Davis v. Harmon et al

Plaintiff: LaToyin Davis
Defendant: Harmon and Westbrook
Case Number: 2:2008cv00201
Filed: November 19, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Izard
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/10/09. (mkf)
December 17, 2008 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 7 Order on Report and Recommendations; case is DISMISSED; the Court certifies that an ifp appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/17/08. (mkf)
November 25, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf's complt be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted 2 . This dismissal count as a "strike" for purposes of 28 USC 1915(g). The Court certify that an ifp appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action be considered frivolous and not in good faith. Objections to R&R due by 12/9/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/25/2008. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Harmon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaToyin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?