Mayo v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: Randy T Mayo
Defendant: Larry Norris, Arkansas Department of Correction, Dennis Carnes, Polly M James, Greg Harmon and Artis Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 2:2009cv00066
Filed: June 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of defts against Randy T Mayo re 24 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/4/09. (bkp)
October 21, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION to grant Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; Dismissal of this action constitutes a "strike" as defined by 28 U.S.C. Section 1815(g); and an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting this R&R would not be taken in good faith. Objections to R&R due 11/04/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/21/2009. (ksm)
August 20, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by defts and advising plaintiff to file, within 30 days of this Order, a response to the defts' motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/20/09. (bkp)
July 22, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 Partial Report and Recommendations allowing plaintiff to proceed with his free exercise claim against defts Norris, Hobbs, Harmon, Carnes and James; and dismissing deft Arkansas Dept of Correction with prejudice; certifying that an ifp appeal taken from this Order would not be in good faith; and directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts and the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint and this order on them through the ADC Compliance Division without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/22/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayo v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy T Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Carnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polly M James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Artis Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?