Ybarra v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al

Plaintiff: Amber Ybarra
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction, Leroy Hoots and Linda Dixon
Case Number: 1:2011cv00057
Filed: July 14, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2013 142 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ON JURY VERDICT. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/8/2013. (dmn)
December 14, 2012 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 122 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, 112 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/14/12. (vjt)
April 24, 2012 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 94 Partial Report and Recommendations granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Linda Dixon, Leroy Hoots. Plaintiff's claims for money damages against defts Dixon and Hoots in their official capacities are dismissed with prejudice. Her claims against deft Dixon in her individual capacity are dismissed, without prejudice. Ms. Ybarra should be permitted to proceed on her claims against deft Hoots in his individual capacity. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/24/12. (kpr)
December 9, 2011 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 69 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 55 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Amber Ybarra,. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/9/11. (kpr)
November 29, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 54 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 11/29/11. (vjt)
October 17, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 47 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 44 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Amber Ybarra. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/17/11. (kpr)
September 16, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 24 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 15 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/16/2011. (dmn)
August 16, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 10 Partial Recommended Disposition; denying 12 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint; dismissing with prejudice Ms. Ybarra's due process claim against Defendant Dixon; and, dismissing without prejudice Ms. Ybarra's state law tort claims of assault and battery against Defendant Dixon. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/16/2011. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ybarra v. Arkansas Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Hoots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?