Campbell v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Plaintiff: Shalonda Arcola Campbell
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction, Dexter Payne, Linda J Lassiter and Judy Taylor
Case Number: 1:2009cv00016
Filed: March 20, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 74 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 70 Motion for Relief from Order is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/18/10. (vjt)
October 29, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION re docket entry # 70 MOTION for Relief filed by Shalonda Arcola Campbell. An in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting this Recommended Disposition would not be taken in good faith. An original and one copy of your objections must be received in the office of the U. S. District Clerk no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/29/10. (ksm)
September 16, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 52 Recommended Disposition in its entirety; therefore, pltf's 49 Motion to Set Aside Judgment is DENIED; the Court certifies that an ifp appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/16/09. (vjt)
August 27, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending 49 Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Judgment be denied; and recommending the Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting this Recommended Disposition would not be taken in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 9/10/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/27/09. (hph)
August 17, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 43 Recommended Disposition in its entirety; therefore, pltf's 39 second motion for voluntary dismissal is GRANTED and this case is VOLUNTARILY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/17/09. (vjt)
July 28, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending 39 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Voluntary Dismissal be granted, and this case be voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 8/11/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 7/28/09. (hph)
April 24, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 3 Motion for TRO filed by Shalonda Arcola Campbell. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/24/09. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 4/24/2009 to correct the description of the document filed.) (bkp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shalonda Arcola Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda J Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?