Collins v. Henline et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Michael D. Collins, Jr.
Defendant: Kay Ivey, Captain Tuck, Officer Templin, Lieutenant Richardson, Officer Tidwell, Officer Carlton, Officer Ryan, James Stroud, Susan Moncrief, Officer Evans, Officer Patten, Officer Shulle, Officer Oliver, Officer Hill, Officer Bell, Warden Estes, Sgt. Hayme, Officer Thornton, Sgt. Ragsdale, Officer Roy, Officer Casablanco, Sgt. Davidson, Officer Weldon, Officer Kodya, Lt. Watkins, Robert Henline, Officer Ricks, Officer Unger, Tracy Jackson, Sgt. Heard and Sgt. Haynie
Case Number: 2:2020cv00364
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Brasher
Referring Judge: Charles S Coody
2 Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Copy of #9 Opinion & #10 Judgment sent to Michael D. Collins, Jr. returned with the following USPS notation, "Return to Sender; Refused; Unable to Forward; Released to DOC." (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT: In accordance with the memorandum opinion entered today, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) The United States Magistrate Judge's recommendation (doc. no. #8 ) is adopted. (2) This lawsuit is dismissed without prejudice. No costs are taxed. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/31/2020. This case is closed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(dmn, )
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION: There are no objections to the recommendation. After an independent and de novo review of the record, the court concludes that the magistrate judge's recommendation should be adopted. An appropriate judgment will be entered. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/31/2020. (dmn, )
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Copy of #8 Recommedenation sent to Michael D. Collins, Jr. returned with the following USPS notation, "Return to Sender - Refused - Unable to Forward; Released." (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order NO OBJECTIONS filed to the #8 Recommendation. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's failures to prosecute this action and comply with the orders of this court; Objections to R&R due by 8/17/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/3/2020. (am, )
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON MOTION: GRANTING the #6 Motion for Extension of Time; GRANTING the Plaintiff an extension from 6/26/2020, to and including 7/10/2020, to comply with the court's 6/5/2020, #5 order that he submit an initial partial filing fee to the court in the amount of $1.10; DIRECTING the Clerk to furnish a copy of this order to the account clerk at the Elmore County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/22/2020.(Furnished: Cashier; Mailed as directed to account clerk at the Elmore County Jail) (am, )
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Deadline to File Initial Partial Filing Fee re #5 Order, by Michael D. Collins, Jr. (dmn, )
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON MOTION: directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $1.10 be paid on or before 6/26/2020; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Elmore County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/5/2020. (Furnished: Cashier) (am, )
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. Honorable Judge Andrew L. Brasher no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (dmn, )
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael D. Collins, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis)(dmn, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/5/2020) (dmn, ). Modified on 6/5/2020, wrong pdf attached as Attachment 1. (dmn, )
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Officer Bell, Officer Carlton, Officer Casablanco, Sgt. Davidson, Warden Estes, Officer Evans, Sgt. Hayme, Sgt. Heard, Robert Henline, Officer Hill, Kay Ivey, Tracy Jackson, Officer Kodya, Susan Moncrief, Officer Oliver, Officer Patten, Sgt. Ragsdale, Lieutenant Richardson, Officer Ricks, Officer Roy, Officer Ryan, Officer Shulle, James Stroud, Officer Templin, Officer Thornton, Officer Tidwell, Captain Tuck, Officer Unger, Lt. Watkins, Officer Weldon, filed by Michael D. Collins, Jr.(dmn, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/29/2020) (dmn, ). Modified on 5/29/2020 to remove incorrect case number. (dmn, )
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Copy of Order entered in Civil Action No. 2:20-cv-345-RAH directing the Clerk to: 1. Assign the present cause of action to Plaintiff Zachary Williams and open separate civil actions for each of the Plaintiffs named in this complaint. 2. Assign the newly opened cases in accordance with this court's normal assignment procedures. 3. Strike the requests for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiffs Collins, Gann, Jones and Webster (Docs. 3, 4, 5, and 6) from the docket in this case. 4. Place a copy of the complaint (Doc. 1), the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by the inmate plaintiff to which the newly opened civil action is assigned and a copy of this order in the newly opened case files. 5. Refer the newly opened cases to the appropriate Magistrate Judge for further proceedings upon completion of the foregoing directives. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/29/2020. (dmn, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/29/2020) (dmn, ) Modified on 5/29/2020 to remove incorrect case number. (dmn, )
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Michael D. Collins, Jr. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #2 for pdf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Henline et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Tuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Templin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Tidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Moncrief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Shulle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Hayme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Ragsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Casablanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Weldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Kodya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Henline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Haynie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Collins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?