Chiarizio v. Ivey et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Brian Chiarizio
Defendant: Charles Tipton, Alabama Department of Corrections, Kay Ivey, Red Eagle Work Center, Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles, Alabama Attorney General's Office, Charles A. Graddick and Jefferson S. Dunn
Case Number: 2:2020cv00266
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that: 1. The motion for preliminary injunction be DENIED. 2. This case be DISMISSED without prejudice for the plaintiff's failure to file an application for leave to proceed in forma paupers accompanied by necessary financial information or the requisite fees as ordered by this court. Objections to R&R due by 6/26/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/12/2020. (kh, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/24/2020. (djy, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing that on or before 5/15/2020 the plf shall file either the appropriate affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a prison account statement from the account clerk at Red Eagle showing the average monthly balance in plf's prison account for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of this complaint, as further set out in order, or, if he does not seek in forma pauperis treatment, the $400 filing/administrative fees; directing the clerk to furnish plf with a copy of the form affidavit used by persons seeking to proceed in forma pauperis; directing the clerk to provide a copy of this order to the account clerk @ Red Eagle, as further set out in order; ORDERING that the plf shall immediately inform the court and the defs or counsel of any change of his address. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/24/20. Mailed to account clerk at Red Eagle, as directed. Also mailed to plf with IFP form.(djy, ) Modified on 4/24/2020 to correct typos in the docket text (wcl, ).
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Brian Chiarizio. (wcl, )
April 21, 2020 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Brian Chiarizio. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #2 for pdf) (wcl, )
April 21, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Brian Chiarizio. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #2 for pdf) (wcl, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Attorney General's Office, Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles, Alabama Department of Corrections, Jefferson S. Dunn, Charles A. Graddick, Kay Ivey, Red Eagle Work Center, Charles Tipton, filed by Brian Chiarizio. (wcl, )
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COPY of ORDER entered in 2:20-cv-00248 DIRECTING the Clerk to: 1) Open a separate civil action which lists Brian Chiarizio as the plf; 2) Place a copy of the complaint (Doc. 1) and the motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. 2) in the newly opened case; 3) Assign the newly opened case to a District Judge and Magistrate Judge in the normal docketing process. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 4/21/2020. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chiarizio v. Ivey et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Tipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Eagle Work Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Board of Pardons and Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Attorney General's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles A. Graddick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Chiarizio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?