Moore v. Norris et al

Plaintiff: William Christopher Moore
Defendant: Larry Norris, Ray Hobbs, James Gibson, Tiffany Compton, Greg Harmon, Steve Outlaw, Maurice Williams, Moses Jackson, III, Dennis Jackson, Crumpton, Wallace McNary, P R Green, Brenda Perry, Dennis Wilson, L Ester and Brown
Case Number: 2:2009cv00168
Filed: November 6, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2011 174 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 173 Order dismissing the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/30/11. (kpr)
May 4, 2011 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER permitting plaintiff's requested witness, Joshua Michael Gould, ADC #129360, to testify an evidentiary hearing 94 ; and ordering the ADC to ensure his attendance at the evidentiary hearing set for May 9, 2011, at 9:30 a.m., at the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse, 600 West Capitol Ave., Little Rock, AR. The Clerk is directed to forward a copy of this Order to the ADC Central Transportation/Medical Services, 7203 West 7th Street, Pine Bluff, AR 71603. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/4/11. (kpr)
January 7, 2011 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 130 Motion for Order; denying 131 Motion to Compel; denying 132 Motion to Take Deposition from Harmon ; granting in part and denying in part 136 Motion for Leave to File; granting 138 Motion to Compel; denying 139 Motion for Medical Examination. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/7/11. (bkp)
October 5, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 103 Partial Report and Recommendations and denying 97 Motion for Relief filed by William Christopher Moore. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/5/10. (bkp)
September 10, 2010 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 91 Motion for Reconsideration re 89 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/10/10. (bkp)
July 27, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 78 and denying 38 Motion for Protective Order, which the Court construed as a motion for preliminary injunctive relief, filed by William Christopher Moore. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/27/10. (bkp)
July 8, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/8/10. (bkp)
June 9, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 63 Witness List: Plaintiff will be permitted to call as witnesses Chester Dee Welch, Barry W. Stewart and Josha M. Gould; and the ADC is directed to ensure the attendance of the plaintiff, together with his medical records and institutional file, and the witnesses, at the June 14, 2010 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/9/10. (bkp)
May 21, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the 42 PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and referring the case to Judge Kearney for an evidentiary hearing on plaintiff's 38 motion for a protective order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/21/10. (bkp)
February 23, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND REJECTING IN PART PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 10 ; dismissing defendants Crumpton and Brown; directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for defendant Moses Jackson and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the complaint, amended complaint, this order and summons on deft Moses Jackson in care of the ADC Compliance Division, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550 without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/23/10. (bkp)
February 22, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for the deft Dennis Jackson and the U.S. Marshal to serve deft with a copy of the summons, original and amended complaints without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/22/10. (bkp)
December 16, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons on defts in care of the Arkansas Board of Correction and Community Punishment Compliance Division, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550, without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 12/6/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Christopher Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crumpton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace McNary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P R Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Ester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?