Green v. Ringwood et al

Plaintiff: Frankie Green
Defendant: Ringwood, Ponder, Davis, T C Outlaw, Byaum and White
Case Number: 2:2009cv00070
Filed: June 16, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 46 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of defts on all claims, dismissing the complaint of Frankie Green without prejudice; the Court certifies that an appeal taken from this Judgment and the accompanying Order would not be in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/23/10. (vjt)
March 5, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judment (docket entry #37) be granted; the court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order and Judgment adopting this Recommended Dispo sition would not be taken in good faith. An original and one copy of objections must be received in the office of the United States District Clerk no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/05/2010. (ksm)
September 29, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, original and amended complaints on defts., the U.S. Attorney and the U.S. Attorney General without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 9/29/09. (bkp)
July 8, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion in Limine; denying 3 Motion for Order; denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel and directing plaintiff to comply with the Court's June 18, 2009 Order within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 7/8/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Ringwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ringwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?