Quarles v. Campbell et al

Plaintiff: Kristina Quarles
Defendant: Campbell, Odom, M Richardson, Fisk and Pansy Rucker
Case Number: 1:2015cv00107
Filed: September 28, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Batesville Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Quarles's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/11/2016. (jak)
January 21, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: If Quarles wants to proceed with these claims again later, then she will have to file a new case. If the Court hears nothing from Quarles by 5 February 2016, it will grant her motion to voluntarily dismiss and enter Judgment dismissing her complaint. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/21/2016. (jak)
December 18, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining the recommendation without prejudice, 27 . In light of the new attachments, the Court would appreciate another recommendation. A more detailed declaration from the Defendants might be helpful at this point too. The Court leaves that matter in Magistrate Judge Kearney's hands. Quarles's motion for a directed verdict, 29 , is denied. The incident she complaint about in that motion happened after she filed this lawsuit and isn't part of this case. The Court refers this case back to Magistrate Judge Kearney for another recommendation. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/18/2015. (jak)
November 20, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 24 Recommendation. Quarles's motion for preliminary injunctive relief, 14 , is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/20/2015. (jak)
November 2, 2015 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion. Quarles's claims against Defendant Richardson are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/2/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quarles v. Campbell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Quarles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odom
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Richardson
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisk
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pansy Rucker
Represented By: Christine A. Cryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?