Locke v. Hughes et al

Plaintiff: Tyrone Locke
Defendant: Joseph E Hughes, Greg Harmon, Todd Ball, Correctional Medical Services and Arkansas Department of Correction
Case Number: 2:2009cv00105
Filed: August 4, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 27 Recommended Disposition in its entirety; therefore, pltf's complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.5(c)(2), and for failure to prosecute; all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT 9 ; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/8/09. (vjt)
September 18, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that pltf's 2 Complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.5(c)(2), and for failure to prosecute; the Court certify that an ifp appeal taken from the Order and Judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith; Objections to R&R due by 10/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/18/09. (vjt)
September 4, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff eleven days from the date of this order to file his response to the 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph E Hughes, Correctional Medical Services Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/4/09. (bkp)
August 24, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 Partial Report and Recommendations and ordering that plaintiff's claims against deft Arkansas Department of Correction are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/24/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Locke v. Hughes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Locke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph E Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?