Everett v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Everett
Defendant: Martin, Larry Ring, Shawn Stevens, Sissy and Casey Martin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00113
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Christopher Everett. (kdr)
January 6, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Casey Martin.(Thomas, JaNan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to #13 Answer to Complaint by Christopher Everett. (llg)
January 2, 2020 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Everett. [Docketed pursuant to 23 Order and instruction from Chambers](jak)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion to amend his complaint #22 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 1/2/2020. (lej)
January 2, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Amend #2 Complaint by Christopher Everett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint) (llg)
January 2, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION in Support of #19 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Christopher Everett. (llg)
January 2, 2020 Filing 20 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #19 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Christopher Everett. (llg)
January 2, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to #16 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Criminal Disposition filed by Christopher Everett. (llg)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting Defendants' motion to stay the proceedings #16 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/26/2019. (lej)
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #16 Motion to Stay Pending Criminal Disposition filed by Larry Ring. (Adams, Jenna)
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Criminal Disposition by Larry Ring (Adams, Jenna)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/23/2020. Dispositive motions due by 7/23/2020. Dispositive motions on the issue of exhaustion due by 2/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/23/2019. (lej)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (lej)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Larry Ring.(Adams, Jenna)
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Adams on behalf of Larry Ring (Adams, Jenna)
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Larry Ring served on 12/2/2019. (ajt)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Martin served on 12/2/2019. (ajt)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Martin.(Thomas, JaNan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JaNan Arnold Thomas on behalf of Martin (Thomas, JaNan)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel #5 . A civil litigant does not have a constitutional or statutory right to appointed counsel in a civil action but the Court may appoint counsel at its discretion. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1). The Court has considered Plaintiff's need for an attorney, the likelihood that Plaintiff will benefit from assistance of counsel, the factual complexity of the case, the Plaintiff's ability to investigate and present his case, and the complexity of the legal issues. In considering these factors, the Court finds that Plaintiff's claims do not appear legally or factually complex, and it appears he is capable of prosecuting his claims without appointed counsel. Plaintiff's motion to correct is granted #6 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/27/2019. (lej)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Fix Clerical Mistake in #3 Order by Christopher Everett. (kdr)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Christopher Everett. (kdr)
November 18, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (ljb)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Clerk prepare summons and the USM serve Defendants Martin and Ring without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/18/2019. (lej)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #1 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/18/2019. (lej)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Everett.(kdr)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Everett. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everett v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Ring
Represented By: Jenna Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sissy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Martin
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?