Johnson v. Hubbard et al

Plaintiff: Wilbert Lezell Johnson
Defendant: James Russell
Case Number: 1:2014cv00107
Filed: August 29, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 67 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition. Defendant James Russell's 59 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's excessive force claims against Defendant Russell are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Any other pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/31/2015. (mcz)
December 8, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 33 Partial Report and Recommendations: Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/8/2014. (mcz)
October 29, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 23 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition. Plaintiff's 17 Notice to the Court and Request for Injunctive Relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/29/2014. (mcz)
October 8, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 Partial Report and Recommendations; Plaintiff's 8 and 12 Motions for Preliminary Injunction are DENIED. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/8/2014. (mcz)
September 24, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 4 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition. Defendants Hubbard, Gay, Lee, Vernon Robertson, Rilley, Lawson, Justine Minor, Weekly, Raymond Naylor and Ray Hobbs are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff is allowed to proceed only with his claim for excessive force against Defendant James Russell. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/24/2014. (mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hubbard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert Lezell Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?