Hooper v. Jamison et al

Plaintiff: Danny Lee Hooper
Defendant: W Jamison, Gregg Harmon, Todd Ball and Smith
Case Number: 2:2009cv00135
Filed: September 10, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2011 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 135 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/28/11. (vjt)
September 23, 2011 133 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER 130 Adopting Report and Recommendations to reflect that the Court considered Plaintiff's filed objections as stated herein. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/23/11. (kpr)
September 19, 2011 131 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT DISMISSING Plaintiff's case without Prejudice 126 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/19/11. (pag)
August 9, 2011 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER notifying pltf of his opportunity to file a response to defts' 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment within 14 days of this Order; pltf is also directed to file a statement setting forth the facts which he thinks need to be decided at a trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/9/11. (vjt)
November 4, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 75 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects in its entirety; and, denying 74 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend his complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/4/2010. (dmn)
January 14, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for defts Jamison, Harmon, Ball, M. Smith and Mounger and the United States Marshal to serve a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons on defts in care of the ABC Compliance Division, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550, without prepayment of costs therefor; and denying plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 1/14/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooper v. Jamison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Lee Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?