Moss v. State of Alabama, Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Cesar Moss
Defendant: State of Alabama, Department of Corrections, Richard F. Allen, Arnold Holt, John Cummins, Bruce Vermilyer and Paul Rogers
Case Number: 2:2010cv00766
Filed: September 10, 2010
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Montgomery Office
County: Montgomery
Presiding Judge: Charles S. Coody
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff shall submit the proposed pretrial order in the proper format and by the proper means immediately. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 8/16/2011. (cc, )
June 22, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER advising that pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this Court is authorized to grant summary judgment on grounds not raised by a party and that this Court is inclined to grant a partial summary judgment to De fendants on the ADA claims pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(f)(2) on the grounds that Plaintiff has neither alleged facts in support of such claims, nor can support for such claims be found in the factual record before this Court. Any party wishing to oppose the Court's proposed actions shall show cause on or before June 27, 2011, as to why such a partial summary judgment should not be granted to Defendants. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/22/2011. (cc, )
June 15, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all claims against Bruce Vermilyer are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 6/15/2011. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. State of Alabama, Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Moss
Represented By: Connie J. Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama, Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard F. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Vermilyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?