012 401 Sealed Declaration of Bartholomew Furrow in Support of Defendants' 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 400 Sealed Exhibit 15 to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Defendants' 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 399 Sealed Exhibit 14 to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Defendants' 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 398 Sealed Exhibit 13 to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Defendants' 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 397 Sealed Exhibit 12 to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Defendants' 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 396 Sealed to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Defendants' 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 395 Sealed to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Defendants' 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 394 Sealed Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Defendants' 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 393 Sealed Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Defendants' 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 392 Sealed Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Defendants' 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 391 Sealed Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Defendants' 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 390 Sealed Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Defendants' 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 389 Sealed Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Defendants' 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 388 Sealed Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Defendants' 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 387 Sealed Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Defendants' 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 386 Sealed Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 385 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Defendants' 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 384 Sealed Exhibit J to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Defendants' 296 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Matters Related to Historical Click-Through Rate, and Exhibits F, H, I and J to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 383 Sealed Exhibit I to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Defendants' 296 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Matters Related to Historical Click-Through Rate, and Exhibits F, H, I and J to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 382 Sealed Exhibit H to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Defendants' 296 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Matters Related to Historical Click-Through Rate, and Exhibits F, H, I and J to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 381 Sealed Exhibit F to the Declaration of Josuan L. Sohn in Support of 296 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Matters Related to Historical Click-Through Rate, and Exhibits F, H, I and J to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 380 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine 3 re 296 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Matters Related to Historical Click-Through Rate, and Exhibits F, H, I and J to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 379 Sealed Exhibit H to the Declaration of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' 324 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 378 Sealed Exhibit G to the Declaration of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' 324 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 377 Sealed Exhibit B to the Declaration of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' 324 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 376 Sealed Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendant's 324 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 375 Sealed Defendants' Memorandum in Support of 324 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect. (ecav, )
September 24, 2012 358 Memorandum in Support re 357 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff I/P Engines Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungars New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2012 357 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff I/P Engines Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungars New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2012 356 Memorandum in Support re 355 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1 to its Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engines Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungars New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2012 355 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1 to its Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engines Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungars New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2012 354 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Motion to Seal Exhibit 1 to its Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engines Daubert Motion, and Fourth Motion in Limine, to Exclude Lyle Ungars New Theory of Invalidity and Opinions Regarding Claim Construction (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2012 353 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 346 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial of Filing of Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 24, 2012 352 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 346 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial (Noona, Stephen)
September 24, 2012 351 Declaration re 347 Memorandum in Support, of James Maccoun in Support of Defendants' Motion to Seal by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 24, 2012 350 Declaration re 347 Memorandum in Support, of Danielle Romain in Support of Defendants' Motion to Seal by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 24, 2012 349 Declaration re 347 Memorandum in Support, of Michael Hochberg in Support of Plaintiff's and Defendants' Motions to Seal (Public Version) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 24, 2012 348 Declaration re 347 Memorandum in Support, of Margaret P. Kammerud in Support of Defendants' Motion to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Noona, Stephen)
September 24, 2012 347 Memorandum in Support re 346 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 24, 2012 346 MOTION to Seal Documents and Close the Courtroom During Presentation of Confidential Material at Trial by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 24, 2012 345 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 343 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Declaration of Michael Hochberg in Support of Plaintiff's and Defendants' Motions to Seal (Noona, Stephen)
September 24, 2012 344 Memorandum in Support re 343 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Declaration of Michael Hochberg in Support of Plaintiff's and Defendants' Motions to Seal filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 24, 2012 343 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Declaration of Michael Hochberg in Support of Plaintiff's and Defendants' Motions to Seal by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 374 Sealed Letter re 372 Sealed Document, 371 Sealed Document, 368 Sealed Document, 373 Sealed Document, 369 Sealed Document, 370 Sealed Document. (ecav, )
September 21, 2012 373 Sealed Exhibit 7 re THIRD 285 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 1, 4, 5, 6, 7, in support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7 Part 2)(ecav, )
September 21, 2012 372 Sealed Exhibit 6 re THIRD 285 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 1, 4, 5, 6, 7, in support. (ecav, )
September 21, 2012 371 Sealed Exhibit 5 re THIRD 285 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 1, 4, 5, 6, 7, in support. (ecav, )
September 21, 2012 370 Sealed Exhibit 4 re THIRD 285 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 1, 4, 5, 6, 7, in support. (ecav, )
September 21, 2012 369 Sealed Exhibit 1 re THIRD 285 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 1, 4, 5, 6, 7, in support. (ecav, )
September 21, 2012 368 Sealed Memorandum in Support of THIRD 285 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 1, 4, 5, 6, 7, in support. (ecav, )
September 21, 2012 367 Sealed Cover Letter re 359 Sealed Document, 342 Sealed Document, 366 Sealed Document, 363 Sealed Document, 365 Sealed Document, 361 Sealed Document, 364 Sealed Document, 362 Sealed Document, 360 Sealed Document. (ecav, )
September 21, 2012 366 Sealed Exhibit 14 re SECOND 280 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 13, and 14 in support. (ecav, )
September 21, 2012 365 Sealed Exhibit 13 re SECOND 280 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 13, and 14 in support. (ecav, )
September 21, 2012 364 Sealed Exhibit 9 re SECOND 280 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 13, and 14 in support. (ecav, )
September 21, 2012 363 Sealed Exhibit 8 re SECOND 280 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 13, and 14 in support. (ecav, )
September 21, 2012 362 Sealed Exhibit 7 re SECOND 280 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 13, and 14 in support. (ecav, )
September 21, 2012 361 Sealed Exhibit 5 re SECOND 280 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 13, and 14 in support. (ecav, )
September 21, 2012 360 Sealed Exhibit 4 re SECOND 280 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 13, and 14 in support. (ecav)
September 21, 2012 359 Sealed Exhibit 2 re SECOND 280 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 13, and 14 in support. (ecav)
September 21, 2012 342 Sealed Memorandum in Support of SECOND 280 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 13, and 14 in support. (ecav)
September 21, 2012 341 Memorandum in Support re 340 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 340 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 339 Memorandum in Support re 338 MOTION to Seal the Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone along with Exhibits 1 and 2 filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 338 MOTION to Seal the Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keith R. Ugone along with Exhibits 1 and 2 by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 337 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Motion to Seal the Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Keither R. Ugone along with Exhibits 1 and 2 (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 336 Memorandum in Support re 335 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion in Limine to Exclude Improper Prior Art Evidence filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 335 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion in Limine to Exclude Improper Prior Art Evidence by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 334 Memorandum in Support re 333 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion in Limine to Preclude Non-Comparable License Agreements filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 333 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion in Limine to Preclude Non-Comparable License Agreements by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 332 Memorandum in Support re 331 MOTION to Seal the Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion in Limine to Preclude Non-Comparable License Agreements along with Exhibits 1 and 2 filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 331 MOTION to Seal the Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion in Limine to Preclude Non-Comparable License Agreements along with Exhibits 1 and 2 by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 330 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Motion to Seal the Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion in Limine to Preclude Non-Comparable License Agreements along with Exhibits 1 and 2 (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 329 Declaration re 327 MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect of Jennifer Ghaussy by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 328 Memorandum in Support re 327 MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect (Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 327 MOTION to Exclude (Preclude) Dr. Ophir Frieder From Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 326 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 324 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorr (Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 325 Memorandum in Support re 324 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorr filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 324 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Preclude Dr. Ophir Frieder from Testifying Regarding Untimely Opinions that were Not Disclosed in his Original Expert Report and Opinions that he Now Concedes are Incorrect, and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 323 Declaration re 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker of Emily C. O'Brien by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 322 Declaration re 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker of Bartholomew Furrow (Public Version) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 321 Declaration re 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker of Nicholas Fox (Public Version) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 320 Memorandum in Support re 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker (Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 319 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen L. Becker by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 318 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof (Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 317 Memorandum in Support re 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 316 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony from Stephen L. Becker and Certain Materials Filed in Support Thereof by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 315 Memorandum in Support re 314 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 314 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 313 Memorandum in Support re 312 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 3 to the Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 312 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 3 to the Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 311 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. of Motion to Seal Exhibit 3 to the Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine's First Motion in Limine to Exclude Inadmissible Evidence (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 310 Declaration re 307 MOTION in Limine #5 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Damages Against AOL Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Target Corporation, 301 MOTION in Limine #2 to Exclude Evidence of Entire Market Value of Accused Products and of Defendants' Size, Wealth and Overall Revenues, 303 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Materials Related to Historical Click-Through Rate, 305 MOTION in Limine #4 to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Evidence or Argument Relating to Defendants' Conduct During Discovery or to Google's Unproduced Licenses, 299 MOTION in Limine #1 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Willful Infringement, Pre-Suit Knowledge, or Copying of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Defendants' Motions in Limine by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 309 Memorandum in Support re 277 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 308 Memorandum in Support re 307 MOTION in Limine #5 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Damages Against AOL Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Target Corporation filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 307 MOTION in Limine #5 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Damages Against AOL Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Target Corporation by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 306 Memorandum in Support re 305 MOTION in Limine #4 to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Evidence or Argument Relating to Defendants' Conduct During Discovery or to Google's Unproduced Licenses filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 305 MOTION in Limine #4 to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Evidence or Argument Relating to Defendants' Conduct During Discovery or to Google's Unproduced Licenses by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 304 Memorandum in Support re 303 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Materials Related to Historical Click-Through Rate (Public Version) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 303 MOTION in Limine #3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Materials Related to Historical Click-Through Rate by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 302 Memorandum in Support re 301 MOTION in Limine #2 to Exclude Evidence of Entire Market Value of Accused Products and of Defendants' Size, Wealth and Overall Revenues filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 301 MOTION in Limine #2 to Exclude Evidence of Entire Market Value of Accused Products and of Defendants' Size, Wealth and Overall Revenues by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 300 Memorandum in Support re 299 MOTION in Limine #1 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Willful Infringement, Pre-Suit Knowledge, or Copying filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 299 MOTION in Limine #1 to Preclude Plaintiff From Introducing Evidence of Willful Infringement, Pre-Suit Knowledge, or Copying by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 298 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 296 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Matters Related to Historical Click-Through Rate, and Exhibits F, H, I and J to the Declaration of Joshua (Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 297 Memorandum in Support re 296 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Matters Related to Historical Click-Through Rate, and Exhibits F, H, I and J to the Declaration of Joshua filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 296 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Marketing and High-Level Non-Technical Matters Related to Historical Click-Through Rate, and Exhibits F, H, I and J to the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of the Defendants' Various Motions in Limine by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 295 Declaration re 294 Memorandum in Support, of Margaret P. Kammerud in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss All Claims Against AOL Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Target Corporation by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 294 Memorandum in Support re 293 MOTION to Dismiss all Claims Against AOL Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Target Corporation filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 293 MOTION to Dismiss all Claims Against AOL Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. and Target Corporation by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 21, 2012 292 TRANSCRIPT HEARING ON MOTIONS for date of 09-18-2012, before Judge F. Bradford Stillman, Court Reporter/Transcriber Gloria Smith, Telephone number 757-222-7074. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 10/22/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2012.(smith, gloria)
September 21, 2012 291 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 287 Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule. The two underlying motions for discovery sanctions were filed the same day (ECF No. 277, 282). The defendants shall file responsive briefs to the plaintiff's motions for discovery sanctions (ECF Nos. 277, 282) on or before October 1, 2012. The plaintiff shall file its rebuttal briefs, if any, on or before 5:00 p.m. on October 4, 2012. A courtesy copy of the briefs and any exhibits, including those submitted for filing under seal, shall be delivered to the chambers of the Honorable Raymond A. Jackson, United StatesDistrict Judge, and to the United States Magistrate Judge co-assignedto this case no later than 9:00 a.m. the morning after filing via CM/ECF. Entered and filed 9/21/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 9/21/12. (ecav, )
September 21, 2012 290 Featured Case ORDER, AGREED on 276 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Modifications of the Scheduling Order the pretrial process and shall not adjust the other dates set forth in the Scheduling Order, including, without limitation, the trial date. (See Order for Specifics and Modifications). Entered and filed 9/21/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 9/21/12). (Attachments: # 1 Letter) (ecav)
September 21, 2012 289 MOTION to Seal [CORRECTED MOTION] Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 1, 4, 5, 6, 7, in support by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 288 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. re 283 Memorandum in Support, [CORRECTED NOTICE] of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 1, 4, 5, 6, 7, in support (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 287 MOTION to Expedite Motion and Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Shorten Defendants' Time to Respond to I/P Engine's Second and Third Motions for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 286 Memorandum in Support re 285 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 1, 4, 5, 6, 7, in support filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 285 MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 1, 4, 5, 6, 7, in support by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 284 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. re 283 Memorandum in Support, of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 1, 4, 5, 6, 7, in support (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 283 Memorandum in Support re 282 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 282 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Third Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 281 Memorandum in Support re 280 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 13, and 14 in support filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 280 MOTION to Seal Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 13, and 14 in support by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 279 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. re 278 Memorandum in Support,, of Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses along with Exhibits 2, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 13, and 14 in support (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 278 Memorandum in Support re 277 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 277 MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Second Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Discovery Responses by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2012 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: F. Bradford Stillman. 276 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 90 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 90 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (ecav, )
September 20, 2012 276 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 90 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., I/P Engine, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 18, 2012 275 Featured Case ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 200 Motion for Discovery Sanctions, as stated on the record at the Motions Hearing on 9/18/12; GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendant Google Inc.'s 209 Motion to Compel, with respect to relief to four categories of documents contained within the original motion that are DENIED as MOOT, as outlined in this Order. Within three days of the date of this Order, the plaintiff shall produce certain documents provided to potential investors by Innovate/Protect, Inc., the plaintiff's parent company, to the defendant with financial information redacted, as stated on the record at the Motions Hearing held on 9/18/12. The parties shall each bear their own expenses with respect to these motions. (See Order for Specifics) Entered and filed 9/18/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 9/18/12). (ecav, )
September 18, 2012 274 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman:Motion Hearing held on 9/18/2012 re 209 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff To Produce Documents filed by Google Inc., 200 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Disclosed Prior Art filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. Present on behalf of the plaintiffs were Donald Schultz, Kenneth Brothers and Jeffrey Sherwood. Steve Noona and David Perlson were present on behalf of the defendants. Mr. Sherwood argued the motion for sanctions and Mr. Perlson responded. The Court made rulings on the record. The motion was DENIED. The parties then moved on to the motion to compel. The parties had previously resolved some of the issues in the motion. Mr. Perlson argued the motion and Mr. Sherwood responded. The Court made rulings on the record. The Court then inquired as to the pending motions to seal in the case. The parties were directed to submit to chambers an agreed order regarding the sealing of documents in the case by Monday, September 24, 2012 at noon. The Court will enter an order with regard to the two motions that were argued in open court. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Gloria Smith, OCR.)(cdod, )
September 18, 2012 273 Featured Case ORDER granting 272 Motion for Pro hac vice appearance. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on September 18, 2012. (Jackson, Raymond) Modified on 9/18/2012 to link gavel order to corrected Pro Hac Vice Order 272 filed by counsel as outlined in the Notice of Correction done by clerk on 9/18/12. Doc 272 took the place of Doc. 268 (ecav).
September 18, 2012 272 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Ryerson and Certification of Local Counsel Donald C. Schultz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3208296. by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Schultz, Donald)
September 18, 2012 271 Featured Case ORDER granting 267 Motion for Pro hac vice appearance. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on September 18, 2012.
September 18, 2012 270 Featured Case ORDER granting 249 Motion for Pro hac vice appearance. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on September 18, 2012.
September 18, 2012 Notice of Correction re 268 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Ryerson and Certification of Local Counsel Donald C. Schultz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3206773. Pro Hac Vice Motion does not contain the following: Bar Identification Number, applicants signature and signature of counsel. Clerk is removing Doc. 268 form the docket text and counsel is to refile completed Pro Hac Vic Motion. (ecav, )
September 18, 2012 269 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 247 Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery Sanctions, filed by the defendants on September 14, 2012. ECF No. 247.For good cause shown, the motion is GRANTED. The Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery Sanctions (ECF No. 247 attach. 1) and the Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn in Support of Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery Sanctions (ECF No. 247 attach. 2) shall be DEEMED FILED. Entered and filed 9/18/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 9/18/12). (ecav, )
September 17, 2012 268 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Ryerson and Certification of Local Counsel Donald C. Schultz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3206773. by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Schultz, Donald)
September 17, 2012 267 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Katie Scott and Certification of Local Counsel Donald C. Schultz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3205772. by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Schultz, Donald)
September 15, 2012 249 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Wilson and Certification of Local Counsel Steohen E. Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3204766. by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 14, 2012 248 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation Notice Pursuant To 35 U.S.C. § 282 (Noona, Stephen)
September 14, 2012 247 MOTION for Leave to File and Memorandum In Support of Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Brief In Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Discovery Sanctions and Declaration Of Joshua L. Sohn In Support Of Defendants Supplemental Brief In Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion For Discovery Sanctions by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Noona, Stephen)
September 13, 2012 266 Sealed Exhibit 31 to Declaration of Howard Chen re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment (ecav, )
September 13, 2012 265 Sealed Exhibit 30 to Declaration of Howard Chen re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 13, 2012 264 Sealed Exhibit 29 to Declaration of Howard Chen re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 13, 2012 263 Sealed Exhibit 28 to Declaration of Howard Chen re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 13, 2012 262 Sealed Exhibit 27 to Declaration of Howard Chen re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 13, 2012 261 Sealed Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Howard Chen re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 13, 2012 260 Sealed Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Howard Chen re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 13, 2012 259 Sealed Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Howard Chen re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 13, 2012 258 Sealed Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Howard Chen re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 13, 2012 257 Sealed Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Howard Chen re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 13, 2012 256 Sealed Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Howard Chen re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 13, 2012 255 Sealed Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Howard Chen re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 13, 2012 254 Sealed Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Howard Chen re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 13, 2012 253 Sealed Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Howard Chen re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav, )
September 13, 2012 252 Sealed Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Howard Chen re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav)
September 13, 2012 251 Sealed Declaration of Bartholomew Furrow re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment (ecav)
September 13, 2012 250 Sealed Memorandum in Support re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ecav (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2012: # 1 Letter) (ecav, ).
September 13, 2012 246 Featured Case ORDER, AGREED. GRANTING 243 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order in this matter, as outlined in this Order. Entered and filed 9/13/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 9/13/12). (Attachments: # 1 Letter) (ecav, )
September 13, 2012 245 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 226 MOTION to Seal Portions of Google Inc.'s Reply Brief in Support of Google's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Documents filed by Google Inc., 214 MOTION to Seal Portions Of Defendants Brief In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Discovery Sanctions And Various Exhibits To The Declaration Of Emily OBrien In Support Thereof filed by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation, Gannett Company, Inc., 181 MOTION to Seal Exhibit P to the Declaration of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(1) Depositions MOTION to Seal Exhibit P to the Declaration of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(1) Depositions filed by Google Inc., AOL Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation, Gannett Company, Inc., 136 MOTION to Seal Portions of Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel and Exhibits AA and BB to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of the Reply filed by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., 125 MOTION to Seal I/P Engine's Opposition to Google and IAC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions Along with Exhibits 11, 12, 14, 15, 18, 21, and 22 in Support filed by I/P Engine, Inc., 115 MOTION to Seal I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Exhibits 15, 16, 17, 18, and 21 of IP Engine's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc.'s Custodial Document Production filed by I/P Engine, Inc., 206 MOTION to Seal Portions Of Google Inc.s Brief In Support Of Motion To Compel And Various Exhibits To The Declaration Of Jen Ghaussy in Support Thereof filed by Google Inc. Accordingly, the Court will ORDER the parties to SHOW CAUSE why the specified materials should not be unsealed and filed in the public record. As outlined in this Order, the Court ORDERS the parties to SHOW CAUSE why the materials described above should not be unsealed and filed in the public record. The parties are DIRECTED to appear before the Court on 9/18/12, at 12:00 noon to identify, on the record, any and all reasons why these materials should be filed under seal rather than in the public record of this case. The Court notes that a hearing on certain discovery motions in this case is already scheduled for that date and time. In the interim, the Clerk shall continue to maintain the materials under seal. (See Order for Specifics) Entered and filed 9/13/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 9/13/12). (ecav, )
September 13, 2012 244 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 234 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Exhibits 4-9, 21-22, and 25-31 to the Declaration of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and the Declaration of Bartholomew Furrow in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, filed on 9/12/12, by Google Inc., AOL Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation, Gannett Company, Inc. As outlined in this Order, the Court finds the stated basis for sealing these materilas to be manifestly insufficient to justify filing of these materials under seal. Accordingly, the Court will ORDER the parties to SHOW CAUSE why the specified materials should not be unsealed and filed in the public record. The parties are DIRECTED to appear before the Court on 9/18/12, at 12:00 noon to identify, on the record, any and all reasons why these materials should be filed under seal rather than in the public record of this case, as outlined in this order. The Court notes that a hearing on certain discovery motions in this case is already scheduled for that date and time. IN the interim, the Clerk shall continue to maintain the materials under seal (See Order for Specifics) Entered and filed 9/13/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 9/13/12). (ecav)
September 12, 2012 243 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 90 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order by Defendants and by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schultz, Donald)
September 12, 2012 242 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 236 NOTICE, 235 Memorandum in Support, 234 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Exhibits 4-9, 21-22, and 25-31 to the Declaration of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and the Declaration o of Filing of Amended Certificates of Service (Noona, Stephen)
September 12, 2012 241 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 238 Memorandum in Support, of Filing of Additional Exhibits to the Declaration of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17, # 2 Exhibit 18, # 3 Exhibit 19, # 4 Exhibit 20, # 5 Exhibit 21, # 6 Exhibit 22, # 7 Exhibit 23, # 8 Exhibit 24, # 9 Exhibit 25, # 10 Exhibit 26, # 11 Exhibit 27, # 12 Exhibit 28, # 13 Exhibit 29, # 14 Exhibit 30, # 15 Exhibit 31, # 16 Exhibit 32, # 17 Exhibit 33)(Noona, Stephen)
September 12, 2012 240 Declaration re 238 Memorandum in Support, of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Noona, Stephen)
September 12, 2012 239 Declaration re 238 Memorandum in Support, of Bartholomew Furrow in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Public Version) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 12, 2012 238 Memorandum in Support re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 12, 2012 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., and Target Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 12, 2012 236 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 234 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Exhibits 4-9, 21-22, and 25-31 to the Declaration of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and the Declaration o (Noona, Stephen)
September 12, 2012 235 Memorandum in Support re 234 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Exhibits 4-9, 21-22, and 25-31 to the Declaration of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and the Declaration o filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 12, 2012 234 MOTION to Seal Portions of the Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Exhibits 4-9, 21-22, and 25-31 to the Declaration of Howard Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and the Declaration of Bartholomew Furrow in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 12, 2012 Motion Hearing (#200, 209) set for 9/18/2012 at 12:00 PM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman. (lwoo)
September 11, 2012 Telephone Conference held on 9/11/2012 held before Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman. (lwoo)
September 11, 2012 233 Featured Case ORDER granting 231 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on September 11, 2012.
September 10, 2012 Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 9/11/2012 at 11:30 AM in Newport News Chambers before Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman. (lwoo)
September 7, 2012 Reset Hearings (time corrected): Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2012 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman. (ptom)
September 5, 2012 232 Sealed Reply Brief in Support of Google's 209 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff To Produce Documents. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(ecav, )
September 5, 2012 231 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David A. Nelson and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen E. Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3188423. by Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
September 4, 2012 230 Declaration re 229 Reply to Response to Motion of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Google's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Documents by Google Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
September 4, 2012 229 REPLY to Response to Motion re 209 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff To Produce Documents (Public Version) filed by Google Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
September 4, 2012 228 NOTICE by Google Inc. re 226 MOTION to Seal Portions of Google Inc.'s Reply Brief in Support of Google's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Documents (Noona, Stephen)
September 4, 2012 227 Memorandum in Support re 226 MOTION to Seal Portions of Google Inc.'s Reply Brief in Support of Google's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Documents filed by Google Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
September 4, 2012 226 MOTION to Seal Portions of Google Inc.'s Reply Brief in Support of Google's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Documents by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
September 4, 2012 Reset Telephone Conference for 9/11/2012 at 11:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman. (lwoo)
September 4, 2012 225 Featured Case ORDER granting 224 Motion for Extension of Page Limit for Breiefing Summary Judgemnt Motion. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on September 4, 2012. )
September 4, 2012 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: F. Bradford Stillman. 214 MOTION to Seal Portions Of Defendants Brief In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Discovery Sanctions And Various Exhibits To The Declaration Of Emily OBrien In Support Thereof. (ecav, )
August 30, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings Telephone Conference set for 9/6/2012 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman. (afor, )
August 30, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings Telephone Conference set for 8/30/2012 at 02:30 PM in Newport News Chambers before Magistrate Judge Tommy E. Miller. (afor, )
August 29, 2012 224 Consent MOTION for Extension and Memorandum in Support of Consent Motion for Extension of Page Limit for Briefing Summary Judgment Motion by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
August 28, 2012 223 Opposition to 209 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff To Produce Documents filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2012 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: F. Bradford Stillman. 200 MOTION for Sanctions for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Disclosed Prior Art, by I/P Engine, INc. (ecav, )
August 23, 2012 222 Reply to Motion re 200 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Disclosed Prior Art filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
August 22, 2012 221 Featured Case ORDER granting 219 Motion for Sarah Agudo to appear Pro hac vice for Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. Entered and filed 8/22/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 8/22/12). (ecav, )
August 20, 2012 220 Sealed Opposition to Plaintiff's 200 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Disclosed Prior Art. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M, # 2 Exhibit N, # 3 Letter)(ecav, )
August 20, 2012 219 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Agudo and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen E. Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3167771. by Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
August 17, 2012 218 Declaration re 217 Opposition Of Emily O'Brien In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Discovery Sanctions by Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Noona, Stephen)
August 17, 2012 217 Opposition to 200 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Disclosed Prior Art (Public Version) filed by Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
August 17, 2012 216 NOTICE by Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 214 MOTION to Seal Motion To Seal Portions Of Defendants Brief In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Discovery Sanctions And Various Exhibits To The Declaration Of Emily OBrien In Support Thereof (Noona, Stephen)
August 17, 2012 215 Memorandum in Support re 214 MOTION to Seal Motion To Seal Portions Of Defendants Brief In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Discovery Sanctions And Various Exhibits To The Declaration Of Emily OBrien In Support Thereof filed by Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
August 17, 2012 214 MOTION to Seal Motion To Seal Portions Of Defendants Brief In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Discovery Sanctions And Various Exhibits To The Declaration Of Emily OBrien In Support Thereof by Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
August 16, 2012 212 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 175 Motion for Reconsideration in Part of the Court's Claim Construction Order. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the term "collaborative feedback data" as it appears in Claims 10 and 25 of the '420 patent be defined as "data from system users with similar interests or needs regarding what informons such users found to be relevant." IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the meaning of the term "[feedback system for] receiving information found to be relevant to the query by other users" is apparent from the claim language itself. (See Order for Specifics) Entered and filed 8/16/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 8/16/12). (ecav, )
August 15, 2012 213 Sealed Brief in Support of Defendants' 209 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff To Produce Documents. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit H, # 5 Exhibit I, # 6 Exhibit J, # 7 Exhibit K, # 8 Exhibit L, # 9 Exhibit M, # 10 Exhibit N Part 1, # 11 Exhibit N Part 2, # 12 Exhibit N Part 3, # 13 Exhibit P, # 14 Exhibit Q, # 15 Exhibit R, # 16 Exhibit S, # 17 Exhibit T, # 18 Exhibit U)(ecav, )
August 14, 2012 211 Declaration re 210 Brief in Support of Jen Ghaussy in Support of Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Documents by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U)(Noona, Stephen)
August 14, 2012 210 Brief in Support to 209 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff To Produce Documents (Public Version) filed by Google Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
August 14, 2012 209 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff To Produce Documents by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
August 14, 2012 208 NOTICE by Google Inc. re 206 MOTION to Seal Portions Of Google Inc.s Brief In Support Of Motion To Compel And Various Exhibits To The Declaration Of Jen Ghaussy in Support Thereof (Noona, Stephen)
August 14, 2012 207 Memorandum in Support re 206 MOTION to Seal Portions Of Google Inc.s Brief In Support Of Motion To Compel And Various Exhibits To The Declaration Of Jen Ghaussy in Support Thereof filed by Google Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
August 14, 2012 206 MOTION to Seal Portions Of Google Inc.s Brief In Support Of Motion To Compel And Various Exhibits To The Declaration Of Jen Ghaussy in Support Thereof by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
August 14, 2012 205 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 204 Motion for Krista Carter to appear Pro hac vice on behalf of I/P Engine, Inc. Entered and filed 8/14/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 8/14/12). (ecav, )
August 13, 2012 204 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Krista Carter and Certification of Local Counsel W. Ryan Snow Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3158724. by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Snow, W. Ryan)
August 6, 2012 203 Featured Case AGREED DISMISSAL ORDER AS TO CERTAIN CLAIMS. It is hereby ORDERED that (1) the patent infringement claims in this case as to Google Search and IAC's Ask Sponsored Listings are dismissed with prejudice; and (2) the Motion for Sanctions (D.I. 189) is withdrawn without prejudice to the right to renew the motion in the future. Entered and filed 8/6/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 8/6/12). (ecav, )
August 6, 2012 202 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice of I/P Engine's Claims Relating to AOL's Advertising.com Sponsored Listings by AOL Inc., I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2012 201 Memorandum in Support re 200 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Disclosed Prior Art filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2012 200 MOTION for Sanctions Motion for Discovery Sanctions Regarding Untimely Disclosed Prior Art by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2012 Notice of Correction re 198 Stipulation. The clerk has removed Doc. 198 titled "Stipulation", due to the fact that this filing is not a Stipulation - it is an Order and proposed orders, per ECF guidelines, are to be attached to pleadings and not filed separately. Counsel is advised that Doc 198 is to be provided on paper, for the Judge's consideration. (ecav, )
August 2, 2012 199 Withdrawal of Motion by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. re 189 MOTION for Sanctions for I/P Engine's Violation of May 2, 2012 Court Order (Without Prejudice) (Noona, Stephen)
August 2, 2012 198 STIPULATION by Google Inc., I/P Engine, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2012 197 RESPONSE in Opposition re 189 MOTION for Sanctions for I/P Engine's Violation of May 2, 2012 Court Order filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2012 196 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.s Updated Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2012 195 Request for Hearing by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 175 MOTION for Reconsideration re 171 Memorandum Opinion, in Part of Claim Construction Order MOTION for Reconsideration re 171 Memorandum Opinion, in Part of Claim Construction Order (Noona, Stephen)
July 26, 2012 194 Featured Case ORDER DENYING AND FINDING AS MOOT and PREMATURE Plaintiff's 177 Motion to Take Deposition, as outlined in this Order. (See Order for Specifics) Entered and filed 7/26/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 7/26/12). (ecav, )
July 18, 2012 193 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING CONSENT 192 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order with Respect to Expert Disclosure Dates. Entered 7/17/12 and filed 7/18/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 7/17/12). (Attachments: # 1 Letter) (ecav, )
July 16, 2012 192 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order with Respect to Expert Disclosure Dates and Memorandum in Support of Consent Motion by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Snow, W. Ryan)
July 13, 2012 191 Declaration re 190 Memorandum in Support of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Google and IAC Search's Motion for Rule 37 Sanctions for I/P Engine's Violation of May 2, 2012 Court Order by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Noona, Stephen)
July 13, 2012 190 Memorandum in Support re 189 MOTION for Sanctions for I/P Engine's Violation of May 2, 2012 Court Order filed by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
July 13, 2012 189 MOTION for Sanctions for I/P Engine's Violation of May 2, 2012 Court Order by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
July 12, 2012 188 REPLY to Response to Motion re 175 MOTION for Reconsideration re 171 Memorandum Opinion, in Part of Claim Construction Order MOTION for Reconsideration re 171 Memorandum Opinion, in Part of Claim Construction Order filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
July 9, 2012 187 Reply to Motion re 177 MOTION to Take Deposition from Google 30(b)(1) et al. , Plaintiff I/P Engine's Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(1) Depositions of Defendants, filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2012 186 Sealed Document (Letter) re 181 MOTION to Seal Exhibit P to the Declaration of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(1) Depositions by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P)(ecav, )
July 6, 2012 185 Opposition to 175 MOTION for Reconsideration re 171 Memorandum Opinion, in Part of Claim Construction Order MOTION for Reconsideration re 171 Memorandum Opinion, in Part of Claim Construction Order , Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration in Part of Claim Construction Order, filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2012 184 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 180 Declaration,, of filing of Corrected Exhibit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Noona, Stephen)
July 6, 2012 183 NOTICE by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation re 181 MOTION to Seal Exhibit P to the Declaration of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(1) Depositions MOTION to Seal Exhibit P to the Declaration of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(1) Depositions (Noona, Stephen)
July 6, 2012 182 Memorandum in Support re 181 MOTION to Seal Exhibit P to the Declaration of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(1) Depositions MOTION to Seal Exhibit P to the Declaration of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(1) Depositions filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
July 6, 2012 181 MOTION to Seal Exhibit P to the Declaration of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(1) Depositions by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
July 6, 2012 Notice of Correction re 180 Declaration. Counsel contacted clerk to advise that Exhibit P that was electronically filed as an attachment to Doc. 180 should not be for public viewing. Counsel requested that Exhibit P be removed from the docket entry. Clerk removed Exhibit P per counsel's request. Counsel advises that a Motion to Seal will be filed regarding this particular exhibit. (ecav, )
July 5, 2012 180 Declaration re 179 Opposition, of Jennifer Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(1) Depositions by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W)(Noona, Stephen)
July 5, 2012 179 Opposition to 177 MOTION to Take Deposition from Google 30(b)(1) et al. , Plaintiff I/P Engine's Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(1) Depositions of Defendants, filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
June 28, 2012 178 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of 06/15/2012, before Judge F. Bradford Stillman, Court Reporter/Transcriber Jody Stewart, Telephone number 757-222-7071. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/28/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2012.(stewart, jody)
June 25, 2012 177 MOTION to Take Deposition from Google 30(b)(1) et al. , Plaintiff I/P Engine's Motion for Leave to Take 30(b)(1) Depositions of Defendants, by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
June 22, 2012 Notice of Correction re 176 Memorandum in Support, 175 MOTION for Reconsideration re 171 Memorandum Opinion,in Part of Claim Construction Order MOTION for Reconsideration re 171 Memorandum Opinion, in Part of Claim Construction Order. Clerk corrected filers in Document 175 and 176, at the request of counsel. (ecav, )
June 22, 2012 176 Memorandum in Support re 175 MOTION for Reconsideration re 171 Memorandum Opinion, in Part of Claim Construction Order filed by AOL Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corp., and Gannett Company, Inc. (collectively, "Defendants"). (Noona, Stephen) Modified on 6/22/2012 to add all defendants to docket text as the Motion is filed on behalf of all defendants (ecav). ).
June 22, 2012 175 MOTION for Reconsideration re 171 Memorandum Opinion, in Part of Claim Construction Order by AOL Inc., Google Inc.. IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corp., and Gannett Company, Inc. (collectively, "Defendants"). (Noona, Stephen) Modified on 6/22/2012 to add all defendants to docket text as the Motion is filed on behalf of all defendants (ecav).
June 18, 2012 174 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot 99 Motion to Compel. On June 15, 2012, the Court held a telephonic hearing on other matters, at which time counsel for the plaintiff and for the defendants agreed that this motion is now moot. Accordingly, the motion (ECF No. 99) is DENIED as MOOT. Entered and filed 6/181/2. (Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 6/18/12). (ecav, )
June 18, 2012 173 Featured Case ORDER entered re. telephonic hearing held on 6/15/12, to discuss various discovery-related issues. (See Order for Specifics) In the interim of the Court's directives set forth in this Order, the parties are DIRECTED to continue to meet and confer with respect to these discovery disputes, and to advise the Court promptly if a resolution is reached by agreement. Entered and filed 6/18/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 6/18/12). (ecav, )
June 15, 2012 172 Minute Entry for telephone conference held before Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman; Jody Stewart, OCR. Matter came on for status conference/discovery issues. Participants included Donald Schultz, Ryan Snow, Charles Monterio, Jr., and Dawn Rudenko for plaintiff; Robert Burns and Steve Story for AOL; Steve Story, David Perlson, Jennifer Ghaussy and John Didday for Target, IAC, Google, and Gannett.Comments of court. Comments of counsel.Court directed that depositions scheduled for next week and following week will go forward. If certain topics are not covered, court may grant leave to resume depositions. Court will take questions of award of costs under advisement. Deposition of witness Alfereneff is to be no longer than ten hours--seven hours one day and three hours on another date which has been agreed to by counsel.Regarding plaintiffs response to Interrogatory No. 1, court directed parties to brief this issue within ten days; opposition with ten days; rebuttal within three days. Note, these dates are to include service and delivery to court and counsel. Regarding number of depositions permitted to be taken, court ordered this matter shall also be briefed with same schedule as set out above. Motion to compel (ECF #99) dismissed as moot. Court will prepare order (see said order for specifics).Adjourned. (afor)
June 15, 2012 171 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court FINDS that the disputed terms in I/P Engine's asserted patents are defined as outlined in this Memorandum Opinion and Order. (See Memorandum Opinion and Order for Specifics) Entered and filed 6/15/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 6/15/12). (ecav, )
June 14, 2012 Set Hearings Telephone Conference set for 6/15/2012 at 02:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman. (cdod, )
June 7, 2012 170 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of 06-04-2012, before Judge Raymond A. Jackson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/7/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2012.(borden, sharon)
June 4, 2012 169 Markman Hearing held on 6/4/2012 before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorneys Jeffrey Sherwood, Frank Cimino, Jr., W. Ryan Snow, Charles J. Monterio, Jr. and Jonathan Falkler appeared on behalf of the plaintiff. Attorneys Robert Burns, II and Stephen Noona appeared on behalf of defendant AOL Inc. Attorneys David Perlson, Antonio Sisto, Joshua Sohn, and Stephen Noona appeared on behalf of the defendants Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc. and Target Corporation. Matter came on for Claim Construction hearing. Comments of the Court. Claims argued. Court takes matter under advisement and will prepare an opinion. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR.)(ptom)
June 1, 2012 Notice of Correction re 168 Letter: The document does not contain the required nine-element signature block. For all future filings, counsel is requested to include the full nine-element signature blocks for the document and the certificate of service, as required by the EDVA ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (mwin, )
June 1, 2012 168 Letter to the Honorable Raymond Alvin Jackson Regarding the June 4, 2012 Markman Hearing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2012 Telephone Conference held on 5/31/2012 with District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Attorney Donald Schultz appeared, via telephone, on behalf of the plaintiff and attorney Stephen Noona appeared, via telephone, on behalf of the defendants. (ptom)
May 17, 2012 166 Claim Construction Brief Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., I/P Engine, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2012 165 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of 05-01-2012, before Judge F. Bradford Stillman, Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Borden, OCR, Telephone number 757-222-7072. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 6/18/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2012.(borden, sharon)
May 16, 2012 167 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion to Seal as follows: The unredacted versions of Exhibit M (ECF No. 107 attach. 3) and Exhibit N {ECF No. 107 attach. 4) shall be FILED UNDER SEAL. The unredacted versions of the defendants' brief in support of their motion to compel (ECF No. 164 attach. 1), Exhibit K (ECF No. 163 attach. 3), and Exhibit L (ECF No. 163 attach. 4)shall be DEEMED UNSEALED and filed in the public record. The redacted versions of Exhibit M (ECF No. 163 attach and Exhibit N (ECF No. 163 attach. 6) shall be filed in the public record. Entered and filed 5/16/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 5/16/12). (ecav, )
May 11, 2012 164 NOTICE by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. re 163 NOTICE, of Filing of Corrected Exhibit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Noona, Stephen)
May 10, 2012 163 NOTICE by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. re 106 Declaration,, 161 Order to Show Cause,,, 105 Memorandum in Support of Filing of Certain Unredacted and Further Redacted Materials in Response to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit K, # 4 Exhibit L, # 5 Exhibit M, # 6 Exhibit N)(Noona, Stephen) Modified on 5/18/2012 to indicate that Exhibit 2 was previously removed on 5/11/12 by clerk due to personal identifiers contained therein) (ecav, ).
May 8, 2012 162 NOTICE by Google Inc. of Filing of Unredacted Exhibit P to the Kammerud Declaration in Support of Google's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Compel Conception, Reduction-to-Practice and Priority Dates, and Unredacted Reply Brief in Support of Google's Motion to Compel Conception, Reduction-to-Practice and Priority Dates (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Noona, Stephen)
May 3, 2012 161 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court will defer ruling on the Motion to Seal (ECF No. 101). The parties are ORDERED to show cause why each of the documents referenced (defendant's brief and Exhibits K, L, M and N) should not be unsealed and filed in the public record. Any party may respond to this Order to Show Cause by filing a written response w/in 7 days of the date of this Order, as outlined in this Order. If no response is filed w/in 7 days of the date of this Order, the Court will issued a further order unsealing these materials and directing the clerk to file them in the public record. In the interim, the clerk shall continue to maintain the unredacted version of the deft.'s brief and Exhibits K, L, M, and N (ECF No. 107) under seal. Entered and filed 5/3/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 5/3/12). (ecav, )
May 3, 2012 160 Claim Construction Brief IP Engine's Reply Claim Construction Brief to 122 Claim Construction Brief filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
May 3, 2012 159 Declaration re 158 Response of Jennifer J. Ghaussy in Support of Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Noona, Stephen)
May 3, 2012 158 Response to 129 Claim Construction Brief, filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
May 2, 2012 157 Featured Case ORDER re. 142 Motion to Seal. The Court ORDERS the following documents to be maintained under seal in connection with the pending motions they support: ECF No. 150 - Google's Opposition Brief to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Google'sCustodial Document Production. Public (redacted) Version filed at ECF No. 145.ECF No. 150-1 - Declaration of Kristin Zmrhal in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Custodial Documents. Public (redacted) Version filed at ECF No. 146.ECF No. 150-2 through 150-7 - Exhibits H, O, Q, R, S and U to the Declaration ofEmily O'Brien in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Google's Custodial Document Production. Public (redacted) Versions filed at ECF Nos. 147-8,147-15,147-17,147-18,147-19 and 147-21 respectively. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) Entered and filed 5/2/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 5/2/12). (ecav, )
May 2, 2012 156 Featured Case ORDER granting 87 Motion to Compel filed on 2/13/12 as outlined; granting in part and denying in part 104 Motion to Compel filed on 3/27/12 as outlined; granting in part and denying in part 117 Motion to Compel filed on 4/11/12 as outlined. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). Entered and filed 5/2/12. (Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 5/2/12). (ecav, )
May 1, 2012 155 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman: Motion Hearing held on 5/1/2012 re 87 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Provide Conception, Reduction-to-Practice, and Priority Date Information for the Patents-in-Suit, 117 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff I/P Engine's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc.'s Custodial Document Production filed by I/P Engine, Inc., 104 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions filed by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc.. Present were W. Ryan Snow, Charles J. Monterio, Jr. and Dawn Rudenko on behalf of the plaintiff. Steve Noona and Emily O'Brien present on behalf of the defendants. Ms. O' Brien argued motions #87 and 104. Mr. Monterio responded. Mr. Noona argued motion #117. Ms. Rudenko responded. The Court made rulings on the record. The Court will enter an order. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Sharon Borden, OCR.) (cdod, )
May 1, 2012 154 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion to Seal; directing the clerk to file Exhibits L, M, and N (ECF No. 98) under seal; directing the parties to SHOW CAUSE within seven days of date of this order why Exhibit P (ECF No. 98) and related portions of Google's Reply Brief (ECF No. 97) should not be unsealed and filed in the public record. If no response is filed within seven days of the date of this Order, the Court will issue further order unsealing Exhibit P and related portions of the Reply Brief. In the interim, the Clerk shall continue to maintain the unredacted version of Google's Reply Brief (ECF No. 97) and Exhibit P (ECF No. 98) under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman and filed on 5/1/12. (mwin, )
April 30, 2012 153 Featured Case ORDER granting 152 Motion for Dawn Rudenko to appear Pro hac vice for I/P Engine, Inc. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and filed on 4/30/12. (mwin, )
April 27, 2012 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman: 115 MOTION to Seal and 125 MOTION to Seal. (mwin, )
April 27, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman: Telephone Conference held on 4/27/2012. (afor, )
April 27, 2012 152 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Dawn Rudenko and Certification of Local Counsel W. Ryan Snow Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3013486. by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Snow, W. Ryan)
April 24, 2012 Set Deadlines as to 117 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff I/P Engine's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc.'s Custodial Document Production, 104 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions, 99 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff IP Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendants' Compliance with this Court's Scheduling Order, or Alternatively, Motion for Protective Order, 87 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Provide Conception, Reduction-to-Practice, and Priority Date Information for the Patents-in-Suit. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2012 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman. (cdod, )
April 24, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman: Telephone Conference held on 4/24/2012. (cdod, )
April 23, 2012 151 Featured Case ORDER granting 141 Motion for Leslie Jacobs, Jr. to appear Pro hac vice on behalf of I/P Engine, Inc. Entered and filed 4/23/12. (Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 4/23/12). (ecav, )
April 23, 2012 148 Reply to Motion re 117 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff I/P Engine's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc.'s Custodial Document Production filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2012 150 Sealed Document re 142 MOTION to Seal Portions of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Custodial Documents; Portions of the Declaration of Kristin Zmrhal in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit O, # 4 Exhibit Q, # 5 Exhibit R, # 6 Exhibit S, # 7 Exhibit U, # 8 Letter)(ecav, )
April 20, 2012 149 Sealed Document re 136 MOTION to Seal Portions of Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel and Exhibits AA and BB to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of the Reply. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA, # 2 Exhibit BB, # 3 Letter)(ecav, )
April 20, 2012 147 Declaration re 145 Opposition (of Emily O'Brien) in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Google's Custodial Document Production by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y)(Noona, Stephen)
April 20, 2012 146 Declaration re 145 Opposition (of Kristin Zmrhal) in Support of Google's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Google's Custodial Document Production (Public Version) by Google Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
April 20, 2012 145 Opposition to 117 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff I/P Engine's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc.'s Custodial Document Production (Public Version) filed by Google Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
April 20, 2012 144 NOTICE by Google Inc. re 142 MOTION to Seal Portions of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Custodial Documents; Portions of the Declaration of Kristin Zmrhal in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to (Noona, Stephen)
April 20, 2012 143 Memorandum in Support re 142 MOTION to Seal Portions of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Custodial Documents; Portions of the Declaration of Kristin Zmrhal in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to filed by Google Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
April 20, 2012 142 MOTION to Seal Portions of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Custodial Documents; Portions of the Declaration of Kristin Zmrhal in Support of Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Custodial Documents; and Exhibits H, O, Q, R, S and U to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of Opposition by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
April 20, 2012 141 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Leslie Jacobs, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel W. Ryan Snow by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Snow, W. Ryan)
April 19, 2012 140 Declaration re 139 Reply to Response to Motion (of Emily C. O'Brien) in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s and IAC Search & Media,Inc.'s Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit X, # 2 Exhibit Y, # 3 Exhibit Z, # 4 Exhibit AA, # 5 Exhibit BB)(Noona, Stephen)
April 19, 2012 139 REPLY to Response to Motion re 104 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions (Public Version) filed by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
April 19, 2012 138 NOTICE by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. re 136 MOTION to Seal Portions of Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel and Exhibits AA and BB to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of the Reply (Noona, Stephen)
April 19, 2012 137 Memorandum in Support re 136 MOTION to Seal Portions of Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel and Exhibits AA and BB to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of the Reply filed by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
April 19, 2012 136 MOTION to Seal Portions of Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel and Exhibits AA and BB to the Declaration of Emily C. O'Brien in Support of the Reply by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
April 19, 2012 Notice of Correction re 135 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Leslie Jacobs, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel W. Ryan Snow Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3000528. Clerk has contacted the filing user to have them refile the Pro Hac Vice Motion with the correct filing user signing the motion. (ecav, )
April 18, 2012 135 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Leslie Jacobs, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel W. Ryan Snow Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3000528. by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Snow, W. Ryan)
April 16, 2012 131 Reply to Motion re 99 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff IP Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendants' Compliance with this Court's Scheduling Order, or Alternatively, Motion for Protective Order filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 13, 2012 134 Sealed Document re 125 MOTION to Seal Motion to Seal I/P Engine's Opposition to Google and IAC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions Along with Exhibits 11, 12, 14, 15, 18, 21, and 22 in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12, # 2 Letter)(ecav, )
April 13, 2012 133 Sealed Document re 125 MOTION to Seal Motion to Seal I/P Engine's Opposition to Google and IAC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions Along with Exhibits 11, 12, 14, 15, 18, 21, and 22 in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(ecav, )
April 13, 2012 132 Sealed Document re 115 MOTION to Seal I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Exhibits 15, 16, 17, 18, and 21 of IP Engine's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc.'s Custodial Document Production. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 16, # 2 Exhibit 17, # 3 Exhibit 18, # 4 Exhibit 21, # 5 Letter)(ecav, )
April 13, 2012 130 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion to Expedite; directing Google Inc. to file its responsive brief no later than 4/20/12; any related materials to be filed under seal shall be delivered to the Clerk for filing prior to 5:00 p.m. that day; plaintiff to file any rebuttal no later than 4/23/12; any related materials to be filed under seal shall be delivered to the Clerk for filing prior to 5:00 p.m. that day; directing the parties to schedule hearing on this motion as outlined; directing the parties to advise the Court promptly if a resolution is reached. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller and filed on 4/13/12. (mwin, )
April 12, 2012 129 Claim Construction Brief Plaintiff I/P Engine, Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 12, 2012 128 Declaration re 127 Memorandum in Opposition,, Declaration of Charles J. Monterio, Jr. in Support of I/P Engine's Opposition to Google and IAC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement Its Infringement Contentions by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 12, 2012 127 Memorandum in Opposition re 104 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 12, 2012 126 Memorandum in Support re 125 MOTION to Seal Motion to Seal I/P Engine's Opposition to Google and IAC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions Along with Exhibits 11, 12, 14, 15, 18, 21, and 22 in Support filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 12, 2012 125 MOTION to Seal Motion to Seal I/P Engine's Opposition to Google and IAC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions Along with Exhibits 11, 12, 14, 15, 18, 21, and 22 in Support by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 12, 2012 124 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. Notice of Motion to Seal I/P Engine's Opposition to Google and IAC's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions Along with Exhibits 11, 12, 14, 15, 18, 21, and 22 in Support (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 12, 2012 123 Declaration re 122 Claim Construction Brief of Joshua Sohn in Support of Defendants' Opening Claim Construction Brief by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Noona, Stephen)
April 12, 2012 122 Claim Construction Brief (Opening) filed by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Noona, Stephen)
April 11, 2012 121 Memorandum in Support re 120 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff I/P Engine's Motion to Shorten Google's Time to Respond to I/P Engine's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc.'s Custodial Document Production filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 11, 2012 120 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff I/P Engine's Motion to Shorten Google's Time to Respond to I/P Engine's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc.'s Custodial Document Production by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 11, 2012 119 Declaration re 117 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff I/P Engine's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc.'s Custodial Document Production Declaration of Charles J. Monterio, Jr. in Support of I/P Engine's Motion to Compel Defendant Google Inc.'s Custodial Document Production by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 11, 2012 118 Memorandum in Support re 117 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff I/P Engine's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc.'s Custodial Document Production filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 11, 2012 117 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff I/P Engine's Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc.'s Custodial Document Production by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 11, 2012 116 Memorandum in Support re 115 MOTION to Seal I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Exhibits 15, 16, 17, 18, and 21 of IP Engine's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc.'s Custodial Document Production filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 11, 2012 115 MOTION to Seal I/P Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Seal Exhibits 15, 16, 17, 18, and 21 of IP Engine's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc.'s Custodial Document Production by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 11, 2012 114 NOTICE by I/P Engine, Inc. Notice of Motion to Seal Exhibits 15, 16, 17, 18, and 21 of IP Engine's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Compel Defendant Google, Inc.'s Custodial Document Production (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
April 11, 2012 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman. 101 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Brief in Support of their Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions and Exhibits K, L, M, and N to the Declaration of Emily O'Brien in Support Thereof, 104 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions (jcow, )
April 9, 2012 113 Featured Case AGREED ORDER granting 108 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to motion to compel - ORDERED that the Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Compliance With the Court's Scheduling Order, or Alternatively, Motion for Protective Order is granted, and the Defendants shall have through and including April 9, 2012, in which to file their Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Compliance With the Court's Scheduling Order, or Alternatively, Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman and filed on 4/9/12. (jcow, )
April 9, 2012 112 Memorandum in Opposition re 99 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff IP Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendants' Compliance with this Court's Scheduling Order, or Alternatively, Motion for Protective Order filed by AOL Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
April 9, 2012 111 Declaration re 109 Memorandum in Opposition, by Joshua Sohn by Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Noona, Stephen)
April 9, 2012 110 Declaration re 109 Memorandum in Opposition, of Emily O'Brien by Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
April 9, 2012 109 Memorandum in Opposition re 99 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff IP Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendants' Compliance with this Court's Scheduling Order, or Alternatively, Motion for Protective Order filed by Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Noona, Stephen)
April 5, 2012 108 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 99 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff IP Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendants' Compliance with this Court's Scheduling Order, or Alternatively, Motion for Protective Order (Unopposed) by AOL Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
March 28, 2012 107 Sealed Brief in Support of 104 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibit M, # 4 Exhibit N, # 5 Letter)(ecav, ) Modified on 4/3/2012 to link to #104 (ecav).
March 27, 2012 106 Declaration re 105 Memorandum in Support of Emily O'Brien by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W)(Noona, Stephen)
March 27, 2012 105 Memorandum in Support re 104 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions (Public Version) filed by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
March 27, 2012 104 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
March 27, 2012 103 NOTICE by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. re 101 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Brief in Support of their Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions and Exhibits K, L, M, and N to the Declaration of Emily O'Brien in Support Thereof (Noona, Stephen)
March 27, 2012 102 Memorandum in Support re 101 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Brief in Support of their Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions and Exhibits K, L, M, and N to the Declaration of Emily O'Brien in Support Thereof filed by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
March 27, 2012 101 MOTION to Seal Portions of Defendants' Brief in Support of their Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Supplement its Infringement Contentions and Exhibits K, L, M, and N to the Declaration of Emily O'Brien in Support Thereof by Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
March 26, 2012 MOTION REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE F. BRADFORD STILLMAN 92 MOTION to Seal Portions of Google's Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Provide Conception, Reduction-to-Practice, and Priority Date Information, and Exhibits L, M, N and P to the Declaration of Margaret Kammerud in Support Thereof by Google Inc. (ecav, )
March 21, 2012 100 Memorandum in Support re 99 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff IP Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendants' Compliance with this Court's Scheduling Order, or Alternatively, Motion for Protective Order filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Proposed Order)(Sherwood, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2012 99 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff IP Engine, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Defendants' Compliance with this Court's Scheduling Order, or Alternatively, Motion for Protective Order by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2012 98 Sealed Document (Letter) re 96 Declaration of Margaret Kammerud. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit P)(ecav, )
March 6, 2012 97 Sealed Reply to Response re 87 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Provide Conception, Reduction-to-Practice, and Priority Date Information for the Patents-in-Suit. (ecav, )
March 5, 2012 96 Declaration re 95 Reply to Response to Motion of Margaret Kammerud in Support of Google's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Provide Conception, Reduction-to-Practice, and Priority Date Information for the Patents-in-Suit by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N, # 4 Exhibit O, # 5 Exhibit P, # 6 Exhibit Q)(Noona, Stephen)
March 5, 2012 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re 87 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Provide Conception, Reduction-to-Practice, and Priority Date Information for the Patents-in-Suit (Public Version) filed by Google Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
March 5, 2012 94 NOTICE by Google Inc. re 92 MOTION to Seal Portions of Google's Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Provide Conception, Reduction-to-Practice, and Priority Date Information, and Exhibits L, M, N and P to the Declaration of Margaret Kammerud in Support T (Noona, Stephen)
March 5, 2012 93 Memorandum in Support re 92 MOTION to Seal Portions of Google's Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Provide Conception, Reduction-to-Practice, and Priority Date Information, and Exhibits L, M, N and P to the Declaration of Margaret Kammerud in Support T filed by Google Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
March 5, 2012 92 MOTION to Seal Portions of Google's Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Provide Conception, Reduction-to-Practice, and Priority Date Information, and Exhibits L, M, N and P to the Declaration of Margaret Kammerud in Support Thereof by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
February 27, 2012 91 Opposition to 87 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Provide Conception, Reduction-to-Practice, and Priority Date Information for the Patents-in-Suit filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Snow, W. Ryan)
February 15, 2012 90 Featured Case Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Markman Hearing is set for 6/4/2012 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk, the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/5/2012 at 02:00 PM in Norfolk, and the Jury Trial is set for 10/16/2012 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk. The Court notes the appearance of Robert L. Burns, Esquire on behalf of defendant AOL Inc. The name of the defendant/counter claimants, AOL, Inc. and Google, Inc are corrected to to AOL Inc. and Google Inc. (no comma). Markman briefs are due as follows: Opening briefs are due on April 12, 2012; Reply briefs are due on May 3, 2012; Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement is due on May 17, 2012. SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 2/13/12 & filed on 2/15/12. (ptom)
February 13, 2012 Scheduling Conference - Rule 16b held on 2/13/2012. Attorneys Donald Schultz, Charles Monterio, Jr. and Kenneth Brothers appeared on behalf of the plaintiff. Attorney Stephen Noona appeared on behalf of all of the defendants, along with attorney Robert Burns on behalf of AOL Inc; and attorney Emily O'Brien on behalf of Google Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc and Target Corporation. (ptom)
February 13, 2012 89 Declaration re 88 Memorandum in Support of Margaret Kammerud in Support of Google's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Provide Conception, Reduction-to-Practice, and Priority Date Infomation for the Patents-in-Suit by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Noona, Stephen)
February 13, 2012 88 Memorandum in Support re 87 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Provide Conception, Reduction-to-Practice, and Priority Date Information for the Patents-in-Suit filed by Google, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
February 13, 2012 87 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Provide Conception, Reduction-to-Practice, and Priority Date Information for the Patents-in-Suit by Google, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
February 2, 2012 86 Featured Case ORDER granting 79 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard Hooper Ottinger, Dustin Mitchell Paul and the law firm of Vandeventer Black LLP are hereby discharged from any further obligation to represent the plaintiff as counsel of record in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman and filed on 2/2/12. (jcow, )
January 30, 2012 Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2012 at 03:30 PM in Norfolk Courtroom 4 - Witness Room. (ptom)
January 23, 2012 85 Featured Case AGREED ORDER granting 84 Motion for Protective Order as to confidential materials produced during the course of this proceeding (see order for specifics). Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman and filed on 1/23/12. (jcow, )
January 19, 2012 84 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order by AOL, Inc., Gannett Company, Inc., Google, Inc., I/P Engine, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noona, Stephen)
January 17, 2012 83 Featured Case RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2012 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman on 1/13/12 & filed on 1/17/12. (ptom)
January 9, 2012 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge F. Bradford Stillman: 79 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard H. Ottinger, Dustin M. Paul and the law firm Vandeventer Black LLP (mwin, )
December 29, 2011 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Charles Schultz on behalf of I/P Engine, Inc. (Schultz, Donald)
December 22, 2011 Notice of Correction re 81 Notice of Appearance: The filing user cannot enter an appearance for another attorney. Only the filing user's name is added to the docket sheet by the notice of appearance. Other attorneys who wish to note an appearance must e-file their own notices of appearance or must e-file a pleading and create the attorney-party link. (mwin, )
December 21, 2011 81 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Ryan Snow on behalf of I/P Engine, Inc. (Snow, W. Ryan)
December 16, 2011 80 Memorandum in Support re 79 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard H. Ottinger, Dustin M. Paul and the law firm Vandeventer Black LLP filed by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Ottinger, Richard)
December 16, 2011 79 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard H. Ottinger, Dustin M. Paul and the law firm Vandeventer Black LLP by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Ottinger, Richard)
December 12, 2011 Referred for 16(b) to be scheduled. (ecav, )
December 9, 2011 78 ANSWER to Counterclaim re 61 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim I/P Engine's Answer to Gannett Company, Inc.'s First Amended Counterclaims by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2011 77 ANSWER to Counterclaim re 60 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim I/P Engine's Answer to Target Corporations First Amended Counterclaims by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2011 76 ANSWER to Counterclaim re 59 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim I/P Engine's Answer to IAC Search & Media, Inc.'s First Amended Counterclaims by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2011 75 ANSWER to Counterclaim re 58 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim I/P Engine's Answer to Google, Inc.'s First Amended Counterclaims by I/P Engine, Inc.. (Sherwood, Jeffrey)
December 8, 2011 74 Featured Case ORDER granting 49 Motion for Pro hac vice, Appointed Joshua Lee Sohn for Gannett Company, Inc., for Google, Inc., for IAC Search & Media, Inc., for Target Corporation. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 12/8/11. (jcow, )
December 8, 2011 73 Featured Case ORDER granting 47 Motion for Pro hac vice, Appointed Antonio Ricardo Sistos for Gannett Company, Inc., for Google, Inc., for IAC Search & Media, Inc., for Target Corporation. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 12/8/11. (jcow, )
December 8, 2011 72 Featured Case ORDER granting 48 Motion for Pro hac vice, Appointed David Andrew Perlson for Gannett Company, Inc., for Google, Inc., for IAC Search & Media, Inc., for Target Corporation. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 12/8/11. (jcow, )
December 8, 2011 71 Featured Case ORDER granting 52 Motion for Pro hac vice, Appointed Emily Christina O'Brien for Gannett Company, Inc., for Google, Inc., for IAC Search & Media, Inc., for Target Corporation. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 12/8/11. (jcow, )
December 8, 2011 70 Featured Case ORDER granting 54 Motion for Pro hac vice, Appointed Jennifer Ann Kash for IAC Search & Media, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 12/8/11. (jcow, )
December 8, 2011 69 Featured Case ORDER granting 51 Motion for Pro hac vice, Appointed Margaret Pirnie Kammerud for Gannett Company, Inc., for Google, Inc., for IAC Search & Media, Inc., for Target Corporation. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 12/8/11. (jcow, )
December 8, 2011