Quinn v. Henline et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Cornelius Webster, Kareem A. Jones, Michael D. Collins, Jr., Zachary L. Williams, James R. Gann and Marcus Quinn
Defendant: Kay Ivey, Captain Tuck, Officer Templin, Lieutenant Richardson, Officer Tidwell, Officer Carlton, Officer Ryan, James Stroud, Susan Moncrief, Officer Evans, Officer Patten, Officer Shulle, Officer Oliver, Officer Hill, Officer Bell, Warden Estes, Sgt. Hayme, Officer Thornton, Sgt. Ragsdale, Officer Roy, Officer Casablanco, Sgt. Davidson, Officer Weldon, Officer Kodya, Lt. Watkins, Robert Henline, Officer Ricks, Officer Unger, Tracy Jackson, Sgt. Heard and Sgt. Haynie
Case Number: 2:2020cv00346
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
2 Judge: William Keith Watkins
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $4.53 be paid on or before on or before July 17, 2020 ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting #9 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Elmore County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/26/2020. (furn: cashier, acct clerk)(kh, )
June 15, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; #7 Order sent to Zachary L. Williams @ Elmore CF was returned with the following notation, "Return To Sender, No Such Street, Unable To Forward, Limestone CF, 28779 Nick Davis Rd, Harvest, AL 35749." (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Marcus Quinn. (wcl, )
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 6/19/2020, Plf shall file either the $400.00 filing/administrative fees or an affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by relevant financial information from the inmate account clerk, as further set out in order; copy of IFP form mailed to plf as directed. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/8/2020. (wcl, )
June 5, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable; #7 Order sent to Cornelius Webster was returned with the following notation, "Return To Sender, Refused, Unable To Forward." (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing directing the clerk to: (1) open separate civil actions for each Plaintiff named in this complaint and assign the present cause of action to Plaintiff Marcus Quinn; (2) Assign the newly opened cases in accordance with this courts normal assignment procedures; (3) Strike the requests for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiffs Collins, Gunn, Jones, Webster, and Williams (Docs. #2 , #3 , #4 , #5 , & #6 ) from the docket in this case; (4) Place a copy of the complaint (Doc. #1 ), the motion for leave to proceed in formapauperis filed by the inmate-plaintiff to which the newly opened civil action is assigned,and a copy of this order in the newly opened case files; 5. Refer these case files to the appropriate Magistrate Judge for further proceedings upon completion of the foregoing directives. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/28/2020. (djy, )
May 28, 2020 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins; Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (kh, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 (STRICKEN pursuant to #7 order) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Zachary Williams. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(imm, ) Modified on 5/28/2020 (djy, ).
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 (STRICKEN pursuant to #7 order) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Cornelius Webster. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(imm, ) Modified on 5/28/2020 (djy, ).
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 (STRICKEN pursuant to #7 order) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Kareem Jones. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(imm, ) Modified on 5/28/2020 (djy, ).
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 (STRICKEN pursuant to #7 order) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by James Gunn. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(imm, ) Modified on 5/28/2020 (djy, ).
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 (STRICKEN pursuant to #7 order) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Michael Collins. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(imm, ) Modified on 5/28/2020 (djy, ).
May 26, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Michael Collins, James Gunn, Kareem Jones, Marcus Quinn, Cornelius Webster, Zachary Williams. (No pdf document attached to this entry - see docket entry #1 for pdf). (imm, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Officer Bell, Officer Carlton, Officer Casablanco, Sgt. Davidson, Warden Estes, Officer Evans, Sgt. Hayme, Sgt. Heard, Robert Henline, Officer Hill, Kay Ivey, Tracy Jackson, Officer Kodya, Susan Moncrief, Officer Oliver, Officer Patten, Sgt. Ragsdale, Lieutenant Richardson, Officer Ricks, Officer Roy, Officer Ryan, Officer Shulle, James Stroud, Officer Templin, Officer Thornton, Officer Tidwell, Captain Tuck, Officer Unger, Lt. Watkins, Officer Weldon, filed by Michael Collins, Marcus Quinn, Kareem Jones, Zachary Williams, Cornelius Webster, James Gunn.(imm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinn v. Henline et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Tuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Templin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Moncrief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Shulle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Hayme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Ragsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Casablanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Kodya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Henline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Haynie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Collins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Gann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?