Jackson v. Houston County Jail (INMATE1) LEAD

Plaintiff: Michael Jackson
Consol_defendant: Andy Hughes, S. Moon, Sgt. Turner, CO Reed, Sgt. Reed, Sgt. Davis, R. Dye and CO Hagler
Case Number: 1:2009cv01153
Filed: December 22, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: O Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: O
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: 1. The plaintiff's objection 43 to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge filed on March 31, 2010 is overruled; 2. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 42 entered on March 23, 2010 is adopted; 3. The motions for preliminary injunction filed by the plaintiff are DENIED. 4. This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 4/6/2010. (jg, )
March 12, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: that the plaintiff's objection 27 to the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge filed on March 2, 2010 is overruled; that the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge 24 filed on February 18, 2010 is adopted; that the plaintiff's claims against the Houston County Jail are DISMISSED with prejudice in accordance with the directives of 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1); that these cases, with respect to the plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants regarding the conditions of confinement at the Houston County Jail, are referred back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 3/12/2010. (jg, )
February 18, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; that the plaintiff's claims against the Houston County Jail be dismissed with prejudice in accordance with the directives of 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b)(1); the Houston County Jail be dismissed as a defendant in the ins tant causes of action; these cases, with respect to the plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants regarding the conditions of confinement at the Houston County Jail, be referred back to the undersigned for appropriate proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 3/3/2010. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 2/18/2010. (jg, )
January 11, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 3 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Houston County Jail. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 1/11/2010. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Houston County Jail (INMATE1) LEAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Andy Hughes
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: S. Moon
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Sgt. Turner
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: CO Reed
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Sgt. Reed
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Sgt. Davis
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: R. Dye
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: CO Hagler
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?