Jones et al v. Ivey et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Tavores Kasel Montgomery, Treundous Qwavon Davis, Dameon Tunnell Stewart, Willie De Brown, Jr., Frederick Campbell, Timothy Mays, Demetrius McNeal, Derrick Timothy Lampley, Lonnie Floyd Stacey, Ontez Woodruff, Michael Sorenso Kennemore, Ceasar Norris, LaKendrick LaShaurn Holley, Michael Land, Brendon Todd Smith, Joe Ranger Pickett, Kent Woods, Stephen Barry Allan, Michael Marcella Finley, Demario Antwan Jones, DeAngelo Dewayne Brown, Hannis Lee Stacey, Charles Lewis, Christopher Antonio Yates, Shakeenan Coleman, Reginald Lebarron Dunklin, Colbertti Cortez Smith, Danny Lee Meeks, Jr., Dennis Maurice Roberson, Walter Doran Joiner, Charles Lavorn McReynolds, David Owens, Jr., Paul Alvin Womack, Jr., Isaac Maurice Riggins, Timothy Lewis Pinchon, David Potter, Daniel Wilson, Jr., Desmond Terrel Brown, Steven Curtis Berryhill, Jeffery Demonte Cunningham, Willie Harris, James F. Wooten, Stephen Michael Kilisz, Eric Tyrone Kimbrough, Cory W. Jones, Tony Bolding, Alphones Lemark Carlton, Keyshawn Deiondre Paige, Billy Jones, Ricky Hawthorne, Orlando J. Hardnett, Phenico B. Hornsby, Quincey Sanders, Ricky Wayne Kemp, Perry Collins, Marcus Davis, Alan Rashard Baker, Ricky Vickers, Juan Landaverde, Kendall Wayne Hurston, Jeffery Shane Stringfellow, Antoine Washington, Ahmad Jamalle Williams, Fredrick Leon Couch, Benigno Steven Garza, III, Josie Vonaill Jones, Sylvester Brown, Brandon Jemaul Kennedy and Avery Millender
Defendant: Jennifer Anderson King, Sharon Folks, Jefferson S. Dunn, Kay Ivey, Steven T. Marshall and Louis V. Franklin
Petitioner: Liston Maron Richardson, George Lee Thompson, III, Steven Christopher Taylor, Alforez Rutledge, Willie Roy Surry, Gregory L Reaser, Willie Miles, Jessie Clyde Pettway, James Bernard Douglas, Jr, Eric Tyrone Nunn, Anthony J Laukhart, Awalski Laquan Williams and Willie James Jackson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00929
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: W Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #3 Recommendation mailed to Billy Jones returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Refused, Unable to Forward." (dmn, ) (no pdf)
December 23, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #5 Opinion and Order mailed to Awalski Laquan Williams returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Refused, Unable to Forward." (dmn, ) (no pdf)
December 23, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #5 Opinion and Order mailed to Willie Roy Surry returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Refused, Unable to Forward." (dmn, ) (no pdf)
December 23, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #5 Opinion and Order mailed to David Potter returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Refused, Unable to Forward." (dmn, ) (no pdf)
December 23, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #5 Opinion and Order mailed to Eric Tyrone Kimbrough returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Refused, Unable to Forward." (dmn, ) (no pdf)
December 23, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #5 Opinion and Order mailed to Billy Jones returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Refused, Unable to Forward." (dmn, )
December 23, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #5 Opinion and Order mailed to Treundous Qwavon Davis returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Refused, Unable to Forward." (dmn, ) (no pdf)
December 4, 2020 Received email from USDC, Southern District of Alabama regarding receipt of e-transfer case; SDAL case number assigned as 1:20-cv-00587, filed 12/4/2020. (dmn, ) (no pdf)
December 2, 2020 Case transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk, United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. (no pdf) (dmn, )
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER: Upon consideration of the Recommendation (Doc. 3]), Plaintiffs' #4 Motion to Stay and Objection, and after an independent review of the record, it is ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay is DENIED. 2. Plaintiffs' Objection to the Recommendation is OVERRULED. 3. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; and 4. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama for review and disposition in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Clerk is DIRECTED to take the appropriate steps to effectuate the transfer of this case. This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 12/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(dmn, )
November 30, 2020 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendations by Steven Curtis Berryhill, Alphones Lemark Carlton, Jeffery Demonte Cunningham, James Bernard Douglas, Jr, Michael Marcella Finley, Orlando J. Hardnett, Willie Harris, Willie James Jackson, Walter Doran Joiner, Cory W. Jones, Josie Vonaill Jones, Ricky Wayne Kemp, Brandon Jemaul Kennedy, Michael Sorenso Kennemore, Anthony J Laukhart, Timothy Mays, Demetrius McNeal, Charles Lavorn McReynolds, Danny Lee Meeks, Jr, Willie Miles, Avery Millender, Tavores Kasel Montgomery, Eric Tyrone Nunn, David Owens, Jr, Keyshawn Deiondre Paige, Jessie Clyde Pettway, Joe Ranger Pickett, Gregory L Reaser, Liston Maron Richardson, Alforez Rutledge, Hannis Lee Stacey, Lonnie Floyd Stacey, Willie Roy Surry, Steven Christopher Taylor, George Lee Thompson, III, Ricky Vickers, Ahmad Jamalle Williams, Awalski Laquan Williams, Daniel Wilson, Jr, Kent Woods, Christopher Antonio Yates. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #4 for pdf)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay and OBJECTION by Writ of Mandamus Coupled with Writ of Error to the Supreme Court of the United States for Conspiracy to Committ Treason against the United States Constitution in Order to Deprive Incarcerated United States Citizens of Their Constitutional Rights to the United States Constitution Without Standing by Steven Curtis Berryhill, Alphones Lemark Carlton, Jeffery Demonte Cunningham, James Bernard Douglas, Jr, Michael Marcella Finley, Orlando J. Hardnett, Willie Harris, Willie James Jackson, Walter Doran Joiner, Cory W. Jones, Josie Vonaill Jones, Ricky Wayne Kemp, Brandon Jemaul Kennedy, Michael Sorenso Kennemore, Anthony J Laukhart, Timothy Mays, Demetrius McNeal, Charles Lavorn McReynolds, Danny Lee Meeks, Jr, Willie Miles, Avery Millender, Tavores Kasel Montgomery, Eric Tyrone Nunn, David Owens, Jr, Keyshawn Deiondre Paige, Jessie Clyde Pettway, Joe Ranger Pickett, Gregory L Reaser, Liston Maron Richardson, Alforez Rutledge, Hannis Lee Stacey, Lonnie Floyd Stacey, Willie Roy Surry, Steven Christopher Taylor, George Lee Thompson, III, Ricky Vickers, Ahmad Jamalle Williams, Awalski Laquan Williams, Daniel Wilson, Jr, Kent Woods, Christopher Antonio Yates. (dmn, )
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C.1404(a). Objections to R&R due by 12/2/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 11/17/2020. (dmn, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Stephen Barry Allan, Alan Rashard Baker, Steven Curtis Berryhill, Tony Bolding, DeAngelo Dewayne Brown, Desmond Terrel Brown, Sylvester Brown, Willie De Brown, Jr, Frederick Campbell, Alphones Lemark Carlton, Shakeenan Coleman, Perry Collins, Fredrick Leon Couch, Jeffery Demonte Cunningham, Marcus Davis, Treundous Qwavon Davis, Reginald Lebarron Dunklin, Michael Marcella Finley, Benigno Steven Garza, III, Orlando J. Hardnett, Willie Harris, Ricky Hawthorne, LaKendrick LaShaurn Holley, Phenico B. Hornsby, Kendall Wayne Hurston, Walter Doran Joiner, Billy Jones, Cory W. Jones, Demario Antwan Jones, Josie Vonaill Jones, Ricky Wayne Kemp, Michael Sorenso Kennemore, Stephen Michael Kilisz, Eric Tyrone Kimbrough, Derrick Timothy Lampley, Michael Land, Juan Landaverde, Charles Lewis, Timothy Mays, Demetrius McNeal, Charles Lavorn McReynolds, Danny Lee Meeks, Jr, Tavores Kasel Montgomery, Ceasar Norris, David Owens, Jr, Keyshawn Deiondre Paige, Joe Ranger Pickett, Timothy Lewis Pinchon, David Potter, Isaac Maurice Riggins, Dennis Maurice Roberson, Quincey Sanders, Brendon Todd Smith, Colbertti Cortez Smith, Hannis Lee Stacey, Lonnie Floyd Stacey, Dameon Tunnell Stewart, Jeffery Shane Stringfellow, Ricky Vickers, Antoine Washington, Ahmad Jamalle Williams, Daniel Wilson, Jr, Paul Alvin Womack, Jr, Ontez Woodruff, Kent Woods, James F. Wooten, Christopher Antonio Yates. (es, )
November 12, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stephen Barry Allan, Alan Rashard Baker, Steven Curtis Berryhill, Tony Bolding, DeAngelo Dewayne Brown, Desmond Terrel Brown, Sylvester Brown, Willie De Brown, Jr, Frederick Campbell, Alphones Lemark Carlton, Shakeenan Coleman, Perry Collins, Fredrick Leon Couch, Jeffery Demonte Cunningham, Marcus Davis, Treundous Qwavon Davis, Reginald Lebarron Dunklin, Michael Marcella Finley, Benigno Steven Garza, III, Orlando J. Hardnett, Willie Harris, Ricky Hawthorne, LaKendrick LaShaurn Holley, Phenico B. Hornsby, Kendall Wayne Hurston, Walter Doran Joiner, Billy Jones, Cory W. Jones, Demario Antwan Jones, Josie Vonaill Jones, Ricky Wayne Kemp, Michael Sorenso Kennemore, Stephen Michael Kilisz, Eric Tyrone Kimbrough, Derrick Timothy Lampley, Michael Land, Juan Landaverde, Charles Lewis, Timothy Mays, Demetrius McNeal, Charles Lavorn McReynolds, Danny Lee Meeks, Jr, Tavores Kasel Montgomery, Ceasar Norris, David Owens, Jr, Keyshawn Deiondre Paige, Joe Ranger Pickett, Timothy Lewis Pinchon, David Potter, Isaac Maurice Riggins, Dennis Maurice Roberson, Quincey Sanders, Brendon Todd Smith, Colbertti Cortez Smith, Hannis Lee Stacey, Lonnie Floyd Stacey, Dameon Tunnell Stewart, Jeffery Shane Stringfellow, Ricky Vickers, Antoine Washington, Ahmad Jamalle Williams, Daniel Wilson, Jr, Paul Alvin Womack, Jr, Ontez Woodruff, Kent Woods, James F. Wooten, Christopher Antonio Yates. (es, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Jefferson S. Dunn, Sharon Folks, Louis V. Franklin, Kay Ivey, Jennifer Anderson King, Steven T. Marshall, filed by Walter Doran Joiner, Kendall Wayne Hurston, Hannis Lee Stacey, Perry Collins, Billy Jones, LaKendrick LaShaurn Holley, Michael Sorenso Kennemore, Ricky Hawthorne, Eric Tyrone Kimbrough, Jeffery Demonte Cunningham, Michael Marcella Finley, Ricky Wayne Kemp, Isaac Maurice Riggins, Alan Rashard Baker, Juan Landaverde, Stephen Barry Allan, Tony Bolding, Danny Lee Meeks, Jr, Phenico B. Hornsby, Jeffery Shane Stringfellow, Frederick Campbell, Orlando J. Hardnett, Desmond Terrel Brown, David Owens, Jr, Kent Woods, Dennis Maurice Roberson, DeAngelo Dewayne Brown, Antoine Washington, Ontez Woodruff, Ceasar Norris, Keyshawn Deiondre Paige, Timothy Lewis Pinchon, Sylvester Brown, Paul Alvin Womack, Jr, Willie De Brown, Jr, David Potter, Marcus Davis, Josie Vonaill Jones, Demetrius McNeal, Cory W. Jones, Lonnie Floyd Stacey, Derrick Timothy Lampley, Christopher Antonio Yates, Michael Land, Charles Lewis, Colbertti Cortez Smith, Steven Curtis Berryhill, Stephen Michael Kilisz, James F. Wooten, Charles Lavorn McReynolds, Dameon Tunnell Stewart, Ahmad Jamalle Williams, Alphones Lemark Carlton, Daniel Wilson, Jr, Treundous Qwavon Davis, Demario Antwan Jones, Fredrick Leon Couch, Benigno Steven Garza, III, Joe Ranger Pickett, Timothy Mays, Shakeenan Coleman, Tavores Kasel Montgomery, Ricky Vickers, Willie Harris, Brendon Todd Smith, Reginald Lebarron Dunklin, Quincey Sanders.(es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Ivey et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tavores Kasel Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Treundous Qwavon Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dameon Tunnell Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie De Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Timothy Lampley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Floyd Stacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ontez Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sorenso Kennemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ceasar Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaKendrick LaShaurn Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendon Todd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Ranger Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Barry Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Marcella Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demario Antwan Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeAngelo Dewayne Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannis Lee Stacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Antonio Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shakeenan Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Lebarron Dunklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colbertti Cortez Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Lee Meeks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Maurice Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Doran Joiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Lavorn McReynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Owens, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Alvin Womack, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Maurice Riggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Lewis Pinchon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desmond Terrel Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Curtis Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Demonte Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James F. Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Michael Kilisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Tyrone Kimbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory W. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Bolding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alphones Lemark Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyshawn Deiondre Paige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Hawthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando J. Hardnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phenico B. Hornsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincey Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Wayne Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Rashard Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Landaverde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Wayne Hurston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Shane Stringfellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmad Jamalle Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Leon Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benigno Steven Garza, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josie Vonaill Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvester Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Jemaul Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avery Millender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Anderson King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Folks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis V. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Liston Maron Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Lee Thompson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Christopher Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alforez Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willie Roy Surry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory L Reaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willie Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessie Clyde Pettway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Bernard Douglas, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Tyrone Nunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony J Laukhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Awalski Laquan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willie James Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?