Smith v. Alphabet Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Smith and Michael Henry Smith
Defendant: Alphabet Inc, Telstra, and Telstra Ventures Group, Alphabet Inc., Amazon.com, Ala Kid, Long John, Long Dong, Itochu Technology Ventures, Coatue Management, General Atlantic, Google, Whistle Dick, Captain Spaulding, Cindy Lou, Scale Venture Partners, DFJ Growth, Beam.to, Peter Will Harden, Thereal Mikesmith 1ER, Tucows Inc., Bessemer Venture Partners, Telefonica Digital, Mitsui & Co, Ezinecentre, My Social Hub XP, Attractsoft GMBH, SAP Ventures, Jon Jones, Freehostingeu, New Enterprise Associates, Box/Box, Inc./Open Box/Medxt, Captain Sprawling, Macnica Networks USA, Inc., Nuke Dukem, Social + Capital Partnership, Facebook, TPG Capital, Thereal Mikesmith, Automatic/Gravatar, Brianna Nathaly and Jimbo King
Case Number: 1:2016cv00086
Filed: February 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Callie V S Granade
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2017 Filing 40 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DISMISSAL ISSUED AS MANDATE of USCA re: #18 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Henry Smith, Mandate issued 8/7/2017 ; USCA Case Number 16-15266 (jal)
July 31, 2017 Filing 39 RESPONSE to #37 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations filed by Michael Henry Smith. (srd) Copy to USCA.
July 12, 2017 Filing 38 JUDGMENT, this action is DISMISSED because Plf has not proven, by a preponderance of the evidence, facts supporting the existence of diversity jurisdiction at the time of the filing of the amended complaint on 4/22/16. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/12/2017. (copy mailed to Plf on 7/12/17) (tot)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING #33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/12/2017. (copy mailed to Plf on 7/12/17) (tot)
July 6, 2017 Filing 36 Response to #33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Michael Henry Smith; referred to Senior Judge Granade (mab)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ENDORSED ORDER, GRANTING Plaintiff's #34 Petition for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge, and EXTENDING the deadline for Plaintiff to file his objection to July 3, 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/5/2017. (copy to Pltf) (mab)
May 31, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Report & Recommendation by Michael Henry Smith. (Referred to J/Granade on 6/2/17) (tot)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this Court find that Plf has not proven, by a preponderance of the evidence, facts supporting the existence of diversity jurisdiction at the time of the filing of the #7 Amended Complaint on 4/22/17, & accordingly, the Court's order & judgment dated 7/5/16 should be vacated & this action should be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 5/18/2017. (copy mailed to Plf on 5/18/17) (tot)
April 28, 2017 REFERRAL OF #32 Response to Order to Judge Murray. (jal)
April 20, 2017 Filing 32 Response to Court's Order Regarding the Question of Diversity #26 filed by Michael Henry Smith. Referred to Judge Murray. (srd)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plf's #30 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Tucows from the Action. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/22/2017. (copy mailed to Plf on 3/22/17) (tot)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order GRANTING Plf's #28 MOTION for Extension of Time. Plf is to file his response NLT 4/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 3/21/2017. (copy mailed to Plf on 3/22/17) (tot)
March 20, 2017 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Tucows from Action by Michael Henry Smith. (Referred to J/Granade on 3/22/17) (tot)
March 20, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #26 Order by Michael Henry Smith. (Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray on 3/21/17). (tot)
March 9, 2017 Filing 27 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (jlr)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order, Plf is extended a period of time, up to & including 3/20/2017, to provide the Court with sufficient information so that it can determine whether it has diversity of citizenship as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 2/17/2017. (copy mailed to Plf on 2/17/17) (tot)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order re: #24 Order of USCA. This action is referred to the Magistrate to determine whether diversity jurisdiction exists in accordance with the 11th Circuit Court of Appeal's instructions. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/10/2017. Referred to Judge Cassady (PSU). (srd)
February 9, 2017 REFERRAL OF #24 USCA Order to Judge Granade. (jal)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER of USCA as to #18 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Henry Smith, LIMITED REMAND TO DC FOR THE PURPOSE OF DETERMINING WHETHER SMITH IS ABLE TO ESTABLISH THAT DIVERSITY JURISDICTION EXIST., ref. Judge Granade (jal)
February 8, 2017 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Southern District of Alabama certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #18 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 16-15266-B. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (Note: No financial arrangements were made with a court reporter for a transcript). (jal)
September 22, 2016 Appeal Remark re #18 Notice of Appeal : USCA Case Number 16-15266-B, a duplicate TOI at doc. has been filed and placed in Civil Daily at 9/22/16. (jal)
September 2, 2016 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM filed by Michael Henry Smith re: #18 Notice of Appeal. Requesting transcripts for proceedings as follows: Pretrial Conference held 3/21/16 before Judge Cassady (Note: Digital Recording, no court reporter). (jal)
August 3, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #18 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Henry Smith. USCA Case Number 16-15266-B (jal)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #19 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/3/2016. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff/Appellant). (jal)
August 3, 2016 Filing 20 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #16 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 Amended Complaint, filed by Michael Henry Smith, #18 Notice of Appeal, #14 Response, #17 Judgment, Judge Appealed: Judge Granade, Fee Paid: Not Paid, Pending IFP (jal)
August 2, 2016 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (jal)
August 2, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Michael Henry Smith. Referred to Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (jal)
August 2, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #16 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, #17 Judgment, by Michael Henry Smith. (jal)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JUDGMENT, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim and, in part, as frivolous. Plaintiff's #15 Motion for an Order Directing the Perfected Defendants to Provide the Complete Information for the Non-Perfected Defendants is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/5/2016. (copy to Pltf) (mab)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADOPTING #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of this Court. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/5/2016. (copy to Pltf) (mab)
July 1, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION for an Order Directing the Perfected Defendants to Provide the Complete Information for the Non-Perfected Defendants filed by Michael Henry Smith; Referred to Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade. (mab)
July 1, 2016 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Michael Henry Smith; referred to Senior Judge Granade (mab)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Plf's #12 Motion for Order Directing Perfected Defendants to Provide Complete Information for Non-Perfected Defendants is DENIED as set out. Plf's #11 Motion for Transcript or Recording is DENIED as set out. Plf's #10 Motion to Toll Time to Respond to Report & Recommendation is MOOT as set out. Plf is GRANTED alternative request for extension of time to file objections to the Report & Recommendation. Plf is to file his objections NLT 7/1/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 6/7/2016. (copy mailed to Plf on 6/7/16) (tot)
May 31, 2016 Filing 12 MOTION for Order Directing Perfected Defendants to Provide Complete Information for Non-Perfected Defendants by Michael Henry Smith. (tot) Modified on 6/6/2016 (tot).
May 31, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION for Transcription &/or Recording of Hearing Held on 3/21/16 by Michael Henry Smith. (tot) Modified on 6/6/2016 (tot).
May 31, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION to Toll the Time to Respond to the Report & Recommendation by Michael Henry Smith. (tot) Modified on 6/6/2016 (tot).
May 23, 2016 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the Court dismiss this action, prior to service, for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) (B)(ii) &, in part, as frivolous in accordance w/28 U.S.C. 1915 (e)(2)(B)(i) as set out. Objections to R&R due by 6/13/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/23/2016. (copy mailed to Plf on 5/23/16) (tot)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Plf's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as set out. The Clerk is DIRECTED to withhold service until further notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 5/2/2016. (copy mailed to Plf on 5/3/16) (tot)
April 22, 2016 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ala Kid, Alphabet Inc., Attractsoft GMBH, Automatic/Gravatar, Beam.to, Bessemer Venture Partners, Box/Box, Inc./Open Box/Medxt, Brianna Nathaly, Captain Spaulding, Captain Sprawling, Cindy Lou, Coatue Management, DFJ Growth, Ezinecentre, Facebook, Freehostingeu, General Atlantic, Google, Itochu Technology Ventures, Jimbo King, Long Dong, Long John, Macnica Networks USA, Inc., Mitsui & Co, My Social Hub XP, New Enterprise Associates, Nuke Dukem, Peter Will Harden, SAP Ventures, Scale Venture Partners, Social Capital Partnership, TPG Capital, Telefonica Digital, Telstra, and Telstra Ventures Group, Thereal Mikesmith, Thereal Mikesmith 1ER, Tucows Inc., Jon Jones, Whistle Dick filed by Michael Henry Smith. (Referred to MJ/Cassady on 4/26/16) (tot)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order re: pretrial conference held on 3/21/16. Plf is to file an amended complaint as set out NLT 4/22/2016. Plf's #4 MOTION to Proceed with Discovery is DENIED without prejudice as set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/22/2016. (copy mailed to Plf on 3/22/16) (tot)
March 21, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/21/2016. (Digital Audio Recording) (eec)
March 17, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed with for Discovery by Michael Henry Smith. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Discovery Request); Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (mab)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order re: #1 Complaint filed by Michael Henry Smith, ( Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2016 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.) Plaintiff is ordered to appear at the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/1/2016. Copy mailed to Plaintiff (eec)
February 26, 2016 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Henry Smith. (Referred to Judge William E. Cassady(PSU) on 2/29/16). (tot)
February 26, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Michael Henry Smith. (Attachments: #1 List of Defendants Not Protected by Aliases & Their Addresses, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Referred to MJ/Cassady(PSU) on 2/29/16) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Alphabet Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telstra, and Telstra Ventures Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ala Kid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Dong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itochu Technology Ventures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coatue Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Atlantic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whistle Dick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Lou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scale Venture Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFJ Growth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beam.to
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Will Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thereal Mikesmith 1ER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tucows Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bessemer Venture Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telefonica Digital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ezinecentre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Social Hub XP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attractsoft GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAP Ventures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freehostingeu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Enterprise Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Box/Box, Inc./Open Box/Medxt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Sprawling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macnica Networks USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuke Dukem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social + Capital Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thereal Mikesmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automatic/Gravatar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brianna Nathaly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimbo King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Henry Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?