Mims v. Ivey et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Hasalee Mims
Defendant: Fob James, State of Alabama and Kay Ivey
Case Number: 2:2020cv00254
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON MOTION: it is ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the plf is GRANTED an extension from 6/9/2020 to and including 6/17/2020 to file objections to the Recommendation entered on 5/26/2020 (Doc. #5 ). Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/9/2020. (cwl, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #5 RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge by Hasalee Mims. (am, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice prior to service of process in accordance with provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) as the claims presented in the complaint provide no basis for relief in the instant cause of action at that time. Objections to R&R due by 6/9/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/26/2020. (dmn, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Partial Filing fee received: $9.49, receipt number 4602057947. (am, )
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON MOTION: directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $9.49 be paid on or before 5/12/2020; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; GRANTING the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Easterling Correctional Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/22/2020. (Furnished: Cashier) (am, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Hasalee Mims. (imm, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Kay Ivey, State of Alabama, & Fob James filed by Hasalee Mims.(imm, ) Modified on 4/21/2020 to include Fob James per the complaint (am, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mims v. Ivey et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fob James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hasalee Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?