Cincoski v. Richard et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Cincoski
Defendant: Richard, Daniels, Cash and Rogers
Case Number: 1:2009cv00038
Filed: July 29, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2012 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 166 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/30/12. (vjt)
March 12, 2012 164 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 163 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/12/12. (vjt)
February 8, 2012 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court is providing notice to the parties that consideration will be given to pleadings 82 and 86 Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and 99 Plaintiff's response to those motions. The parties may respond to this notice no later than 2/20/2012. For good cause shown 141 Defendant Richard's Motion to Deem Admitted is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/8/2012. (srw)
October 5, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 120 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action without prejudice; the Court certifies that an ifp appeal from this Judgment and the accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/5/10. (vjt)
September 16, 2010 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 112 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to 108 Recommended Disposition; Objections to R&R due within 14 days of the entry of this Order; pltf's 110 MOTION for Copies of docket entries 15 and 35 is granted; pltf's 111 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/16/10. (vjt)
January 4, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 44] Partial Report and Recommendations terminating 36 Motion for Hearing; denying 27 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 25 Motion for Injunctive Relief; terminating 41 Motion for Trial; denying 35 Motion to Amend/Correct; [28 ] Motion for Discovery; denying as premature 42 Motion to Take Deposition; and denying Motion for Default Judgment; and directing the Clerk to once again prepare summons for deft Richard and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the complaint and amended complaint on deft Richard in care of the attorneys for CMS without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/4/10. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 1/4/2010 to correct typographical error.) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cincoski v. Richard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Cincoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?