Joiner v. Allen et al (INMATE2)

Plaintiff: Henry Joiner
Defendant: Richard F. Allen, Kenneth Jones, Warden Mason, D. Gould, Dr. Siddiq, Ms. Knolls and Sandra Giles
Case Number: 2:2009cv00243
Filed: March 25, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Bullock
Presiding Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; that the motion for preliminary injunction and motion for permanent injunction filed by Plaintiff 27 & 28 be and are hereby DENIED. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 4/2/2010. (jg, )
February 25, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 2/25/2010. (jg, )
April 15, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Bullock County CF. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 4/15/2009. (cc, )
April 3, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff may have to and including April 20, 2009 in which to either file an amended complaint limiting his claim to allegations concerning his present inability to obtain adequate medical care for his current spinal conditions and attend ant back pain and identifying the individual(s) responsible for refusing him care or submit a check or money order made payable to the Clerk of Court in the amount of $350.00 in order to proceed with the complaint in its current form. Signed by Honorable Terry F. Moorer on 4/3/2009. (cc, ) Mailed to plaintiff with 1983 form as directed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joiner v. Allen et al (INMATE2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Joiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard F. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Siddiq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Knolls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?