Bridgeman v. Neldon et al

Plaintiff: David Bridgeman
Defendant: Neldon, Does, Pickering and Fry
Case Number: 1:2014cv00011
Filed: February 14, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 26 Order entered in this matter on this date, the Court dismisses without prejudice this case. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/18/2015. (ks)
August 18, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING 17 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION. It is therefore ordered that the Doe defendants are dismissed from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 08/18/2014. (rhm)
February 19, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff Bridgeman to file an amended complaint within thirty days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/19/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridgeman v. Neldon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bridgeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pickering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?