Calvin v. May et al

Plaintiff: Raymond Calvin
Defendant: Larry May, Marvin Evans, Lindale Cooper, Kyle Foster, Ray Hobbs, Larry Norris, Ronald Dobbs, James Gibson, John Engelhardt, Michael Smith, Eddie Selvey, Ronald Gillihan, Kevin Berry, Sheri Burris and Rusty McFarren
Case Number: 1:2009cv00006
Filed: January 13, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Izard
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 106 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 93 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and pltf's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/1/10. (vjt)
January 13, 2010 106 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending defts' motion for summary judgment be granted and pltf's case be dismissed with prejudice 93 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/13/10. (tjj)
November 19, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion to Compel ; granted with respect to the names of inmates housed adjacent to him in July and August, 2008, and denied with respect to the remaining requests. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/19/09. (mkf)
September 29, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Motion to Continue and 68 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; terminating 65 Motion to Compel; and terminating 67 Motion for Discovery as they are actually requests for discovery from the defts and should be re-docketed as such. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 9/29/09. (bkp)
July 10, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Dismiss; Adopting 39 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety except that Norris and Engelhardt are not dismissed as to plaintiff's equal protection claim; Defts Selvey and Gillihan are dismissed from palintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/10/09. (mkf)
July 8, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, the original and amended complaints on deft Sheri Burris in care of the ADC Compliance Office, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/8/09. (bkp)
February 5, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve defts with the original and amended complaints and summons in care of the ADC Compliance Division without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/5/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calvin v. May et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Calvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindale Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Selvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Gillihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheri Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusty McFarren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?