Friendly House, et al., v. Whiting, et al. Featured Case
Plaintiff: C.M., Jose Angel Vargas, Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Andrew Anderson, Border Action Network, Jim Shee, Luz Santiago, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Japanese American Citizens League, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Southside Presbyterian Church, Muslim American Society, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, Friendly House, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, John Doe, Service Employees International Union, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Vicki Gaubeca and Jane Doe
Defendant: Michael B Whiting, Edward G Rheinheimer, David W Rozema, Daisy Flores, Kenny Angle, Derek D Rapier, Sam Vederman, Richard M Romley, Matthew J Smith, Bradley Carlyon, Barbara LaWall, James P Walsh, George Silva, Sheila S Polk, Jon R Smith, Joseph Dedman, Jr., Larry A Dever, Bill Pribil, John R Armer, Preston J Allred, Steven N Tucker, Donald Lowery, Joseph M Arpaio, Tom Sheahan, Kelly Clark, Clarence W Dupnik, Paul Babeu, Tony Estrada, Steve Waugh, Ralph Ogden and Duncan Hunter
Intervenor_defendant: Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer and Phoenix Law Enforcement Association
Amicus: Legal Momentum, National Council of La Raza, American Immigration Lawyers Association, International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Hispanic National Bar Association, Los Abogados Hispanic Bar Association of Arizona, United States Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Los Angeles, County of, Santa Clara, County of, Baltimore, City of, Berkeley, City of, Los Angeles, City of, Minneapolis, City of, Monterey, County of, New Haven, City of, Palo Alto, City of, Portland, City of, Saint Paul, City of, San Francisco, City of, San Francisco, County of, San Jose, City of, Seattle, City of, Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice, Asian American Institute, Anti-Defamation League, United Mexican States, American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, Asian American Legal Defense Fund, Center for Community Change, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights of Los Angeles, Equal Justice Society, Hebrew Immigrant Aid Society, Immigration Equality, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, National Asian Pacific American Bar Association, National Black Law Students Association, National Center for Lesbian Rights, National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, National Korean American Service and Education Consortium, National Organization for Mexican American Rights, OneAmerica, Organization of Chinese Americans, Public Counsel, Society of American Law Teachers, Southern Center for Human Rights, Arab American Institute, Arizona Asian-American Bar Association, Arizona Opportunities Industrialization Center, Asian Law Caucus, BPSOS Incorporated, Clergy & Laity United for Economic Justice, Greater Phoenix Urban League, Hispanic Bar Association of New Jersey, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund Incorporated, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area, League of Woman Voters of Arizona, League of Woman Voters of the United States, Muslim Advocates, Muslim Public Affairs Counsel, New York Immigrant Coalition, Progressive Jewish Alliance, Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund, American Bar Association, American Unity Legal Defense Fund, Inc., Ecuador, Republic of, Argentine, Republic of, Washington Legal Foundation, Tohono O'Odham Nation, El Paso, City of, San Mateo, County of, United States Conference of Mayors, Landmark Legal Foundation, Bolivia, Plurinational State of, Peru, Republic of, American Immigration Control Foundation, Dan Burton, Trent Franks, Sam Graves, Wally Herger, Steve King, Doug Lamborn, Cynthia Lummis, Tom McClintock, Gary Miller, Jerry Moran, Sue Myrick, National Border Patrol Council, Russell Pearce, Ted Poe, Denny Rehberg, Phil Roe, Dana Rohrabacher, Mike Simpson, Lamar Smith, Allied Educational Foundation, El Salvador, Republic of, Paraguay, Republic of, Concerned Citizens and Friends of Illegal Immigration Law Enforcement, Colombia, Republic of, Guatemala, Nicaragua, Republic of, Costa Rica, Republic of and Chile, Republic of
Movant: First Amendment Coalition of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2010cv01061
Filed: May 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER that the 452 Motion for Partial Reconsideration will be denied within 3 days of the date of this order if counsel does not comply with the ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, Section II(D), specifically, subparagraph 3. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/03/10. (ESL)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 453 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 25, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX102763 as to Benjamin J Maro. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 22, 2010 Filing 453 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Benjamin J Maro on behalf of Friendly House. (BAS)
October 22, 2010 Filing 452 MOTION for Reconsideration re 447 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Ruling,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Jane Doe(#2, proceeding under pseudonym), Jane Doe(#1, proceeding under pseudonym), John Doe, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of V.Viramontes in Supp. of Pls' Mot. for Partial Reconsideration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Viramontes, Victor)
October 22, 2010 Filing 451 Separate ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Joseph M Arpaio.(Liddy, Thomas)
October 22, 2010 Filing 450 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Larry A Dever.(Bergin, Brian)
October 22, 2010 Filing 449 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer.(Bouma, John)
October 22, 2010 Filing 448 Pinal County Defendants' ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Paul Babeu, James P Walsh.(Albo, Joe)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER granting in part and denying in part the Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants Pinal County Sheriff Paul Babeu and Pinal County Attorney James P. Walsh 204 , Defendant Maricopa County Sheriff Joseph Arpaio 205 , and Intervenor Defendant Arizona Governor Janice K. Brewer 238 ; the following of Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed for lack of standing: violation of the First Amendment (Count 3) only as far as Plaintiffs challenge Section 2 of S.B. 1070; violation of the right to travel under the Privileges and Immunities Clause (Count 7); Plaintiffs fail to state a claim upon which relief can be granted for the following claims: violation of the First Amendment (Count 3) only as far as Plaintiffs challenge A.R.S. § 13-2928(C) of Section 5 of S.B. 1070; violation of the Due Process Clause (Count 6) only as far as Plaintiffs challenge Sections 2 and 5 of S.B. 1070 for vagueness; Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are denied for the balance of Plaintiffs' claims; denying as moot Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 235 and Request for Order on Pending Motion 430 . Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/8/10.(REW)
October 5, 2010 Remark as to attornes Cory L Andrews, Daniel J Popeo, and Richard A Sump - removed per counsel's request; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 445 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 4, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX101910 as to Laura D Blackburne. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 4, 2010 Filing 445 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Laura D Blackburne on behalf of Andrew Anderson. (BAS)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER granting the 443 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, that attorney Ghazal Tajmiri be relieved as attorney of record for Plaintiffs FRIENDLY HOUSE, et al.. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 09/21/10.(ESL)
September 17, 2010 Filing 443 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ghazal Tajmiri by Friendly House. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joaquin, Linton)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER granting 441 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Harini Raghupathi is relieved as attorney of record for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/7/10.(REW)
September 3, 2010 Filing 441 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Harini Raghupathi by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Jane Doe(#2, proceeding under pseudonym), Jane Doe(#1, proceeding under pseudonym), John Doe, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Raghupathi, Harini)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER denying the 403 Motion for Leave to Join Amicus Curiae Brief of the United Mexican States (Republic of Costa Rica) and the 421 Motion for Leave to Join Amicus Curiae Brief of the United Mexican States (Republic of Chile). Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 09/02/10. (ESL)
August 26, 2010 Filing 439 NOTICE of Change of Address by Anne Lai (Lai, Anne)
August 23, 2010 Filing 438 REPLY to Response to Motion re 430 MOTION for Ruling re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Jane Doe(#2, proceeding under pseudonym), Jane Doe(#1, proceeding under pseudonym), John Doe, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Jadwat, Omar)
August 16, 2010 Filing 437 RESPONSE to Motion re 430 MOTION for Ruling re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Bouma, John)
August 9, 2010 Filing 436 REPLY to Response to Motion re 430 MOTION for Ruling re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 435 MOTION for Joinder in Defendants Paul Babeu and James P. Walsh's Response to Plaintiff's Request for Order on Pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Jane Doe(#2, proceeding under pseudonym), Jane Doe(#1, proceeding under pseudonym), John Doe, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Jadwat, Omar)
August 2, 2010 Filing 435 MOTION for Joinder in Defendants Paul Babeu and James P. Walsh's 434 Response to Plaintiff's Request for Order on Pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A [Proposed] Order)(Liddy, Thomas) Modified on 8/3/2010 to create document linkage. (ESL).
August 2, 2010 Filing 434 RESPONSE to Motion re 430 Motion for Ruling by Defendants Paul Babeu, James P Walsh. (Albo, Joe) Correction: incorrect event selected. Modified on 8/2/2010 (ESL).
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 431 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 432 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 30, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX099621 as to John Nibbelin, Michael P Murphy. (BAS)
July 30, 2010 Filing 432 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney John D Nibbelin on behalf of San Mateo, County of. (BAS)
July 30, 2010 Filing 431 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Michael P Murphy on behalf of San Mateo, County of. (BAS)
July 30, 2010 Filing 430 MOTION for Ruling re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Jane Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Attachments: # 1 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)(Jadwat, Omar) CORRECTION: Incorrect event selected. Modified on 8/2/2010 (ESL).
July 30, 2010 Filing 429 Remark as to attorney Laura Blackburne - removed for noncompliance with admissions procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. (BAS)
July 30, 2010 Remark as to attorney mark R Levin of Landmark Legal Foundation - removed per attorney request- party represented by other admitted counsel. (BAS)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER granting 413 Ex Parte Motion for Withdrawal of James Neil Lombardo in his capacity as counsel for the National Council of La Raza. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/30/10.(REW)
July 29, 2010 Filing 427 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM requested by Los Angeles, County of for proceedings held on July 22, 2010 before Judge Susan Bolton. (Lehman, Jennifer)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 425 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 28, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX099535 as to Kimberley A Morris. (BAS)
July 28, 2010 Filing 425 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Kimberley A Morris on behalf of C.M.. (BAS)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 424 NOTICE OF ORDER in CV10-1413-PHX-SRB. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 07/28/10. (note: see attached pdf for complete details)(ESL)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER, the 413 EX PARTE MOTION For Withdrawal of Counsel James Neil Lombardo by National Council of La Raza will be denied within 3 days if counsel does not comply with the ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, Section II(G), specifically, subparagraph 1b. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/27/10. (REW)
July 27, 2010 Filing 420 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Motion Hearing held on 07/22/2010 before Judge Susan R Bolton. Court Reporter: Elizabeth A Lemke. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/17/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2010. (BAS)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 417 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 418 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 27, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX099377 as to Garrett Roe. (BAS)
July 27, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX099376 as to Michael M Hethmon. (BAS)
July 26, 2010 Filing 422 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chile, Republic of re 421 MOTION for Leave to Join: Amicus Curiae Brief. (ESL)
July 26, 2010 Filing 421 MOTION for Leave to Join: 299 Amicus Curiae Brief of the United Mexican States, by Chile, Republic of. (ESL)
July 26, 2010 Filing 418 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Michael M Hethmon on behalf of Phoenix Law Enforcement Association. (BAS)
July 26, 2010 Filing 417 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Garrett Roe on behalf of Phoenix Law Enforcement Association. (BAS)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 414 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 415 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 26, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX099372 as to Stephen Paul Berzon, Jonathan Weissglass. (BAS)
July 26, 2010 Filing 415 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Stephen P. Berzon by Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Berzon, Stephen)
July 26, 2010 Filing 414 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jonathan Weissglass by Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Weissglass, Jonathan)
July 26, 2010 Filing 413 EX PARTE MOTION For Withdrawal of Counsel James Neil Lombardo by National Council of La Raza. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cherny, Stephanie)
July 26, 2010 Filing 412 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer for proceedings held on 07-22-10 before Judge Bolton. (Bouma, John)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 409 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 410 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 407 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 26, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098988 as to John Daniel Reaves. (BAS)
July 23, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX099358 as to Charlie F McNabb, Jr, Laura Prendergast Gordon. (BAS)
July 23, 2010 Filing 410 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Charlie F McNabb Jr on behalf of El Paso, City of. (BAS)
July 23, 2010 Filing 409 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Laura Prendergast Gordon on behalf of El Paso, City of. (BAS)
July 23, 2010 Filing 407 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney John Daniel Reaves on behalf of United States Conference of Mayors. (BAS)
July 23, 2010 Filing 406 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM RE Oral Argument by Joseph M Arpaio for proceedings held on 07-22-2010 before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Liddy, Thomas)
July 23, 2010 Filing 405 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Jane Doe(#2, proceeding under pseudonym), Jane Doe(#1, proceeding under pseudonym), John Doe, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa for proceedings held on 7/22/2010 before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Lai, Anne)
July 22, 2010 Filing 404 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Motion Hearing held on 7/22/2010 re Plaintiffs' 235 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 204 , 205 and 238 ). IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement Plaintiffs' 235 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 204 , 205 and 238 ).(Court Reporter Elizabeth Lemke.)(ESL)
July 21, 2010 Filing 403 MOTION for Leave to Join: Amicus Curiae of the United Mexican States by Costa Rica, Republic of. (ESL)
July 21, 2010 Filing 402 RESPONSE to Amicus Curiae Briefs filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Intervenor Defendants Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Bouma, John)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 399 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 400 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 21, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX099263 as to Richard P Hutchison. (BAS)
July 21, 2010 Filing 400 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Richard P Hutchison on behalf of Landmark Legal Foundation. (BAS)
July 21, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX099265 as to Michael J ONeill. (BAS)
July 21, 2010 Filing 399 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Michael J ONeill on behalf of Landmark Legal Foundation. (BAS)
July 21, 2010 Notice of request for e-notices by Kenneth D. Nyman. (Nyman, Kenneth)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER denying First Amendment Coalition of Arizona's 308 Motion to Participate For Limited Purpose of Requesting Camera Coverage of July 22, 2010 Hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no audio/video recording of the arguments on July 22, 2010 will be permitted. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 07/20/10. (Attachments: # 1 Letter dated 11/05/07, # 2 Letter dated 07/23/09, # 3 Letter dated 09/23/09)(ESL)
July 20, 2010 Filing 397 Joinder in Intervenor-Defendant Governor Brewer's 329 Response to Plaintiff's 235 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Joseph M Arpaio. (Liddy, Thomas) Modified on 7/21/2010 CORRECTED: linkage added (REW).
July 20, 2010 Filing 396 Joinder in the State of Arizona's 329 Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Paul Babeu. (Albo, Joe) Modified on 7/20/2010 to create document linkage.(ESL).
July 20, 2010 Filing 395 ERRATA re 379 Reply re Motion to Dismiss by Paul Babeu, James P Walsh (Albo, Joe) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. Modified on 7/20/2010 (ESL).
July 19, 2010 Filing 394 REPLY in Support re 238 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Tom Tardy)(Bouma, John)
July 19, 2010 Filing 393 Joinder in Defendants Paul Babeu and James P. Walsh's 379 Reply to Response to Motion -AND- Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motions to Dismiss by Defendant Joseph M Arpaio. (Liddy, Thomas) Modified on 7/20/2010 to create document linkage.(ESL).
July 19, 2010 Filing 392 RESPONSE to Motion re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Matthew J Smith. (Taylor, Robert) CORRECTION: document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c). Modified on 7/20/2010 (ESL).
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 390 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 19, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX099114 as to Erin Archerd. (BAS)
July 19, 2010 Filing 390 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Erin Archerd on behalf of American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, Asian American Institute, Asian American Legal Defense Fund, Center for Community Change, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights of Los Angeles, Equal Justice Society, Hebrew Immigrant Aid Society, Immigration Equality, Mexican American Bar Association of Texas, National Asian Pacific American Bar Association, National Black Law Students Association, National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, National Korean American Service and Education Consortium, National Organization for Mexican American Rights, OneAmerica, Organization of Chinese Americans, Sheila S Polk, Public Counsel, Society of American Law Teachers, and Southern Center for Human Rights. (BAS)
July 19, 2010 Filing 389 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF in Support of Defendants' 238 MOTION to Dismiss and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Intervenor Defendant Phoenix Law Enforcement Association. (REW)
July 19, 2010 Filing 388 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Amicus Landmark Legal Foundation. (REW)
July 19, 2010 Filing 387 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF in Support of Plaintiffs' 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Amicus Tohono O'Odham Nation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(REW)
July 19, 2010 Filing 386 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF in Oppposition to Plaintiffs' 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Amicus Parties Allied Educational Foundation, American Immigration Control Foundation, Dan Burton, Concerned Citizens and Friends of Illegal Immigration Law Enforcement, Trent Franks, Sam Graves, Wally Herger, Steve King, Doug Lamborn, Cynthia Lummis, Tom McClintock, Gary Miller, Jerry Moran, Sue Myrick, National Border Patrol Council, Russell Pearce, Ted Poe, Denny Rehberg, Phil Roe, Dana Rohrabacher, Mike Simpson, Lamar Smith, Washington Legal Foundation, Defendant Duncan Hunter.(REW)
July 19, 2010 Filing 385 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF in Opposition to Plaintiffs' 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and in Support of Defendants' 238 MOTION to Dismiss by Amicus American Unity Legal Defense Fund, Inc. (REW)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER. The following Amicus Curiae briefs are ordered filed as of this date: 326 , 347 , 351 , 353 , 358 ; granting the following Motions for Leave to Join Amicus Curiae Briefs: 332 , 334 , 350 , 362 , 364 , 369 , 371 , 373 , 375 , 377 ; granting the following Motions to File Amicus Curiae Briefs: 325 , 345 , 346 , 352 ; the following Motion is granted in part, with regard to participation as Amicus Curiae: 357 . Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/19/10.(REW)
July 19, 2010 Remark as to attorney Ronald Lee - per firm request (Asian Pacific American Legal Center) no longer with firm and will not gain admission, party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. (BAS)
July 19, 2010 Filing 383 DECLARATION of Declaration of Elisabeth Neubauer in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Jane Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 3 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 3 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 4 - 7)(Neubauer, Elisabeth)
July 19, 2010 Filing 382 REPLY in Support re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Jane Doe(#2, proceeding under pseudonym), Jane Doe(#1, proceeding under pseudonym), John Doe, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Neubauer, Elisabeth)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 380 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 16, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX099096 as to Lisa Kung. (BAS)
July 16, 2010 Filing 380 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lisa Kung on behalf of plaintiffs. (BAS)
July 16, 2010 Filing 379 REPLY to Response to Motion re 204 First MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Paul Babeu, James P Walsh. (Albo, Joe)
July 15, 2010 Filing 378 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by El Salvador, Republic of re 377 MOTION for Leave to Join: Amicus Curiae Brief. (REW)
July 15, 2010 Filing 377 MOTION for Leave to Join: Amicus Curiae Brief of the United Mexican States by El Salvador, Republic of. (REW)
July 15, 2010 Filing 376 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paraguay, Republic of re 375 MOTION for Leave to Join: Amicus Curiae Brief (REW)
July 15, 2010 Filing 375 MOTION for Leave to Join: Amicus Curiae Brief of the United Mexican States by Paraguay, Republic of. (REW)
July 15, 2010 Filing 374 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nicaragua, Republic of re 373 MOTION for Leave to Join: Amicus Curiae Brief (REW)
July 15, 2010 Filing 373 MOTION for Leave to Join: Amicus Curiae Brief of the United Mexican States by Nicaragua, Republic of. (REW)
July 15, 2010 Filing 372 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Guatemala re 371 MOTION for Leave to Join: Amicus Curiae Brief (REW)
July 15, 2010 Filing 371 MOTION for Leave to Join: Amicus Curiae Brief of the United Mexican States by Guatemala. (REW)
July 15, 2010 Filing 370 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Colombia, Republic of re 369 MOTION for Leave to Join: Amicus Curiae Brief. (REW)
July 15, 2010 Filing 369 MOTION for Leave to Join: 299 Amicus Curiae Brief of the Unitd Mexican States by Colombia, Republic of. (REW)
July 15, 2010 Filing 368 Joinder re 317 Response to Motion, 329 Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Larry A Dever. (Bergin, Brian)
July 15, 2010 Filing 367 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian McCormack Bergin on behalf of Larry A Dever (Bergin, Brian)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER granting Defendant Larry Dever's 339 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw Britt Hanson as Attorney; counsel for Defendant Larry Dever is now: Brian M Bergin and Kenneth M Frakes. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/15/10.(REW)
July 14, 2010 Filing 365 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peru, Republic of re 364 MOTION for Leave to Join: Amicus Curiae Brief. (ESL)
July 14, 2010 Filing 364 MOTION for Leave to Join: 299 Amicus Curiae Brief of the United Mexican States, by Peru, Republic of. (ESL)
July 14, 2010 Filing 363 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bolivia, Plurinational State of re 362 MOTION for Leave to Join: Amicus Curiae Brief. (ESL)
July 14, 2010 Filing 362 MOTION for Leave to Join: 299 Amicus Curiae Brief of the United Mexican States by Bolivia, Plurinational State of. (ESL)
July 14, 2010 Filing 361 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 358 Lodged Proposed Document Order by Defendant Phoenix Law Enforcement Association. (Napier, Michael)
July 14, 2010 Filing 360 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 357 MOTION to Intervene Proposed Order for Permissive Intervention by Defendant Phoenix Law Enforcement Association. (Napier, Michael)
July 14, 2010 Filing 359 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 357 MOTION to Intervene Proposed Order as of right by Defendant Phoenix Law Enforcement Association. (Napier, Michael)
July 14, 2010 Filing 358 LODGED Proposed Amicus Brief re: 238 MOTION to Dismiss Case, 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Phoenix Law Enforcement Association. (Napier, Michael)
July 14, 2010 Filing 357 MOTION to Intervene by Phoenix Law Enforcement Association. (Napier, Michael)
July 14, 2010 Filing 356 BRIEF re Amicus Curiae Memorandum Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' 235 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by American Bar Association. (Dill, Sara) CORRECTION: Incorrect event selected. Modified on 8/2/2010 (ESL).
July 14, 2010 Filing 355 LODGED Proposed Revised Brief of Amicus Curiae American Bar Association re: 278 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum Brief. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by American Bar Association. (Dill, Sara)
July 14, 2010 Filing 354 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' 235 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by American Immigration Lawyers Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Resources)(Badrinath, Vikram) CORRECTION: Incorrect event selected. Modified on 8/2/2010 (ESL).
July 14, 2010 Filing 353 LODGED Proposed Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief re: 352 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Landmark Legal Foundation. (REW)
July 14, 2010 Filing 352 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Landmark Legal Foundation. (REW)
July 14, 2010 Filing 351 LODGED PROPOSED DOCUMENT Amicus Curiae Brief re 346 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae . Document to be filed by Clerk of Motion to File is granted. by Amicus Tohono O'odham Nation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jantzen, Jonathan) CORRECTION: Incorrect event selected. Modified on 7/15/2010 (ESL).
July 14, 2010 Filing 350 MOTION for Leave: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO JOIN THE 341 REVISED AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF OF THE COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA, ET AL., by El Paso, City of, San Mateo, County of, United States Conference of Mayors. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Greta) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. Modified on 7/15/2010 (ESL).
July 14, 2010 Filing 349 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Washington Legal Foundation, American Immigration Control Foundation, National Border Patrol Council, Allied Education Foundation and Concerned Citizens and Friends of Illegal Immigration Law Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Hardy, David) Modified on 7/15/2010 to add additional filers. (ESL).
July 14, 2010 Filing 348 NOTICE of Appearance by David T Hardy on behalf of Washington Legal Foundation (Hardy, David)
July 14, 2010 Filing 347 LODGED Proposed Proposed amicus brief. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Washington Legal Foundation. (Hardy, David)
July 14, 2010 Filing 346 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae by Tohono O'odham Nation. (Jantzen, Jonathan)
July 14, 2010 Filing 345 First MOTION to File Amicus Curiae by Washington Legal Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order granting leave to file amicus)(Hardy, David)
July 14, 2010 Filing 344 BRIEF re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AS AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Amicus Parties Hispanic National Bar Association, Los Abogados Hispanic Bar Association of Arizona, National Council of La Raza, United States Hispanic Chamber of Commerce. (Cherny, Stephanie)
July 14, 2010 Remark as to attorney Claudia McGee Henry -removed per attorney request, party represented by other admitted counsel. (BAS)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 316 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 14, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098990 as to Maria E Andrade. (BAS)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 342 TEXT ORDER: On July 22, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. the Court will first hear argument on the Motions to Dismiss followed by argument on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. On the three Motions to Dismiss, each Defendant will have the opportunity to argue followed by one argument by Plaintiffs in response to the three Motions to Dismiss. Each Defendant is allocated 7 minutes and may reserve part of that time for rebuttal. Defendants may agree among themselves to allocate the total time differently. Plaintiffs shall have 20 minutes of argument. On the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiffs shall have 40 minutes and Intervenor Defendant shall have 40 minutes. No other Defendant will be allocated oral argument time. The amicus filings will be considered on the papers only. Plaintiffs may reserve part of their 40 minutes for rebuttal.Only one lawyer may argue each motion but the Motions to Dismiss may be argued by a different lawyer than the Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Entered by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/14/10. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
July 14, 2010 Filing 341 BRIEF REVISED AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS 235 MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Amicus Parties Baltimore, City of, Berkeley, City of, Los Angeles, City of, Los Angeles, County of, Minneapolis, City of, Monterey, County of, New Haven, City of, Palo Alto, City of, Portland, City of, Saint Paul, City of, San Francisco, City of, San Francisco, County of, San Jose, City of, Santa Clara, County of, Seattle, City of. (Hansen, Greta) Modified on 7/15/2010 to create document linkage.(ESL).
July 14, 2010 Filing 340 BRIEF of Amici Curiae by Amicus Parties American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee, Arab American Institute, Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, Arizona Asian-American Bar Association, Arizona Opportunities Industrialization Center, Asian American Institute, Asian American Legal Defense Fund, Asian Law Caucus, BPSOS Incorporated, Center for Community Change, Clergy & Laity United for Economic Justice, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights of Los Angeles, Equal Justice Society, Greater Phoenix Urban League, Hebrew Immigrant Aid Society, Hispanic Bar Association of New Jersey, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund Incorporated, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area, League of Woman Voters of Arizona, League of Woman Voters of the United States, Muslim Advocates, Muslim Public Affairs Counsel, National Asian Pacific American Bar Association, National Black Law Students Association, National Center for Lesbian Rights, National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, National Korean American Service and Education Consortium, National Organization for Mexican American Rights, New York Immigrant Coalition, OneAmerica, Organization of Chinese Americans, Progressive Jewish Alliance, Public Counsel, Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund, Society of American Law Teachers, Southern Center for Human Rights. (Feng, Wendy)
July 13, 2010 Filing 339 EX PARTE DOCUMENT application for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (With Client Approval) by Defendant Larry A Dever. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Bergin, Brian)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 337 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 13, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098842 as to Carmen A Trutanich. (BAS)
July 13, 2010 Filing 336 BRIEF Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' 235 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Filed by Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice. (Euchner, David) CORRECTION: Incorrect event selected. Modified on 8/2/2010 (ESL).
July 13, 2010 Filing 331 RESPONSE in Opposition re 238 MOTION to Dismiss, 205 MOTION to Dismiss, 204 First MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Friendly House, et al. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Jennifer Allen, # 2 Declaration Joseph Hansen, # 3 Declaration Gail Gabler, # 4 Declaration Alison Harrington, # 5 Declaration C.M., # 6 Declaration Efran Sanchez, # 7 Declaration Jim Shee) (ESL)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting Pla's 313 Motion for Leave to file Brief in Excess of Page Limit, that Plas may file a consolidated opposition to the three pending motions to dismiss in excess of the page limit set forth in Local Rule 7.2(e). Plas' opposition shall not exceed 40 pages. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plas' Opposition to Motions to Dismiss and supporting declarations, which were lodged with Plas' Motion For Leave To File One Consolidated Opposition In Excess Of Page Limit To Three Motions To Dismiss, shall be filed forthwith. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 07/13/10. (ESL)
July 13, 2010 Filing 329 RESPONSE to Motion re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index and Exhibits A-L, # 2 Braddock Decl. and Exhibits 1-22, # 3 Braddock Decl. Exhibits 23-37)(ESL)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER that Intervenor Defendants' 318 Motion is granted and that the proposed Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, which Intervenor Defendants lodged with this Court on 07/09/10, shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs reply shall not exceed the eleven page limit set out in LRCiv. 7.2(e). Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 07/13/10. (ESL)
July 13, 2010 Filing 327 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Unity Legal Defense Fund, Inc.. (Zall, Barnaby)
July 13, 2010 Filing 326 LODGED Proposed Proposed Brief Amicus Curiae re: 325 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Supporting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by American Unity Legal Defense Fund, Inc.. (Zall, Barnaby)
July 13, 2010 Filing 325 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Supporting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by American Unity Legal Defense Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Zall, Barnaby)
July 12, 2010 Filing 335 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Argentine, Republic of re 334 MOTION for Leave to Join. (ESL)
July 12, 2010 Filing 334 MOTION for Leave to Join 299 Amicus Curiae Brief of the United Mexican States, by Argentine, Republic of. (ESL)
July 12, 2010 Filing 333 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ecuador, Republic of re 332 MOTION for Leave to Join. (ESL)
July 12, 2010 Filing 332 MOTION for Leave to Join 299 Amicus Curiae Brief of the United Mexican States, by Ecuador, Republic of. (ESL)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 322 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 323 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 12, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098861 as to J Richard Doyle. (BAS)
July 12, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098862 as to Nora V Frimann. (BAS)
July 12, 2010 Filing 323 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney J Richard Doyle on behalf of San Jose, City of. (BAS)
July 12, 2010 Filing 322 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Nora V Frimann on behalf of San Jose, City of. (BAS)
July 12, 2010 Notice of request for e-notices by Michael M. Walker. (Walker, Michael)
July 12, 2010 Filing 321 RESPONSE to Motion re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Donald Lowery, Sam Vederman. (Buckelew, Robert)
July 9, 2010 Filing 337 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Carmen A Trutanich on behalf of Los Angeles, City of. (BAS)
July 9, 2010 Filing 320 Joinder re 318 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants Richard M Romley, Arizona, State of filed by Richard M Romley, Arizona, State of. (White, Bruce) Modified on 7/12/2010 to create document linkage (ESL).
July 9, 2010 Filing 319 LODGED Proposed Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: 318 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index and Exhibits A-L, # 2 Exhibit Braddock Dec. and Exhibits 1-22, # 3 Exhibit Braddock Decl. Exhibits 23-37)(Bouma, John)
July 9, 2010 Filing 318 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bouma, John)
July 9, 2010 Filing 317 RESPONSE to Motion re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Joseph M Arpaio. (Liddy, Thomas)
July 9, 2010 Filing 316 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Maria E. Andrade by American Immigration Lawyers Association. (Andrade, Maria)
July 9, 2010 Filing 315 RESPONSE to Motion re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bradley Carlyon, Kelly Clark. (Payette, Lance)
July 9, 2010 Filing 314 LODGED Proposed Oppn to Mots to Dismiss. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Friendly House. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Affidavit, # 5 Affidavit, # 6 Affidavit, # 7 Affidavit)(Joaquin, Linton)
July 9, 2010 Filing 313 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for For One Consolidated Oppn by Friendly House. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joaquin, Linton)
July 9, 2010 Filing 312 RESPONSE to Motion re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kenny Angle, Preston J Allred. (Angle, Kenneth) Modified on 7/12/2010 to add additional filers. (ESL).
July 9, 2010 Filing 311 RESPONSE to Motion re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sheila S Polk, Steve Waugh. (Fields, Jack) Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c). Attorney noticed. Modified on 7/9/2010 (ESL).
July 9, 2010 Filing 310 RESPONSE to Motion re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Response of Defendants Coconino County Attorney David W. Rozema and Sheriff Bill Pribil filed by Bill Pribil, David W Rozema. (DAndrea, Michelle)
July 8, 2010 Filing 309 DECLARATION of Daniel C. Barr re 308 MOTION for To Participate for Limited Purpose of Requesting Camera Coverage of July 22, 2010 Hearing by Movant First Amendment Coalition of Arizona. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kruschek, Elizabeth)
July 8, 2010 Filing 308 MOTION for To Participate for Limited Purpose of Requesting Camera Coverage of July 22, 2010 Hearing by First Amendment Coalition of Arizona. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kruschek, Elizabeth)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 305 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 306 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 8, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098754 as to Gerald M Sato. (BAS)
July 8, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098755 as to William W Carter. (BAS)
July 8, 2010 Filing 306 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney William W Carter on behalf of Los Angeles, City of. (BAS)
July 8, 2010 Filing 305 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Gerald M Sato on behalf of Los Angeles, City of. (BAS)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER granting Defendant Sheriff Arpaio's 281 Motion for Hearing on Motion.Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2010 at 10:00 AM in Special Proceedings Courtroom #200, re: Motion to Dismiss 205 . Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/8/10.(REW)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER, the Court advises counsel that the hearing scheduled for July 22, 2010, at 10:00 a.m. will be held in Special Proceedings Courtroom #200. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/8/10. (REW)
July 8, 2010 Filing 302 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Joseph Dedman, Jr.(Young, Joseph)
July 8, 2010 Filing 301 ANSWER to Complaint by Michael B Whiting.(Young, Joseph)
July 8, 2010 Filing 300 RESPONSE to Motion re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Larry A Dever, Edward G Rheinheimer. (Hanson, Britt)
July 8, 2010 Filing 299 BRIEF of the United Mexican States as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs Pursuant to Court Order by Amicus Parties United Mexican States, United Mexican States filed by United Mexican States. (Gorniak, Carla)
July 7, 2010 Filing 298 RESPONSE to Motion re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Steven N Tucker. (McCarthy, Michael)
July 7, 2010 Filing 297 RESPONSE to Motion re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Derek D Rapier. (McCarthy, Michael)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 295 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 7, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098656 as to Henry L Solano. (BAS)
July 7, 2010 Filing 295 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Henry L Solano on behalf of United Mexican States. (BAS)
July 7, 2010 Filing 294 BRIEF Amicus Curiae in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Amicus Legal Momentum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A)(McCallum, Joanna)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 292 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 6, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098561 as to Chris Newman. (BAS)
July 6, 2010 Filing 292 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Chris Newman on behalf of plaintiff Friendly House. (BAS)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER that Defendant's 281 Motion to Request Oral Argument will be denied within 3 days of the date of this order if counsel does not comply with the ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, Page 12, Section G, specifically, subparagraph 1b. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 07/06/10. (ESL)
July 6, 2010 Filing 290 BRIEF re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Amicus Curiae) by Amicus Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. (Kruschek, Elizabeth)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 285 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 286 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 287 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 288 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 6, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098545 as to Barnaby W Zall. (BAS)
July 2, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 150, receipt number PHX098544 as to Vikki Cooper, Kathleen M Foster, Victor A Bolden. (BAS)
July 2, 2010 Filing 288 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Kathleen M Foster on behalf of New Haven, City of. (BAS)
July 2, 2010 Filing 287 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Victor A Bolden on behalf of New Haven, City of. (BAS)
July 2, 2010 Filing 286 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Vikki Cooper on behalf of New Haven, City of. (BAS)
July 2, 2010 Filing 285 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Barnaby W Zall on behalf of American Unity Legal Defense Fund, Inc. (BAS)
July 1, 2010 Filing 284 BRIEF of Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Amicus Anti-Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter S. Kozinets, # 2 Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit A-H, # 4 Exhibit I-R)(ESL)
July 1, 2010 Filing 283 AMICUS CURIAE in Support of Plaintiffs' 235 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Amicus International Longshore and Warehouse Union. (ESL) Modified on 7/1/2010 to create document linkage and update docket text (ESL).
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting the following motions: International Longshore and Warehouse Union's 145 Motion for Leave to Appear as Amicus Curiae in Support of, docket entry # 146 shall be deemed filed this date and Anti-Defamation League's 228 Motion for Leave to File of Amicus Curiae in Support of. Docket entry # 229 shall be deemed filed this date. Granting in part and denying in part the following motions: National Council of La Raza et al's 150 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief; Legal Momentum' 97 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of; 161 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law; County of Santa Clara, et al's 188 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of; Amended/Corrected 152 , 195 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Amercian Immigration Lawyerse Association; Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice's 198 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of; Asian American Institute and Other's 226 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of; United Mexican States' 230 Amended Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief; American Bar Association's 278 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plas' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. DENYING Legal Momentum's 132 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Excess of 17 Pages and County of Santa Clara, et al's 189 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Excess of Page Limit. Granting in part and denying in part Intervenor Dfts' 245 Motion for an Order Limiting Amici Curiae Briefing. Granting Intervenor Dfts' 246 Motion to Stay Responses to Amici Curiae Filings. That any revised Amicus Curiae brief be filed no later than Wednesday, 07/14/10. Intervenor Dfts may, but are not required to, submit Responses to these briefs no later than 07/21/10. That any other interested party wishing to file an Amicus Curiae brief must file a Motion for Leave and lodge the proposed brief not later than 07/14/10. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 07/01/10. (NOTE: See attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)
July 1, 2010 Filing 281 MOTION for Hearing on Motion re Defendant Sheriff Joseph M. Arpaio's Motion to Dismiss by Joseph M Arpaio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Liddy, Thomas)
July 1, 2010 Filing 280 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 269 Memorandum filed by American Bar Association. Description of deficiency: Leave of Court required to file a document. Please see attached pdf for complete details. No follow up is required. (ESL)
June 30, 2010 Filing 279 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Elizabeth Dill on behalf of American Bar Association (Dill, Sara)
June 30, 2010 Filing 278 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum Brief by American Bar Association. (Dill, Sara)
June 30, 2010 Filing 277 RESPONSE in Opposition re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum filed by Paul Babeu, James P Walsh. (Albo, Joe)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER setting oral argument on Plaintiffs' 235 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Defendants Pinal County Sheriff, Paul Babeu, and Pinal County Attorney James P. Walsh's 204 Motion to Dismiss, and Intervenor Defendant Governor Brewer's 238 Motion to Dismiss for 07/22/10 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 502, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 06/30/10. (ESL)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 270 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 271 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 272 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 274 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 30, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098469 as to Gerald T Hendrickson. (BAS)
June 30, 2010 Filing 274 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Gerald T Hendrickson on behalf of Saint Paul, City of. (BAS)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting the Joint 263 Motion Proposing Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendants' Motions to Dismiss; that oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are due on or before 07/09/10; that replies in support of the motions are due on or before 07/19/10. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 06/30/10. (ESL)
June 30, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098472 as to Charles J McKee. (BAS)
June 30, 2010 Filing 272 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Charles J McKee on behalf of Monterey, County of. (BAS)
June 30, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098473 as to William Litt. (BAS)
June 30, 2010 Filing 271 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney William M Litt on behalf of Monterey, County of. (BAS)
June 30, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098478 as to Zachary D Cowan. (BAS)
June 30, 2010 Filing 270 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Zachary D Cowan on behalf of Berkeley, City of. (BAS)
June 30, 2010 Filing 269 LODGED PROPOSED DOCUMENT re: 278 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum Brief of Amicus Curiae American Bar Association in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Amicus. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File is granted. filed by American Bar Association. (Dill, Sara)CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (memorandum) to (lodged proposed document) Modified on 7/1/2010 (ESL).
June 30, 2010 Filing 268 Notice re Election of District Judge Option by Michael B Whiting (Young, Joseph)
June 29, 2010 Filing 267 RESPONSE in Opposition re 245 MOTION for Order Limiting Amici Curiae Briefing filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Jane Doe(#2, proceeding under pseudonym), Jane Doe(#1, proceeding under pseudonym), John Doe, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Neubauer, Elisabeth)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 265 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 29, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098437 as to Sara Elizabeth Dill. (BAS)
June 29, 2010 Filing 265 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Sara Elizabeth Dill on behalf of American Bar Association. (BAS)
June 29, 2010 Filing 264 STATUS REPORT on Pending Motions in CV-10-1061 PHX-SRB by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Jane Doe(#2, proceeding under pseudonym), Jane Doe(#1, proceeding under pseudonym), John Doe, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Neubauer, Elisabeth)
June 28, 2010 Filing 263 MOTION re Proposed Briefing Schedule For Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction and Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Plaintiff Friendly House. (Viramontes, Victor) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected. This entry has been modified from (joinder) to (motion) Modified on 6/28/2010 (ESL).
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 260 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 261 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 28, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098359 as to William Rowe Phelan, Jr. (BAS)
June 28, 2010 Filing 261 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney William Rowe Phelan Jr on behalf of Baltimore, City of. (BAS)
June 28, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX093858 as to George A Nilson. (BAS)
June 28, 2010 Filing 260 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney George A Nilson on behalf of Baltimore, City of. (BAS)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 252 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 253 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 254 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 255 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 256 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 257 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 258 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 28, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098335 as to Gary M Baum. (BAS)
June 28, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098336 as to Peter S Holmes. (BAS)
June 28, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098342 as to Linda Meng. (BAS)
June 28, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098345 as to Jean Boler. (BAS)
June 25, 2010 Filing 258 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Gary M Baum on behalf of Palo Alto, City of. (BAS)
June 25, 2010 Filing 257 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Peter Holmes on behalf of Seattle, City of. (BAS)
June 25, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098341 as to Stephen N Zack. (BAS)
June 25, 2010 Filing 256 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Stephen N Zack on behalf of American Bar Association. (BAS)
June 25, 2010 Filing 255 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Linda Meng on behalf of Portland, City of. (BAS)
June 25, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX098353 as to Susan L Segal, Peter William Ginder. (BAS)
June 25, 2010 Filing 254 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Peter W Ginder on behalf of Minneapolis, City of. (BAS)
June 25, 2010 Filing 253 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Susan L Segal on behalf of by Minneapolis, City of. (BAS)
June 25, 2010 Filing 252 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jean Boler on behalf of Seattle, City of. (BAS)
June 25, 2010 Filing 251 RESPONSE in Opposition re 230 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae [AMENDED] Brief of the United Mexican States filed by Joseph M Arpaio. (Liddy, Thomas)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting the Pla's Motion to Transfer Related Case (docket #8 filed in CV10-926-PHX-SRB). Further ordered granting the Motion to Transfer Related Cases to this Court filed by Governor Brewer (docket 13 filed in CV10-926-PHX-SRB. Further ordered transferring the following cases to this Court: CV 10-249-TUC-DCB, CV 10-951-PHX-ROS, and CV 10-1061-PHX-JWS. Directing the Plas in CV 10-926-PHX-SRB, CV 10-943-PHX-SRB, CV 10-249-TUC-DCB, CV 10-951-PHX-ROS, and CV 10-1061-PHX-JWS to file a notice summarizing all pending motions in each case and the briefing status of those motions, no later than 5:00 p.m. on 06/29/10. It is further ordered that all future filings in the transferred cases shall bear the following case numbers: CV 10-249-TUC-SRB, CV 10-951-PHX-SRB, and CV 10-1061-PHX-SRB. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 06/25/10. (ESL)
June 24, 2010 Filing 249 Notice re Response to Joinder in Requests for Consolidation by Janice K Brewer (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Bouma, John)
June 24, 2010 Filing 248 ANSWER to Complaint by Edward G Rheinheimer.(Hanson, Britt)
June 24, 2010 Filing 247 ANSWER to Complaint by Larry A Dever.(Hanson, Britt)
June 23, 2010 Filing 246 MOTION to Stay re Responses to Amici Curiae Filings by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bouma, John)
June 23, 2010 Filing 245 MOTION for Order Limiting Amici Curiae Briefing by Arizona, State of, Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bouma, John)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 240 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 241 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 242 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 243 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 23, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098282 as to Carla Gorniak. (BAS)
June 23, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098279 as to Christopher R Clark. (BAS)
June 23, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098285 as to Richard Anthony Lopez. (BAS)
June 23, 2010 Filing 243 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Richard Anthony Lopez on behalf of Arab American Institute, Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services, Arizona Asian-American Bar Association, Arizona Opportunities Industrialization Center, Asian American Legal Defense Fund, Asian Law Caucus, BPSOS, Inc., Center for Community Change, Clergy & Laity United for Economic Justice, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights of Los Angeles (CHIRLA), Equal Justice Society, Hebrew Immigrant Aid Society, Hispanic Bar Association of New Jersey, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigration Equality, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area, League of Woman Voters of Arizona, League of Woman Voters of the United States, Muslim Advocates, Muslim Public Affairs Counsel, National Asian Pacific American Bar Association, National Black Law Students Association (NBLSA), National Center for Lesbian Rights, National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild, National Korean American Service and Education Consortium (NAKASEC), National Organization for Mexican American Rights (NOMAR), New York Immigrant Coalition, OneAmerica, Organization of Chinese Americans, Progressive Jewish Alliance, Public Counsel, Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund, Society of American Law Teachers (SALT), Southern Center for Human Rights. (BAS)
June 23, 2010 Filing 242 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Carla Gorniak on behalf of United Mexican States. (BAS)
June 23, 2010 Filing 241 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Christopher R Clark on behalf of United Mexican States. (BAS)
June 23, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098290 as to Carolyn B Lamm. (BAS)
June 23, 2010 Filing 240 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Carolyn B Lamm on behalf of amicus American Bar Association. (BAS)
June 23, 2010 Filing 239 Joinder IN REQUESTS FOR CONSOLIDATION by Intervenor Plaintiffs Flagstaff, City of, San Luis, City of, Somerton, City of, Tolleson, City of. (Rivera, Jose)
June 23, 2010 Remark as to attorney Ronald Lee- removed per attorney request, party and/or parties represented by other admitted counsel. (BAS)
June 23, 2010 Filing 237 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Jane Doe(#2, proceeding under pseudonym), Jane Doe(#1, proceeding under pseudonym), John Doe, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. Sam Vederman served on 6/8/2010. (Lai, Anne)
June 23, 2010 Filing 234 MINUTE ORDER granting 213 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Henceforth, the State of Arizona shall be represented by Messrs. Bouma, Henry and Adams of the law firm of Snell & Wilmer and by Joseph A. Kanefield in the office of the Governor of Arizona. (LAD)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 214 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 215 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 22, 2010 Filing 231 LODGED Proposed Brief of The United Mexican States as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs re: 230 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae [AMENDED]. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by United Mexican States. (Flores, Albert)
June 22, 2010 Filing 230 AMENDED MOTION to File Amicus Curiae by United Mexican States. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Flores, Albert) Modified on 6/23/2010 (LSP), INCORRECT event, modified to Amended Motion.
June 21, 2010 Filing 238 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Intervenor Defendant Janice K Brewer. (ESL)
June 21, 2010 Filing 236 Additional Attachments (DECLARATIONS) to Main Document re 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: Declaration of Samuel Granato # 1 Declaration of Joseph T. Hansen, # 2 Decl of Luis Ibarra, # 3 Decl of Abraham F. Lowenthal, # 4 Exhibits to decl of Abraham F Lowenthal, # 5 Decl of Eliseo Medina, # 6 Exhibits to Decl of Eliseo Medina, # 7 Decl of Doris Meissner, # 8 Exhibits to Decl of Doris Meissner, # 9 Decl of Tupac Enrique, # 10 Decl of Jose Angel Vargas, # 11 Decl of Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa, # 12 Decl of Jane Doe 1 (redacted))(KMG)
June 21, 2010 Filing 235 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support by Plas (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susuan Boyd, # 2 Index and Exhibits to Decl of S Boyd, # 3 Decl of Andrew Anderson, # 4 Decl of Bo Cooper, # 5 Exhibits to Decl of Bo Cooper, # 6 Decl of George Gascon, # 7 Decl of Vicki Gaubeca, # 8 Decl of Eduardo Gonzalez)(KMG)
June 21, 2010 Filing 233 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 21, 2010 Filing 229 LODGED Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae The Anti-Defamation League in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Anti-Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Peter S. Kozinets in Support of Brief of Amicus Curiae The Anti-Defamation League, # 2 Appendix Index of Exhibits to Peter S. Kozinets' Declaration in Support of Brief of Amicus Curiae The Anti-Defamation League, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits A-H, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits I-R)(Kozinets, Peter)
June 21, 2010 Filing 228 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Anti-Defamation League in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Anti-Defamation League. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Anti-Defamation League)(Kozinets, Peter)
June 21, 2010 Filing 227 LODGED Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief of Asian American Institute and Other Amici Curiae re: 226 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Asian American Institute. (Feng, Wendy) Cover sheet missing. Modified on 6/22/2010 (ESL).
June 21, 2010 Filing 226 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Asian American Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List and Description of Amicus Curiae, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Feng, Wendy)
June 21, 2010 Filing 225 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Shawn Kozinets on behalf of Anti-Defamation League (Kozinets, Peter)
June 21, 2010 Filing 224 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER re 207 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant intervenor Brewer's motion at docket 207 to file a 34-page brief in support of her motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The brief shall be filed upon receipt of this order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JWS)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 217 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 219 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 220 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 221 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 222 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 21, 2010 Filing 222 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Tamara Lange on behalf of Santa Clara, County of. (BAS)
June 21, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098159 as to Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal. (BAS)
June 21, 2010 Filing 221 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Ivan E Espinoza-Madrigal on behalf of plaintiffs. (BAS)
June 21, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098160 as to Wayne Snodgrass. (BAS)
June 21, 2010 Filing 220 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Wayne Snodgrass on behalf of San Francisco, City of, San Francisco, County of. (BAS)
June 21, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098161 as to Dennis J Herrera. (BAS)
June 21, 2010 Filing 219 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Dennis J Herrera on behalf of San Francisco, City of, San Francisco, County of. (BAS)
June 21, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX0137890 as to Aileen Wheeler. (BAS)
June 21, 2010 Filing 218 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER re 69 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff's' motion at docket 69 to file a brief not to exceed 40 pages is GRANTED for good cause shown. The lodged brief shall be filed upon receipt of this order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JWS)
June 21, 2010 Filing 217 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Aileen Wheeler on behalf of Asian American Institute. (BAS)
June 21, 2010 Filing 216 First MOTION for Leave to File AMICAS BRIEF by United Mexican States. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flores, Albert) Modified on 6/22/2010 (SAT). CORRECTION: Docket text modified to identify correct filer.
June 21, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX0137890 as to Michael M Markman. (BAS)
June 21, 2010 Filing 215 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Michael M Markman on behalf of Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona and other proposed amicus parties. (BAS)
June 21, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX0137890 as to Wendy L Feng. (BAS)
June 21, 2010 Filing 214 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Wendy L Feng on behalf of Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona and other amicus parties. (BAS)
June 21, 2010 Filing 213 MOTION/Notice re NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT-INTERVENOR STATE OF ARIZONA by Arizona, State of (O'Grady, Mary) Modified on 6/22/2010 (SAT). CORRECTION/NOTIFICATION: Docket text modified to reflect event corrected to Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting 3 Motion to proceed anonymously as follows - Pending any further order which might require choosing between proceeding as an identified party and being dismissed, John Doe #1, Jane Doe #1, and Jane Doe #2 may proceed anonymously. (DMT)
June 21, 2010 Filing 211 ANSWER to Complaint by John R Armer, Daisy Flores.(Chambers, Bryan)
June 21, 2010 Filing 210 Notice re Appearance (2nd Notice) by Joseph M Arpaio (Brandon, Maria)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER FROM CHAMBERS granting 81 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Richard M Romley answer due 6/30/2010(DMT)
June 18, 2010 Filing 208 LODGED Proposed Motion to Dismiss re: 207 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Janice K Brewer. (Bouma, John)
June 18, 2010 Filing 207 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bouma, John)
June 18, 2010 Filing 206 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Richard M Romley.(White, Bruce)
June 18, 2010 Filing 205 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Joseph M Arpaio. (Liddy, Thomas)
June 18, 2010 Filing 204 First MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Paul Babeu, James P Walsh. (Albo, Joe)
June 18, 2010 Filing 203 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Donald Lowery, Sam Vederman.(Buckelew, Robert)
June 18, 2010 Filing 202 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, of Defendants Graham County Attorney, Kenneth A. Angle and Graham County Sheriff, P.J. Allred by Kenny Angle.(Angle, Kenneth)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER FROM CHAMBERS granting 47 State of Arizona's Motion to Intervene; granting 51 Governor Brewer's Motion to Intervene. (DMT)
June 18, 2010 Filing 200 LODGED Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice re: 198 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice. (Bleier, Adam) Modified on 6/22/2010 (LSP), COVER sheet missing.
June 18, 2010 Filing 199 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Netel Bleier on behalf of Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice (Bleier, Adam)
June 18, 2010 Filing 198 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice. (Bleier, Adam)
June 17, 2010 Filing 197 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 17, 2010 Filing 196 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 17, 2010 Filing 195 MOTION for Leave to File as Amicus Curiae Brief by American Immigration Lawyers Association. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Badrinath, Vikram) Modified on 6/22/2010 (LSP).
June 17, 2010 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by Vikram Ketty Badrinath on behalf of American Immigration Lawyers Association (Badrinath, Vikram)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER: Pending before the Court in CV10-0926-PHX-SRB are two Motions to Transfer Related Cases. One filed by Defendant Governor Janice K. Brewer (dkt #13) requesting to transfer CV10-0249-TUC-DCB and CV10-0951-PHX-ROS to this Court and one filed by Plaintiffs in case number CV10-1061-PHX-JWS (dkt. #8). Any party who wishes to file a response either in opposition or in support of the Motions to Transfer must do so by 5:00 p.m. on June 23, 2010. Any response filed shall be filed in case number CV10-926-PHX SRB. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/17/10. (MAW)
June 17, 2010 Filing 192 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, Answer of Defendant Coconino County Attorney David W. Rozema by David W Rozema.(Wilcox, Jean)
June 17, 2010 Filing 191 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, Answer of Defendant Coconino County Sheriff Bill Pribil by Bill Pribil.(Wilcox, Jean)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 185 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 186 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 17, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098094 as to Cynthia Ann Aziz. (BAS)
June 17, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098096 as to Stephen W Manning. (BAS)
June 17, 2010 Filing 186 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Stephen W Manning on behalf of American Immigration Lawyers Association. (BAS)
June 17, 2010 Filing 185 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Cynthia Ann Aziz on behalf of American Immigration Lawyers Association. (BAS)
June 17, 2010 Filing 184 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 152 MOTION for Leave to File. Description of deficiency: Incorrect PDF document attached. (SAT)
June 17, 2010 Filing 183 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. Preston J Allred served on 6/2/2010; Kenny Angle served on 6/2/2010; Derek D Rapier served on 6/7/2010; Tom Sheahan served on 6/1/2010; Matthew J Smith served on 6/1/2010; Steven N Tucker served on 6/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Affidavit, # 5 Affidavit)(Lai, Anne)
June 17, 2010 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Britt Wesley Hanson on behalf of Larry A Dever, Edward G Rheinheimer (Hanson, Britt)
June 17, 2010 Filing 181 ANSWER to Complaint by Tom Sheahan.(Taylor, Robert) Modified on 6/18/2010 (SAT). NOTIFICATION: Document not text searchable.
June 17, 2010 Filing 180 ANSWER to Complaint by Matthew J Smith.(Taylor, Robert) Modified on 6/18/2010 (SAT). NOTIFICATION: Not text searchable.
June 17, 2010 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Alexander Taylor on behalf of Tom Sheahan (Taylor, Robert)
June 17, 2010 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Alexander Taylor on behalf of Matthew J Smith (Taylor, Robert)
June 17, 2010 Filing 177 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by George Silva.(Bodkin, Sean)
June 17, 2010 Filing 176 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Tony Estrada.(Bodkin, Sean)
June 16, 2010 Filing 190 LODGED Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction re: 188 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae and 189 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Amicus Curiae Brief. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Baltimore, City of, Berkeley, City of, Los Angeles, City of, Los Angeles, County of, Minneapolis, City of, Monterey, County of, New Haven, City of, Palo Alto, City of, Portland, City of, Saint Paul, City of, San Francisco, City of, San Francisco, County of, San Jose, City of, Santa Clara, California, County of, Seattle, City of. (ESL)
June 16, 2010 Filing 189 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Amicus Curiae Brief by Baltimore, City of, Berkeley, City of, Los Angeles, City of, Los Angeles, County of, Minneapolis, City of, Monterey, County of, New Haven, City of, Palo Alto, City of, Portland, City of, Saint Paul, City of, San Francisco, City of, San Francisco, County of, San Jose, City of, Santa Clara, California, County of, Seattle, City of. (ESL)
June 16, 2010 Filing 188 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Baltimore, City of, Berkeley, City of, Los Angeles, City of, Los Angeles, County of, Minneapolis, City of, Monterey, County of, New Haven, City of, Palo Alto, City of, Portland, City of, Saint Paul, City of, San Francisco, City of, San Francisco, County of, San Jose, City of, Santa Clara, California, County of, Seattle, City of. (ESL)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 165 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 166 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 167 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 168 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 169 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 170 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 171 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 172 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 173 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 174 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 16, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098053 as to Ronald G Blum. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 Filing 174 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Ronald G Blum on behalf of Legal Momentum. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098023 as to Jon Marshall Greenbaum. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 Filing 173 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jon Marshall Greenbaum on behalf of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098038 as to Lawrence L Hafetz. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 Filing 172 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lawrence L Hafetz on behalf of Los Angeles, County of. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098036 as to Andrea Sheridan Ordin. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 Filing 171 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Andrea Sheridan Ordin on behalf of Los Angeles, County of. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098037 as to Jennifer AD Lehman. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 Filing 170 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jennifer AD Lehman on behalf of Los Angeles, County of. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098031 as to Russell Reid Abrutyn. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 Filing 169 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Russell Reid Abrutyn on behalf of American Immigration Lawyers Association. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098035 as to Katherine Desormeau. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 Filing 168 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Katherine Desormeau on behalf of Santa Clara, California, County of. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098034 as to Anjali Bhargava. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 Filing 167 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Anjali Bhargava on behalf of Santa Clara, California, County of. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX09832 as to Miguel A Marquez. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 Filing 166 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Miguel A Marquez on behalf of Santa Clara, California, County of. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098033 as to Greta S Hansen. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 Filing 165 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Greta S Hansen on behalf of Santa Clara, California, County of. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 Filing 164 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 16, 2010 Notice of request for e-notices by Daniel C. Barr. (Barr, Daniel)
June 16, 2010 Filing 163 LODGED Proposed Declaration of Daniel C. Barr in Support of Brief of Amicus Curiae re: 161 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-7, # 2 Exhibit 8-12)(Kruschek, Elizabeth)
June 16, 2010 Filing 162 LODGED Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae re: 161 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. (Kruschek, Elizabeth)
June 16, 2010 Filing 161 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kruschek, Elizabeth)
June 16, 2010 Filing 159 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hispanic National Bar Association, Los Abogados Hispanic Bar Association of Arizona, National Council of La Raza, The United States Hispanic Chamber of Commerce. (Cherny, Stephanie)
June 16, 2010 Filing 158 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Bradley Carlyon, Kelly Clark.(Payette, Lance)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 154 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 155 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 156 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 16, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098025 as to Charles F Walker. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 Filing 156 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Charles F Walker on behalf of plaintiffs. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098024 as to Richard Louis Brusca. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 Filing 155 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Richard Louis Brusca on behalf of plaintiffs. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX098023 as to James Neil Lombardo. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 Filing 154 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James Neil Lombardo on behalf of plaintiffs. (BAS)
June 16, 2010 Filing 153 LODGED Proposed re: 152 MOTION for Leave to File. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by American Immigration Lawyers Association. (Badrinath, Vikram)
June 16, 2010 Filing 152 MOTION for Leave to File by American Immigration Lawyers Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave)(Badrinath, Vikram) Modified on 6/17/2010 (SAT). NOTIFICATION: Attorney noticed to re-file with correct PDF document.
June 15, 2010 Filing 160 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 15, 2010 Filing 151 LODGED Proposed AMICI CURIAE BRIEF OF LA RAZA et al. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re: 150 MOTION for Leave to File AMICI CURIAE BRIEF AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Hispanic National Bar Association, Los Abogados Hispanic Bar Association of Arizona, National Council of La Raza, The United States Hispanic Chamber of Commerce. (Cherny, Stephanie)
June 15, 2010 Filing 150 MOTION for Leave to File AMICI CURIAE BRIEF AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Hispanic National Bar Association, Los Abogados Hispanic Bar Association of Arizona, National Council of La Raza, The United States Hispanic Chamber of Commerce. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cherny, Stephanie)
June 15, 2010 Filing 149 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Sheila S Polk, Steve Waugh.(Fields, Jack) Modified on 6/16/2010 (SAT). NOTIFICATION: Atty noticed that document is not text searchable.
June 15, 2010 Filing 148 Notice re Advisory of Non-Opposition to Defendants' Requests to File Responsive Pleadings on or before June 18, 2010 by Friendly House et al. (Viramontes, Victor)
June 15, 2010 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Andrew Angle on behalf of Kenny Angle (Angle, Kenneth)
June 15, 2010 Filing 146 MEMORANDUM re: Memorandum Of Points and Authorities of Amicus Curiae International Longshore And Warehouse Union in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Amicus International Longshore and Warehouse Union. (Enoch, Nicholas)
June 15, 2010 Filing 145 MOTION for Leave to Appear: International Longshore and Warehouse Union's Motion for Leave to Appear As Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Injunction by International Longshore and Warehouse Union. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Enoch, Nicholas)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 139 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 140 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 143 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 15, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX097983 as to Robert S Remar, Phil A Thomas. (BAS)
June 15, 2010 Filing 143 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Phil A Thomas on behalf of plaintiffs Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, and Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (BAS)
June 15, 2010 Filing 142 ANSWER to Complaint by Steven N Tucker.(McCarthy, Michael)
June 15, 2010 Filing 141 ANSWER to Complaint by Derek D Rapier.(McCarthy, Michael)
June 15, 2010 Filing 140 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robert S Remar on behalf of plaintiffs Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, and Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (BAS)
June 15, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097987 as to Deborah S Smith. (BAS)
June 15, 2010 Filing 139 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Deborah S Smith on behalf of American Immigration Lawyers Association. (BAS)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 135 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 136 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 137 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 15, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097935 as to Jose L Perez. (BAS)
June 15, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097934 as to Cesar A Perales. (BAS)
June 15, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097933 as to Foster Maer. (BAS)
June 15, 2010 Filing 137 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Foster Maer on behalf of National Council of La Raza. (BAS)
June 15, 2010 Filing 136 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Cesar A Perales on behalf of National Council of La Raza. (BAS)
June 15, 2010 Filing 135 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jose L Perez on behalf of National Council of La Raza. (BAS)
June 15, 2010 Filing 134 Answer of Jon R. Smith, Yuma County Attorney ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Jon R Smith.(Romero, George)
June 15, 2010 Filing 133 Answer of Defendant Ralph Ogden, Yuma County Sheriff ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Ralph Ogden.(Romero, George)
June 15, 2010 Filing 132 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to file amicus curiae brief and proposed brief by Legal Momentum. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order on motion for excess pages)(McCallum, Joanna)
June 15, 2010 Filing 129 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Clarence W Dupnik.(Jurkowitz, Daniel)
June 15, 2010 Filing 128 ANSWER to Complaint by Barbara LaWall.(Jurkowitz, Daniel)
June 15, 2010 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by June Ava Florescue on behalf of John R Armer, Daisy Flores (Florescue, June)
June 14, 2010 Filing 131 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 14, 2010 Filing 130 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 14, 2010 Filing 126 LODGED Proposed Declaration of Jane Doe 1 [Redacted-Public Version] re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Boyd, Susan)
June 14, 2010 Filing 125 LODGED Proposed Declaration of Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Boyd, Susan)
June 14, 2010 Filing 124 LODGED Proposed Declaration of Jose Angel Vargas re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Boyd, Susan)
June 14, 2010 Filing 123 LODGED Proposed Declaration of Tupac Enrique re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Boyd, Susan)
June 14, 2010 Filing 122 LODGED Proposed Declaration of Doris Meissner re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Doris Meissner)(Boyd, Susan)
June 14, 2010 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Aloysius Bodkin on behalf of Tony Estrada (Bodkin, Sean) Modified on 6/16/2010 (SAT). NOTE: Same PDF as doc #119.
June 14, 2010 Filing 120 LODGED Proposed Declaration of Eliseo Medina re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Eliseo Medina)(Boyd, Susan)
June 14, 2010 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Aloysius Bodkin on behalf of George Silva (Bodkin, Sean)
June 14, 2010 Filing 118 LODGED Proposed Declaration of Abraham F. Lowenthal re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Abraham F. Lowenthal)(Boyd, Susan)
June 14, 2010 Filing 117 LODGED Proposed Declaration of Luis Ibarra re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Boyd, Susan)
June 14, 2010 Filing 116 LODGED Proposed Declaration of Joseph T. Hansen re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Boyd, Susan)
June 14, 2010 Filing 115 LODGED Proposed Declaration of Samuel Granato re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Boyd, Susan)
June 14, 2010 Filing 114 LODGED Proposed Declaration of Eduardo Gonzalez re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Boyd, Susan)
June 14, 2010 Filing 113 LODGED Proposed Declaration of Vicki Gaubeca re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Boyd, Susan)
June 14, 2010 Filing 112 LODGED Proposed Declaration of George Gascon re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Boyd, Susan)
June 14, 2010 Filing 111 LODGED Proposed Declaration of Bo Cooper re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Bo Cooper)(Boyd, Susan)
June 14, 2010 Filing 110 LODGED Proposed Declaration of Andrew Anderson re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Boyd, Susan)
June 14, 2010 Filing 109 LODGED Proposed Declaration of Susan T. Boyd re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of Susan T. Boyd)(Boyd, Susan)
June 14, 2010 Filing 108 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert Glenn Buckelew (Buckelew, Robert)
June 14, 2010 Filing 107 Minute Order Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8(a), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John W. Sedwick. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 10-1061-PHX-JWS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 14, 2010 Filing 106 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 11, 2010 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Dennis Latham on behalf of Michael B Whiting (Latham, Michael)
June 11, 2010 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Baird Dupont on behalf of Legal Momentum (Dupont, Christopher)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 98 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 100 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 101 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 102 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 11, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 200, receipt number PHX097888 as to Joanna S McCallum, Gregory N Pimstone, Sirena Castillo, Lydia Mendoza. (BAS)
June 11, 2010 Filing 102 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Joanna S McCallum on behalf of Legal Momentum. (BAS)
June 11, 2010 Filing 101 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lydia Mendoza on behalf of Legal Momentum. (BAS)
June 11, 2010 Filing 100 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Sirena Castillo on behalf of Legal Momentum. (BAS)
June 11, 2010 Filing 99 LODGED Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Planitiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, re: 97 Motion for leave to File. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Legal Momentum. (Dupont, Christopher) Modified on 6/14/2010 CORRECTED to add linkage (REW).
June 11, 2010 Filing 98 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Gregory N Pimstone on behalf of Legal Momentum. (BAS)
June 11, 2010 Filing 97 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Legal Momentum. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dupont, Christopher) Modified on 6/14/2010 CORRECTED to correct motion event (REW).
June 11, 2010 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Baird Dupont on behalf of Legal Movement (Dupont, Christopher)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER that Defendants David Rozema, Derek Rapier, Richard Romley, Bradley Carlyon, Barbara Lawall, James Walsh, Sheila Polk, Jon Smith, Bill Pribil, Steven Tucker, Joseph Arpaio, Kelly Clark, Clarence Dupnik, Paul Baben, and Ralph Ogden, and proposed Intervenor Jan Brewer, having now appeared in this matter, shall each separately execute and file within 14 days of the entry of this order their written election to either consent to the exercise of jurisdiction over this matter by a magistrate judge or a written election to have this case reassigned to a United States district judge. The parties are reminded that consent forms are not to be filed electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 6/11/10. (MAP)
June 11, 2010 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Glenn Buckelew on behalf of Donald Lowery, Sam Vederman (Buckelew, Robert)
June 11, 2010 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Hamilton Fields on behalf of Steve Waugh (Fields, Jack)
June 11, 2010 Filing 92 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 91 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Joseph M Arpaio. Description of deficiency: Pursuant to Administrative Policies and Procedures, Consent forms are not to be e-filed. (MAP)
June 10, 2010 Filing 91 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Joseph M Arpaio (Liddy, Thomas) Pursuant to Administrative Policies and Procedures, Consent Forms Are Not to be E-Filed. Text changed from Notice to above on 6/11/2010 (MAP).
June 10, 2010 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P Liddy on behalf of Joseph M Arpaio (Liddy, Thomas)
June 10, 2010 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by George Jacob Romero on behalf of Ralph Ogden (Romero, George)
June 10, 2010 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S Jurkowitz on behalf of Clarence W Dupnik, Barbara LaWall (Jurkowitz, Daniel)
June 10, 2010 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by George Jacob Romero on behalf of Jon R Smith (Romero, George)
June 10, 2010 Filing 86 Joinder re 81 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Extension of Time for Responsive Pleading by Defendants Bill Pribil, David W Rozema. (Wilcox, Jean)
June 10, 2010 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Joe A Albo, Jr on behalf of Paul Babeu, James P Walsh (Albo, Joe)
June 10, 2010 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Hamilton Fields on behalf of Sheila S Polk (Fields, Jack)
June 9, 2010 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael William McCarthy on behalf of Derek D Rapier (McCarthy, Michael)
June 9, 2010 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael William McCarthy on behalf of Steven N Tucker (McCarthy, Michael)
June 9, 2010 Filing 81 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Extension of Time for Responsive Pleading by Richard M Romley. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(White, Bruce)
June 9, 2010 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Cecile Longo on behalf of Richard M Romley (Longo, Anne)
June 9, 2010 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce P White on behalf of Richard M Romley (White, Bruce)
June 9, 2010 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean E Wilcox on behalf of Bill Pribil, David W Rozema (Wilcox, Jean)
June 8, 2010 Filing 77 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. Donald Lowery served on 5/27/2010. (Lai, Anne)
June 8, 2010 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A LaMar on behalf of Arizona, State of (LaMar, Steven)
June 8, 2010 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaiah Fields on behalf of Arizona, State of (Fields, Isaiah)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 73 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 7, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097428 as to Connie Choi. (BAS)
June 4, 2010 Filing 70 LODGED Proposed LODGED PROPOSED PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT ATTACHED re: 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Boyd, Susan)
June 4, 2010 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT)(Boyd, Susan)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 66 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 67 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 3, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX097521 as to Vivek Mittal, Ghazal Tajmiri. (BAS)
June 3, 2010 Filing 67 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Ghazal Tajmiri on behalf of plaintiffs. (BAS)
June 3, 2010 Filing 66 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Vivek Mittal on behalf of plaintiffs. (BAS)
June 3, 2010 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance B Payette on behalf of Bradley Carlyon, Kelly Clark (Payette, Lance)
June 3, 2010 Filing 64 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. Bill Pribil served on 5/25/2010; David W Rozema served on 5/25/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Lai, Anne)
June 3, 2010 Filing 63 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. Bradley Carlyon served on 5/26/2010; Kelly Clark served on 5/26/2010; Joseph Dedman, Jr served on 5/26/2010; Larry A Dever served on 5/24/2010; Clarence W Dupnik served on 5/25/2010; Tony Estrada served on 5/24/2010; Barbara LaWall served on 5/25/2010; Ralph Ogden served on 5/24/2010; Sheila S Polk served on 5/25/2010; Edward G Rheinheimer served on 5/24/2010; George Silva served on 5/24/2010; Jon R Smith served on 5/24/2010; Steve Waugh served on 5/25/2010; Michael B Whiting served on 5/26/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Affidavit, # 5 Affidavit, # 6 Affidavit, # 7 Affidavit, # 8 Affidavit, # 9 Affidavit, # 10 Affidavit, # 11 Affidavit, # 12 Affidavit, # 13 Affidavit)(Lai, Anne)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 59 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 60 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 61 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 2, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX097504 as to Nora A Preciado, Melissa S Keaney. (BAS)
June 2, 2010 Filing 61 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Nora A Preciado on behalf of plaintiffs. (BAS)
June 2, 2010 Filing 60 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Melissa S Kearney on behalf of plaintiffs. (BAS)
June 2, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097503 as to Thomas A Saenz. (BAS)
June 2, 2010 Filing 59 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Thomas A Saenz on behalf of plaintiffs. (BAS)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 52 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 53 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 2, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX097451 as to Karen Cassandra Tumlin, Linton Joaquin. (BAS)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 54 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 55 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 56 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 1, 2010 Filing 73 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Connie Choi on behalf of the plaintiffs. (BAS)
June 1, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097428 as to Carmina OCampo. (BAS)
June 1, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097427 as to Yungsuhn Park. (BAS)
June 1, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097426 as to Julie A Su. (BAS)
June 1, 2010 Filing 56 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Carmina Ocampo on behalf of plaintiffs. (BAS)
June 1, 2010 Filing 55 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Yungsuhn Park on behalf of plaintiffs. (BAS)
June 1, 2010 Filing 54 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Julie A Su on behalf of plaintiffs. (BAS)
June 1, 2010 Filing 53 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Linton Joaquin by Friendly House. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Record Certificate of Good Standing)(Tumlin, Karen)
June 1, 2010 Filing 52 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Karen C. Tumlin by Friendly House. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Record Certificate of Good Standing)(Tumlin, Karen)
June 1, 2010 Filing 51 MOTION to Intervene by Janice K Brewer. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bouma, John)
June 1, 2010 Filing 50 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 28, 2010 Filing 72 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa; Clarence Dupnik served on 5/25/10. (REW)
May 28, 2010 Filing 71 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa; Barbara LaWall served on 5/25/10. (REW)
May 28, 2010 Magistrate Election Form Deadline (re 49 ) (MAP)
May 28, 2010 Filing 49 Magistrate Election Form Deadline (6/11/10) as to State of Arizona (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(MAP)
May 28, 2010 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Arthur Munns on behalf of State of Arizona (Munns, Christopher)
May 28, 2010 Filing 47 MOTION to Intervene by State of Arizona. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Grady, Mary)
May 28, 2010 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ruth O'Grady on behalf of State of Arizona (O'Grady, Mary)
May 27, 2010 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. John R Armer served on 5/24/2010; Paul Babeu served on 5/24/2010; Daisy Flores served on 5/24/2010; James P Walsh served on 5/24/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit)(Lai, Anne)
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 43 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 26, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097299 as to Tanaz Moghadam. (BAS)
May 26, 2010 Filing 43 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Tanaz Moghadam on behalf of plaintiffsy Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, and Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (BAS)
May 26, 2010 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. Joseph M Arpaio served on 5/21/2010; Richard M Romley served on 5/21/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Lai, Anne)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that each individual Plaintiff named in the caption of this matter shall separately execute and file within 14 days of the entry of this order their written election to either consent to the exercise of jurisdiction over this matter by a magistrate judge or a written election to have this case reassigned to a United States district judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 5/25/10. (MAP)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 39 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 25, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097199 as to Paul J Watford. (BAS)
May 24, 2010 Filing 39 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Paul J Watford on behalf of Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Muslim American Society, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, and Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (BAS)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 37 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 24, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX018789 as to Lucas Guttentag. (BAS)
May 24, 2010 Filing 37 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lucas Guttentag by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Guttentag, Lucas)
May 21, 2010 Filing 36 Notice re Filed Motion to Transfer Related Case by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion to Transfer Related Case)(Perales, Nina)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 34 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 21, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097160 as to Victor Viramontes. (BAS)
May 21, 2010 Filing 34 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Victor G Viramontes by Friendly House. (Viramontes, Victor)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 32 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 21, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097139 as to Omar C Jadwat. (BAS)
May 21, 2010 Filing 32 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Omar C. Jadwat by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Jadwat, Omar)
May 20, 2010 Filing 31 Summons Issued as to Tom Sheahan. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 19, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097069 as to Yuval Miller. (BAS)
May 19, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097070 as to Susan T Boyd. (BAS)
May 19, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097071 as to Joseph J Ybarra. (BAS)
May 19, 2010 Filing 29 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Joseph J Ybarra on behalf of plaintiffs Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, and Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (BAS)
May 19, 2010 Filing 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Susan Traub Boyd on behalf of plaintiffs Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, and Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (BAS)
May 19, 2010 Filing 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Yuval Miller on behalf of plaintiffs Andrew Anderson, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, and Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (BAS)
May 19, 2010 Filing 26 SUMMONS Submitted by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa (Lai, Anne)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 19, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX97042 as to Cecillia D Wang, Harini Raghupathi. (BAS)
May 19, 2010 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Barbara LaWall, Donald Lowery, Ralph Ogden, Sheila S Polk, Bill Pribil, Derek D Rapier, Edward G Rheinheimer, Richard M Romley, David W Rozema, George Silva, Matthew J Smith, Steven N Tucker, Sam Vederman, James P Walsh, Steve Waugh, Michael B Whiting. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons)(MHA). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 19, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 150, receipt number PHX097039 as to Cynthia Valenzuela Dixon, Gladys Limon, Nicholas David Espiritu. (BAS)
May 19, 2010 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Preston J Allred, Kenny Angle, John R Armer, Joseph M Arpaio, Paul Babeu, Bradley Carlyon, Kelly Clark, Joseph Dedman, Jr, Larry A Dever, Clarence W Dupnik, Tony Estrada, Daisy Flores, Jon R Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons)(MHA). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
May 18, 2010 Filing 21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Harini Raghupathi by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Wang, Cecillia)
May 18, 2010 Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Cecillia D. Wang by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Wang, Cecillia)
May 18, 2010 Filing 19 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Gladys Limon by Friendly House. (Limon, Gladys)
May 18, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Nicholas D Espiritu by Friendly House. (Espiritu, Nicholas)
May 18, 2010 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Cynthia Valenzuela Dixon by Friendly House. (Dixon, Cynthia)
May 18, 2010 Filing 16 Notice re Constitutional Challenge to a State Statute by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Exhibits to Complaint)(Lai, Anne)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 18, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX096969 as to Bradley S Phillips. (BAS)
May 18, 2010 Filing 14 SUMMONS Submitted by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Lai, Anne)
May 18, 2010 Filing 13 SUMMONS Submitted by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Lai, Anne)
May 18, 2010 Filing 12 SUMMONS Submitted by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Lai, Anne)
May 18, 2010 Filing 11 SUMMONS Submitted by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle Del Sol Incorporated, Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Lai, Anne)
May 18, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Bradley S. Phillips by Friendly House. (Phillips, Bradley)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 17, 2010 Filing 8 Magistrate Election Form Deadline (Attachments: # 1 Instructions)(BAS)
May 17, 2010 Filing 7 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Mark E. Aspey. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 10-1061-PHX-MEA. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 17, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX096928 as to Nina Perales. (BAS)
May 17, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX096919 as to Elisabeth Jill Neubauer. (BAS)
May 17, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Nina Perales by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle del Sol, Inc., Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Perales, Nina)
May 17, 2010 Filing 5 APPLICATION of Nina Perales for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to LRCiv 83.1(b)(3) by Plaintiffs Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Service Employees International Union, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Unknown Parties, Valle del Sol, Inc., Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Perales, Nina)
May 17, 2010 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Elisabeth J. Neubauer by Andrew Anderson, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, C.M., Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Vicki Gaubeca, Muslim American Society, Luz Santiago, Jim Shee, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, Unknown Parties, Valle del Sol, Inc., Jose Angel Vargas, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa. (Neubauer, Elisabeth)
May 17, 2010 Filing 3 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS by Unknown Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Anne Lai, # 3 Declaration of John Doe 1, # 4 Declaration of Jane Doe 1, # 5 Declaration of Jane Doe 2)(Lai, Anne) Modified on 5/25/2010 (JEMB**CORRECITON-Modified to non-exparte event**).
May 17, 2010 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Border Action Network, Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, Friendly House, Japanese American Citizens League, Muslim American Society, Southside Presbyterian Church, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, Valle del Sol, Inc.. (Lai, Anne)
May 17, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 0970-3923535, filed by C.M., Jose Angel Vargas, Coalicion De Derechos Humanos, United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Andrew Anderson, Border Action Network, Jim Shee, Luz Santiago, Arizona South Asians for Safe Families, Japanese American Citizens League, Local 5 Service Employees International Union, Southside Presbyterian Church, Muslim American Society, Tonatierra Community Development Institute, Friendly House, Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa, Valle del Sol, Inc., Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona, Unknown Parties, Service Employees International Union, Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce, Vicki Gaubeca. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Index and Exhibits 1-2)(Lai, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friendly House, et al., v. Whiting, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.M.
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Angel Vargas
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coalicion De Derechos Humanos
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Food and Commercial Workers International Union
Represented By: Stephen Paul Berzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Anderson
Represented By: Laura D Blackburne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Border Action Network
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Shee
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Santiago
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona South Asians for Safe Families
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Japanese American Citizens League
Represented By: Connie Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 5 Service Employees International Union
Represented By: Stephen Paul Berzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southside Presbyterian Church
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muslim American Society
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonatierra Community Development Institute
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friendly House
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Cuauhtemoc Villa
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valle Del Sol Incorporated
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asian Chamber of Commerce of Arizona
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Service Employees International Union
Represented By: Stephen Paul Berzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Hispanic Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Gaubeca
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Susan Traub Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B Whiting
Represented By: Michael Dennis Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward G Rheinheimer
Represented By: Britt Wesley Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W Rozema
Represented By: Jean E Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daisy Flores
Represented By: Bryan B Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Angle
Represented By: Kenneth Andrew Angle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek D Rapier
Represented By: Michael William McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Vederman
Represented By: Robert Glenn Buckelew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M Romley
Represented By: Anne Cecile Longo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J Smith
Represented By: Robert Alexander Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Carlyon
Represented By: Lance B Payette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara LaWall
Represented By: Daniel S Jurkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P Walsh
Represented By: Joe A Albo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Silva
Represented By: Sean Aloysius Bodkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila S Polk
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon R Smith
Represented By: George Jacob Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Dedman, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Dennis Latham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry A Dever
Represented By: Brian McCormack Bergin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Pribil
Represented By: Jean E Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R Armer
Represented By: Bryan B Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston J Allred
Represented By: Kenneth Andrew Angle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven N Tucker
Represented By: Michael William McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Lowery
Represented By: Robert Glenn Buckelew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Represented By: Maria R Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Sheahan
Represented By: Robert Alexander Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Clark
Represented By: Lance B Payette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence W Dupnik
Represented By: Daniel S Jurkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Babeu
Represented By: Joe A Albo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Estrada
Represented By: Sean Aloysius Bodkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Waugh
Represented By: Jack Hamilton Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Ogden
Represented By: George Jacob Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan Hunter
Represented By: Cory L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Janice K Brewer
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Phoenix Law Enforcement Association
Represented By: James P Abdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Legal Momentum
Represented By: Ronald G Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Council of La Raza
Represented By: Richard Louis Brusca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American Immigration Lawyers Association
Represented By: Russell Reid Abrutyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: International Longshore and Warehouse Union
Represented By: Nicholas Jason Enoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Hispanic National Bar Association
Represented By: Stephanie Fleischman Cherny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Los Abogados Hispanic Bar Association of Arizona
Represented By: Stephanie Fleischman Cherny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: United States Hispanic Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: Stephanie Fleischman Cherny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Los Angeles, County of
Represented By: Lawrence L Hafetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Santa Clara, County of
Represented By: Anjali Bhargava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Baltimore, City of
Represented By: George A Nilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Berkeley, City of
Represented By: Zachary D Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Los Angeles, City of
Represented By: William W Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Minneapolis, City of
Represented By: Peter William Ginder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Monterey, County of
Represented By: William M Litt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: New Haven, City of
Represented By: Victor A Bolden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Palo Alto, City of
Represented By: Gary Michael Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Portland, City of
Represented By: Linda Meng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Saint Paul, City of
Represented By: Gerald T Hendrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: San Francisco, City of
Represented By: Dennis J Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: San Francisco, County of
Represented By: Dennis J Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: San Jose, City of
Represented By: J Richard Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Seattle, City of
Represented By: Jean Boler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Arizona Attorneys for Criminal Justice
Represented By: Adam Netel Bleier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Asian American Institute
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Anti-Defamation League
Represented By: David Jeremy Bodney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: United Mexican States
Represented By: Christopher R Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American-Arab Anti-Discrimination Committee
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Arab Community Center for Economic and Social Services
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Asian American Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Center for Community Change
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights of Los Angeles
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Equal Justice Society
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Hebrew Immigrant Aid Society
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Immigration Equality
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Mexican American Bar Association of Texas
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Asian Pacific American Bar Association
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Black Law Students Association
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Center for Lesbian Rights
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Korean American Service and Education Consortium
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: National Organization for Mexican American Rights
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: OneAmerica
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Organization of Chinese Americans
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Public Counsel
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Society of American Law Teachers
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Southern Center for Human Rights
Represented By: Erin Archerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Arab American Institute
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Arizona Asian-American Bar Association
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Arizona Opportunities Industrialization Center
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Asian Law Caucus
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: BPSOS Incorporated
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Clergy & Laity United for Economic Justice
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Greater Phoenix Urban League
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Hispanic Bar Association of New Jersey
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund Incorporated
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: League of Woman Voters of Arizona
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: League of Woman Voters of the United States
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Muslim Advocates
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Muslim Public Affairs Counsel
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: New York Immigrant Coalition
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Progressive Jewish Alliance
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Sikh American Legal Defense and Education Fund
Represented By: Wendy L Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American Bar Association
Represented By: Sara Elizabeth Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American Unity Legal Defense Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Barnaby W Zall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Ecuador, Republic of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Argentine, Republic of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Washington Legal Foundation
Represented By: Cory L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Tohono O'Odham Nation
Represented By: Jonathan Landis Jantzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: El Paso, City of
Represented By: Laura Prendergast Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: San Mateo, County of
Represented By: Michael P Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: United States Conference of Mayors
Represented By: John Daniel Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Landmark Legal Foundation
Represented By: Richard P Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Bolivia, Plurinational State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Peru, Republic of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American Immigration Control Foundation
Represented By: Cory L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Dan Burton
Represented By: Cory L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Trent Franks
Represented By: Cory L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Sam Graves
Represented By: Cory L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Wally Herger
Represented By: Cory L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Steve King
Represented By: Cory L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Doug Lamborn
Represented By: Cory L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Cynthia Lummis
Represented By: Cory L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Tom McClintock
Represented By: Cory L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets |